Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2608 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16014 Week
» 69030 Month
» 188557 Year
» 3215410 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
81 Bo-Bo
Class |
BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (Type B) |
BR (Tops) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
AL1/A |
E3001
|
|
81001
|
04/11/1959 |
29/07/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3003
|
|
81002
|
27/02/1960 |
01/10/1990 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/06/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3004
|
|
81003
|
30/03/1960 |
30/03/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
06/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3005
|
|
81004
|
04/05/1960 |
30/04/1990 |
Modified for One Man Operation |
06/1984 |
AL1/A |
E3006
|
|
81005
|
08/07/1960 |
20/02/1989 |
Air Brakes fitted |
29/12/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3007
|
|
81006
|
21/07/1960 |
03/10/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/10/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3008
|
|
81007
|
23/09/1960 |
14/12/1989 |
Modified for One Man Operation |
06/1984 |
AL1/A |
E3010
|
|
81008
|
22/10/1960 |
30/03/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/08/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3011
|
|
81009
|
11/11/1960 |
17/12/1990 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/01/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3012
|
|
81010
|
18/11/1960 |
23/05/1990 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3013
|
|
81011
|
02/12/1960 |
05/04/1989 |
Air Brakes fitted |
26/04/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3014
|
|
81012
|
16/12/1960 |
22/07/1991 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/08/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3015
|
|
81013
|
30/12/1960 |
01/11/1989 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3016
|
|
81014
|
08/03/1961 |
30/03/1988 |
Air Brakes fitted |
10/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3017
|
|
81015
|
05/05/1961 |
17/12/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3018
|
|
81016
|
23/03/1961 |
11/07/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
24/02/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3020
|
|
81017
|
27/04/1961 |
15/07/1991 |
Air Brakes fitted |
21/12/1972 |
AL1/A |
E3021
|
|
81018
|
13/06/1961 |
20/01/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3022
|
|
81019
|
14/09/1961 |
03/01/1989 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3023
|
|
81020
|
05/02/1962 |
09/09/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
25/01/1973 |
AL1/A |
E3097
|
(E3302)
|
81022
|
27/01/1964 |
10/07/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1973 |