BR (Pre Tops) |
BR (25/9) |
BR (Tops) |
BR (97/2) |
BR (ETHEL) |
Built |
|
Depot Name |
From |
Date Withdrawn |
D5151
|
|
25001
|
|
|
15/04/1961 |
51L 52A 12A 8F 9A D09 64B ED HA TI ED W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
15/04/1961 07/10/1967 02/12/1967 06/01/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 04/11/1972 29/12/1973 23/02/1974 11/05/1974 12/07/1975 28/09/1980 |
28/09/1980 |
D5152
|
|
25002
|
|
|
01/05/1961 |
51L 12A 8F 9A D09 64B TI ED
R W |
Thornaby (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield
Reinstated Withdrawn |
01/05/1961 25/11/1967 06/01/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 04/11/1972 11/05/1974 12/07/1975 06/1977 06/1977 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5153
|
|
25003
|
|
|
10/05/1961 |
51L 12A 8F 9A D09 64B TI ED W |
Thornaby (New) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
10/05/1961 25/11/1967 06/01/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 04/11/1972 11/05/1974 12/07/1975 18/08/1976 |
18/08/1976 |
D5154
|
|
25004
|
|
|
20/05/1961 |
51L 50A 55A 51L 12A 8F 9A D09 64B TI ED W |
Thornaby (New) York (North) Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/05/1961 31/12/1966 17/06/1967 07/10/1967 25/11/1967 06/01/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 04/11/1972 11/05/1974 12/07/1975 15/09/1976 |
15/09/1976 |
D5155
|
|
25005
|
|
|
03/06/1961 |
51L 50A 55A 51L 12A 8F 9A D09 65A HA TI ED W |
Thornaby (New) York (North) Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/06/1961 31/12/1966 17/06/1967 07/10/1967 25/11/1967 06/01/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 16/09/1972 19/05/1973 19/10/1974 09/08/1975 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5156
|
|
25006
|
|
|
17/06/1961 |
51L 52A 51L 12A 8F 9A D09 65A HA TI ED HA W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Thornaby Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
17/06/1961 16/12/1961 19/09/1964 02/12/1967 06/01/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 16/09/1972 27/04/1974 15/02/1975 09/08/1975 05/1980 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5157
|
|
25007
|
|
|
07/07/1961 |
51L 52A 51L 55A 66A 65A HA TI ED HA W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
07/07/1961 16/12/1961 19/09/1964 17/07/1971 16/10/1971 30/10/1971 27/04/1974 15/02/1975 09/08/1975 05/1980 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5158
|
|
25008
|
|
|
10/07/1961 |
51L 55A 65A TI ED HA W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
10/07/1961 17/07/1971 08/01/1972 15/02/1975 09/08/1975 01/1980 09/06/1980 |
09/06/1980 |
D5159
|
|
25009
|
|
|
27/07/1961 |
51L 55A 65A HA TI 91X
R W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley To Scottish Region
Reinstated Withdrawn |
27/07/1961 07/08/1971 08/01/1972 27/04/1974 19/10/1974 09/08/1975 01/02/1976 03/07/1976 07/07/1980 |
07/07/1980 |
D5160
|
|
25010
|
|
|
19/08/1961 |
51L 55A 65A HA TI 91X W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley To Scottish Region Withdrawn |
19/08/1961 07/08/1971 08/01/1972 25/05/1974 19/10/1974 09/08/1975 11/02/1981 |
11/02/1981 |
D5161
|
|
25011
|
|
|
02/09/1961 |
51L 66A 65A HA TI 91X W |
Thornaby (New) Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Tinsley To Scottish Region Withdrawn |
02/09/1961 16/10/1971 30/10/1971 25/05/1974 15/02/1975 09/08/1975 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5162
|
|
25012
|
|
|
09/09/1961 |
51L 55A 41A 91X
R W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley To Scottish Region
Reinstated Withdrawn |
09/09/1961 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 09/08/1975 01/02/1976 29/05/1976 04/02/1977 |
04/02/1977 |
D5163
|
|
25013
|
|
|
29/09/1961 |
51L 55A 41A 91X
ED W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley To Scottish Region
Eastfield Withdrawn |
29/09/1961 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 09/08/1975 27/03/1976 03/07/1976 28/09/1980 |
28/09/1980 |
D5164
|
|
25014
|
|
|
07/10/1961 |
51L 55A 41A 55A TI 91X ED
R
W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley To Scottish Region Eastfield
Reinstated
Withdrawn |
07/10/1961 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 25/11/1972 19/05/1973 09/08/1975 23/08/1975 01/02/1976 03/07/1976 06/1977 20/07/1977 |
20/07/1977 |
D5165
|
|
25015
|
|
|
19/10/1961 |
51L 55A 51L 55A 41A W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Withdrawn |
19/10/1961 17/05/1969 21/03/1970 08/01/1972 07/10/1972 18/12/1975 |
18/12/1975 |
D5166
|
|
25016
|
|
|
02/11/1961 |
51L 52A 51L 55A 51L 55A 41A 55A TI HO TI
W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley
Withdrawn |
02/11/1961 15/07/1967 02/12/1967 12/10/1968 09/05/1970 08/01/1972 07/10/1972 25/11/1972 19/05/1973 03/11/1973 09/03/1974 11/01/1976 25/01/1976 |
25/01/1976 |
D5167
|
|
25017
|
|
|
25/11/1961 |
51L 52A 51L 55A 51L 55A 51L 55A 41A
W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Tinsley
Withdrawn |
25/11/1961 15/07/1967 02/12/1967 12/10/1968 09/05/1970 07/11/1970 13/11/1971 08/01/1972 07/10/1972 11/01/1976 25/01/1976 |
25/01/1976 |
D5168
|
|
25018
|
|
|
01/12/1961 |
51L 52A 51L 55A 51L 55A 52A 55A 41A HO TI ED
W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Eastfield
Withdrawn |
01/12/1961 15/07/1967 02/12/1967 02/12/1967 09/05/1970 07/11/1970 06/11/1971 06/05/1972 07/10/1972 03/11/1973 09/03/1974 01/02/1976 11/1976 22/11/1976 |
22/11/1976 |
D5169
|
|
25019
|
|
|
15/12/1961 |
51L 52A 51L 55A 52A 41A ED W |
Thornaby (New) Gateshead Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
15/12/1961 15/07/1967 02/12/1967 30/12/1967 08/04/1972 05/08/1972 01/02/1976 03/09/1980 |
03/09/1980 |
D5170
|
|
25020
|
|
|
29/12/1961 |
51L 55A 51L 55A 51L 55A 52A 41A
W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Tinsley
Withdrawn |
29/12/1961 30/12/1967 23/01/1971 03/04/1971 13/11/1971 08/01/1972 08/04/1972 07/10/1972 11/01/1976 25/01/1976 |
25/01/1976 |
D5171
|
|
25021
|
|
|
03/02/1962 |
51L 55A 51L 55A 52A 41A ED W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/02/1962 30/12/1967 23/01/1971 03/04/1971 06/11/1971 02/09/1972 01/02/1976 03/09/1980 |
03/09/1980 |
D5172
|
|
25022
|
|
|
17/02/1962 |
51L 55A 52A 55A 51L 55A 52A 41A
W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Tinsley
Withdrawn |
17/02/1962 08/10/1966 04/11/1967 30/12/1967 13/11/1971 08/01/1972 12/08/1972 07/10/1972 11/01/1976 25/01/1976 |
25/01/1976 |
D5173
|
|
25023
|
|
|
17/03/1962 |
51L 55A 52A 41A ED W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
17/03/1962 08/10/1966 12/08/1972 07/10/1972 01/02/1976 28/09/1980 |
28/09/1980 |
D5174
|
|
25024
|
|
|
30/03/1962 |
51L 55A 52A 41A
W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Tinsley
Withdrawn |
30/03/1962 08/10/1966 12/08/1972 02/09/1972 11/01/1976 25/01/1976 |
25/01/1976 |
D5175
|
|
25025
|
|
|
21/04/1962 |
51L 55A 41A ED W |
Thornaby (New) Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
21/04/1962 08/10/1966 07/10/1972 01/02/1976 15/04/1977 |
15/04/1977 |
D5176
|
|
25026
|
|
|
08/01/1963 |
55A 50A ML 50A 51L 55A 65A D09 TI 91E HA W |
Holbeck (MR) (New) York (North) Line Power Controller, Derby York (North) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Manchester Division Tinsley To Eastern Region Haymarket Withdrawn |
08/01/1963 22/06/1963 04/09/1965 18/09/1965 31/12/1966 07/10/1967 17/07/1971 16/09/1972 17/08/1974 24/08/1974 15/02/1975 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5177
|
|
25027
|
|
|
04/02/1963 |
55A 52A 50A 55A 65A D09 W |
Holbeck (MR) (New) Gateshead York (North) Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Manchester Division Withdrawn |
04/02/1963 15/06/1963 06/11/1965 20/05/1967 17/07/1971 16/09/1972 08/05/1983 |
08/05/1983 |
D5178
|
|
25028
|
|
|
08/02/1963 |
55A 52A 50A 51L 55A 65A HA W |
Holbeck (MR) (New) Gateshead York (North) Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
08/02/1963 15/06/1963 06/11/1965 31/12/1966 07/10/1967 31/07/1971 25/05/1974 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5179
|
|
25029
|
|
|
11/02/1963 |
52A 55A 86B CF 91X HA TO W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton To Scottish Region Haymarket Toton Withdrawn |
11/02/1963 28/01/1967 07/11/1970 11/05/1974 11/10/1975 25/10/1975 12/06/1976 07/08/1977 |
07/08/1977 |
D5180
|
|
25030
|
|
|
19/02/1963 |
52A 55A 86B 84A 86B CF 91X HA IS ED CW W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Laira Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton To Scottish Region Haymarket Inverness Eastfield Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
19/02/1963 28/01/1967 07/11/1970 16/10/1971 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 11/10/1975 25/10/1975 15/11/1975 29/05/1976 12/06/1976 21/08/1976 |
21/08/1976 |
D5181
|
|
25031
|
|
|
04/03/1963 |
52A 55A 86B CF 91X HA IS ED SP ED
W |
Gateshead (New) Holbeck (MR) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton To Scottish Region Haymarket Inverness Eastfield Springs Branch (Wigan) Eastfield
Withdrawn |
04/03/1963 28/01/1967 07/11/1970 11/05/1974 11/10/1975 25/10/1975 15/11/1975 29/05/1976 12/06/1976 10/1977 17/10/1977 31/12/1977 |
31/12/1977 |
D5182
|
|
25032
|
|
|
19/03/1963 |
52A D05 55A 86B CF BS W |
Gateshead (New) Stoke Division Holbeck (MR) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bescot Withdrawn |
19/03/1963 18/04/1966 30/12/1967 07/11/1970 11/05/1974 09/10/1976 10/03/1986 |
10/03/1986 |
D5183
|
|
25033
|
|
|
08/04/1963 |
18A 41D 16A 2E D02 D05 ML D16 D01 55A 41A HA W |
Toton (New) Canklow Toton Saltley Birmingham Division Stoke Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Haymarket Withdrawn |
08/04/1963 04/01/1964 15/02/1964 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 12/07/1969 12/08/1972 07/10/1972 15/02/1975 24/04/1983 |
24/04/1983 |
D5184
|
|
25034
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
18A 41D 16A 14B ML D15 ML D16 D01 55A 41A HA ED HA W |
Toton (New) Canklow Toton Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
30/04/1963 15/02/1964 06/06/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 31/07/1965 17/06/1968 12/07/1969 12/08/1972 07/10/1972 15/02/1975 23/08/1975 05/1977 22/12/1986 |
22/12/1986 |
D5185
|
|
25035
|
|
|
22/05/1963 |
18A 15A 16A 14B ML D16 D01 55A 41A HA W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Toton Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Haymarket Withdrawn |
22/05/1963 04/01/1964 23/05/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 12/07/1969 15/07/1972 07/10/1972 15/02/1975 15/03/1987 |
15/03/1987 |
D5186
|
|
25036
|
|
|
19/03/1963 |
18A 15A ML D16 D15 ML D16 D10 D01 WN CW SP W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division London Division Willesden Cricklewood East Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
19/03/1963 08/02/1964 16/01/1965 06/02/1965 19/06/1965 18/09/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 15/11/1969 11/05/1974 10/08/1974 07/12/1974 19/12/1982 |
19/12/1982 |
D5187
|
|
25037
|
|
|
22/03/1963 |
18A 2E 16A 16D D16 D15 ML D16 D10 D01 TO ED HA W |
Toton (New) Saltley Toton Nottingham Nottingham Division Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division London Division Toton Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
22/03/1963 04/01/1964 03/10/1964 10/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 18/09/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 09/09/1972 06/10/1973 10/1976 05/1977 19/01/1987 |
19/01/1987 |
D5188
|
|
25038
|
|
|
23/03/1963 |
18A 2E 16C D16 D15 ML D16 D10 BS W |
Toton (New) Saltley Derby Nottingham Division Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Bescot Withdrawn |
23/03/1963 11/04/1964 06/06/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 18/09/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 12/05/1973 31/05/1981 |
31/05/1981 |
