25/0 |
D5151
|
25001
|
|
|
|
15/04/1961 |
28/09/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
25/0 |
D5152
|
25002
|
|
|
|
01/05/1961 |
01/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
09/03/1971 |
25/0 |
D5153
|
25003
|
|
|
|
10/05/1961 |
18/08/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/05/1971 |
25/0 |
D5154
|
25004
|
|
|
|
20/05/1961 |
15/09/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
10/11/1970 |
25/0 |
D5155
|
25005
|
|
|
|
03/06/1961 |
01/12/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/0 |
D5156
|
25006
|
|
|
|
17/06/1961 |
01/12/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/0 |
D5157
|
25007
|
|
|
|
07/07/1961 |
01/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5158
|
25008
|
|
|
|
10/07/1961 |
09/06/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5159
|
25009
|
|
|
|
27/07/1961 |
07/07/1980 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5160
|
25010
|
|
|
|
19/08/1961 |
11/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/03/1971 |
25/0 |
D5161
|
25011
|
|
|
|
02/09/1961 |
01/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5162
|
25012
|
|
|
|
09/09/1961 |
04/02/1977 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5163
|
25013
|
|
|
|
29/09/1961 |
28/09/1980 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5164
|
25014
|
|
|
|
07/10/1961 |
20/07/1977 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5165
|
25015
|
|
|
|
19/10/1961 |
18/12/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
25/0 |
D5166
|
25016
|
|
|
|
02/11/1961 |
25/01/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/02/1971 |
25/0 |
D5167
|
25017
|
|
|
|
25/11/1961 |
25/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5168
|
25018
|
|
|
|
01/12/1961 |
22/11/1976 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5169
|
25019
|
|
|
|
15/12/1961 |
03/09/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5170
|
25020
|
|
|
|
29/12/1961 |
25/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5171
|
25021
|
|
|
|
03/02/1962 |
03/09/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5172
|
25022
|
|
|
|
17/02/1962 |
25/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5173
|
25023
|
|
|
|
17/03/1962 |
28/09/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/0 |
D5174
|
25024
|
|
|
|
30/03/1962 |
25/01/1976 |
Steam heat boiler removed |
15/02/1969 |
25/0 |
D5175
|
25025
|
|
|
|
21/04/1962 |
15/04/1977 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5176
|
25026
|
|
|
|
08/01/1963 |
02/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
11/1973 |
25/1 |
D5177
|
25027
|
|
|
|
04/02/1963 |
08/05/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5178
|
25028
|
|
|
|
08/02/1963 |
01/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1977 |
25/1 |
D5179
|
25029
|
|
|
|
11/02/1963 |
07/08/1977 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5180
|
25030
|
|
|
|
19/02/1963 |
21/08/1976 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5181
|
25031
|
|
|
|
04/03/1963 |
31/12/1977 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5182
|
25032
|
|
|
|
19/03/1963 |
10/03/1986 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5183
|
25033
|
|
|
|
08/04/1963 |
24/04/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
25/06/1970 |
25/1 |
D5184
|
25034
|
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
22/12/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/1 |
D5185
|
25035
|
|
|
|
22/05/1963 |
15/03/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/1970 |
25/1 |
D5186
|
25036
|
|
|
|
19/03/1963 |
19/12/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/05/1971 |
25/1 |
D5187
|
25037
|
|
|
|
22/03/1963 |
19/01/1987 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
02/1979 |
25/1 |
D5188
|
25038
|
|
|
|
23/03/1963 |
31/05/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/1 |
D5189
|
25039
|
|
|
|
27/03/1963 |
31/05/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/1 |
D5190
|
25040
|
|
|
|
04/04/1963 |
16/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/05/1971 |
