LMS Stanier "5MT" Class 4-6-0 - 'Black Five'
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fri 06/08/1954 | 44719, 44801, 45213, 45453 |
60A, 63A, 63A, 60A |
Lochgorm Works visit: Around the works. Lochgorm Works visit: Around the works. Lochgorm Works visit: Around the works. Lochgorm Works visit: Around the works. |
RO 9/1954 | ||
Sat 22/08/1959 | 45260 | 14D | D5003/9 worked the 12:13 Ramsgate - Derby Friargate holiday train as far as Kensington Olympia. Black five 45260 completed the journey | The Early Years of London Diesels | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | 44690, 44690, 44695, 44697, 44746, 44753, 44757, 44765, 44781, 44887, 44942, 44943, 44944, 44944, 44965, 44965, 44989, 45026, 45042, 45042, 45046, 45092, 45101, 45145, 45186, 45186, 45190, 45197, 45200, 45256, 45256, 45290, 45301, 45337, 45386, 45386, 45401, 45424, 45493, 45493 |
15C, MRM10, 56F, 26A, 26A, ??, ??, 5A, 26B, 27C, 21D, 55A, 21A, MRM3, 21A, MRM3, 27C, 8F, 6B, W37, 5A, 8F, 26A, 89A, 21A, MRM3, 89A, 5B, 24E, 8B, W23, 26A, 2E, 26B, 8C, W35, Wdn, 26F, 2A, W8 |
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Minor repair road. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap road - remains only. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 08/04/1962 | 44741, 44741, 44778, 44815, 44815, 44862, 44862, 44911, 44911, 44932, 44964, 45097, 45116, 45134, 45202, 45210, 45224, 45225, 45231, 45242, 45242, 45262, 45370, 45370, 45375, 45375, 45418, 45434 |
8C, W35, 24E, 15C, MRM10, 2A, W8, 9B, W16S, 16D, 9E, 24L, 16D, 2E, 26A, 27B, 26A, 5A, 21D, 8A, W26, 15E, 8C, W35, 8C, W35, 21D, 1A |
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Crewe South shed Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Crewe South shed Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - On Crewe South shed waiting Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Wed 18/04/1962 | 45009 | 66B | Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In shops. | SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sat 02/06/1962 | 44921 | 63A | Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. | SLS 7/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | 44843, 44843 |
15C, MRM10 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - "Stone Pit". Derby Works visit: Around the works - "Stone Pit". |
SLS 7/1962 | ||
Fri 05/07/1963 | 44796 | 63A | D6115 and Black Five 44796 worked the Perth - Carlisle section of the 20:15 Perth - Kensington Olympia | MR 9/1963 | ||
Thu 29/04/1965 | 44708, 44830, 44895, 45139, 45278, 45330 |
9E, 16C, 9E, 9E, 8F, 8L |
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station - arrived on a local passenger train from Manchester Central
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station |
John Thickitt - station visit | ||
Sat 07/05/1966 | 45418 | Wdn | At Dock Street Goods yard, Newport: Dumped - Awaiting entry to Buttigieg's scrapyard | RO 8/1966 | ||
Sun 21/08/1966 | 44869, 45067, 45114, 45190, 45201, 45201, 45338, 45338, 45348, 45392, 45448 |
9F, 9F, 9F, 9F, 8C, W35, 8C, W35, Wdn, 9F, 9F |
A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed A visit to Heaton Mersey shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 03/09/1966 | 44984 | 16B | Last day of through services on the Great Central main line: Worked the 5:15pm Nottingham Victoria - Marylebone | Last Years of the Great Central Mainline (Robert Robotham) | ||
Sat 03/09/1966 | 44984 | 16B | Last day of through services on the Great Central main line: Worked the last scheduled through passenger service on the Great Central, the 10:45pm Marylebone - Manchester Victoria, in the hands of Driver Tom Pavey as far as Woodford Halse, and then Driver Hutt for the remainder | Last Years of the Great Central Mainline (Robert Robotham) | ||
Sat 03/09/1966 | 45292 | 2A | Last day of through services on the Great Central main line: Worked the 16:38 out of Marylebone | Last Years of the Great Central Mainline (Robert Robotham) | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 44710, 44717, 44717, 44732, 44737, 44962, 45019, 45089, 45267, 45312, 45312, 45331, 45368, 45372, 45408, 45425, 45431 |
Wdn, 8A, W26, 8F, Wdn, 8F, 8F, 5B, 8F, 8B, W23, 8F, 9J, Wdn, Wdn, 8F, 8F |
A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 29/04/1967 | 44674, 44675, 44711, 44899, 45281, 45282, 45296, 45425, 45449 |
12A, 12A, 8F, 12A, 8F, 8F, 8F, 8F, 8F |
Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing - Hauled an Up fitted-freight (a load of vans) along the WCML past Ince. Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing Lineside at Ince: Passing |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 26/07/1969 | 45428 | Wdn | Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited (as 5428 'Eric Treacy') | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 26/07/1969 | 45428 | Wdn | D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 | RO 9/1969 |