46 1Co-Co1
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (97/4) | BR (Tops) | BR (Dept) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D138 | 46001 | 21/10/1961 | 17A 12B 17A 16D ML D16 ML D16 82A 84A ZL ZL R |
Derby (New) Carlisle Upperby Derby Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Swindon Works (on loan) Swindon Works (on loan) Reinstated |
21/10/1961 06/01/1962 02/06/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 20/02/1965 25/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 11/11/1972 05/10/1980 14/12/1980 13/09/1981 |
20/12/1981 | ||
D139 | 46002 | 03/11/1961 | 17A 16D ML D16 ML 55A 52A 84A W |
Derby (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Laira Withdrawn |
03/11/1961 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 30/01/1965 25/06/1966 16/09/1967 11/07/1970 28/10/1972 14/12/1980 20/09/1981 |
20/09/1981 | ||
D140 | 46003 | 25/11/1961 | 17A 18A 17A 16D ML D16 ML D16 ML D16 82A 84A W |
Derby (New) Toton Derby Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
25/11/1961 05/05/1962 07/07/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 20/02/1965 17/04/1965 02/10/1965 25/06/1966 17/06/1968 02/01/1971 11/11/1972 05/10/1978 |
05/10/1978 | ||
D141 | 46004 | 17/11/1961 | 17A 26A 17A 16D ML D16 ML D16 82A 84A W |
Derby (New) Newton Heath Derby Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
17/11/1961 03/02/1962 31/03/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 20/02/1965 25/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 10/02/1973 26/06/1983 |
26/06/1983 | ||
D142 | 46005 | 05/12/1961 | 17A 16D ML D16 ML D16 82A LA W |
Derby (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
05/12/1961 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 17/04/1965 25/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 12/05/1973 10/1977 04/12/1977 |
04/12/1977 | ||
D143 | 46006 | 01/12/1961 | 17A 18A 17A 16D D16 ML D16 82A LA R W |
Derby (New) Toton Derby Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
01/12/1961 12/05/1962 07/07/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 25/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 12/05/1973 14/12/1980 22/11/1981 31/01/1982 |
31/01/1982 | ||
D144 | 46007 | 09/12/1961 | 17A 55H 17A 16A 41D 16C 16D D16 ML D16 82A LA R W |
Derby (New) Neville Hill Derby Toton Canklow Derby Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
09/12/1961 16/12/1961 14/07/1962 02/11/1963 30/11/1963 11/01/1964 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 02/01/1971 12/10/1974 14/12/1980 22/11/1981 07/02/1982 |
07/02/1982 | ||
D145 | 46008 | 09/12/1961 | 17A 41A 17A 18A 17A 16D D16 ML D16 82A LA W |
Derby (New) Sheffield Darnall Derby Toton Derby Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
09/12/1961 23/12/1961 05/05/1962 05/05/1962 07/07/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 06/02/1971 12/10/1974 11/10/1981 |
11/10/1981 | ||
D146 | 97401 | 46009 | 15/12/1961 | 17A 52A 17A 34E 17A 16D D16 ML D16 82A LA W |
Derby (New) Gateshead Derby New England Derby Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
15/12/1961 23/12/1961 12/05/1962 12/05/1962 30/06/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 21/05/1966 17/06/1968 08/03/1969 12/05/1973 01/10/1983 |
01/10/1983 | |
D147 | 46010 | 16/12/1961 | 17A 67A 17A 14B 16C 16D D16 ML D16 82A LA R W |
Derby (New) Corkerhill Derby Cricklewood West Derby Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
16/12/1961 13/01/1962 09/06/1962 18/04/1964 18/07/1964 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 17/09/1966 17/06/1968 06/02/1971 12/10/1974 14/12/1980 29/11/1981 04/11/1984 |
04/11/1984 | ||
D148 | 46011 | 22/12/1961 | 17A 52A 17A 16A D16 82A D16 ML 55A 52A 84A BR LA CF LA W |
Derby (New) Gateshead Derby Toton Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road (on loan) Nottingham Division (returned from loan) Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
22/12/1961 10/02/1962 23/06/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 22/11/1965 12/03/1966 11/03/1967 28/10/1967 11/07/1970 28/10/1972 12/07/1975 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 25/11/1984 |
25/11/1984 | ||
D149 | 46012 | 30/12/1961 | 17A 82A 82A 17A 18A 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A LA CF LA W |
Derby (New) Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Derby Toton Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
30/12/1961 06/01/1962 27/01/1962 24/03/1962 05/05/1962 08/09/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 27/07/1980 |
27/07/1980 | ||
D150 | 46013 | 30/12/1961 | 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A LA CF LA W |
Derby (New) Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
30/12/1961 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 17/09/1966 17/06/1968 08/03/1969 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 01/11/1981 |
01/11/1981 | ||
D151 | 46014 | 17/01/1962 | 17A 55H 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A LA CF LA W |