25/1 |
D5191
|
25041
|
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
31/05/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/09/1970 |
25/1 |
D5192
|
25042
|
|
|
|
29/04/1963 |
08/05/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/1 |
D5193
|
25043
|
|
|
|
29/04/1963 |
01/02/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/1 |
D5194
|
25044
|
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
08/07/1985 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
09/1977 |
25/1 |
D5195
|
25045
|
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
04/10/1975 |
EQ Brakes Added |
18/08/1970 |
25/1 |
D5196
|
25046
|
|
|
|
10/05/1963 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
18/08/1970 |
25/1 |
D5197
|
25047
|
|
|
|
09/05/1963 |
07/09/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/1 |
D5198
|
25048
|
|
|
|
16/05/1963 |
20/02/1986 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5199
|
25049
|
|
|
|
17/05/1963 |
08/01/1984 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/1 |
D5200
|
25050
|
|
|
|
31/05/1963 |
24/04/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/1 |
D5201
|
25051
|
|
|
|
20/05/1963 |
18/09/1985 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
12/1974 |
25/1 |
D5202
|
25052
|
|
|
|
28/05/1963 |
05/10/1980 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
10/1977 |
25/1 |
D5203
|
25053
|
|
|
|
29/05/1963 |
01/12/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/1 |
D5204
|
25054
|
|
|
|
07/06/1963 |
13/05/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
25/1 |
D5205
|
25055
|
|
|
|
14/06/1963 |
02/11/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
01/12/1970 |
25/1 |
D5206
|
25056
|
|
|
|
19/06/1963 |
01/08/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
03/1970 |
25/1 |
D5207
|
25057
|
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
15/03/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
25/1 |
D5208
|
25058
|
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
03/02/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
09/1971 |
25/1 |
D5209
|
25059
|
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
20/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
09/1971 |
25/1 |
D5210
|
25060
|
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
09/12/1985 |
EQ Brakes Added |
26/08/1970 |
25/1 |
D5211
|
25061
|
|
|
|
24/06/1963 |
02/11/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
17/10/1970 |
25/1 |
D5212
|
25062
|
|
|
|
28/06/1963 |
19/12/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/01/1971 |
25/1 |
D5213
|
25063
|
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
02/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/1 |
D5214
|
25064
|
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
09/12/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/1 |
D5215
|
25065
|
|
|
|
15/07/1963 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
31/10/1970 |
25/1 |
D5216
|
25066
|
|
|
|
11/07/1963 |
21/06/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/10/1970 |
25/1 |
D5217
|
25067
|
|
|
|
02/08/1963 |
12/12/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
02/1971 |
25/1 |
D5219
|
25069
|
|
|
|
09/08/1963 |
19/12/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/1 |
D5220
|
25070
|
|
|
|
17/09/1963 |
02/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
25/1 |
D5221
|
25071
|
|
|
|
31/08/1963 |
21/06/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
02/1971 |
25/1 |
D5222
|
25072
|
|
|
|
17/09/1963 |
05/12/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/1978 |
25/1 |
D5223
|
25073
|
|
|
|
04/07/1963 |
08/09/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
08/1971 |
25/1 |
D5224
|
25074
|
|
|
|
19/07/1963 |
07/09/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/1 |
D5225
|
25075
|
|
|
|
26/07/1963 |
27/03/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
18/08/1970 |
25/1 |
D5226
|
25076
|
|
|
|
23/08/1963 |
12/11/1984 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
10/1978 |
