Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D141 |
17/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46004 |
31/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
17/11/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
26/06/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
23/03/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams |
17/11/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/11/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D141 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) Livery applied: Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
31/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46004 |
|
|
26/06/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46004 |
|
|
23/03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|