Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 28 Online
» 492 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 492 Week
» 18544 Month
» 251464 Year
» 1916840 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "E1A" Class 4-4-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1019     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1067     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1160     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1163     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1165     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1179     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1497     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1504     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1506     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1507     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1511     BAT Stewarts Lane  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 1160 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 1163 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 1165 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 1179 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
05/1949 Condemned 31163 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
28/05/1949 Reallocation 31504 BAT Stewarts Lane BAT Stewarts Lane  
28/05/1949 Reallocation 31507 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 1497 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
30/06/1949 Reallocation 31511 BAT Stewarts Lane BA Bricklayers Arms  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 31165 BA Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 31497 BA Bricklayers Arms 73B Bricklayers Arms  
10/1950 Condemned 31179 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31179 98W   74A Ashford  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31497 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
08/12/1950 Reallocation 31511 BA Bricklayers Arms 74A Ashford  
30/12/1950 Condemned 31511 74A Ashford   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 31160 BA Bricklayers Arms   COND  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31165 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
05/02/1951 Reallocation 31497 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 31165 73B Bricklayers Arms 73A Stewarts Lane  
26/05/1953 Reallocation 31165 73A Stewarts Lane 73B Bricklayers Arms  
15/02/1958 Condemned 31504 BAT Stewarts Lane   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 31506 BAT Stewarts Lane   COND  
02/05/1959 Condemned 31165 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31019 BAT Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31067 BAT Stewarts Lane 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31497 73B Bricklayers Arms 70A Nine Elms  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 31507 BA Bricklayers Arms 70A Nine Elms  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 31019 70A Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 31067 70A Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 31497 70A Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 31507 70A Nine Elms 72B Salisbury  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 31019 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 31067 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 31497 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
05/04/1960 Reallocation 31507 72B Salisbury 72B Salisbury  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 31019 72B Salisbury 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 31067 72B Salisbury 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 31497 72B Salisbury 73B Bricklayers Arms  
06/05/1960 Reallocation 31507 72B Salisbury 73B Bricklayers Arms  
22/10/1960 Condemned 31497 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
29/04/1961 Condemned 31019 73A Stewarts Lane   COND  
22/07/1961 Condemned 31507 73B Bricklayers Arms   COND  
11/11/1961 Condemned 31067 73A Stewarts Lane   COND