25/1 |
D5227
|
25077
|
|
|
|
02/09/1963 |
06/05/1978 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
05/1977 |
25/1 |
D5228
|
25078
|
|
|
|
13/09/1963 |
23/09/1985 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
04/1978 |
25/1 |
D5229
|
25079
|
|
|
|
29/09/1963 |
28/08/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/09/1970 |
25/1 |
D5230
|
25080
|
|
|
|
19/10/1963 |
02/09/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/1 |
D5231
|
25081
|
|
|
|
14/12/1963 |
07/02/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/08/1970 |
25/1 |
D5232
|
25082
|
|
|
|
06/11/1963 |
10/05/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
25/2 |
D5233
|
25083
|
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
01/07/1984 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
24/04/1971 |
25/2 |
D5234
|
25084
|
|
|
|
11/12/1963 |
18/12/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
26/09/1970 |
25/2 |
D5235
|
25085
|
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
21/03/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D5237
|
25087
|
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
28/09/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
05/1971 |
25/2 |
D5238
|
25088
|
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
16/08/1981 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
11/1976 |
25/2 |
D5239
|
25089
|
|
|
|
20/12/1963 |
24/02/1986 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
02/1977 |
25/2 |
D5240
|
25090
|
|
|
|
31/12/1963 |
22/05/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D5241
|
25091
|
|
|
|
31/12/1963 |
15/10/1978 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
05/1971 |
25/2 |
D5242
|
25092
|
|
|
|
30/12/1963 |
11/05/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
09/10/1970 |
25/2 |
D5243
|
25093
|
|
|
|
08/01/1964 |
07/11/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
24/08/1970 |
25/2 |
D5244
|
25094
|
|
|
|
20/01/1964 |
01/02/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
02/1972 |
25/2 |
D5245
|
25095
|
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
23/07/1986 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D5246
|
25096
|
|
|
|
24/01/1964 |
31/12/1977 |
EQ Brakes Added |
09/11/1970 |
25/2 |
D5247
|
25097
|
|
|
|
31/01/1964 |
13/11/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D5249
|
25099
|
|
|
|
07/02/1964 |
01/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
21/12/1970 |
25/2 |
D5250
|
25100
|
|
|
|
14/02/1964 |
01/02/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D5251
|
25101
|
|
|
|
19/02/1964 |
16/01/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
25/2 |
D5252
|
25102
|
|
|
|
21/02/1964 |
11/05/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
02/1971 |
25/2 |
D5253
|
25103
|
|
|
|
26/02/1964 |
07/09/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D5254
|
25104
|
|
|
|
28/02/1964 |
26/09/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D5255
|
25105
|
|
|
|
06/03/1964 |
04/04/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1972 |
25/2 |
D5256
|
25106
|
|
|
|
13/03/1964 |
09/10/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D5258
|
25108
|
|
|
|
20/03/1964 |
14/07/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/2 |
D5259
|
25109
|
|
|
|
25/03/1964 |
11/03/1987 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
03/1972 |
25/2 |
D5260
|
25110
|
|
|
|
26/03/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/2 |
D5261
|
25111
|
|
|
|
02/04/1964 |
30/03/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
25/2 |
D5263
|
25113
|
|
|
|
14/04/1964 |
26/06/1983 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
03/1972 |
25/2 |
D5264
|
25114
|
|
|
|
17/04/1964 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
02/1970 |
25/2 |
D5265
|
25115
|
|
|
|
22/04/1964 |
02/10/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/2 |
D5266
|
25116
|
|
|
|
29/04/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
25/2 |
D5267
|
25117
|
|
|
|
29/04/1964 |