D5189
|
|
25039
|
|
|
27/03/1963 |
18A 16C D16 D15 ML D16 D10 BS W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Bescot Withdrawn |
27/03/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 04/12/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 12/05/1973 31/05/1981 |
31/05/1981 |
D5190
|
|
25040
|
|
|
04/04/1963 |
18A 16C D16 ML D16 D10 BS W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Bescot Withdrawn |
04/04/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 12/05/1973 16/11/1980 |
16/11/1980 |
D5191
|
|
25041
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
18A 15A ML D16 D10 CD TO KD W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Crewe Diesel Toton Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
30/04/1963 08/02/1964 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 28/02/1976 05/1977 07/1977 31/05/1981 |
31/05/1981 |
D5192
|
|
25042
|
|
|
29/04/1963 |
18A 15A ML D16 D10 LO CD W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/04/1963 08/02/1964 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 22/03/1975 08/05/1976 08/05/1986 |
08/05/1986 |
D5193
|
|
25043
|
|
|
29/04/1963 |
18A 16D 16C D16 2E D02 ML D16 D08 D10 LO CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Derby Nottingham Division Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/04/1963 07/03/1964 10/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 09/05/1970 07/09/1974 08/05/1976 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D5194
|
|
25044
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
18A 15A ML D14 D01 D08 D10 SP ED TO KD W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Eastfield Toton Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
30/04/1963 08/02/1964 16/01/1965 07/01/1967 17/06/1968 09/11/1968 09/05/1970 12/05/1973 10/1976 11/1981 11/1981 08/07/1985 |
08/07/1985 |
D5195
|
|
25045
|
|
|
30/04/1963 |
18A 16D D16 40E D16 ML D16 D08 D10 SP
W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Nottingham Division Colwick Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn |
30/04/1963 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 22/05/1965 08/01/1966 08/10/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 09/05/1970 12/05/1973 23/08/1975 04/10/1975 |
04/10/1975 |
D5196
|
|
25046
|
|
|
10/05/1963 |
18A 16C ML D14 D16 ML D16 D08 D10 D08 TO SP HA W |
Toton (New) Derby Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Liverpool Division Toton Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Withdrawn |
10/05/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 29/01/1966 28/01/1967 08/06/1968 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 09/05/1970 22/07/1972 06/10/1973 07/08/1976 01/05/1977 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D5197
|
|
25047
|
|
|
09/05/1963 |
18A 16D 2E D02 ML 9A D09 TO SP W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Toton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
09/05/1963 18/01/1964 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 07/08/1976 07/09/1980 |
07/09/1980 |
D5198
|
|
25048
|
|
|
16/05/1963 |
18A 15A ML 8F 9A D09 SP SP W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
16/05/1963 08/02/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/08/1973 11/10/1975 20/02/1986 |
20/02/1986 |
D5199
|
|
25049
|
|
|
17/05/1963 |
18A 16D ML 8F 9A D09 TO CD ED HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Toton Crewe Diesel Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
17/05/1963 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 10/07/1976 10/1976 02/1978 08/01/1984 |
08/01/1984 |
D5200
|
|
25050
|
|
|
31/05/1963 |
18A 16C ML 50A ML 8F 9A D09 KD HA CW W |
Toton (New) Derby Line Power Controller, Derby York (North) Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Carlisle Kingmoor Haymarket Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
31/05/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 28/08/1965 18/09/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 22/03/1975 01/05/1977 11/1981 24/04/1983 |
24/04/1983 |
D5201
|
|
25051
|
|
|
20/05/1963 |
18A 14A 16D ML 8F D08 LO W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Longsight Withdrawn |
20/05/1963 05/10/1963 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 08/09/1973 18/09/1985 |
18/09/1985 |
D5202
|
|
25052
|
|
|
28/05/1963 |
18A 9A 10G 9A 16A 16D D16 2E D02 ML 8F D08 82A LA W |
Toton (New) Longsight Skipton Longsight Toton Nottingham Nottingham Division Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
28/05/1963 04/01/1964 09/05/1964 01/08/1964 05/09/1964 26/12/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 02/12/1967 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 08/05/1976 05/10/1980 |
05/10/1980 |
D5203
|
|
25053
|
|
|
29/05/1963 |
18A 14A 18A 16D ML 8F D08 CW W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Toton Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
29/05/1963 20/07/1963 31/08/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 02/12/1967 17/06/1968 04/1977 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5204
|
|
25054
|
|
|
07/06/1963 |
18A 14A ML 8F 12A D05 D08 D09 CW W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Stoke Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
07/06/1963 20/07/1963 16/01/1965 02/12/1967 06/01/1968 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 12/02/1972 04/1977 13/05/1985 |
13/05/1985 |
D5205
|
|
25055
|
|
|
14/06/1963 |
18A 14A 18A 16C ML 8F 12A D05 D08 CD CF CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Toton Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Stoke Division Liverpool Division Crewe Diesel Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
14/06/1963 20/07/1963 31/08/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 02/12/1967 06/01/1968 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 08/05/1976 11/12/1976 20/11/1977 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5206
|
|
25056
|
|
|
19/06/1963 |
18A 14A ML 8F D08 D10 D08 LO CD KD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Preston Division Liverpool Division Longsight Crewe Diesel Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
19/06/1963 20/07/1963 16/01/1965 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 23/11/1968 11/01/1975 08/05/1976 04/1977 01/08/1982 |
01/08/1982 |
D5207
|
|
25057
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
18A 14A 18A 16C ML 8F D08 D10 D08 D09 D08 W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Toton Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Preston Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
21/06/1963 20/07/1963 31/08/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 23/11/1968 08/01/1972 12/02/1972 15/03/1987 |
15/03/1987 |
D5208
|
|
25058
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
18A 14A ML 91X D16 ML 9A 12A D10 D08 D08 D09 SP W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby To Scottish Region (on loan) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
21/06/1963 20/07/1963 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 14/08/1965 08/10/1966 03/02/1968 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 08/05/1971 08/01/1972 11/01/1975 03/02/1987 |
03/02/1987 |
D5209
|
|
25059
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
18A 14A ML 9A 12A D10 D08 86B 82A CF BR CD HA W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Haymarket Withdrawn |
21/06/1963 20/07/1963 16/01/1965 03/02/1968 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 08/01/1972 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 08/05/1976 15/05/1976 20/03/1987 |
20/03/1987 |
D5210
|
|
25060
|
|
|
21/06/1963 |
18A 14A 18A ML 9A 12A D10 D09 SP W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Toton Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Manchester Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
21/06/1963 20/07/1963 31/08/1963 16/01/1965 24/02/1968 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 11/10/1975 09/12/1985 |
09/12/1985 |
D5211
|
|
25061
|
|
|
24/06/1963 |
18A 14A ML 9A D09 CD HA CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Crewe Diesel Haymarket Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
24/06/1963 20/07/1963 16/01/1965 24/02/1968 17/06/1968 08/05/1976 01/05/1977 31/05/1977 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5212
|
|
25062
|
|
|
28/06/1963 |
18A 14A ML 9A D09 D01 LO ED HA IS KD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division London Division Longsight Eastfield Haymarket Inverness Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
28/06/1963 20/07/1963 16/01/1965 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 19/08/1972 12/05/1973 23/08/1975 29/05/1976 03/07/1976 07/1981 19/12/1982 |
19/12/1982 |
D5213
|
|
25063
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
18A 14A D14 D01 86B 82A CF BR LA CF LA CF CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East London (Midland) London Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/07/1963 24/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 11/10/1975 10/01/1976 09/10/1976 11/12/1976 20/11/1977 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5214
|
|
25064
|
|
|
05/07/1963 |
18A 14A D14 D01 55A 41A SP IS W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East London (Midland) London Division Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Springs Branch (Wigan) Inverness Withdrawn |
05/07/1963 24/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 12/08/1972 07/10/1972 08/03/1975 03/07/1976 09/12/1985 |
09/12/1985 |
D5215
|
|
25065
|
|
|
15/07/1963 |
18A 14A D14 D01 HA W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East London (Midland) London Division Haymarket Withdrawn |
15/07/1963 24/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 01/05/1977 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D5216
|
|
25066
|
|
|
11/07/1963 |
18A 14A D14 D01 TO HA TO W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East London (Midland) London Division Toton Haymarket Toton Withdrawn |
11/07/1963 24/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 01/05/1977 14/12/1980 21/06/1981 |
21/06/1981 |
D5217
|
|
25067
|
|
|
02/08/1963 |
18A 14A D14 D01 W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East London (Midland) London Division Withdrawn |
02/08/1963 24/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 12/12/1982 |
12/12/1982 |
D5218
|
|
25068
|
|
|
02/08/1963 |
14A D14 D01 CW ED IS W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) London Division Cricklewood East Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
02/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 14/06/1975 03/07/1976 05/1977 14/07/1980 |
14/07/1980 |
D5219
|
|
25069
|
|
|
09/08/1963 |
18A 14A D14 D01 CW W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East London (Midland) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
09/08/1963 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 14/06/1975 19/12/1983 |
19/12/1983 |
D5220
|
|
25070
|
|
|
17/09/1963 |
14A D14 D01 WN CW BS SP W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) London Division Willesden Cricklewood East Bescot Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
17/09/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 11/01/1975 14/06/1975 10/01/1976 10/1976 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5221
|
|
25071
|
|
|
31/08/1963 |
14A D14 D01 CW W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
31/08/1963 16/01/1965 17/06/1968 14/06/1975 21/06/1981 |
21/06/1981 |
D5222
|
|
25072
|
|
|
17/09/1963 |
14A D14 ML D15 D14 D01 WN CW ED W |
Cricklewood East (New) London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division London (Midland) London Division Willesden Cricklewood East Eastfield Withdrawn |
