21/10/1961 |
To Service |
138 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/11/1961 |
To Service |
139 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
17/11/1961 |
To Service |
141 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/11/1961 |
To Service |
140 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
01/12/1961 |
To Service |
143 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/12/1961 |
To Service |
142 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/12/1961 |
To Service |
144 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/12/1961 |
To Service |
145 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
15/12/1961 |
To Service |
146 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
144 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
16/12/1961 |
To Service |
147 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/12/1961 |
To Service |
148 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
145 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
146 |
17A |
Derby |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
30/12/1961 |
To Service |
149 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/12/1961 |
To Service |
150 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
138 |
17A |
Derby |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
149 |
17A |
Derby |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
147 |
17A |
Derby |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
17/01/1962 |
To Service |
151 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
25/01/1962 |
To Service |
153 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
27/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
149 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/02/1962 |
To Service |
152 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
141 |
17A |
Derby |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
151 |
17A |
Derby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
03/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
153 |
17A |
Derby |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
148 |
17A |
Derby |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/02/1962 |
To Service |
154 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/02/1962 |
To Service |
155 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/02/1962 |
To Service |
156 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
154 |
17A |
Derby |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
03/03/1962 |
To Service |
157 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
10/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
155 |
17A |
Derby |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
15/03/1962 |
To Service |
158 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/03/1962 |
To Service |
159 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
24/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
149 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
141 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/03/1962 |
To Service |
160 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
31/03/1962 |
To Service |
161 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/04/1962 |
To Service |
162 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
18/04/1962 |
To Service |
163 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
19/04/1962 |
To Service |
164 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
153 |
64B |
Haymarket |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
04/05/1962 |
To Service |
165 |
|
NEW |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
140 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
145 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
145 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
149 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
152 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
155 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
17A |
Derby |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
155 |
17A |
Derby |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
158 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
09/05/1962 |
To Service |
166 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
143 |
17A |
Derby |
18A |
Toton |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
146 |
52A |
Gateshead |
17A |
Derby |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
146 |
17A |
Derby |
34E |
New England |
|
31/05/1962 |
To Service |
167 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
31/05/1962 |
To Service |
168 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
02/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
138 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/06/1962 |
To Service |
169 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
147 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
17A |
Derby |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
158 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
153 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/06/1962 |
To Service |
170 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
148 |
52A |
Gateshead |
17A |
Derby |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
154 |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
17A |
Derby |
|
30/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
146 |
34E |
New England |
17A |
Derby |
|
02/07/1962 |
To Service |
172 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
06/07/1962 |
To Service |
171 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
140 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
143 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
145 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
13/07/1962 |
To Service |
173 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
13/07/1962 |
To Service |
174 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
144 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
151 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
17A |
Derby |
|
21/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
155 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
03/08/1962 |
To Service |
175 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
04/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
173 |
52A |
Gateshead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
155 |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/08/1962 |
To Service |
176 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
24/08/1962 |
To Service |
177 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
149 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
152 |
18A |
Toton |
17A |
Derby |
|
14/09/1962 |
To Service |
178 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/09/1962 |
To Service |
180 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
173 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
21/09/1962 |
To Service |
179 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
22/09/1962 |
To Service |
181 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
27/09/1962 |
To Service |
182 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
04/10/1962 |
To Service |
183 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
15/10/1962 |
To Service |
184 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/10/1962 |
To Service |
185 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
09/11/1962 |
To Service |
186 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
23/11/1962 |
To Service |
187 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
17/12/1962 |
To Service |
188 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
26/01/1963 |
To Service |
189 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
26/01/1963 |
To Service |
190 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
26/01/1963 |
To Service |
191 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
26/01/1963 |
To Service |
192 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
26/01/1963 |
To Service |
193 |
|
NEW |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
01/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
155 |
17A |
Derby |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
15/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
155 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
17A |
Derby |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
189 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
190 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
191 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
192 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
144 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
29/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
169 |
52A |
Gateshead |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
30/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
144 |
16A |
Toton |
41D |
Canklow |
|
11/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
144 |
41D |
Canklow |
16C |
Derby |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
147 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
189 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
190 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
191 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
192 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
18/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
147 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
16C |
Derby |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
138 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
139 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
140 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
141 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
142 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
143 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
144 |
16C |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
145 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
146 |
17A |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
147 |
16C |
Derby |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
148 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
149 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
150 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
151 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
153 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
154 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
155 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
157 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
159 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
160 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
161 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
162 |
17A |
Derby |
15B |
Wellingborough |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
163 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
165 |
17A |
Derby |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
163 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
16C |
Derby |
|
10/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
165 |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
16C |
Derby |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
152 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
156 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
158 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
163 |
16C |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
165 |
16C |
Derby |
16A |
Toton |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
138 |
16D |
Nottingham |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
