Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19973 Week
» 72989 Month
» 192516 Year
» 3219369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "5MT" Class 4-6-0 - 'Black Five'
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LMS |
5083 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45083 |
|
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
|
LMS |
5194 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45194 |
|
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
|
LMS |
5365 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45365 |
|
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
|
LMS |
5096 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45096 |
|
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5168 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45168 |
|
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5213 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45213 |
|
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5251 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45251 |
|
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5292 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45292 |
|
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4839 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44839 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4867 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44867 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4959 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44959 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5045 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45045 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5069 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45069 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5081 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45081 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5087 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45087 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5122 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45122 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5326 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45326 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5411 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45411 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5423 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45423 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4870 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44870 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5013 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45013 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5116 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45116 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5236 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45236 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5357 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45357 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5378 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45378 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5389 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45389 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5402 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45402 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5456 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45456 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4844 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44844 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4849 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44849 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4906 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44906 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5034 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45034 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5076 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45076 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5119 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45119 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5272 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45272 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5360 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45360 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5442 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45442 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5469 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45469 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
5471 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45471 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
4767 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44767 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4795 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44795 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4833 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44833 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4928 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44928 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4929 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44929 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4973 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44973 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5026 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45026 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5049 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45049 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5061 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45061 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5123 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45123 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5124 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45124 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5166 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45166 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5167 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45167 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5249 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45249 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5261 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45261 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5367 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45367 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4951 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44951 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4991 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44991 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5014 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45014 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5037 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45037 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5057 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45057 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5079 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45079 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5102 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45102 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5109 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45109 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5113 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45113 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5146 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45146 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5153 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45153 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5157 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45157 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5264 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45264 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5303 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45303 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5306 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45306 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5312 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45312 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5336 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45336 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5338 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45338 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4799 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44799 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4822 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44822 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4859 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44859 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4931 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44931 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5009 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45009 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5019 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45019 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5052 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45052 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5115 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45115 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5130 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45130 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5177 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45177 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5260 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45260 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5288 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45288 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5308 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45308 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5319 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45319 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5385 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45385 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5459 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45459 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4758 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44758 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4766 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44766 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4846 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44846 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4892 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44892 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5004 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45004 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5080 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45080 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5170 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45170 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5171 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45171 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5181 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45181 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5229 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45229 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5268 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45268 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5333 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45333 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5397 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45397 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5403 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45403 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5433 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45433 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5487 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45487 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4845 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44845 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
4965 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44965 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5100 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45100 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5217 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45217 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5225 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45225 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5245 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45245 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5253 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45253 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5377 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45377 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5419 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45419 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5464 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45464 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5482 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45482 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
5491 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45491 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
BR |
M4753 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44753 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4861 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44861 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4866 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44866 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4985 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44985 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5054 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45054 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5219 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45219 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5231 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45231 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5259 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45259 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5282 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45282 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5380 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45380 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5400 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45400 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5467 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45467 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
BR |
M4748 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44748 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
BR |
M4749 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44749 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4811 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44811 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4834 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44834 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4987 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44987 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4998 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44998 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4999 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44999 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5053 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45053 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5256 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45256 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5358 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45358 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5422 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45422 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5436 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45436 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5472 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45472 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5179 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45179 |
|
on |
17/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4958 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44958 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4974 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44974 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5020 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45020 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5044 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45044 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5063 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45063 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5066 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45066 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5205 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45205 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5252 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45252 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5266 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45266 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5305 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45305 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5410 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45410 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4826 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44826 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4880 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44880 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4983 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44983 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5086 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45086 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5126 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45126 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5158 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45158 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5258 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45258 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5366 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45366 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5395 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45395 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5396 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45396 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5448 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45448 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
5490 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45490 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
4773 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44773 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4809 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44809 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4817 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44817 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4914 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44914 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4948 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44948 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4971 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44971 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5074 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45074 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5090 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45090 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5091 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45091 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5192 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45192 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5195 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45195 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5218 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45218 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5283 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45283 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5323 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45323 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5475 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45475 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4805 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44805 |
|
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4877 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44877 |
|
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4970 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44970 |
|
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5022 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45022 |
|
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5084 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45084 |