17/09/1963 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 04/12/1965 28/01/1967 17/06/1968 10/08/1974 14/06/1975 10/1976 05/12/1985 |
05/12/1985 |
D5223
|
|
25073
|
|
|
04/07/1963 |
18A 14A ML D16 2E D02 ML D14 D01 D16 W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
04/07/1963 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 06/02/1965 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 08/09/1981 |
08/09/1981 |
D5224
|
|
25074
|
|
|
19/07/1963 |
18A 16D ML D14 D01 D16 W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
19/07/1963 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 15/11/1969 07/09/1980 |
07/09/1980 |
D5225
|
|
25075
|
|
|
26/07/1963 |
18A 16D 15A ML D16 ML D14 D01 D16 HA CW W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Haymarket Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
26/07/1963 18/01/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 19/02/1966 11/03/1967 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 07/12/1968 05/1977 07/1981 27/03/1983 |
27/03/1983 |
D5226
|
|
25076
|
|
|
23/08/1963 |
18A 16C 2E D02 ML D16 D01 D16 HA W |
Toton (New) Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Haymarket Withdrawn |
23/08/1963 07/03/1964 06/06/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 02/03/1968 12/10/1968 07/12/1968 01/05/1977 12/11/1984 |
12/11/1984 |
D5227
|
|
25077
|
|
|
02/09/1963 |
18A 14A ML D16 D01 D16 86B 82A 64B BR LA CF ED W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Haymarket Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Eastfield Withdrawn |
02/09/1963 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 19/02/1966 12/10/1968 07/12/1968 08/01/1972 12/08/1972 28/10/1972 11/05/1974 06/09/1975 08/11/1975 09/10/1976 06/05/1978 |
06/05/1978 |
D5228
|
|
25078
|
|
|
13/09/1963 |
16A 14A ML D16 55A 41A SP HA TO ED W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood East Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Toton Eastfield Withdrawn |
13/09/1963 05/10/1963 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 08/04/1972 07/10/1972 08/03/1975 08/05/1976 15/05/1976 10/1976 23/09/1985 |
23/09/1985 |
D5229
|
|
25079
|
|
|
29/09/1963 |
14A ML D16 55A 41A SP HA W |
Cricklewood East (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Holbeck (MR) Tinsley Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Withdrawn |
29/09/1963 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 08/04/1972 07/10/1972 08/03/1975 08/05/1976 28/08/1983 |
28/08/1983 |
D5230
|
|
25080
|
|
|
19/10/1963 |
14A ML D16 ML D16 82A LA W |
Cricklewood East (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
19/10/1963 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 08/05/1976 02/09/1985 |
02/09/1985 |
D5231
|
|
25081
|
|
|
14/12/1963 |
16A 16D ML D16 ML D16 CD CW W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 07/03/1964 16/01/1965 02/03/1968 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 15/05/1976 11/12/1976 07/02/1982 |
07/02/1982 |
D5232
|
|
25082
|
|
|
06/11/1963 |
16A 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 D09 ED W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Manchester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
06/11/1963 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 02/03/1968 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/10/1972 10/1976 10/05/1981 |
10/05/1981 |
D5233
|
|
25083
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
16A 16C 2E ML D16 ML D16 ED TI 91E BS 91X ED IS SP W |
Toton (New) Derby Saltley Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Tinsley To Eastern Region Bescot To Scottish Region Eastfield Inverness Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
19/12/1963 11/01/1964 11/04/1964 23/04/1966 09/03/1968 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/09/1973 13/10/1973 03/11/1973 08/03/1975 02/08/1975 23/08/1975 03/07/1976 14/12/1980 01/07/1984 |
01/07/1984 |
D5234
|
|
25084
|
|
|
11/12/1963 |
16A 16D 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 ED TI CF HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Tinsley Cardiff Canton Haymarket Withdrawn |
11/12/1963 28/12/1963 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/03/1968 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/09/1973 13/10/1973 08/03/1975 23/08/1975 18/12/1983 |
18/12/1983 |
D5235
|
|
25085
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
16A 16D ML D16 ML D16 ED TI CF HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Tinsley Cardiff Canton Haymarket Withdrawn |
19/12/1963 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 09/03/1968 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 25/08/1973 13/10/1973 08/03/1975 23/08/1975 21/03/1982 |
21/03/1982 |
D5236
|
|
25086
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
16A 16C 2E D02 ML D16 ED KM LO 91X ED HA SP W |
Toton (New) Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Eastfield Carlisle Kingmoor Longsight To Scottish Region Eastfield Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
19/12/1963 11/01/1964 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 25/08/1973 10/11/1973 09/03/1974 02/08/1975 23/08/1975 02/1978 14/12/1980 09/10/1983 |
09/10/1983 |
D5237
|
|
25087
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
16A 16D D16 ML D16 91X ED HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division To Scottish Region Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
19/12/1963 26/12/1964 16/01/1965 03/04/1965 17/06/1968 02/08/1975 23/08/1975 02/1978 28/09/1980 |
28/09/1980 |
D5238
|
|
25088
|
|
|
19/12/1963 |
16A D16 ML D05 10D D10 D16 D09 TO LO W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Lostock Hall Preston Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Toton Longsight Withdrawn |
19/12/1963 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 26/08/1967 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 10/06/1972 11/08/1973 06/10/1973 16/08/1981 |
16/08/1981 |
D5239
|
|
25089
|
|
|
20/12/1963 |
16A 16D 16A D16 2E D02 ML D14 D16 ML D16 TI ED LO W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Toton Nottingham Division Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Longsight Withdrawn |
20/12/1963 09/05/1964 26/12/1964 16/01/1965 30/01/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 19/11/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 06/10/1973 12/07/1975 02/08/1975 24/02/1986 |
24/02/1986 |
D5240
|
|
25090
|
|
|
31/12/1963 |
16A 14B 15A 15B 16A 16A D16 ML D14 ML D16 D10 D16 TI ED LO BS ED W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Leicester Midland Wellingborough Toton Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Longsight Bescot Eastfield Withdrawn |
31/12/1963 11/04/1964 27/06/1964 04/07/1964 26/09/1964 19/12/1964 16/01/1965 06/02/1965 06/11/1965 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 10/05/1969 06/10/1973 12/07/1975 02/08/1975 07/1977 10/1977 22/05/1983 |
22/05/1983 |
D5241
|
|
25091
|
|
|
31/12/1963 |
16A 14B 15A 15B 16A 16A D16 D14 ML D14 D01 D16 TI ED BS LA HA W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Leicester Midland Wellingborough Toton Toton Nottingham Division London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Bescot Laira Haymarket Withdrawn |
31/12/1963 11/04/1964 27/06/1964 04/07/1964 26/09/1964 19/12/1964 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 18/09/1965 06/11/1965 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 06/10/1973 12/07/1975 02/08/1975 23/08/1975 11/10/1975 15/10/1978 |
15/10/1978 |
D5242
|
|
25092
|
|
|
30/12/1963 |
16A 14B 15A 15B 16C 14B D14 2E ML D16 ML D05 9A 8F D08 D16 TI ED TO LA HA IS ED IS ED LO TO CW ED CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Leicester Midland Wellingborough Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Saltley Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Toton Laira Haymarket Inverness Eastfield Inverness Eastfield Longsight Toton Cricklewood East Eastfield Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
30/12/1963 11/04/1964 27/06/1964 25/07/1964 26/09/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 07/08/1965 19/02/1966 15/04/1967 05/07/1967 26/08/1967 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 06/10/1973 12/07/1975 02/08/1975 23/08/1975 11/10/1975 15/11/1975 29/05/1976 24/07/1976 04/09/1976 10/1976 01/1977 04/1977 10/1977 11/1978 11/05/1980 |
11/05/1980 |
D5243
|
|
25093
|
|
|
08/01/1964 |
16A 16A ML 2E D02 ML D14 D16 ML D16 HA SP TO LO BR LA HA IS ED IS ED CD BS W |
Toton (New) Toton Line Power Controller, Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Longsight Bristol Bath Road Laira Haymarket Inverness Eastfield Inverness Eastfield Crewe Diesel Bescot Withdrawn |
08/01/1964 05/12/1964 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 12/11/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 09/02/1974 12/10/1974 08/02/1975 22/02/1975 10/05/1975 09/08/1975 11/10/1975 15/11/1975 29/05/1976 24/07/1976 04/09/1976 11/1978 11/1981 07/11/1982 |
07/11/1982 |
D5244
|
|
25094
|
|
|
20/01/1964 |
16A 16A ML D16 ML D05 D02 9A 8F D08 D16 ED HA SP TO LO SP BR LA HA ED TO KD CD W |
Toton (New) Toton Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Birmingham Division Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Bristol Bath Road Laira Haymarket Eastfield Toton Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
20/01/1964 05/12/1964 16/01/1965 19/02/1966 15/04/1967 05/07/1967 26/08/1967 03/02/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 09/03/1974 25/05/1974 12/10/1974 08/02/1975 22/02/1975 08/03/1975 10/05/1975 09/08/1975 11/10/1975 04/09/1976 10/1976 07/1977 10/1977 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D5245
|
|
25095
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
16A 16A ML 2E D02 ML D14 D16 ML D16 D08 D16 CW W |
Toton (New) Toton Line Power Controller, Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
21/01/1964 19/12/1964 16/01/1965 30/01/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 12/11/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 10/05/1969 20/11/1977 23/07/1986 |
23/07/1986 |
D5246
|
|
25096
|
|
|
24/01/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 2E D02 ML D14 D16 ML D16 D08 D16 ED HA BS BR LA HA IS ED TO ED
W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Bescot Bristol Bath Road Laira Haymarket Inverness Eastfield Toton Eastfield
Withdrawn |
24/01/1964 22/08/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 06/08/1966 19/11/1966 11/03/1967 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 10/05/1969 09/03/1974 25/05/1974 12/10/1974 10/05/1975 09/08/1975 11/10/1975 15/11/1975 29/05/1976 10/1976 10/1977 10/1977 31/12/1977 |
31/12/1977 |
D5247
|
|
25097
|
|
|
31/01/1964 |
16A 16A ML 2E D02 ML D16 D08 D16 D09 W |
Toton (New) Toton Line Power Controller, Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Withdrawn |
31/01/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 28/06/1969 10/06/1972 13/11/1983 |
13/11/1983 |
D5248
|
|
25098
|
|
|
06/02/1964 |
16A ML D15 51L D15 51L 55A 12A 8F 8J D08 D16 D08 D16 BR LA HA ED W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor (on loan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
06/02/1964 16/01/1965 17/04/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 03/01/1966 18/06/1966 02/12/1967 06/01/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 10/10/1970 07/11/1970 10/05/1975 09/08/1975 11/10/1975 04/09/1976 15/10/1978 |
15/10/1978 |
D5249
|
|
25099
|
|
|
07/02/1964 |
16A 15E D15 51L D15 51L 55A 12A 8F 8J D08 D16 D08 D16 CW W |
Toton (New) Coalville Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
07/02/1964 21/11/1964 16/01/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 03/01/1966 18/06/1966 09/12/1967 06/01/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 27/06/1970 07/11/1970 20/11/1977 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D5250
