46 1Co-Co1
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 19/11/1961 | D138, D138, D141, D141 |
MRM1, 17A, 17A, MRM1 |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Returned for minor adjustments. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Returned for minor adjustments. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Derby shed. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 15/12/1961 | D146, D146 |
17A, MRM1 |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 16/03/1962 | D156, D156, D158, D158 |
MRM1, 17A, 17A, MRM1 |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. |
|||
Fri 06/04/1962 | D160, D160, D161, D161 |
17A, MRM1, 17A, MRM1 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Derby shed. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | D147, D169 |
67A, 52A |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Klondyke Sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. |
SLS 7/1962 | ||
Thu 29/04/1965 | D140, D142, D155 |
ML, D16, D16 |
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station |
John Thickitt - station visit | ||
Sun 05/11/1967 | D166, D171 |
52A, 52A |
Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. |
RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D155 | 82A | Gloucester depot: On shed | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 13/07/1969 | D193 | 55A | Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. | RO 10/1969 | ||
Sun 06/02/1972 | D142, D149, D151, D159, D162, D178, D182, D186, D187 |
82A, 82A, 82A, 82A, 82A, 52A, 52A, 82A, 55A |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Wed 10/01/1973 | D185 | 82A | Overran the end of the test track at Tollerton (Old Dalby test track) while running high speed tests with the APT POP train. | http://www.old-dalby.com/apt-e.htm |