|
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5125 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45125 |
|
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4952 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44952 |
|
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5008 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45008 |
|
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5085 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45085 |
|
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5162 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45162 |
|
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5359 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45359 |
|
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5363 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45363 |
|
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4900 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44900 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4989 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44989 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5184 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45184 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5234 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45234 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5331 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45331 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4769 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44769 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4935 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44935 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5035 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45035 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5095 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45095 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5223 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45223 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5386 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45386 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5401 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45401 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
5430 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45430 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
4825 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44825 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4857 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44857 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4910 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44910 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4926 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44926 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5071 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45071 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5135 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45135 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5160 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45160 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5263 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45263 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5276 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45276 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4808 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44808 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4827 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44827 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4838 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44838 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4864 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44864 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4988 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44988 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5047 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45047 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5262 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45262 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5277 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45277 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5302 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45302 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5361 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45361 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5440 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45440 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5474 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45474 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5499 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45499 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4855 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44855 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4919 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44919 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5073 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45073 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5098 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45098 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5151 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45151 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5164 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45164 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5185 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45185 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5224 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45224 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5242 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45242 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5349 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45349 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5439 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45439 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5455 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45455 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4814 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44814 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4832 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44832 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4837 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44837 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4938 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44938 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5060 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45060 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5121 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45121 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5279 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45279 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5291 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45291 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5376 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45376 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5394 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45394 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5418 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45418 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
5457 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45457 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
4765 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44765 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4813 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44813 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4830 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44830 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4968 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44968 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5141 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45141 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5285 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45285 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5318 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45318 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5334 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45334 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5347 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45347 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5483 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45483 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4962 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44962 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4979 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44979 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5005 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45005 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5134 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45134 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5155 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45155 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5316 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45316 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5355 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45355 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5373 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45373 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5425 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45425 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5443 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45443 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5461 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45461 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4828 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44828 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4878 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44878 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5150 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45150 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5156 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45156 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5173 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45173 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5328 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45328 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5434 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45434 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5486 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45486 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4875 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44875 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5137 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45137 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5169 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45169 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5216 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45216 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
5477 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45477 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
4916 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44916 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4921 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44921 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4978 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44978 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5015 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45015 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5065 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45065 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5133 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45133 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5186 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45186 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5214 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45214 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5271 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45271 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5289 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45289 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5428 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45428 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5438 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45438 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5478 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45478 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5492 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45492 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4772 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44772 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4874 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44874 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4966 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44966 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5139 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45139 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5196 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45196 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5212 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45212 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5335 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45335 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5364 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45364 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5485 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45485 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5489 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45489 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4770 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44770 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4815 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44815 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4953 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44953 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5003 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45003 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5017 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45017 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5089 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45089 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5117 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45117 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5278 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45278 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4818 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44818 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5023 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45023 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5056 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45056 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5182 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45182 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5307 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45307 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5309 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45309 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5463 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45463 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4829 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44829 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4955 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44955 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5002 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45002 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5163 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45163 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5215 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45215 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5275 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45275 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
5321 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45321 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
4800 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44800 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4904 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44904 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4912 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44912 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5027 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45027 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5040 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45040 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5165 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45165 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5208 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45208 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5248 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45248 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5320 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45320 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5332 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45332 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5344 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45344 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5351 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45351 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5481 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45481 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5067 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45067 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5187 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45187 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5267 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45267 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5337 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45337 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5460 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45460 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5484 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45484 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4793 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44793 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4804 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44804 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4982 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44982 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5138 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45138 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5210 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45210 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5327 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45327 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5407 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45407 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5447 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45447 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5452 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45452 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5458 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45458 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5470 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45470 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4768 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44768 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4771 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44771 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4787 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44787 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4803 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44803 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4851 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44851 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4893 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44893 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4945 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44945 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4954 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44954 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4992 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44992 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5016 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45016 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5031 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45031 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5033 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45033 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5111 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45111 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5178 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45178 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5207 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45207 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5270 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45270 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5280 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45280 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5329 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45329 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5345 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45345 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5371 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45371 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
