Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 247 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6031 Week
» 27420 Month
» 146947 Year
» 3173800 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
46 1Co-Co1
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
Notes |
D182 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46045 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
06/09/1973 |
|
D145 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46008 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
15/09/1973 |
|
D166 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46029 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/10/1973 |
|
D193 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46056 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
14/11/1973 |
|
D173 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46036 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
22/11/1973 |
|
D188 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46051 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
12/12/1973 |
|
D151 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46014 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
27/12/1973 |
|
D144 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46007 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
|
D149 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46012 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
01/1974 |
|
D150 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46013 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
|
D154 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46017 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
|
D176 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46039 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
|
D178 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46041 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
|
D180 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46043 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
01/1974 |
|
D172 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46035 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/01/1974 |
|
D181 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46044 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
19/01/1974 |
|
D148 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46011 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
24/01/1974 |
|
D164 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46027 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
26/01/1974 |
|
D161 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46024 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
30/01/1974 |
|
D141 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46004 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
31/01/1974 |
|
D184 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46047 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
31/01/1974 |
|
D139 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46002 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D140 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46003 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D143 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46006 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D155 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46018 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D157 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46020 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D158 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46021 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D162 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46025 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D163 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46026 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D168 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46031 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D169 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46032 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D177 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46040 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D179 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46042 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D189 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46052 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D167 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46030 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D170 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46033 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D171 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46034 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D174 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46037 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D175 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46038 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D183 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46046 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D187 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46050 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D190 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46053 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D191 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46054 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D192 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46055 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D146 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46009 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/02/1974 |
|
D186 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46049 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
05/02/1974 |
|
D142 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46005 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
06/02/1974 |
|
D138 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46001 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
12/02/1974 |
|
D156 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46019 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
03/1974 |
|
D160 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46023 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
03/1974 |
|
D185 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46048 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
03/1974 |
|
D147 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46010 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D153 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46016 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D159 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46022 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D165 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46028 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D152 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
46015 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
25/05/1974 |
|
46035 |
BR |
TOPS |
97403 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
12/1984 |
|
46045 |
BR |
TOPS |
97404 |
BR |
Dept |
Departmental |
m/e |
12/1984 |
|