|
|
25100
|
|
|
14/02/1964 |
16A ML D15 51L D15 51L 55A 12A 8F 8J D08 D16 LO W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Longsight Withdrawn |
14/02/1964 16/01/1965 17/04/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 03/01/1966 18/06/1966 09/12/1967 03/02/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 10/01/1976 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D5251
|
|
25101
|
|
|
19/02/1964 |
16A ML D15 51L D15 51L 91N 51L 55A 12A 8J D08 D16 D08 D16 D08 D16 TI 91X ED BS TO BS W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Thornaby To North Eastern Region Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Tinsley To Scottish Region Eastfield Bescot Toton Bescot Withdrawn |
19/02/1964 16/01/1965 28/08/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 01/01/1966 08/01/1966 29/01/1966 18/06/1966 09/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 10/06/1972 06/01/1973 29/12/1973 12/07/1975 26/07/1975 10/1976 10/1977 11/1981 16/01/1983 |
16/01/1983 |
D5252
|
|
25102
|
|
|
21/02/1964 |
16A 16D D16 ML D15 51L D15 51L 91N 51L 55A 12A 8J D08 D16 D08 D16 D08 D16 LO W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Thornaby To North Eastern Region Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Longsight Withdrawn |
21/02/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 06/02/1965 17/04/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 01/01/1966 22/01/1966 29/01/1966 18/06/1966 23/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 03/04/1971 06/05/1972 10/06/1972 06/01/1973 10/01/1976 11/05/1980 |
11/05/1980 |
D5253
|
|
25103
|
|
|
26/02/1964 |
16A 16D D16 51L D16 51L 91N 51L 55A 12A 8J D08 D16 SP W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Nottingham Division Thornaby Nottingham Division Thornaby To North Eastern Region Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
26/02/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 01/01/1966 22/01/1966 29/01/1966 18/06/1966 23/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 06/01/1973 12/05/1973 07/09/1980 |
07/09/1980 |
D5254
|
|
25104
|
|
|
28/02/1964 |
16A ML D16 51L D16 51L 91N 51L 55A 12A 8J D08 TI BS LO W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Thornaby Nottingham Division Thornaby To North Eastern Region Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Allerton Liverpool Division Tinsley Bescot Longsight Withdrawn |
28/02/1964 16/01/1965 13/11/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 01/01/1966 08/01/1966 29/01/1966 16/07/1966 23/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 09/11/1974 11/01/1975 12/07/1975 26/09/1982 |
26/09/1982 |
D5255
|
|
25105
|
|
|
06/03/1964 |
16A 9E 16A D16 D15 51L D15 51L 91N 51L 55A 12A 8F D08 TI BS LO W |
Toton (New) Trafford Park (LMS) Toton Nottingham Division Leicester Division Thornaby Leicester Division Thornaby To North Eastern Region Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Tinsley Bescot Longsight Withdrawn |
06/03/1964 14/03/1964 11/04/1964 16/01/1965 28/08/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 01/01/1966 22/01/1966 29/01/1966 16/07/1966 23/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1974 11/01/1975 12/07/1975 04/04/1982 |
04/04/1982 |
D5256
|
|
25106
|
|
|
13/03/1964 |
16A 16C D16 91N D16 51L 91N 51L 55A 12A 8F D08 TI BS LO CD W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division To North Eastern Region Nottingham Division Thornaby To North Eastern Region Thornaby Holbeck (MR) Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Tinsley Bescot Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
13/03/1964 22/08/1964 16/01/1965 11/12/1965 11/12/1965 01/01/1966 08/01/1966 29/01/1966 08/10/1966 23/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1974 11/01/1975 12/07/1975 09/1981 09/10/1983 |
09/10/1983 |
D5257
|
|
25107
|
|
|
17/03/1964 |
16A D16 31B D16 ML D05 9A 8F D08 TI BS TO W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division March Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Tinsley Bescot Toton Withdrawn |
17/03/1964 16/01/1965 02/10/1965 15/01/1966 15/04/1967 05/07/1967 09/03/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1974 11/01/1975 07/08/1976 03/05/1981 |
03/05/1981 |
D5258
|
|
25108
|
|
|
20/03/1964 |
16A 16D D16 D15 D05 8J D08 TI ED W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Nottingham Division Leicester Division Stoke Division Allerton Liverpool Division Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/03/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 05/07/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 22/06/1974 12/07/1975 14/07/1990 |
14/07/1980 |
D5259
|
|
25109
|
|
|
25/03/1964 |
16A 16C D16 8F 8J D08 ED W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/03/1964 22/08/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 26/02/1978 11/03/1987 |
11/03/1987 |
D5260
|
|
25110
|
|
|
26/03/1964 |
16A 16C D16 8F 8J D08 D16 SP W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
26/03/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/04/1972 12/05/1973 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5261
|
|
25111
|
|
|
02/04/1964 |
16A D16 8F 8J D08 TI 91X ED CD CW TO CW W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Tinsley To Scottish Region Eastfield Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Toton Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
02/04/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 19/10/1974 12/07/1975 26/07/1975 10/1976 04/1977 10/1977 03/1978 30/03/1980 |
30/03/1980 |
D5262
|
|
25112
|
|
|
10/04/1964 |
16A D16 8F 8J D08 KD SP CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
10/04/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 10/1977 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5263
|
|
25113
|
|
|
14/04/1964 |
16A D16 8F 9A 8F D08 KD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
14/04/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 09/03/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 26/06/1983 |
26/06/1983 |
D5264
|
|
25114
|
|
|
17/04/1964 |
16A 16D 16A D16 8F 9A 8F D08 KD SP CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Toton Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/04/1964 09/05/1964 26/12/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 09/03/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 10/1977 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D5265
|
|
25115
|
|
|
22/04/1964 |
16A 16C D16 8F 9A 8F D08 KD SP TO CD W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
22/04/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 14/10/1967 09/03/1968 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 08/05/1976 10/1977 11/1981 02/10/1983 |
02/10/1983 |
D5266
|
|
25116
|
|
|
29/04/1964 |
16A 16C D16 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 D08 D09 D16 KD CW W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Nottingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
29/04/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 30/01/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/12/1967 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 13/12/1969 07/11/1970 28/02/1976 08/05/1976 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5267
|
|
25117
|
|
|
29/04/1964 |
16A 16C 16A D16 CW W |
Toton (New) Derby Toton Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
29/04/1964 09/05/1964 22/08/1964 16/01/1965 20/11/1977 22/01/1984 |
22/01/1984 |
D5268
|
|
25118
|
|
|
08/05/1964 |
16A 16C D16 W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
08/05/1964 05/09/1964 16/01/1965 04/01/1981 |
04/01/1981 |
D5269
|
|
25119
|
|
|
06/05/1964 |
16A 15B 16A D16 D15 D09 KD W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Toton Nottingham Division Leicester Division Manchester Division Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
06/05/1964 06/06/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 09/10/1965 11/03/1972 11/10/1975 14/06/1985 |
14/06/1985 |
D5270
|
|
25120
|
|
|
14/05/1964 |
16A 15B 16A D16 ML D16 D14 D01 D02 D01 D16 CW W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London (Midland) London Division Birmingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
14/05/1964 06/06/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/02/1968 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 07/01/1970 11/07/1970 20/11/1977 27/11/1983 |
27/11/1983 |
D5271
|
|
25121
|
|
|
15/05/1964 |
16A 15B 16A D16 D14 D01 D02 D01 D08 D16 W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Toton Nottingham Division London (Midland) London Division Birmingham Division London Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
15/05/1964 01/08/1964 19/09/1964 16/01/1965 15/01/1966 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 07/01/1970 03/04/1971 07/10/1972 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5272
|
|
25122
|
|
|
22/05/1964 |
16A 15B 16A D16 ML D16 D08 D01 D02 D09 D08 D16 W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Toton Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division London Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
22/05/1964 06/06/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 09/11/1968 11/10/1969 07/01/1970 06/02/1971 07/10/1972 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5273
|
|
25123
|
|
|
22/05/1964 |
16A 15B 16D D16 D15 8B 8F 9A D09 D08 D16 CD W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Nottingham Nottingham Division Leicester Division Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
22/05/1964 06/06/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 02/10/1965 22/07/1967 07/10/1967 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 08/04/1972 07/10/1972 11/1981 01/05/1983 |
01/05/1983 |
D5274
|
|
25124
|
|
|
29/05/1964 |
16A 9E 9A D09 D16 W |
Toton (New) Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
29/05/1964 27/06/1964 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 06/05/1972 20/10/1983 |
20/10/1983 |
D5275
|
|
25125
|
|
|
03/06/1964 |
16A 9E 9E 9A D09 D16 W |
Toton (New) Trafford Park (LMS) (on loan) Trafford Park (LMS) (loan made permanent) Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
03/06/1964 13/06/1964 18/07/1964 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 06/05/1972 06/12/1981 |
06/12/1981 |
D5276
|
|
25126
|
|
|
05/06/1964 |
16A 9E 9E 9A D09 D16 W |
Toton (New) Trafford Park (LMS) (on loan) Trafford Park (LMS) (loan made permanent) Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
05/06/1964 27/06/1964 18/07/1964 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 06/05/1972 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D5277
|
|
25127
|
|
|
11/06/1964 |
16A 16C 9E 9A D09 D16 W |
Toton (New) Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
11/06/1964 04/07/1964 01/08/1964 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/04/1972 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5278
|
|
|
|
|
12/06/1964 |
16A 16C 9E 9A D09 W |
Toton (New) Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Manchester Division Withdrawn |
12/06/1964 04/07/1964 01/08/1964 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 02/05/1971 |
02/05/1971 |
D5279
|
|
25129
|
|
|
18/06/1964 |
16A 9E 9A D09 D16 W |
Toton (New) Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
18/06/1964 01/08/1964 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/04/1972 07/02/1982 |
07/02/1982 |
D5280
|
|
25130
|
|
|
20/06/1964 |
16A 16C D16 ML D16 D08 D10 D16 W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
20/06/1964 01/08/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 23/11/1968 06/05/1972 05/12/1982 |
05/12/1982 |
D5281
|
|
25131
|
97202
|
|