5451 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45451 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
4997 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44997 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5007 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45007 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5038 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45038 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5097 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45097 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5190 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45190 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5202 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45202 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5417 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45417 |
|
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4972 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44972 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4986 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44986 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4993 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44993 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5172 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45172 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5230 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45230 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5241 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45241 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5299 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45299 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4918 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44918 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4937 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44937 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4946 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44946 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5029 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45029 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5311 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45311 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5314 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45314 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5340 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45340 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5424 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45424 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
5480 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45480 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
4797 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44797 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4887 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44887 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5092 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45092 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5404 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45404 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5444 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45444 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4843 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44843 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4908 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44908 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5011 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45011 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5108 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45108 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5265 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45265 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4884 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44884 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4898 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44898 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4917 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44917 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4950 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44950 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5024 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45024 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5036 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45036 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5041 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45041 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5055 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45055 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5136 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45136 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5147 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45147 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5293 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45293 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
BR |
M4752 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44752 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4976 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44976 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5000 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45000 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5010 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45010 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5059 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45059 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5068 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45068 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5140 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45140 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5152 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45152 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5154 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45154 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5274 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45274 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5362 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45362 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5383 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45383 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4868 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44868 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4981 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44981 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5093 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45093 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5149 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45149 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5294 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45294 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5387 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45387 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5427 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45427 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5488 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45488 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
5494 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45494 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
4925 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44925 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5228 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45228 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5239 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45239 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5317 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45317 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5449 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45449 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4777 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44777 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4823 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44823 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4876 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44876 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4883 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44883 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4903 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44903 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5103 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45103 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5284 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45284 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5354 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45354 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5375 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45375 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4812 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44812 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4995 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44995 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5106 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45106 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5120 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45120 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5129 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45129 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5222 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45222 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5372 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45372 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5429 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45429 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5435 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45435 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4782 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44782 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4791 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44791 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4810 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44810 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4888 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44888 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4890 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44890 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4896 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44896 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4933 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44933 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4949 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44949 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4967 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44967 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4977 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44977 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5174 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45174 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5200 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45200 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5226 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45226 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5353 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45353 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5368 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45368 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
5454 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45454 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
4802 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44802 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4848 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44848 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4960 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44960 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5070 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45070 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5201 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45201 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5466 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45466 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5468 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45468 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4996 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44996 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5021 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45021 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5247 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45247 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5254 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45254 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5286 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45286 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5330 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45330 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5388 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45388 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5462 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45462 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
BR |
M4751 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44751 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4891 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44891 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4924 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44924 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4942 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44942 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5001 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45001 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5413 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45413 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5479 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45479 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4775 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44775 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4872 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44872 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4939 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44939 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4963 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44963 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
4984 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44984 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5082 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45082 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5343 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45343 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5356 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45356 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
5042 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45042 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5088 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45088 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5127 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45127 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5145 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45145 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5233 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45233 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5297 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45297 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5382 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45382 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5384 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45384 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5415 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45415 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5453 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45453 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4781 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44781 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4911 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44911 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5078 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45078 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5110 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45110 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5244 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45244 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5269 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45269 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5393 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45393 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4764 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44764 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4790 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44790 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5180 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45180 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5341 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45341 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4779 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44779 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4897 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44897 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4932 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44932 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4975 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44975 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5046 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45046 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5132 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45132 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5296 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45296 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4819 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44819 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
4865 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44865 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5220 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45220 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5298 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45298 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5346 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45346 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
