Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 540 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 540 Week
» 18592 Month
» 251512 Year
» 1916888 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Q" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/1938 To Service 539   NEW BM Bournemouth  
04/01/1939 To Service 540   NEW BM Bournemouth  
23/01/1939 To Service 541   NEW GFD Guildford  
03/1939 To Service 542   NEW GFD Guildford  
29/03/1939 To Service 543   NEW GFD Guildford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 530     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 531     TWW Tunbridge Wells West  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 532     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 533     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 534     TWW Tunbridge Wells West  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 535     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 536     ELH Eastleigh  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 537     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 538     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 539 BM Bournemouth RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 540 BM Bournemouth HOR Horsham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 541 GFD Guildford 3Br Three Bridges  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 542 GFD Guildford 3Br Three Bridges  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 543 GFD Guildford HOR Horsham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 544     HOR Horsham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 545     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 546     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 547     RED Redhill  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 548     BM Bournemouth  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 549     BM Bournemouth  
02/01/1948 Reallocation 531 TWW Tunbridge Wells West TWW Tunbridge Wells West  
02/01/1948 Reallocation 534 TWW Tunbridge Wells West TWW Tunbridge Wells West  
02/01/1948 Reallocation 541 3Br Three Bridges 3Br Three Bridges  
02/01/1948 Reallocation 542 3Br Three Bridges 3Br Three Bridges  
02/01/1948 Reallocation 545 RED Redhill RED Redhill  
02/01/1948 Reallocation 546 RED Redhill RED Redhill  
01/03/1948 Reallocation 540 HOR Horsham 3Br Three Bridges  
01/03/1948 Reallocation 542 3Br Three Bridges HOR Horsham  
01/06/1948 Reallocation 531 TWW Tunbridge Wells West HOR Horsham  
01/06/1948 Reallocation 544 HOR Horsham TWW Tunbridge Wells West  
01/06/1948 Reallocation 545 RED Redhill HOR Horsham  
01/06/1948 Reallocation 546 RED Redhill HOR Horsham  
01/06/1948 Reallocation 547 RED Redhill 3Br Three Bridges  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 533 RED Redhill NORW Norwood Junction  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 537 RED Redhill NORW Norwood Junction  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 538 RED Redhill NORW Norwood Junction  
01/08/1948 Reallocation 539 RED Redhill NORW Norwood Junction  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 30537 NORW Norwood Junction BAT Stewarts Lane  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 30539 NORW Norwood Junction BAT Stewarts Lane  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 548 BM Bournemouth BAT Stewarts Lane  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 549 BM Bournemouth NORW Norwood Junction  
12/03/1949 Reallocation 30537 BAT Stewarts Lane NOR Norwich Thorpe  
12/03/1949 Reallocation 30539 BAT Stewarts Lane NOR Norwich Thorpe  
12/03/1949 Reallocation 548 BAT Stewarts Lane BM Bournemouth  
12/03/1949 Reallocation 549 NORW Norwood Junction BM Bournemouth  
03/05/1949 Reallocation 547 3Br Three Bridges NORW Norwood Junction  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 30534 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 75C Norwood Junction  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 30531 HOR Horsham 71A Eastleigh  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 30542 HOR Horsham 71A Eastleigh  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 30543 HOR Horsham 71A Eastleigh  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 30544 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 71A Eastleigh  
09/10/1950 Reallocation 30531 71A Eastleigh 71A Eastleigh  
19/03/1952 Reallocation 30544 71A Eastleigh 75E Three Bridges  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30540 3Br Three Bridges 75C Norwood Junction  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30541 3Br Three Bridges 73A Stewarts Lane  
20/07/1953 Reallocation 30544 75E Three Bridges 73A Stewarts Lane  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 30541 73A Stewarts Lane 71B Bournemouth  