22/01/1984 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/09/1970 |
25/2 |
D5268
|
25118
|
|
|
|
08/05/1964 |
04/01/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/12/1970 |
25/2 |
D5269
|
25119
|
|
|
|
06/05/1964 |
14/06/1985 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
11/1971 |
25/2 |
D5270
|
25120
|
|
|
|
14/05/1964 |
27/11/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/09/1970 |
25/2 |
D5271
|
25121
|
|
|
|
15/05/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/2 |
D5272
|
25122
|
|
|
|
22/05/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
08/03/1971 |
25/2 |
D5273
|
25123
|
|
|
|
22/05/1964 |
01/05/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
27/08/1970 |
25/2 |
D5274
|
25124
|
|
|
|
29/05/1964 |
20/10/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/2 |
D5275
|
25125
|
|
|
|
03/06/1964 |
06/12/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/2 |
D5276
|
25126
|
|
|
|
05/06/1964 |
28/11/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D5277
|
25127
|
|
|
|
11/06/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/2 |
D5279
|
25129
|
|
|
|
18/06/1964 |
07/02/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
11/09/1970 |
25/2 |
D5280
|
25130
|
|
|
|
20/06/1964 |
05/12/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
08/1971 |
25/2 |
D5281
|
25131
|
|
|
97202
|
26/06/1964 |
01/01/1984 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D5282
|
25132
|
|
|
|
10/07/1964 |
19/12/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/2 |
D5283
|
25133
|
|
|
|
02/07/1964 |
28/08/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
08/1972 |
25/2 |
D5284
|
25134
|
|
|
|
09/07/1964 |
19/12/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/2 |
D5285
|
25135
|
|
|
|
09/07/1964 |
16/01/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
11/1972 |
25/2 |
D5286
|
25136
|
|
|
|
29/07/1964 |
27/03/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
03/08/1970 |
25/2 |
D5287
|
25137
|
|
|
|
29/07/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/2 |
D5288
|
25138
|
|
|
|
30/07/1964 |
11/12/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/09/1970 |
25/2 |
D5289
|
25139
|
|
|
|
13/08/1964 |
07/11/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
25/2 |
D5290
|
25140
|
|
|
|
17/08/1964 |
18/12/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
05/1971 |
25/2 |
D5291
|
25141
|
|
|
|
24/08/1964 |
19/09/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
05/1972 |
25/2 |
D5292
|
25142
|
|
|
|
26/08/1964 |
18/10/1981 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
12/1971 |
25/2 |
D5293
|
25143
|
|
|
|
02/09/1964 |
14/11/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
25/2 |
D5294
|
25144
|
|
|
|
07/09/1964 |
17/04/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1972 |
25/2 |
D5295
|
25145
|
|
|
|
10/09/1964 |
02/01/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1977 |
25/2 |
D5297
|
25147
|
|
|
|
18/09/1964 |
30/03/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/2 |
D5298
|
25148
|
|
|
|
28/09/1964 |
07/09/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
25/2 |
D5299
|
25149
|
|
|
|
15/10/1965 |
10/01/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
11/1971 |
25/2 |
D7500
|
25150
|
|
|
|
02/10/1964 |
13/06/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1974 |
25/2 |
D7501
|
25151
|
|
|
|
06/10/1964 |
12/09/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
16/11/1970 |
25/2 |
D7502
|
25152
|
|
|
|
08/10/1964 |
26/01/1984 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
01/1972 |
25/2 |
D7503
|
25153
|
|
|
|
14/10/1964 |
03/04/1983 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
01/1972 |
25/2 |
D7504
|
25154
|
|
|
|
17/10/1964 |
27/03/1985 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
03/1974 |
25/2 |
D7505
|
25155
|
|
|
|
22/10/1964 |
01/12/1980 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
10/1975 |
25/2 |
D7506
|
25156
|
|
|
|
27/10/1964 |
20/12/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
18/11/1970 |
25/2 |
D7507
|
25157
|
|
|
|
29/10/1964 |
