Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 548 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 548 Week
» 18600 Month
» 251520 Year
» 1916896 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Q" Class 0-6-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
530 30530 01/1938 20/12/1964 26.92 27.35
531 30531 06/1938 19/07/1964 26.08 26.52
532 30532 06/1938 05/01/1964 25.58 26.52
533 30533 07/1938 03/03/1963 24.67 24.85
534 30534 09/1938 22/12/1962 24.25 25.68
535 30535 09/1938 25/04/1965 26.58 27.35
536 30536 10/1938 05/01/1964 25.25 25.77
537 30537 10/1938 08/12/1962 24.17 25.60
538 30538 11/1938 14/07/1963 24.67 26.02
539 30539 12/1938 Bournemouth 13/01/1963 24.08 24.52
540 30540 04/01/1939 Bournemouth 24/11/1962 23.83 25.38
541 30541 23/01/1939 Guildford 29/11/1964 25.83 Prs Preserved
542 30542 03/1939 Guildford 20/12/1964 25.75 26.19
543 30543 29/03/1939 Guildford 20/12/1964 25.75 26.15
544 30544 04/1939 05/01/1964 24.75 25.27
545 30545 06/1939 18/04/1965 25.83 26.27
546 30546 06/1939 10/05/1964 24.92 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 12/1964 25.52
547 30547 07/1939 05/01/1964 24.5 25.02
548 30548 08/1939 21/03/1965 25.58 25.93
549 30549 09/1939 21/07/1963 23.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1964 24.60