26/06/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 2E D02 ML D16 D08 D10 D16 SP TO
R W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton
Reinstated Withdrawn |
26/06/1964 01/08/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 23/11/1968 06/05/1972 07/07/1973 25/08/1973 06/12/1982 01/10/1983 01/01/1984 |
01/01/1984 |
D5282
|
|
25132
|
|
|
10/07/1964 |
16A 16D D16 ML D16 D08 D10 D16 SP TO W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Withdrawn |
10/07/1964 22/08/1964 16/01/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 23/11/1968 06/05/1972 07/07/1973 25/08/1973 19/12/1982 |
19/12/1982 |
D5283
|
|
25133
|
|
|
02/07/1964 |
16A 14B 16A 16D D16 ML D16 D14 ML D05 8J D08 D10 D16 SP TO W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Toton Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Allerton Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Withdrawn |
02/07/1964 18/07/1964 19/09/1964 26/09/1964 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 13/11/1965 15/01/1966 12/11/1966 05/07/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 06/05/1972 07/07/1973 08/09/1973 28/08/1983 |
28/08/1983 |
D5284
|
|
25134
|
|
|
09/07/1964 |
16A 14B 16A 16C 14B D14 2E D02 ML D16 D08 D10 D16 SP TO W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Toton Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Withdrawn |
09/07/1964 18/07/1964 19/09/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 10/04/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 20/07/1968 12/10/1968 06/05/1972 07/07/1973 08/09/1973 19/12/1982 |
19/12/1982 |
D5285
|
|
25135
|
|
|
09/07/1964 |
16A 14B 16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D05 12A D10 D08 D10 D16 SP TO W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Toton Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Withdrawn |
09/07/1964 18/07/1964 19/09/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 23/04/1966 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 08/01/1972 07/10/1972 07/07/1973 20/10/1973 16/01/1983 |
16/01/1983 |
D5286
|
|
25136
|
|
|
29/07/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D05 12A D10 D08 D16 SP TO W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Withdrawn |
29/07/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 23/04/1966 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 17/01/1970 10/03/1973 07/07/1973 09/03/1974 27/03/1983 |
27/03/1983 |
D5287
|
|
25137
|
|
|
29/07/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D02 D05 D10 D08 TO WN TO SP TO W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Stoke Division Preston Division Liverpool Division Toton Willesden Toton Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Withdrawn |
29/07/1964 05/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 13/11/1965 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/11/1967 14/09/1968 17/01/1970 06/10/1973 10/05/1975 14/06/1975 28/02/1976 20/11/1977 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D5288
|
|
25138
|
|
|
30/07/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D02 D05 D08 W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Stoke Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
30/07/1964 22/08/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 23/04/1966 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/11/1967 09/11/1968 11/12/1983 |
11/12/1983 |
D5289
|
|
25139
|
|
|
13/08/1964 |
16A 15A 15A D15 ML D02 D05 D08 W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Leicester Midland Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Stoke Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
13/08/1964 29/08/1964 09/01/1965 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/11/1967 09/11/1968 07/11/1982 |
07/11/1982 |
D5290
|
|
25140
|
|
|
17/08/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D02 D05 D08 KD W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Stoke Division Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
17/08/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 19/02/1966 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/11/1967 09/11/1968 11/1981 18/12/1983 |
18/12/1983 |
D5291
|
|
25141
|
|
|
24/08/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D02 D05 D08 D02 TO LO BS LO W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Stoke Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Toton Longsight Bescot Longsight Withdrawn |
24/08/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 23/04/1966 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/11/1967 09/11/1968 10/02/1973 12/01/1974 07/09/1974 20/11/1977 11/1981 19/09/1982 |
19/09/1982 |
D5292
|
|
25142
|
|
|
26/08/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D02 D05 D08 D09 D08 D02 KD W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Stoke Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
26/08/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 23/04/1966 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/11/1967 09/11/1968 11/10/1969 13/12/1969 10/02/1973 10/01/1976 18/10/1981 |
18/10/1981 |
D5293
|
|
25143
|
|
|
02/09/1964 |
16A 16C 14B D14 ML D16 ML D02 8F 9A D09 D02 D09 D16 D01 D09 BS W |
Toton (New) Derby Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Manchester Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Nottingham Division London Division Manchester Division Bescot Withdrawn |
02/09/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 06/11/1965 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 25/11/1967 30/12/1967 17/06/1968 06/02/1971 27/02/1971 06/05/1972 19/08/1972 09/09/1972 11/08/1973 14/11/1982 |
14/11/1982 |
D5294
|
|
25144
|
|
|
07/09/1964 |
16A 16C 16D D16 ML D02 D09 KD
R W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Manchester Division Carlisle Kingmoor
Reinstated Withdrawn |
07/09/1964 26/09/1964 17/10/1964 16/01/1965 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/03/1972 11/10/1975 31/05/1981 21/06/1981 17/04/1983 |
17/04/1983 |
D5295
|
|
25145
|
|
|
10/09/1964 |
16A 16C 16D ML D02 D08 D09 BS CW W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Bescot Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
10/09/1964 26/09/1964 10/10/1964 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/03/1972 10/03/1973 11/08/1973 11/1981 02/01/1986 |
02/01/1986 |
D5296
|
|
25146
|
|
|
18/09/1964 |
16A 16C 16D 40E D16 ML D02 D09 KM W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Colwick Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Manchester Division Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
18/09/1964 26/09/1964 10/10/1964 23/01/1965 01/05/1965 11/03/1967 05/07/1967 11/03/1972 09/03/1974 07/08/1983 |
07/08/1983 |
D5297
|
|
25147
|
|
|
18/09/1964 |
16A 16C 16D ML D16 D10 BS LO KM LO SP BS W |
Toton (New) Derby Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Bescot Longsight Carlisle Kingmoor Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Bescot Withdrawn |
18/09/1964 26/09/1964 10/10/1964 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 19/07/1969 06/10/1973 08/12/1973 12/01/1974 09/03/1974 04/1977 07/1977 30/03/1980 |
30/03/1980 |
D5298
|
|
25148
|
|
|
28/09/1964 |
16A 16D 2E D02 ML D16 D10 LO LO CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Longsight Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/09/1964 24/10/1964 06/03/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 17/06/1968 19/07/1969 06/07/1974 04/1977 10/1977 07/09/1981 |
07/09/1981 |
D5299
|
|
25149
|
|
|
15/10/1965 |
D16 ML D16 D10 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division Withdrawn |
15/10/1965 30/09/1967 17/06/1968 15/11/1969 10/01/1982 |
10/01/1982 |
D7500
|
|
25150
|
|
|
02/10/1964 |
16A 16F ML D16 64B 64B TI ED LO BS W |
Toton (New) Burton Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Haymarket Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Longsight Bescot Withdrawn |
02/10/1964 12/12/1964 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 04/11/1972 25/11/1972 12/05/1973 12/07/1975 23/08/1975 07/1977 13/06/1982 |
13/06/1982 |
D7501
|
|
25151
|
|
|
06/10/1964 |
16A 16F ML D16 64B TI ED LO BS W |
Toton (New) Burton Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Haymarket Tinsley Eastfield Longsight Bescot Withdrawn |
06/10/1964 12/12/1964 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 18/11/1972 12/05/1973 12/07/1975 23/08/1975 07/1977 12/09/1982 |
12/09/1982 |
D7502
|
|
25152
|
|
|
08/10/1964 |
16A 16F D01 D05 8F D08 D16 84A 82A 86A BR CD TO W |
Toton (New) Burton London Division Stoke Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Toton Withdrawn |
08/10/1964 12/12/1964 25/02/1967 12/08/1967 25/11/1967 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 08/01/1972 28/10/1972 09/12/1972 12/10/1974 28/02/1976 09/1977 26/01/1984 |
26/01/1984 |
D7503
|
|
25153
|
|
|
14/10/1964 |
16A 16F D14 D01 ML D16 84A 82A 86A BR CD W |
Toton (New) Burton London (Midland) London Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
14/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/10/1965 25/02/1967 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 09/12/1972 12/10/1974 28/02/1976 03/04/1983 |
03/04/1983 |
D7504
|
|
25154
|
|
|
17/10/1964 |
16A 16F D14 ML D16 84A 82A 86A CD LO CD W |
Toton (New) Burton London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/10/1964 12/12/1964 27/01/1968 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 09/12/1972 11/12/1976 12/03/1978 09/1981 27/03/1985 |
27/03/1985 |
D7505
|
|
25155
|
|
|
22/10/1964 |
16A 16F ML D16 84A 86A BR CF LA W |
Toton (New) Burton Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
22/10/1964 12/12/1964 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 09/12/1972 12/10/1974 08/11/1975 05/1977 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D7506
|
|
25156
|
|
|
27/10/1964 |
16A 8F D08 D16 84A CF BR LO CD W |
Toton (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Nottingham Division Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
27/10/1964 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 08/01/1972 06/10/1973 07/09/1974 07/02/1976 28/02/1976 20/12/1981 |
20/12/1981 |
D7507
|
|
25157
|
|
|
29/10/1964 |
16A ML D16 84A 82A CF BR CF BR BS CD W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Bescot Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/10/1964 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 09/12/1972 06/10/1973 10/11/1973 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 07/02/1976 28/02/1976 24/10/1982 |
24/10/1982 |
D7508
|
|
25158
|
|
|
05/11/1964 |
16A 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 ML D16 84A 86B BR CF BR CF BR TO CD W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/11/1964 30/01/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 07/01/1967 11/03/1967 09/12/1967 02/03/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 09/12/1972 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 12/10/1974 07/12/1974 10/05/1975 07/02/1976 28/02/1976 22/05/1983 |
22/05/1983 |
D7509
|
|
25159
|
|
|
05/11/1964 |
16A ML D16 84A 86B CF BR TO CD W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Toton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/11/1964 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 12/08/1972 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 07/02/1976 28/02/1976 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D7510
|
|
25160
|
|
|
10/11/1964 |
16A ML D16 86B CF BR CD W |
Toton (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
10/11/1964 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 07/02/1976 10/10/1982 |
10/10/1982 |
D7511
|
|
25161
|
|
|
17/11/1964 |
16A 16D ML D16 86B CF BR CD W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/11/1964 21/11/1964 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 10/01/1976 28/11/1984 |