24/10/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7508
|
25158
|
|
|
|
05/11/1964 |
22/05/1983 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
06/1976 |
25/2 |
D7509
|
25159
|
|
|
|
05/11/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
25/2 |
D7510
|
25160
|
|
|
|
10/11/1964 |
10/10/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
09/12/1970 |
25/2 |
D7511
|
25161
|
|
|
|
17/11/1964 |
28/11/1984 |
EQ Brakes Added |
03/08/1970 |
25/2 |
D7512
|
25162
|
|
|
|
20/11/1964 |
31/05/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
16/12/1970 |
25/2 |
D7513
|
25163
|
|
|
|
25/11/1964 |
09/11/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
25/2 |
D7514
|
25164
|
|
|
|
25/11/1964 |
21/08/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/2 |
D7515
|
25165
|
|
|
|
02/12/1964 |
03/11/1978 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
13/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7516
|
25166
|
|
|
|
04/12/1964 |
02/11/1980 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
01/1972 |
25/2 |
D7517
|
25167
|
|
|
|
09/12/1964 |
29/05/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
25/2 |
D7518
|
25168
|
|
|
|
12/12/1964 |
22/05/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/2 |
D7519
|
25169
|
|
|
|
06/01/1965 |
08/09/1981 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
25/2 |
D7520
|
25170
|
|
|
|
22/12/1964 |
08/08/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/1970 |
25/2 |
D7521
|
25171
|
|
|
|
07/01/1965 |
15/10/1978 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
11/1978 |
25/2 |
D7522
|
25172
|
|
|
|
08/01/1965 |
01/02/1981 |
Exceptional headcode modification |
12/1978 |
25/2 |
D7523
|
25173
|
|
|
|
12/01/1965 |
19/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D7524
|
25174
|
|
|
|
18/01/1965 |
20/09/1976 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D7525
|
25175
|
|
|
|
27/01/1965 |
05/12/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
07/1977 |
25/2 |
D7526
|
25176
|
|
|
|
28/01/1965 |
09/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1972 |
25/2 |
D7527
|
25177
|
|
|
|
30/01/1965 |
28/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/2 |
D7528
|
25178
|
|
|
|
02/02/1965 |
03/04/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
08/1977 |
25/2 |
D7529
|
25179
|
|
|
|
12/02/1965 |
28/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
09/1971 |
25/2 |
D7530
|
25180
|
|
|
|
12/02/1965 |
28/11/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
03/1978 |
25/2 |
D7531
|
25181
|
|
|
|
17/02/1965 |
11/08/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1978 |
25/2 |
D7532
|
25182
|
|
|
|
18/02/1965 |
21/01/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
01/1972 |
25/2 |
D7533
|
25183
|
|
|
|
24/02/1965 |
01/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
16/09/1970 |
25/2 |
D7534
|
25184
|
|
|
|
03/03/1965 |
28/08/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1977 |
25/2 |
D7535
|
25185
|
|
|
|
03/03/1965 |
05/11/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
25/2 |
D7536
|
25186
|
|
|
|
12/03/1965 |
28/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/2 |
D7537
|
25187
|
|
|
|
12/03/1965 |
28/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
25/2 |
D7538
|
25188
|
|
|
|
19/03/1965 |
15/08/1982 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
07/1976 |
25/2 |
D7539
|
25189
|
|
|
|
25/03/1965 |
09/07/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
25/2 |
D7540
|
25190
|
|
|
|
29/03/1965 |
28/01/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1979 |
25/2 |
D7541
|
25191
|
|
|
|
29/03/1965 |
01/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/2 |
D7542
|
25192
|
|
|
|
09/04/1965 |
07/05/1986 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/08/1970 |
25/2 |
D7543
|
25193
|
|
|
|
15/04/1965 |
12/11/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
25/2 |
D7544
|
25194
|
|
|
|
13/05/1965 |
03/06/1985 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/2 |
D7545
|
25195
|
|
|
|
06/05/1965 |
