Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 521 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 521 Week
» 18573 Month
» 251493 Year
» 1916869 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Q" Class 0-6-0


Class SR (1931) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Q 530 30530 01/1938 ELH
72A
71B
70A
W
Eastleigh
Exmouth Junction
Bournemouth
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1962
14/07/1963
06/01/1964
20/12/1964
20/12/1964
Q 531 30531 06/1938 TWW
TWW
HOR
71A
71A
72A
75E
75A
75B
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Tunbridge Wells West
Horsham
Eastleigh
Eastleigh
Exmouth Junction
Three Bridges
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1948
01/06/1948
09/09/1950
09/10/1950
17/12/1962
14/07/1963
06/01/1964
25/05/1964
19/07/1964
19/07/1964
Q 532 30532 06/1938 ELH
72B
W
Eastleigh
Salisbury
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1962
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Q 533 30533 07/1938 RED
NORW
75A
71B
W
Redhill
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
18/03/1961
07/01/1963
03/03/1963
03/03/1963
Q 534 30534 09/1938 TWW
TWW
75C
75A
W
Tunbridge Wells West
Tunbridge Wells West
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1948
31/08/1950
03/05/1961
22/12/1962
22/12/1962
Q 535 30535 09/1938 ELH
75A
71B
70E
70C
W
Eastleigh
Brighton
Bournemouth
Salisbury
Guildford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/07/1961
17/12/1962
06/01/1964
18/01/1965
25/04/1965
25/04/1965
Q 536 30536 10/1938 ELH
75E
W
Eastleigh
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/01/1963
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Q 537 30537 10/1938 RED
NORW
BAT
NOR
73A
75C
75A
75D
W
Redhill
Norwood Junction
Stewarts Lane
Norwich Thorpe
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
12/02/1949
12/03/1949
18/06/1954
06/11/1954
04/01/1962
02/07/1962
08/12/1962
08/12/1962
Q 538 30538 11/1938 RED
NORW
73A
75C
75A
75D
71B
W
Redhill
Norwood Junction
Stewarts Lane
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
18/06/1954
06/11/1954
18/03/1961
02/07/1962
07/01/1963
14/07/1963
14/07/1963
Q 539 30539 12/1938 BM
RED
NORW
BAT
NOR
71B
W
Bournemouth
Redhill
Norwood Junction
Stewarts Lane
Norwich Thorpe
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
12/1938
01/01/1948
01/08/1948
12/02/1949
12/03/1949
16/09/1955
13/01/1963
13/01/1963
Q 540 30540 04/01/1939 BM
HOR
3B
75C
75E
W
Bournemouth
Horsham
Three Bridges
Norwood Junction
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
04/01/1939
01/01/1948
01/03/1948
20/07/1953
08/12/1961
24/11/1962
24/11/1962
Q 541 30541 23/01/1939 GFD
3B
3B
73A
71B
70D
70C
W
Guildford
Three Bridges
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Bournemouth
Basingstoke
Guildford
Withdrawn
23/01/1939
01/01/1948
02/01/1948
20/07/1953
01/10/1953
30/01/1963
01/04/1963
29/11/1964
29/11/1964
Q 542 30542 03/1939 GFD
3B
3B
HOR
71A
70C
W
Guildford
Three Bridges
Three Bridges
Horsham
Eastleigh
Guildford
Withdrawn
03/1939
01/01/1948
02/01/1948
01/03/1948
09/09/1950
17/12/1962
20/12/1964
20/12/1964
Q 543 30543 29/03/1939 GFD
HOR
71A
75D
75E
75A
75B
W
Guildford
Horsham
Eastleigh
Stewarts Lane
Three Bridges
Brighton
Redhill
Withdrawn
29/03/1939
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
17/12/1962
07/01/1963
06/01/1964
25/05/1964
20/12/1964
20/12/1964
Q 544 30544 04/1939 HOR
TWW
71A
75E
73A
75D
75E
75A
75D
75E
W
Horsham
Tunbridge Wells West
Eastleigh
Three Bridges
Stewarts Lane
Horsham
Three Bridges
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/06/1948
09/09/1950
19/03/1952
20/07/1953
01/10/1953
18/07/1959
26/05/1961
02/07/1962
07/01/1963
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Q 545 30545 06/1939 RED
RED
HOR
75E
70A
W
Redhill
Redhill
Horsham
Three Bridges
Nine Elms
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1948
01/06/1948
18/07/1959
27/01/1964
18/04/1965
18/04/1965
Q 546 30546 06/1939 RED
RED
HOR
75E
70F
W
Redhill
Redhill
Horsham
Three Bridges
Bournemouth
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/01/1948
01/06/1948
18/07/1959
06/01/1964
10/05/1964
10/05/1964
Q 547 30547 07/1939 RED
3B
NORW
75D
75E
W
Redhill
Three Bridges
Norwood Junction
Horsham
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/06/1948
03/05/1949
10/10/1955
18/07/1959
05/01/1964
05/01/1964
Q 548 30548 08/1939 BM
BAT
BM
75E
71A
W
Bournemouth
Stewarts Lane
Bournemouth
Three Bridges
Eastleigh
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1949
12/03/1949
07/01/1963
30/01/1963
21/03/1965
21/03/1965
Q 549 30549 09/1939 BM
NORW
BM
75C
75A
75D
75E
W
Bournemouth
Norwood Junction
Bournemouth
Norwood Junction
Brighton
Stewarts Lane
Three Bridges
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1949
12/03/1949
16/09/1955
04/01/1962
02/07/1962
17/12/1962
21/07/1963
21/07/1963