139 |
16D |
Nottingham |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
140 |
16D |
Nottingham |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
141 |
16D |
Nottingham |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
142 |
16D |
Nottingham |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
143 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
144 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
145 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
146 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
147 |
16D |
Nottingham |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
148 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
149 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
150 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
151 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
152 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
153 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
154 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
155 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
156 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
157 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
158 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
159 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
160 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
161 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
162 |
15B |
Wellingborough |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
163 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
164 |
17A |
Derby |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
165 |
16A |
Toton |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
139 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
138 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
140 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
141 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
20/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
164 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
06/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
164 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
140 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
142 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
01/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
174 |
52A |
Gateshead |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
19/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
174 |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
140 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
22/11/1965 |
Reallocation |
148 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D16 |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
12/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
148 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
146 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
154 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
155 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
156 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
21/05/1966 |
Reallocation |
165 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
138 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
139 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
140 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
141 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
142 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
143 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
25/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
157 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
147 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
150 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
151 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
152 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
153 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
17/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
158 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
144 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
148 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
149 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
159 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
11/03/1967 |
Reallocation |
160 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
16/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
139 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
145 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
161 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
162 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
30/09/1967 |
Reallocation |
163 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
190 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
191 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
192 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
07/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
193 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/10/1967 |
Reallocation |
148 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
153 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
02/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
189 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
160 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
16/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
164 |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
31/12/1967 |
Reallocation |
153 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
06/01/1968 |
Reallocation |
160 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
25/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
166 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
25/05/1968 |
Reallocation |
167 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
138 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
140 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
141 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
142 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
143 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
144 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
145 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
146 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
147 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
149 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
150 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
151 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
152 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
154 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
155 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
156 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
157 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
158 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
159 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
161 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
162 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
163 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
17/06/1968 |
Reallocation |
165 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
12/10/1968 |
Reallocation |
188 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
138 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
141 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
142 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
143 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
149 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
151 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
154 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
156 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
157 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
165 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
08/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
146 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
08/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
150 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
08/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
155 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
29/03/1969 |
Reallocation |
164 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
139 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
148 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
153 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
160 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
170 |
52A |
Gateshead |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
181 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
183 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
184 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
185 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
186 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
187 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
190 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/07/1970 |
Reallocation |
192 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
10/10/1970 |
Reallocation |
170 |
64B |
Haymarket |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
10/10/1970 |
Reallocation |
174 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
10/10/1970 |
Reallocation |
179 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
31/10/1970 |
Reallocation |
176 |
52A |
Gateshead |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
07/11/1970 |
Reallocation |
166 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
02/01/1971 |
Reallocation |
140 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
02/01/1971 |
Reallocation |
144 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
06/02/1971 |
Reallocation |
145 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
06/02/1971 |
Reallocation |
147 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
20/03/1971 |
Reallocation |
176 |
64B |
Haymarket |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
03/04/1971 |
Reallocation |
152 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
03/04/1971 |
Reallocation |
158 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
03/04/1971 |
Reallocation |
159 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/05/1971 |
Reallocation |
161 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/05/1971 |
Reallocation |
162 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/05/1971 |
Reallocation |
163 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
08/05/1971 |
Reallocation |
183 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
174 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
09/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
179 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
16/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
184 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
16/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
185 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
16/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
186 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
16/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
188 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
16/10/1971 |
Reallocation |
189 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
20/11/1971 |
Reallocation |
166 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
20/11/1971 |
Reallocation |
193 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
08/01/1972 |
Reallocation |
168 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
06/05/1972 |
Reallocation |
166 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
06/05/1972 |
Reallocation |