14/06/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
01/1972 |
25/2 |
D7546
|
25196
|
|
|
|
07/05/1965 |
17/03/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/1974 |
25/2 |
D7547
|
25197
|
|
|
|
14/05/1965 |
01/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
10/12/1970 |
25/2 |
D7548
|
25198
|
|
|
|
20/05/1965 |
21/02/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
04/1973 |
25/2 |
D7549
|
25199
|
|
|
|
28/05/1965 |
09/02/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7550
|
25200
|
|
|
|
04/06/1965 |
11/02/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1974 |
25/2 |
D7551
|
25201
|
|
|
|
16/06/1965 |
28/01/1987 |
Air Brakes fitted |
03/1974 |
25/2 |
D7552
|
25202
|
|
|
|
23/06/1965 |
25/06/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/1974 |
25/2 |
D7553
|
25203
|
|
|
|
24/06/1965 |
01/12/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
09/1971 |
25/2 |
D7554
|
25204
|
|
|
|
03/07/1965 |
06/07/1980 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D7555
|
25205
|
|
|
|
09/07/1965 |
09/05/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/2 |
D7556
|
25206
|
|
|
|
09/07/1965 |
21/03/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1973 |
25/2 |
D7557
|
25207
|
|
|
|
04/08/1965 |
12/11/1984 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
02/1974 |
25/2 |
D7558
|
25208
|
|
|
|
13/08/1965 |
06/05/1984 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
18/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7559
|
25209
|
|
|
|
28/08/1965 |
17/12/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D7560
|
25210
|
|
|
|
18/09/1965 |
29/04/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
10/1971 |
25/2 |
D7561
|
25211
|
|
|
|
20/10/1965 |
25/07/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1978 |
25/2 |
D7562
|
25212
|
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
21/05/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
25/2 |
D7563
|
25213
|
|
|
|
12/11/1965 |
19/03/1987 |
EQ Brakes Added |
24/06/1970 |
25/2 |
D7564
|
25214
|
|
|
|
12/12/1965 |
14/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
14/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7565
|
25215
|
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
19/06/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7566
|
25216
|
|
|
|
19/01/1966 |
28/12/1980 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/2 |
D7567
|
25217
|
|
|
|
20/01/1966 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/2 |
D7568
|
25218
|
|
|
|
27/09/1963 |
25/01/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
17/02/1968 |
25/2 |
D7569
|
25219
|
|
|
|
08/10/1963 |
03/04/1983 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
02/1978 |
25/2 |
D7570
|
25220
|
|
|
|
04/10/1963 |
13/06/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
14/05/1971 |
25/2 |
D7571
|
25221
|
|
|
|
09/10/1963 |
31/01/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
04/1968 |
25/2 |
D7572
|
25222
|
|
|
|
17/10/1963 |
14/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
24/02/1968 |
25/2 |
D7573
|
25223
|
|
|
|
23/10/1963 |
05/10/1980 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
31/12/1971 |
25/2 |
D7574
|
25224
|
|
|
|
23/10/1963 |
08/05/1986 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
06/11/1971 |
25/2 |
D7575
|
25225
|
|
|
|
30/11/1963 |
05/10/1980 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
06/11/1971 |
25/2 |
D7577
|
25227
|
|
|
|
09/11/1963 |
26/06/1983 |
Snowplough brackets fitted |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D7578
|
25228
|
|
|
|
30/11/1963 |
20/03/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
25/2 |
D7579
|
25229
|
|
|
|
13/12/1963 |
20/05/1985 |
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
25/2 |
D7580
|
25230
|
|
|
|
14/12/1963 |
06/08/1986 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1981 |
25/2 |
D7581
|
25231
|
|
|
|
27/12/1963 |
23/08/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
02/1978 |
25/2 |
D7582
|
25232
|
|
|
|
07/01/1964 |