28/11/1984 |
D7512
|
|
25162
|
|
|
20/11/1964 |
16A D15 ML D16 86B CF BR CD W |
Toton (New) Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
20/11/1964 09/10/1965 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 10/05/1975 10/01/1976 31/05/1981 |
31/05/1981 |
D7513
|
|
25163
|
|
|
25/11/1964 |
16A D05 9A D09 D02 D16 86B CF BR CD W |
Toton (New) Stoke Division Longsight Manchester Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/11/1964 19/08/1967 23/03/1968 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 07/11/1970 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 08/11/1975 10/01/1976 09/11/1980 |
09/11/1980 |
D7514
|
|
25164
|
|
|
25/11/1964 |
16A D15 ML D16 86B CF BR CD W |
Toton (New) Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/11/1964 09/10/1965 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 08/11/1975 10/01/1976 21/08/1983 |
21/08/1983 |
D7515
|
|
25165
|
|
|
02/12/1964 |
16A 14B D14 ML D16 ML D16 86B CF CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
02/12/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 06/08/1966 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 10/01/1976 03/11/1978 |
03/11/1978 |
D7516
|
|
25166
|
|
|
04/12/1964 |
16A 14B D14 ML D16 ML D16 86B CF CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
04/12/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 19/02/1966 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/01/1972 11/05/1974 08/05/1976 02/11/1980 |
02/11/1980 |
D7517
|
|
25167
|
|
|
09/12/1964 |
16A 14B D14 ML D16 ML D16 86B CF BR CD W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West London (Midland) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
09/12/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 18/09/1965 06/08/1966 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 11/08/1973 10/01/1976 28/02/1976 29/05/1983 |
29/05/1983 |
D7518
|
|
25168
|
|
|
12/12/1964 |
16A 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 86B CF LA BR CD W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
12/12/1964 30/01/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/12/1967 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 12/05/1973 08/11/1975 10/01/1976 28/02/1976 22/05/1983 |
22/05/1983 |
D7519
|
|
25169
|
|
|
06/01/1965 |
2E D16 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 LA SP CD W |
(New) Saltley Nottingham Division Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Laira Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
06/01/1965 06/03/1965 13/03/1965 17/07/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/12/1967 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 10/07/1976 07/08/1976 08/09/1981 |
08/09/1981 |
D7520
|
|
25170
|
|
|
22/12/1964 |
16A 2E D02 ML D16 ML D16 86A LA W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
22/12/1964 06/03/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/12/1967 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 11/10/1975 08/08/1982 |
08/08/1982 |
D7521
|
|
25171
|
|
|
07/01/1965 |
ML D16 86A LA BR CF HA W |
(New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Haymarket Withdrawn |
07/01/1965 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/07/1972 12/10/1974 10/05/1975 07/06/1975 11/10/1975 15/10/1978 |
15/10/1978 |
D7522
|
|
25172
|
|
|
08/01/1965 |
D15 ML D16 D01 D10 D01 CD WN CF LA BR CF HA SP W |
(New) Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Preston Division London Division Cricklewood East Willesden Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
08/01/1965 09/10/1965 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 19/08/1972 09/09/1972 06/01/1973 09/06/1973 12/01/1974 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 10/05/1975 07/06/1975 11/10/1975 11/12/1976 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D7523
|
|
25173
|
|
|
12/01/1965 |
ML D16 D10 D01 D09 WN CW CW TO CW W |
(New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Preston Division London Division Manchester Division Willesden Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Toton Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
12/01/1965 04/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 19/08/1972 04/11/1972 12/05/1973 14/06/1975 04/1977 10/1977 03/1978 19/03/1987 |
19/03/1987 |
D7524
|
|
25174
|
|
|
18/01/1965 |
D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
18/01/1965 19/08/1972 14/06/1975 20/09/1976 |
20/09/1976 |
D7525
|
|
25175
|
|
|
27/01/1965 |
D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
27/01/1965 09/10/1971 14/06/1975 05/12/1985 |
05/12/1985 |
D7526
|
|
25176
|
|
|
28/01/1965 |
D16 31B 34G D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) March Finsbury Park Nottingham Division London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
28/01/1965 20/02/1965 22/05/1965 12/06/1965 09/10/1971 14/06/1975 09/03/1987 |
09/03/1987 |
D7527
|
|
25177
|
|
|
30/01/1965 |
D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
30/01/1965 09/10/1971 14/06/1975 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7528
|
|
25178
|
|
|
02/02/1965 |
D16 D01 CW CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
02/02/1965 09/10/1971 14/06/1975 09/1981 03/04/1985 |
03/04/1985 |
D7529
|
|
25179
|
|
|
12/02/1965 |
D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
12/02/1965 09/08/1969 14/06/1975 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7530
|
|
25180
|
|
|
12/02/1965 |
D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
12/02/1965 09/08/1969 14/06/1975 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7531
|
|
25181
|
|
|
17/02/1965 |
D16 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
17/02/1965 09/08/1969 14/06/1975 11/08/1986 |
11/08/1986 |
D7532
|
|
25182
|
|
|
18/02/1965 |
D16 D01 D02 D01 CW CD CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Birmingham Division London Division Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
18/02/1965 09/08/1969 06/05/1972 19/08/1972 14/06/1975 10/01/1976 07/08/1976 21/01/1985 |
21/01/1985 |
D7533
|
|
25183
|
|
|
24/02/1965 |
D16 D01 D02 D01 CW CD CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Birmingham Division London Division Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
24/02/1965 09/08/1969 06/05/1972 19/08/1972 14/06/1975 10/01/1976 07/08/1976 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D7534
|
|
25184
|
|
|
03/03/1965 |
D16 D01 D02 WN KM BS WN CW LO CD LO LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Birmingham Division Willesden Carlisle Kingmoor Bescot Willesden Cricklewood East Longsight Crewe Diesel Longsight Longsight Withdrawn |
03/03/1965 12/07/1969 18/12/1971 07/07/1973 09/11/1974 08/02/1975 10/05/1975 14/06/1975 10/01/1976 10/1976 12/03/1978 09/1981 28/08/1983 |
28/08/1983 |
D7535
|
|
25185
|
|
|
03/03/1965 |
D16 D01 D02 D01 D02 WN TO WN CW LO KD W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Willesden Toton Willesden Cricklewood East Longsight Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
03/03/1965 12/07/1969 09/05/1970 27/06/1970 18/12/1971 07/07/1973 12/10/1974 08/03/1975 14/06/1975 10/01/1976 04/1977 05/11/1984 |
05/11/1984 |
D7536
|
|
25186
|
|
|
12/03/1965 |
D16 D15 D01 D09 D08 D01 D09 D02 WN SP LO CD KD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division London Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division London Division Manchester Division Birmingham Division Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe Diesel Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
12/03/1965 02/10/1965 12/07/1969 10/07/1971 07/08/1971 08/01/1972 12/02/1972 11/03/1972 09/03/1974 12/10/1974 12/07/1975 10/1977 08/01/1978 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7537
|
|
25187
|
|
|
12/03/1965 |
D16 D15 D01 D02 WN BS W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division London Division Birmingham Division Willesden Bescot Withdrawn |
12/03/1965 09/10/1965 12/07/1969 06/02/1971 09/03/1974 23/03/1974 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7538
|
|
25188
|
|
|
19/03/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D01 D02 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division London Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
19/03/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 06/02/1971 15/08/1982 |
15/08/1982 |
D7539
|
|
25189
|
|
|
25/03/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D01 D02 D09 D08 D02 D09 D16 BS WN LO CW TO CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division London Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Nottingham Division Bescot Willesden Longsight Cricklewood East Toton Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
25/03/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 06/02/1971 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 04/11/1972 06/01/1973 10/11/1973 23/03/1974 10/08/1974 28/02/1976 10/1976 03/1977 09/07/1985 |
09/07/1985 |
D7540
|
|
25190
|
|
|
29/03/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D08 D09 D08 D02 D09 D16 KM SP KM TO WN CW CD CW TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Nottingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Toton Willesden Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
29/03/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 23/01/1971 10/07/1971 09/10/1971 07/10/1972 04/11/1972 06/01/1973 12/05/1973 07/09/1974 09/11/1974 08/02/1975 08/03/1975 14/06/1975 11/12/1976 06/1977 09/1981 28/01/1987 |
28/01/1987 |
D7541
|
|
25191
|
|
|
29/03/1965 |
D16 D14 9A D09 D08 KM W |
Nottingham Division (New) London (Midland) Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
29/03/1965 16/10/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 12/05/1973 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7542
|
|
25192
|
|
|
09/04/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D08 D10 SP KD SP LO CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
09/04/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 08/05/1971 10/07/1971 11/08/1973 12/04/1975 08/05/1976 04/1977 10/1977 07/05/1986 |
07/05/1986 |
D7543
|
|
25193
|
|
|
15/04/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D02 D10 SP KD WN CW TO CW CW TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division Birmingham Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Willesden Cricklewood East Toton Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
15/04/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 27/02/1971 08/05/1971 11/08/1973 12/04/1975 10/05/1975 14/06/1975 11/10/1975 17/04/1976 04/1977 10/1977 12/11/1984 |
12/11/1984 |
D7544
|
|
25194
|
|
|
13/05/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D02 D10 SP LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division Birmingham Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Withdrawn |
13/05/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 06/02/1971 08/05/1971 11/08/1973 06/07/1974 03/06/1985 |
03/06/1985 |
D7545
|
|
25195
|
|
|
06/05/1965 |
D16 9A D09 D10 D09 D08 D10 LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Longsight Manchester Division Preston Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Longsight Withdrawn |
06/05/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 11/07/1970 07/11/1970 10/07/1971 06/07/1974 14/06/1985 |
14/06/1985 |
D7546
|
|
25196
|
|
|
07/05/1965 |
D16 8F 8J D08 D10 LO KM TO LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Preston Division Longsight Carlisle Kingmoor Toton Longsight Withdrawn |
07/05/1965 02/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 09/03/1974 07/09/1974 09/08/1975 11/10/1975 17/03/1986 |
17/03/1986 |
D7547
|
|
25197
|
|
|
14/05/1965 |
D16 8F 8J D08 D10 SP LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Withdrawn |