5118 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45118 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5161 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45161 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5408 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45408 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5465 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45465 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4801 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44801 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4856 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44856 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4853 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44853 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4902 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44902 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5006 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45006 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5028 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45028 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5209 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45209 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5255 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45255 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5295 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45295 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5304 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45304 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5348 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45348 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5495 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45495 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4774 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44774 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4894 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44894 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4990 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44990 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5128 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45128 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5221 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45221 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5379 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45379 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
5391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45391 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
4776 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44776 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4788 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44788 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4858 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44858 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4863 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44863 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4885 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44885 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4889 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44889 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5051 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45051 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5062 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45062 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5176 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45176 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5211 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45211 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5232 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45232 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5315 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45315 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5496 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45496 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5498 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45498 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5058 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45058 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5075 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45075 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5322 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45322 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5405 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45405 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
BR |
M4750 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44750 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4783 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44783 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4850 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44850 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4994 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44994 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5159 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45159 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5175 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45175 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5273 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45273 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5381 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45381 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5406 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45406 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4806 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44806 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4847 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44847 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4882 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44882 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5257 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45257 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
5300 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45300 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
4784 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44784 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5072 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45072 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5094 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45094 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5105 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45105 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5313 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45313 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5416 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45416 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5431 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45431 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5437 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45437 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5497 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45497 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
4762 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44762 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
4778 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44778 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
4807 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44807 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
4886 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44886 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5188 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45188 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5193 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45193 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5227 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45227 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
5281 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45281 |
|
w/e |
30/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
4763 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44763 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4785 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44785 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4821 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44821 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4842 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44842 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4869 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44869 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4895 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44895 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5203 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45203 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5414 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45414 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5450 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45450 |
|
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4816 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44816 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4831 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44831 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4881 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44881 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5206 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45206 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5350 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45350 |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4909 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44909 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5032 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45032 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5039 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45039 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5204 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45204 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5432 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45432 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4854 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44854 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4899 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44899 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4907 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44907 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4943 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44943 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5143 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45143 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5189 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45189 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
5243 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45243 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
4852 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44852 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
4879 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44879 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5287 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45287 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5301 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45301 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
4798 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44798 |
|
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5235 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45235 |
|
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
4780 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44780 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5012 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45012 |
|
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
4786 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44786 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5043 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45043 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5392 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45392 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
5050 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45050 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5250 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45250 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5412 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45412 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5446 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45446 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
4836 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44836 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
4860 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44860 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5324 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45324 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5390 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45390 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5476 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45476 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
4792 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44792 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5142 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45142 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5339 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45339 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5473 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45473 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
4941 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44941 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
4944 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44944 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5107 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45107 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
5131 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45131 |
|
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
4794 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44794 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
4957 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44957 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
5370 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45370 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
5409 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45409 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
4936 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44936 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
4862 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44862 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
5197 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45197 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
4824 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44824 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4980 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44980 |
|
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4915 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44915 |
|
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
5030 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45030 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4920 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44920 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4930 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44930 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4956 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44956 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
5198 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45198 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
5237 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45237 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4871 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44871 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4873 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44873 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
4789 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44789 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
4927 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44927 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
4940 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44940 |
|
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
5114 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45114 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
5342 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45342 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
5493 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45493 |
|
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
5048 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45048 |
|
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
4922 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44922 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
4913 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44913 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
5099 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45099 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
5238 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45238 |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
4820 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44820 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
4934 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44934 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
4961 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44961 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
4969 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44969 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
5025 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45025 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
4835 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44835 |
|
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
4901 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44901 |
|
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
5325 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45325 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
4796 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44796 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
5240 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45240 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
4759 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44759 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
4760 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44760 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
5018 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45018 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
5101 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45101 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
5352 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45352 |
|
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
4905 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44905 |
|
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
5144 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45144 |
|
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
5441 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45441 |
|
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
4761 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44761 |
|
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
5064 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45064 |
|
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
4841 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44841 |
|
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
5246 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45246 |
|
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
5077 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45077 |
|
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
|
LMS |
4947 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44947 |
|
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
5310 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45310 |
|
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
4923 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44923 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
4964 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44964 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
5445 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45445 |
|
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
|
LMS |
5183 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45183 |
|
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
5398 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45398 |
|
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
5420 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45420 |
|
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
5290 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45290 |
|
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
5191 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45191 |
|
w/e |
22/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
5112 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45112 |
|
w/e |
29/07/1950 |
|
LMS |
5426 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45426 |
|
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
|
LMS |
5199 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45199 |
|
w/e |
02/09/1950 |
|
LMS |
5421 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45421 |
|
w/e |
09/09/1950 |
|
LMS |
5399 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45399 |
|
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
|
LMS |
5104 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45104 |
|
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
|
LMS |
4840 |
renumbered to |
BR |
44840 |
|
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
|
LMS |
5374 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45374 |
|
w/e |
16/12/1950 |
|
LMS |
5369 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45369 |
|
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|
LMS |
5148 |
renumbered to |
BR |
45148 |
|
w/e |
31/03/1951 |
|