01/12/1980 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/09/1973 |
25/2 |
D7583
|
25233
|
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
13/03/1983 |
Steam heat boiler isolated |
11/1981 |
25/2 |
D7584
|
25234
|
|
|
|
01/02/1964 |
27/02/1985 |
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
25/2 |
D7585
|
25235
|
|
|
|
13/02/1964 |
01/03/1985 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
03/1978 |
25/2 |
D7586
|
25236
|
|
|
|
25/02/1964 |
05/12/1984 |
Air Brakes fitted |
18/05/1968 |
25/2 |
D7587
|
25237
|
|
|
|
09/03/1964 |
10/06/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
11/1973 |
25/2 |
D7588
|
25238
|
|
|
|
10/03/1964 |
13/10/1980 |
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
25/2 |
D7589
|
25239
|
|
|
|
13/04/1964 |
05/11/1984 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
10/1977 |
25/2 |
D7590
|
25240
|
|
|
|
15/04/1964 |
28/08/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
02/09/1973 |
25/2 |
D7591
|
25241
|
|
|
|
25/04/1964 |
06/05/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
25/2 |
D7592
|
25242
|
|
|
|
13/05/1964 |
06/05/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/2 |
D7593
|
25243
|
|
|
|
27/06/1964 |
11/09/1983 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/1968 |
25/2 |
D7594
|
25244
|
|
|
|
03/06/1964 |
21/07/1986 |
EQ Brakes Added |
21/12/1970 |
25/2 |
D7595
|
25245
|
|
|
|
20/06/1964 |
25/06/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1971 |
25/2 |
D7596
|
25246
|
|
|
|
07/07/1964 |
05/10/1981 |
Air Brakes fitted |
28/06/1968 |
25/2 |
D7597
|
25247
|
|
|
|
12/08/1964 |
24/07/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/3 |
D7598
|
25248
|
|
|
|
05/02/1966 |
28/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/3 |
D7599
|
25249
|
|
|
|
05/02/1966 |
29/01/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
30/04/1971 |
25/3 |
D7602
|
25252
|
|
|
|
21/02/1966 |
30/03/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
25/3 |
D7603
|
25253
|
|
|
|
25/02/1966 |
25/09/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/09/1970 |
25/3 |
D7604
|
25254
|
|
|
|
11/03/1966 |
04/09/1986 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/3 |
D7605
|
|
|
|
|
12/03/1966 |
31/03/1972 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
14/05/1971 |
25/3 |
D7608
|
25258
|
|
|
|
02/04/1966 |
21/12/1984 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1972 |
25/3 |
D7609
|
25259
|
|
|
|
02/04/1966 |
03/09/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
18/05/1971 |
25/3 |
D7610
|
25260
|
|
|
|
07/04/1966 |
12/12/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
04/1972 |
25/3 |
D7611
|
25261
|
|
|
|
16/04/1966 |
04/01/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/9 |
D7612
|
25262
|
25901
|
|
|
23/04/1966 |
01/03/1987 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
05/1977 |
25/3 |
D7613
|
25263
|
|
|
|
30/04/1966 |
16/11/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
07/12/1970 |
25/3 |
D7614
|
25264
|
|
|
|
07/06/1966 |
14/12/1980 |
EQ Brakes Added |
23/12/1970 |
25/3 |
D7615
|
25265
|
|
|
|
12/06/1966 |
18/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
08/1971 |
25/3 |
D7616
|
25266
|
|
|
|
19/06/1966 |
18/09/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
12/1973 |
25/3 |
D7617
|
25267
|
|
|
|
12/08/1966 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
16/11/1970 |
25/9 |
D7618
|
25268
|
25902
|
|
|
18/08/1966 |
01/03/1987 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
05/1974 |
25/3 |
D7619
|
25269
|
|
|
|
20/08/1966 |
02/04/1986 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/3 |
D7620
|
25270
|
|
|
|
26/08/1966 |
28/11/1982 |
EQ Brakes Added |
02/1971 |
25/3 |
D7621
|
25271
|
|
|
|
29/08/1966 |
11/10/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
25/3 |
D7622
|
25272
|
|
|
|
02/09/1966 |
12/07/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
01/07/1970 |
25/3 |
D7623
|
25273
|
|
|
|
08/09/1966 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
10/08/1970 |
25/3 |
D7624
|
