Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 86 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17889 Week
» 70905 Month
» 190432 Year
» 3217285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
538 |
m/e |
11/1938 |
British Railways |
30538 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Q |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 11/1938 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/07/1963 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (On Works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 538 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30538 |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
07/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
14/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30538 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|