Derby (New) Neville Hill Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
17/01/1962 03/02/1962 21/07/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 17/09/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 06/05/1984 |
06/05/1984 | ||
D152 | 46015 | 01/02/1962 | 17A 18A 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A LA CF LA W |
Derby (New) Toton Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
01/02/1962 05/05/1962 08/09/1962 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 17/09/1966 17/06/1968 03/04/1971 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 14/12/1980 |
14/12/1980 | ||
D153 | 46016 | 25/01/1962 | 17A 64B 65B 17A 16A D16 ML 55A 55A 52A 84A BR CF LA CF LA W |
Derby (New) Haymarket St Rollox (Balornock) Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) (on loan) Holbeck (MR) (loan made permanent) Gateshead Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
25/01/1962 03/02/1962 21/04/1962 16/06/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 17/09/1966 02/12/1967 31/12/1967 11/07/1970 28/10/1972 18/05/1974 11/10/1975 06/03/1976 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 31/12/1983 |
31/12/1983 | ||
D154 | 46017 | 16/02/1962 | 17A 34G 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A CF LA CF LA R W |
Derby (New) Finsbury Park Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
16/02/1962 24/02/1962 23/06/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 21/05/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 11/10/1975 06/03/1976 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 14/12/1980 29/11/1981 22/04/1984 |
22/04/1984 | ||
D155 | 46018 | 16/02/1962 | 17A 26A 17A 9E 34G 17A 41A 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A CF LA R W |
Derby (New) Newton Heath Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Finsbury Park Derby Sheffield Darnall Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
16/02/1962 10/03/1962 05/05/1962 05/05/1962 21/07/1962 11/08/1962 01/06/1963 15/06/1963 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 21/05/1966 17/06/1968 08/03/1969 11/10/1975 01/1977 14/12/1980 29/11/1981 18/12/1983 |
18/12/1983 | ||
D156 | 46019 | 23/02/1962 | 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A CF LA W |
Derby (New) Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
23/02/1962 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 21/05/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 11/10/1975 02/1977 14/12/1980 |
14/12/1980 | ||
D157 | 46020 | 03/03/1962 | 17A 15B D15 ML D16 82A CF LA W |
Derby (New) Wellingborough Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
03/03/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 25/06/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 09/08/1975 02/1977 14/12/1980 |
14/12/1980 | ||
D158 | 46021 | 15/03/1962 | 17A 18A 17A 16A D16 ML D16 82A CF LA R W |
Derby (New) Toton Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
15/03/1962 05/05/1962 09/06/1962 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 17/09/1966 17/06/1968 03/04/1971 10/05/1975 05/1977 14/12/1980 29/11/1981 16/01/1983 |
16/01/1983 | ||
D159 | 46022 | 23/03/1962 | 17A 15B D15 ML D16 82A CF LA R W |
Derby (New) Wellingborough Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
23/03/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 03/04/1971 10/05/1975 05/1977 14/12/1980 29/11/1981 28/03/1982 |
28/03/1982 | ||
D160 | 97402 | 46023 | 31/03/1962 | 17A 15B D15 ML D16 55A 52A 84A BR CF LA W |
Derby (New) Wellingborough Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
31/03/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 16/12/1967 06/01/1968 11/07/1970 28/10/1972 18/05/1974 10/05/1975 05/1977 01/11/1983 |
01/11/1983 | |
D161 | 46024 | 31/03/1962 | 17A 15B D15 ML D16 82A CF LA W |
Derby (New) Wellingborough Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
31/03/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 01/05/1971 10/05/1975 05/1977 16/04/1978 |
16/04/1978 | ||
D162 | 46025 | 09/04/1962 | 17A 15B D15 ML D16 82A CF LA R W |
Derby (New) Wellingborough Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Reinstated Withdrawn |
09/04/1962 12/09/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 01/05/1971 10/05/1975 05/1977 14/12/1980 29/11/1981 25/11/1984 |
25/11/1984 | ||
D163 | 46026 | 18/04/1962 | 17A 14B 16C 16A D16 ML D16 82A CF LA W |
Derby (New) Cricklewood West Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
18/04/1962 12/09/1964 10/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 01/05/1971 10/05/1975 05/1977 25/11/1984 |
25/11/1984 | ||
D164 | 46027 | 19/04/1962 | 17A ML D16 D15 55A 52A LA W |
Derby (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Leicester Division Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Laira Withdrawn |
19/04/1962 16/01/1965 20/02/1965 06/03/1965 16/12/1967 29/03/1969 11/1978 25/11/1984 |
25/11/1984 | ||
D165 | 46028 | 04/05/1962 | 17A 14B 16C 16A D16 ML D16 82A CF TO CF LA W |
Derby (New) Cricklewood West Derby Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Toton (on loan) Cardiff Canton (returned from loan) Laira Withdrawn |