14/05/1965 02/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 11/01/1975 10/05/1975 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D7548
|
|
25198
|
|
|
20/05/1965 |
D16 8F 8J D08 LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Longsight Withdrawn |
20/05/1965 02/12/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 21/02/1986 |
21/02/1986 |
D7549
|
|
25199
|
|
|
28/05/1965 |
D16 8F 12A D10 LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Longsight Withdrawn |
28/05/1965 07/10/1967 11/11/1967 17/06/1968 11/10/1975 09/02/1987 |
09/02/1987 |
D7550
|
|
25200
|
|
|
04/06/1965 |
D16 D15 D16 12A D10 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division Nottingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Withdrawn |
04/06/1965 09/10/1965 23/10/1965 07/10/1967 17/06/1968 11/02/1986 |
11/02/1986 |
D7551
|
|
25201
|
|
|
16/06/1965 |
D16 D15 12A 8F 8J D08 D10 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Preston Division Withdrawn |
16/06/1965 09/10/1965 07/10/1967 06/01/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 28/01/1987 |
28/01/1987 |
D7552
|
|
25202
|
|
|
23/06/1965 |
D16 8F 8J D08 D10 D02 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Allerton Liverpool Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
23/06/1965 07/10/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 09/05/1970 25/06/1986 |
25/06/1986 |
D7553
|
|
25203
|
|
|
24/06/1965 |
D16 12A D10 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
24/06/1965 07/10/1967 17/06/1968 10/01/1976 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D7554
|
|
25204
|
|
|
03/07/1965 |
D16 8F 12A D10 D01 D08 KM CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division London Division Liverpool Division Carlisle Kingmoor Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
03/07/1965 09/09/1967 11/11/1967 17/06/1968 18/12/1971 08/04/1972 12/05/1973 10/01/1976 06/07/1980 |
06/07/1980 |
D7555
|
|
25205
|
|
|
09/07/1965 |
D16 D15 ML D05 D16 8F 12A D10 D01 CW SP TO CW LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Division Line Power Controller, Derby Stoke Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division London Division Cricklewood East Springs Branch (Wigan) Toton Cricklewood East Longsight Withdrawn |
09/07/1965 23/10/1965 15/01/1966 28/05/1966 17/09/1966 09/09/1967 11/11/1967 17/06/1968 18/12/1971 11/05/1974 10/08/1974 09/08/1975 20/11/1977 11/1981 09/05/1986 |
09/05/1986 |
D7556
|
|
25206
|
|
|
09/07/1965 |
D16 8F 12A D10 D16 D10 D16 BS TO LO LA W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Nottingham Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Bescot Toton Longsight Laira Withdrawn |
09/07/1965 09/09/1967 11/11/1967 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 10/04/1971 07/10/1972 06/07/1974 08/03/1975 07/1977 12/03/1978 21/03/1986 |
21/03/1986 |
D7557
|
|
25207
|
|
|
04/08/1965 |
D16 8F D08 D10 D16 D10 D16 BS TO LO LA W |
Nottingham Division (New) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Preston Division Nottingham Division Bescot Toton Longsight Laira Withdrawn |
04/08/1965 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 07/11/1970 06/11/1971 07/10/1972 06/07/1974 08/03/1975 07/1977 12/03/1978 12/11/1984 |
12/11/1984 |
D7558
|
|
25208
|
|
|
13/08/1965 |
D16 D02 9A D09 D10 D02 D16 LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Longsight Withdrawn |
13/08/1965 13/05/1967 13/01/1968 17/06/1968 12/10/1968 09/05/1970 07/11/1970 10/08/1974 06/05/1984 |
06/05/1984 |
D7559
|
|
25209
|
|
|
28/08/1965 |
D16 D02 D05 D02 D10 D02 D16 LO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Birmingham Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Longsight Withdrawn |
28/08/1965 13/05/1967 10/06/1967 26/08/1967 07/01/1970 09/05/1970 07/11/1970 10/08/1974 17/12/1985 |
17/12/1985 |
D7560
|
|
25210
|
|
|
18/09/1965 |
D16 D01 8F D08 D02 D16 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
18/09/1965 08/04/1967 25/11/1967 17/06/1968 11/01/1969 07/11/1970 11/1978 29/04/1985 |
29/04/1985 |
D7561
|
|
25211
|
|
|
20/10/1965 |
D16 D01 D02 D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
20/10/1965 08/04/1967 09/03/1968 07/11/1970 25/07/1986 |
25/07/1986 |
D7562
|
|
25212
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
D16 D01 D02 D16 CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
03/12/1965 08/04/1967 09/03/1968 12/12/1970 11/1981 21/05/1985 |
21/05/1985 |
D7563
|
|
25213
|
|
|
12/11/1965 |
D16 D01 D10 D02 D16 TI ED TO SP W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Toton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
12/11/1965 08/04/1967 06/07/1968 11/10/1969 08/05/1971 20/10/1973 12/07/1975 10/1976 26/02/1978 19/03/1987 |
19/03/1987 |
D7564
|
|
25214
|
|
|
12/12/1965 |
D16 D01 D10 D02 D16 WN CW TO CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Willesden Cricklewood East Toton Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
12/12/1965 08/04/1967 06/07/1968 11/10/1969 08/05/1971 12/05/1973 11/05/1974 18/05/1974 17/04/1976 14/11/1982 |
14/11/1982 |
D7565
|
|
25215
|
|
|
03/12/1965 |
D16 D02 D16 D01 64B 64B CF LA W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division London Division Haymarket Haymarket Cardiff Canton Laira Withdrawn |
03/12/1965 13/05/1967 08/01/1972 19/08/1972 04/11/1972 25/11/1972 30/08/1975 11/10/1975 19/06/1983 |
19/06/1983 |
D7566
|
|
25216
|
|
|
19/01/1966 |
D16 D02 D16 D01 ED HA CF LA CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division London Division Eastfield Haymarket Cardiff Canton Laira Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
19/01/1966 13/05/1967 08/01/1972 19/08/1972 26/01/1974 25/05/1974 30/08/1975 11/10/1975 12/03/1978 28/12/1980 |
28/12/1980 |
D7567
|
|
25217
|
|
|
20/01/1966 |
D16 D02 D16 D01 LO ED HA CF LA CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division London Division Longsight Eastfield Haymarket Cardiff Canton Laira Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
20/01/1966 13/05/1967 08/01/1972 19/08/1972 10/11/1973 26/01/1974 25/05/1974 30/08/1975 11/10/1975 12/03/1978 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D7568
|
|
25218
|
|
|
27/09/1963 |
16A 16D 16C 14B ML 55A D16 CW W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Derby Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
27/09/1963 29/02/1964 10/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 12/08/1967 19/08/1972 20/11/1977 25/01/1985 |
25/01/1985 |
D7569
|
|
25219
|
|
|
08/10/1963 |
14A 16C 14B ML 55A ML 8J D05 D08 D09 82A 86A LA BR CF CD SP W |
Cricklewood East (New) Derby Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Stoke Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
08/10/1963 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 12/08/1967 16/03/1968 27/04/1968 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 09/05/1970 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 12/10/1974 10/05/1975 08/11/1975 20/11/1977 09/1981 03/04/1983 |
03/04/1983 |
D7570
|
|
25220
|
|
|
04/10/1963 |
16A 2E D02 ML 55A 8F D08 D09 D01 D16 BR LA CF CD W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Manchester Division London Division Nottingham Division Bristol Bath Road Laira Cardiff Canton Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
04/10/1963 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 09/09/1972 10/03/1973 11/05/1974 12/07/1975 11/12/1976 20/11/1977 13/06/1982 |
13/06/1982 |
D7571
|
|
25221
|
|
|
09/10/1963 |
14A 16C D15 D16 ML 55A D16 D01 CD WN CW CD LO W |
Cricklewood East (New) Derby Leicester Division Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Nottingham Division London Division Cricklewood East Willesden Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Longsight Withdrawn |
09/10/1963 24/10/1964 19/06/1965 31/07/1965 11/03/1967 12/08/1967 19/08/1972 10/03/1973 06/10/1973 06/04/1974 14/06/1975 04/1977 07/1981 31/01/1984 |
31/01/1984 |
D7572
|
|
25222
|
|
|
17/10/1963 |
14A 16C 14B ML 55A D16 D01 CD WN CW CD W |
Cricklewood East (New) Derby Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Nottingham Division London Division Cricklewood East Willesden Cricklewood East Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
17/10/1963 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 12/08/1967 19/08/1972 10/03/1973 06/10/1973 06/04/1974 14/06/1975 04/1977 14/12/1980 |
14/12/1980 |
D7573
|
|
25223
|
|
|
23/10/1963 |
14A 16C 14B ML 55A 9A D09 84A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Derby Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Longsight Manchester Division Laira Withdrawn |
23/10/1963 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 12/08/1967 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 09/10/1971 05/10/1980 |
05/10/1980 |
D7574
|
|
25224
|
|
|
23/10/1963 |
14A 16C 14B ML D16 ML D02 ML 8J D08 D09 84A W |
Cricklewood East (New) Derby Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Liverpool Division Manchester Division Laira Withdrawn |
23/10/1963 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 30/04/1966 24/09/1966 19/08/1967 16/09/1967 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 09/10/1971 08/05/1986 |
08/05/1986 |
D7575
|
|
25225
|
|
|
30/11/1963 |
16A 14B 16C 14B ML 8J D08 D09 84A W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Derby Cricklewood West Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Liverpool Division Manchester Division Laira Withdrawn |
30/11/1963 01/12/1963 24/10/1964 12/12/1964 16/01/1965 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 09/10/1971 05/10/1980 |
05/10/1980 |
D7576
|
|
25226
|
|
|
09/11/1963 |
16A 14B 16C ML 65A 64B 65A HA IS ED W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Inverness Eastfield Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 01/12/1963 24/10/1964 16/01/1965 09/09/1967 28/06/1969 28/02/1970 06/10/1973 05/1977 03/08/1981 10/06/1985 |
10/06/1985 |
D7577
|
|
25227
|
|
|
09/11/1963 |
16A 14B 16C ML 8J D08 D09 84A 82A LA ED W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Liverpool Division Manchester Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Eastfield Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 01/12/1963 24/10/1964 11/03/1967 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 09/10/1971 28/10/1972 08/05/1976 09/10/1976 26/06/1983 |
26/06/1983 |
D7578
|
|
25228
|
|
|
30/11/1963 |
16A 50A 55H 50A 16A 16C 40E D16 ML 65A 64B IS W |
Toton (New) York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Toton Derby Colwick Nottingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Eastfield Haymarket Inverness Withdrawn |
30/11/1963 04/01/1964 25/01/1964 13/06/1964 31/10/1964 14/11/1964 01/05/1965 22/05/1965 11/03/1967 09/09/1967 28/06/1969 05/1977 20/03/1984 |
20/03/1984 |
D7579
|
|
25229
|
|
|
13/12/1963 |
16A 16C 15A ML 65A 64B 65A HA IS W |
Toton (New) Derby Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Inverness Withdrawn |
13/12/1963 04/01/1964 08/02/1964 16/01/1965 09/09/1967 28/06/1969 28/02/1970 06/10/1973 05/1977 20/05/1985 |
20/05/1985 |
D7580
|
|
25230
|
|
|
14/12/1963 |
16A 16D ML D14 8J 65A 64B ED W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby London (Midland) Allerton Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
14/12/1963 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 07/01/1967 27/04/1968 01/06/1968 28/06/1969 24/05/1975 06/08/1986 |
06/08/1986 |
D7581
|
|
25231
|
|
|
27/12/1963 |
16A 12A 16A 14B 16C ML 65A 64B ED IS W |
Toton (New) Carlisle Kingmoor Toton Cricklewood West Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
27/12/1963 18/01/1964 01/08/1964 26/09/1964 24/10/1964 11/03/1967 09/09/1967 28/06/1969 29/05/1976 05/1977 23/08/1985 |
23/08/1985 |
D7582
|
|
25232
|
|
|
07/01/1964 |