167 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
06/05/1972 |
Reallocation |
168 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
12/08/1972 |
Reallocation |
192 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/08/1972 |
Reallocation |
193 |
52A |
Gateshead |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
28/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
139 |
52A |
Gateshead |
84A |
Laira |
|
28/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
148 |
52A |
Gateshead |
84A |
Laira |
|
28/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
153 |
52A |
Gateshead |
84A |
Laira |
|
28/10/1972 |
Reallocation |
160 |
52A |
Gateshead |
84A |
Laira |
|
11/11/1972 |
Reallocation |
138 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
84A |
Laira |
|
11/11/1972 |
Reallocation |
140 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
84A |
Laira |
|
27/01/1973 |
Reallocation |
187 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
27/01/1973 |
Reallocation |
191 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
10/02/1973 |
Reallocation |
141 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
84A |
Laira |
|
12/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
142 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
12/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
143 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
12/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
146 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
19/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
181 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
19/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
192 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
19/05/1973 |
Reallocation |
193 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
18/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
46016 |
84A |
Laira |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
18/05/1974 |
Reallocation |
46023 |
84A |
Laira |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
46007 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
46008 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
12/10/1974 |
Reallocation |
46010 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46021 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46022 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46023 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46024 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46025 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46026 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46028 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46047 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46048 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46049 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
10/05/1975 |
Reallocation |
46051 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
12/07/1975 |
Reallocation |
46011 |
84A |
Laira |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
09/08/1975 |
Reallocation |
46020 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46011 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46012 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46013 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46014 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46015 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
LA |
Laira |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46016 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46017 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46018 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46019 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
11/10/1975 |
Reallocation |
46052 |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
06/03/1976 |
Reallocation |
46016 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
06/03/1976 |
Reallocation |
46017 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46011 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46012 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46013 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46014 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46015 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46016 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
08/05/1976 |
Reallocation |
46017 |
LA |
Laira |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46011 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46012 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46013 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46014 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46015 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46016 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46017 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46047 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46048 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46049 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46051 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
09/10/1976 |
Reallocation |
46052 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
11/12/1976 |
Reallocation |
46028 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
CF |
Toton |
|
01/1977 |
Reallocation |
46018 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
01/1977 |
Reallocation |
46028 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
02/1977 |
Reallocation |
46019 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
02/1977 |
Reallocation |
46020 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46021 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46022 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46023 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46024 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46025 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46026 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
05/1977 |
Reallocation |
46028 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
LA |
Laira |
|
04/12/1977 |
Condemned |
46005 |
98S |
|
|
COND |
|
16/04/1978 |
Condemned |
46024 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
05/10/1978 |
Condemned |
46003 |
84A |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
11/1978 |
Reallocation |
46027 |
52A |
Gateshead |
LA |
Laira |
|
27/07/1980 |
Condemned |
46012 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
05/10/1980 |
Reallocation |
46001 |
84A |
Laira |
98S |
Swindon Works |
|
26/10/1980 |
Condemned |
46040 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
02/11/1980 |
Condemned |
46034 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Reallocation |
46001 |
98S |
|
98W |
Swindon Works |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
46015 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
46019 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1980 |
Condemned |
46020 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
22/02/1981 |
Condemned |
46053 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
13/09/1981 |
Reallocation |
46001 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
13/09/1981 |
Condemned |
46048 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
20/09/1981 |
Condemned |
46002 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
11/10/1981 |
Condemned |
46008 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
11/10/1981 |
Condemned |
46032 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1981 |
Condemned |
46013 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1981 |
Condemned |
46030 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1981 |
Condemned |
46041 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1981 |
Condemned |
46042 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1981 |
Condemned |
46043 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
22/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46006 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
22/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46007 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46010 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46017 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46018 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46021 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46022 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46025 |
98W |
|
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46038 |
52A |
Gateshead |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46050 |
52A |
Gateshead |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
29/11/1981 |
Reallocation |
46054 |
52A |
Gateshead |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
20/12/1981 |
Condemned |
46001 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
10/01/1982 |
Condemned |
46054 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
31/01/1982 |
Condemned |
46006 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
07/02/1982 |
Condemned |
46007 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
28/03/1982 |
Condemned |
46022 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
28/03/1982 |
Condemned |
46038 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1982 |
Condemned |
46036 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
26/10/1982 |
Condemned |
46050 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1982 |
Condemned |
46055 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1982 |
Condemned |
46056 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1982 |
Condemned |
46049 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
16/01/1983 |
Condemned |
46021 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1983 |
Condemned |
46029 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1983 |
Condemned |
46031 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
19/06/1983 |
Condemned |
46033 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1983 |
Condemned |
46004 |
84A |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
01/10/1983 |
Condemned |
97401 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1983 |
Condemned |
46039 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1983 |
Condemned |
46023 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
04/12/1983 |
Condemned |
46051 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1983 |
Condemned |
46018 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1983 |
Condemned |
46016 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
08/04/1984 |
Condemned |
46044 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1984 |
Condemned |
46017 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1984 |
Condemned |
46014 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1984 |
Condemned |
46046 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1984 |
Condemned |
46028 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
24/06/1984 |
Condemned |
46037 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|
02/09/1984 |
Condemned |
46047 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1984 |
Condemned |
46052 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46035 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
01/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46045 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
04/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46010 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46011 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46025 |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46026 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1984 |
Condemned |
46027 |
LA |
Laira |
|
COND |
|