01/10/1953 Reallocation 30544 73A Stewarts Lane 75D Horsham  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 30537 NOR Norwich Thorpe 73A Stewarts Lane  
18/06/1954 Reallocation 30538 NORW Norwood Junction 73A Stewarts Lane  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 30537 73A Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 30538 73A Stewarts Lane 75C Norwood Junction  
16/09/1955 Reallocation 30539 NOR Norwich Thorpe 71B Bournemouth  
16/09/1955 Reallocation 30549 BM Bournemouth 75C Norwood Junction  
10/10/1955 Reallocation 30547 NORW Norwood Junction 75D Horsham  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30544 75D Horsham 75E Three Bridges  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30545 HOR Horsham 75E Three Bridges  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30546 HOR Horsham 75E Three Bridges  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 30547 75D Horsham 75E Three Bridges  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 30533 NORW Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 30538 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
03/05/1961 Reallocation 30534 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
26/05/1961 Reallocation 30544 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
06/07/1961 Reallocation 30535 ELH Eastleigh 75A Brighton  
08/12/1961 Reallocation 30540 75C Norwood Junction 75E Three Bridges  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30537 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
04/01/1962 Reallocation 30549 75C Norwood Junction 75A Brighton  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 30537 75A Brighton 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 30538 75A Brighton 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 30544 75A Brighton 75D Stewarts Lane  
02/07/1962 Reallocation 30549 75A Brighton 75D Stewarts Lane  
24/11/1962 Condemned 30540 75E Three Bridges   COND  
08/12/1962 Condemned 30537 75D Stewarts Lane   COND  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30530 ELH Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30531 71A Eastleigh 72A Exmouth Junction  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30532 ELH Eastleigh 72B Salisbury  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30535 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30542 71A Eastleigh 70C Guildford  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30543 71A Eastleigh 75D Stewarts Lane  
17/12/1962 Reallocation 30549 75D Stewarts Lane 75E Three Bridges  
22/12/1962 Condemned 30534 75A Brighton   COND  
07/01/1963 Reallocation 30533 75A Brighton 71B Bournemouth  
07/01/1963 Reallocation 30538 75D Stewarts Lane 71B Bournemouth  
07/01/1963 Reallocation 30543 75D Stewarts Lane 75E Three Bridges  
07/01/1963 Reallocation 30544 75D Stewarts Lane 75E Three Bridges  
07/01/1963 Reallocation 30548 BM Bournemouth 75E Three Bridges  
13/01/1963 Condemned 30539 71B Bournemouth   COND  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30536 ELH Eastleigh 75E Three Bridges  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30541 71B Bournemouth 70D Basingstoke  
30/01/1963 Reallocation 30548 75E Three Bridges 71A Eastleigh  
03/03/1963 Condemned 30533 71B Bournemouth   COND  
01/04/1963 Reallocation 30541 70D Basingstoke 70C Guildford  
14/07/1963 Reallocation 30530 72A Exmouth Junction 71B Bournemouth  
14/07/1963 Reallocation 30531 72A Exmouth Junction 75E Three Bridges  
14/07/1963 Condemned 30538 71B Bournemouth   COND  
21/07/1963 Condemned 30549 75E Three Bridges   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 30532 72B Salisbury   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 30536 75E Three Bridges   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 30544 75E Three Bridges   COND  
05/01/1964 Condemned 30547 75E Three Bridges   COND  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30530 71B Bournemouth 70A Nine Elms  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30531 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30535 71B Bournemouth 70E Salisbury  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30543 75E Three Bridges 75A Brighton  
06/01/1964 Reallocation 30546 75E Three Bridges 70F Bournemouth  
27/01/1964 Reallocation 30545 75E Three Bridges 70A Nine Elms  
10/05/1964 Condemned 30546 70F Bournemouth   COND  
25/05/1964 Reallocation 30531 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
25/05/1964 Reallocation 30543 75A Brighton 75B Redhill  
19/07/1964 Condemned 30531 75B Redhill   COND  
29/11/1964 Condemned 30541 70C Guildford   COND  
20/12/1964 Condemned 30530 70A Nine Elms   COND  
20/12/1964 Condemned 30542 70C Guildford   COND  
20/12/1964 Condemned 30543 75B Redhill   COND  
18/01/1965 Reallocation 30535 70E Salisbury 70C Guildford  
21/03/1965 Condemned 30548 71A Eastleigh   COND  
18/04/1965 Condemned 30545 70A Nine Elms   COND  
25/04/1965 Condemned 30535 70C Guildford   COND