04/05/1962 12/09/1964 10/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 21/05/1966 17/06/1968 01/03/1969 10/05/1975 11/12/1976 01/1977 05/1977 27/05/1984 |
27/05/1984 | ||
D166 | 46029 | 09/05/1962 | 52A 55A 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
09/05/1962 25/05/1968 07/11/1970 20/11/1971 06/05/1972 30/01/1983 |
30/01/1983 | ||
D167 | 46030 | 31/05/1962 | 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
31/05/1962 25/05/1968 06/05/1972 01/11/1981 |
01/11/1981 | ||
D168 | 46031 | 31/05/1962 | 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
31/05/1962 08/01/1972 06/05/1972 24/04/1983 |
24/04/1983 | ||
D169 | 46032 | 07/06/1962 | 52A 86A W |
Gateshead (New) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
07/06/1962 29/11/1963 29/04/1984 |
11/10/1981 | ||
D170 | 46033 | 21/06/1962 | 52A 64B 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Gateshead Withdrawn |
21/06/1962 11/07/1970 10/10/1970 19/06/1983 |
19/06/1983 | ||
D171 | 46034 | 06/07/1962 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
06/07/1962 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 | ||
D172 | 46035 | 97403 | 02/07/1962 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
02/07/1962 01/11/1984 |
01/11/1984 | |
D173 | 46036 | 13/07/1962 | 52A 8A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Edge Hill Gateshead Withdrawn |
13/07/1962 04/08/1962 15/09/1962 02/05/1982 |
02/05/1982 | ||
D174 | 46037 | 13/07/1962 | 52A 34G 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Finsbury Park Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
13/07/1962 01/05/1965 19/06/1965 10/10/1970 09/10/1971 02/11/1980 24/06/1984 |
24/06/1984 | ||
D175 | 46038 | 03/08/1962 | 52A R W |
Gateshead (New) Reinstated Withdrawn |
03/08/1962 29/11/1981 28/03/1982 |
28/03/1982 | ||
D176 | 46039 | 14/08/1962 | 52A 64B 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Haymarket Gateshead Withdrawn |
14/08/1962 31/10/1970 20/03/1971 23/10/1983 |
23/10/1983 | ||
D177 | 46040 | 24/08/1962 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
24/08/1962 26/10/1980 |
26/10/1980 | ||
D178 | 46041 | 14/09/1962 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
14/09/1962 01/11/1981 |
01/11/1981 | ||
D179 | 46042 | 21/09/1962 | 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
21/09/1962 10/10/1970 09/10/1971 01/11/1981 |
01/11/1981 | ||
D180 | 46043 | 14/09/1962 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
14/09/1962 09/11/1981 |
09/11/1981 | ||
D181 | 46044 | 22/09/1962 | 52A 55A GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
22/09/1962 11/07/1970 19/05/1973 08/04/1984 |
08/04/1984 | ||
D182 | 46045 | 97404 | 27/09/1962 | 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Withdrawn |
27/09/1962 01/11/1984 |
01/11/1984 | |
D183 | 46046 | 04/10/1962 | 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
04/10/1962 11/07/1970 08/05/1971 06/05/1984 |
06/05/1984 | ||
D184 | 46047 | 15/10/1962 | 52A 55A 82A CF GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Gateshead Withdrawn |
15/10/1962 11/07/1970 16/10/1971 10/05/1975 09/10/1976 02/09/1984 |
02/09/1984 | ||
D185 | 46048 | 16/10/1962 | 52A 55A 82A CF GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Gateshead Withdrawn |
16/10/1962 11/07/1970 16/10/1971 10/05/1975 09/10/1976 13/09/1981 |
13/09/1981 | ||
D186 | 46049 | 09/11/1962 | 52A 55A 82A CF GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Gateshead Withdrawn |
09/11/1962 11/07/1970 16/10/1971 10/05/1975 09/10/1976 12/12/1982 |
12/12/1982 | ||
D187 | 46050 | 23/11/1962 | 52A 55A 52A R W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Reinstated Withdrawn |
23/11/1962 11/07/1970 27/01/1973 29/11/1981 26/10/1982 |
26/10/1982 | ||
D188 | 46051 | 17/12/1962 | 52A 55A 82A CF GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Gateshead Withdrawn |
17/12/1962 12/10/1968 16/10/1971 10/05/1975 09/10/1976 04/12/1983 |
04/12/1983 | ||
D189 | 46052 | 26/01/1963 | 52A 55A 52A 55A 82A CF GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Gateshead Withdrawn |
26/01/1963 22/06/1963 25/04/1964 02/12/1967 16/10/1971 11/10/1975 09/10/1976 30/09/1984 |
30/09/1984 | ||
D190 | 46053 | 26/01/1963 | 52A 55A 52A 55A 52A W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
26/01/1963 22/06/1963 25/04/1964 07/10/1967 11/07/1970 22/02/1981 |
22/02/1981 | ||
D191 | 46054 | 26/01/1963 | 52A 55A 52A 55A 52A R W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Reinstated Withdrawn |
26/01/1963 22/06/1963 25/04/1964 07/10/1967 27/01/1973 29/11/1981 10/01/1982 |
10/01/1982 | ||
D192 | 46055 | 26/01/1963 | 52A 55A 52A 55A 52A 55A GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
26/01/1963 22/06/1963 25/04/1964 07/10/1967 11/07/1970 12/08/1972 19/05/1973 31/10/1982 |
31/10/1982 | ||
D193 | 46056 | 26/01/1963 | 52A 55A 52A 55A GD W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Withdrawn |
26/01/1963 07/10/1967 20/11/1971 12/08/1972 19/05/1973 31/10/1982 |
31/10/1982 |