25274
|
|
|
|
30/07/1965 |
02/05/1982 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/3 |
D7625
|
25275
|
|
|
|
30/07/1965 |
18/04/1982 |
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
10/1975 |
25/9 |
D7626
|
25276
|
25903
|
|
|
05/08/1965 |
01/03/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/3 |
D7627
|
25277
|
|
|
|
12/08/1965 |
15/04/1984 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/3 |
D7628
|
25278
|
|
|
|
12/08/1965 |
01/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/3 |
D7630
|
25280
|
|
|
|
16/09/1965 |
01/11/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
15/12/1970 |
25/3 |
D7631
|
25281
|
|
|
|
29/09/1965 |
01/02/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
19/11/1970 |
25/3 |
D7632
|
25282
|
|
|
|
08/10/1965 |
10/03/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
06/1974 |
25/9 |
D7633
|
25283
|
25904
|
|
|
30/10/1965 |
01/03/1987 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1978 |
25/3 |
D7634
|
25284
|
|
|
|
19/10/1965 |
21/01/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1973 |
25/3 |
D7637
|
25287
|
|
|
|
22/12/1965 |
02/12/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/3 |
D7638
|
25288
|
|
|
|
30/01/1965 |
19/02/1987 |
EQ Brakes Removed |
10/1973 |
25/3 |
D7639
|
25289
|
|
|
|
23/12/1965 |
17/01/1984 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
02/1973 |
25/3 |
D7640
|
25290
|
|
|
|
31/12/1965 |
01/10/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
05/1970 |
25/3 |
D7641
|
25291
|
|
|
|
14/01/1966 |
03/05/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/3 |
D7642
|
25292
|
|
|
|
28/01/1966 |
18/10/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
30/12/1970 |
25/3 |
D7643
|
25293
|
|
|
|
08/02/1966 |
01/02/1981 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |
25/3 |
D7644
|
25294
|
|
|
|
23/03/1966 |
10/10/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/05/1971 |
25/9 |
D7647
|
25297
|
25907
|
|
|
30/03/1966 |
01/09/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
02/1971 |
25/3 |
D7648
|
25298
|
|
|
|
07/04/1966 |
19/03/1985 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/3 |
D7649
|
25299
|
|
|
|
15/04/1966 |
05/10/1981 |
EQ Brakes Added |
24/11/1970 |
25/3 |
D7651
|
25301
|
|
|
|
09/05/1966 |
11/12/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
03/1971 |
25/3 |
D7652
|
25302
|
|
|
|
21/05/1966 |
14/06/1985 |
EQ Brakes Added |
06/1970 |
25/3 |
D7653
|
25303
|
|
|
|
24/06/1966 |
19/02/1986 |
EQ Brakes Added |
28/08/1970 |
25/3 |
D7654
|
25304
|
|
|
|
24/06/1966 |
28/11/1982 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
Ethel |
D7655
|
25305
|
|
|
|
01/07/1966 |
01/07/1983 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
25/04/1971 |
25/3 |
D7656
|
25306
|
|
|
|
05/07/1966 |
25/02/1985 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
12/1971 |
25/9 |
D7657
|
25307
|
25908
|
|
|
04/07/1966 |
01/11/1986 |
Air Brakes fitted |
09/1977 |
25/3 |
D7667
|
25317
|
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
24/04/1983 |
EQ Brakes Added |
12/1970 |
25/3 |
D7670
|
25320
|
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
11/12/1983 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
04/1978 |
25/3 |
D7671
|
25321
|
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
29/09/1986 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
07/1971 |
25/9 |
D7672
|
25322
|
25912
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
01/09/1991 |
Air Brakes fitted |
05/1977 |
25/3 |
D7673
|
25323
|
|
|
|
25/03/1967 |
19/03/1987 |
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
09/1971 |
25/3 |
D7674
|
25324
|
|
|
|
25/03/1967 |
23/12/1985 |
Air Brakes fitted |
01/07/1972 |
25/3 |
D7675
|
25325
|
|
|
|
22/04/1967 |
23/12/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/3 |
D7676
|
25326
|
|
|
|
22/04/1967 |
23/01/1985 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
12/1977 |
25/3 |
D7677
|
25327
|
|
|
|
29/04/1967 |
02/02/1984 |
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
11/1977 |