16A 2E D02 ML D02 ML 8J D08 65A 64B SP HA ED W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Liverpool Division Eastfield Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/01/1964 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 19/08/1967 16/09/1967 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 17/08/1968 28/06/1969 08/09/1973 11/01/1975 24/05/1975 01/12/1980 |
01/12/1980 |
D7583
|
|
25233
|
|
|
21/01/1964 |
16A 16C ML 65A SP HA ED IS W |
Toton (New) Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Eastfield Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
21/01/1964 22/08/1964 11/03/1967 09/09/1967 25/08/1973 11/01/1975 24/05/1975 05/1977 13/03/1983 |
13/03/1983 |
D7584
|
|
25234
|
|
|
01/02/1964 |
16A 15A ML 65A SP HA ED IS W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Eastfield Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Eastfield Inverness Withdrawn |
01/02/1964 22/02/1964 16/01/1965 09/09/1967 25/08/1973 11/01/1975 24/05/1975 05/1977 27/02/1985 |
27/02/1985 |
D7585
|
|
25235
|
|
|
13/02/1964 |
16A 16D 16C 2E D02 ML 8J D08 D10 D09 ED HA W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Liverpool Division Preston Division Manchester Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
13/02/1964 22/02/1964 10/10/1964 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 27/04/1968 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 23/11/1968 02/08/1975 02/1978 01/03/1985 |
01/03/1985 |
D7586
|
|
25236
|
|
|
25/02/1964 |
16A 9E 9A 55A 52A 55A 52A 55A D01 CD WN CW W |
Toton (New) Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) London Division Cricklewood East Willesden Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
25/02/1964 29/02/1964 28/10/1967 25/05/1968 28/09/1968 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 04/03/1972 15/07/1972 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 14/06/1975 05/12/1984 |
05/12/1984 |
D7587
|
|
25237
|
|
|
09/03/1964 |
16A 2E D02 ML 8J D05 D16 D09 HA ED HA W |
Toton (New) Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Allerton Stoke Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
09/03/1964 11/04/1964 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 27/04/1968 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 09/10/1971 09/11/1974 24/05/1975 06/03/1976 10/06/1985 |
10/06/1985 |
D7588
|
|
25238
|
|
|
10/03/1964 |
16A 15A ML 9A D09 D16 D09 82A 86A LA CF LA CF HA IS W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Haymarket Inverness Withdrawn |
10/03/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 09/03/1974 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 07/06/1975 23/08/1975 05/1977 13/10/1980 |
13/10/1980 |
D7589
|
|
25239
|
|
|
13/04/1964 |
16A 15A ML 9A D09 D16 D09 CD TO ED W |
Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Crewe Diesel Toton Eastfield Withdrawn |
13/04/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 07/11/1970 11/10/1975 08/11/1975 03/07/1976 05/11/1984 |
05/11/1984 |
D7590
|
|
25240
|
|
|
15/04/1964 |
16A 16D ML 9A D09 65A 64B SP HA ED W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Eastfield Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
15/04/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 17/08/1968 26/10/1968 08/09/1973 09/11/1974 24/05/1975 28/08/1983 |
28/08/1983 |
D7591
|
|
25241
|
|
|
25/04/1964 |
16A 16D ML 9A D09 65A 64B ED W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/04/1964 09/05/1964 16/01/1965 25/05/1968 17/06/1968 17/08/1968 26/10/1968 24/05/1975 06/05/1981 |
06/05/1981 |
D7592
|
|
25242
|
|
|
13/05/1964 |
16A 15B 15A ML 9A D09 WN LO W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Willesden Longsight Withdrawn |
13/05/1964 06/06/1964 04/07/1964 16/01/1965 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 11/08/1973 12/10/1974 06/05/1984 |
06/05/1984 |
D7593
|
|
25243
|
|
|
27/06/1964 |
15B 16A 15A ML 55A 52A 55A 52A D16 D01 WN CW W |
Wellingborough Toton (New) Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Nottingham Division London Division Willesden Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
06/06/1964 27/06/1964 04/07/1964 16/01/1965 16/03/1968 28/09/1968 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 08/04/1972 06/05/1972 11/05/1974 06/07/1974 11/09/1983 |
11/09/1983 |
D7594
|
|
25244
|
|
|
03/06/1964 |
16A 16C ML 9A D09 ED W |
Toton (New) Derby Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/06/1964 04/07/1964 11/03/1967 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 23/08/1975 21/07/1986 |
21/07/1986 |
D7595
|
|
25245
|
|
|
20/06/1964 |
16A 15B 15A ML 9A D09 TO W |
Toton (New) Wellingborough Leicester Midland Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Toton Withdrawn |
20/06/1964 11/07/1964 25/07/1964 16/01/1965 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 12/05/1973 25/06/1985 |
25/06/1985 |
D7596
|
|
25246
|
|
|
07/07/1964 |
16A 14B 16C 2E D02 ML 55A 52A 55A 52A D16 D01 HA ED W |
Toton (New) Cricklewood West Derby Saltley Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Holbeck (MR) Gateshead Nottingham Division London Division Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
07/07/1964 18/07/1964 24/10/1964 19/06/1965 18/04/1966 23/04/1966 25/05/1968 28/09/1968 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 08/04/1972 06/05/1972 09/11/1974 24/05/1975 05/10/1981 |
05/10/1981 |
D7597
|
|
25247
|
|
|
12/08/1964 |
16A 16D ML 9A D09 SP W |
Toton (New) Nottingham Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
12/08/1964 22/08/1964 16/01/1965 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 08/09/1973 24/07/1983 |
24/07/1983 |
D7598
|
|
25248
|
|
|
05/02/1966 |
41A 65A ML D02 D01 D16 D09 D16 D09 KM CD SP W |
Tinsley (New) Eastfield Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Nottingham Division Manchester Division Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe Diesel Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
05/02/1966 08/10/1966 09/09/1967 16/09/1967 06/02/1971 13/02/1971 06/11/1971 07/10/1972 11/11/1972 12/05/1973 10/01/1976 08/05/1976 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7599
|
|
25249
|
|
|
05/02/1966 |
41A 65A ML D16 D02 D09 D08 D10 SP KM SP LO TO W |
Tinsley (New) Eastfield Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Kingmoor Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Toton Withdrawn |
05/02/1966 08/10/1966 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 06/11/1971 11/03/1972 11/11/1972 07/07/1973 07/09/1974 11/01/1975 11/10/1975 07/1977 29/01/1987 |
29/01/1987 |
D7600
|
|
25250
|
|
|
15/02/1966 |
41A 41E 34G 65A ML D16 D02 D08 D09 D01 CW W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Finsbury Park Eastfield Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
15/02/1966 18/06/1966 20/08/1966 08/10/1966 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 06/12/1969 09/05/1970 09/10/1971 10/03/1973 14/06/1975 13/05/1984 |
13/05/1984 |
D7601
|
|
25251
|
|
|
16/02/1966 |
41A 41E 65A ML D16 D08 D09 D08 BS CW W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Eastfield Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Liverpool Division Bescot Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
16/02/1966 18/06/1966 08/10/1966 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 09/10/1971 10/03/1973 18/08/1973 08/05/1976 15/01/1985 |
15/01/1985 |
D7602
|
|
25252
|
|
|
21/02/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 D02 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
21/02/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 28/06/1969 06/12/1969 30/03/1980 |
30/03/1980 |
D7603
|
|
25253
|
|
|
25/02/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 D02 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
25/02/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 28/06/1969 06/12/1969 25/09/1983 |
25/09/1983 |
D7604
|
|
25254
|
|
|
11/03/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
11/03/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 28/06/1969 04/09/1986 |
04/09/1986 |
D7605
|
|
|
|
|
12/03/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
12/03/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 28/06/1969 31/03/1972 |
31/03/1972 |
D7606
|
|
25256
|
|
|
19/03/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 D02 D01 D16 D02 D16 D08 WN TO BS CW W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Birmingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Willesden Toton Bescot Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
19/03/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 02/08/1969 07/11/1970 06/02/1971 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 08/07/1972 10/02/1973 06/10/1973 03/11/1973 09/03/1974 08/05/1976 01/04/1985 |
01/04/1985 |
D7607
|
|
25257
|
|
|
24/03/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 D02 D01 D16 D02 D16 D08 WN TO BS HA LO TO W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Birmingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Willesden Toton Bescot Haymarket Longsight Toton Withdrawn |
24/03/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 28/06/1969 12/12/1970 06/02/1971 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 08/07/1972 10/02/1973 06/10/1973 03/11/1973 09/03/1974 12/10/1974 09/11/1974 07/1977 02/12/1985 |
02/12/1985 |
D7608
|
|
25258
|
|
|
02/04/1966 |
41A 41E 64B D16 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Haymarket Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
02/04/1966 18/06/1966 10/12/1966 28/06/1969 21/12/1984 |
21/12/1984 |
D7609
|
|
25259
|
|
|
02/04/1966 |
41A 41E 8F D08 D02 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
02/04/1966 10/12/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 11/01/1969 03/09/1986 |
03/09/1986 |
D7610
|
|
25260
|
|
|
07/04/1966 |
41A 41E 8F D08 D02 D01 D02 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
07/04/1966 10/12/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 11/01/1969 06/02/1971 08/05/1971 12/12/1982 |
12/12/1982 |
D7611
|
|
25261
|
|
|
16/04/1966 |
65A ML D16 D02 W |
Eastfield (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
16/04/1966 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 04/01/1981 |
04/01/1981 |
D7612
|
25901
|
25262
|
|
|
23/04/1966 |
65A ML D16 D02 D16 D02 W |
Eastfield (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
23/04/1966 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 14/09/1968 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7613
|
|
25263
|
|
|
30/04/1966 |
65A D09 D02 D16 D02 W |
Eastfield (New) Manchester Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
30/04/1966 17/08/1968 14/09/1968 08/01/1972 11/11/1972 16/11/1980 |
16/11/1980 |
D7614
|
|
25264
|
|
|
07/06/1966 |
65A D09 D02 D16 D02 TO BS TO TO W |
Eastfield (New) Manchester Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Toton Bescot Toton Toton Withdrawn |
07/06/1966 27/07/1968 14/09/1968 08/01/1972 10/02/1973 08/09/1973 06/10/1973 11/05/1974 01/1977 14/12/1980 |
14/12/1980 |
D7615
|
|
25265
|
|
|
12/06/1966 |
65A D08 D10 D02 D16 D02 D16 D02 D16 CW WN CW W |
Eastfield (New) Liverpool Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Cricklewood East Willesden Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
12/06/1966 17/08/1968 14/09/1968 09/11/1968 12/12/1970 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 10/02/1973 10/03/1973 18/05/1974 06/07/1974 14/06/1975 18/03/1987 |
18/03/1987 |
D7616
|
|
25266
|
|
|
19/06/1966 |
65A 8J D08 60A D10 D16 D02 D16 LO SP LO SP CW W |
Eastfield (New) Allerton Liverpool Division Inverness Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
19/06/1966 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 29/06/1968 14/09/1968 09/11/1968 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 12/01/1974 10/08/1974 11/10/1975 10/01/1976 08/05/1976 18/09/1986 |
18/09/1986 |
D7617
|
|
25267
|
|
|
12/08/1966 |
65A D10 D16 D02 D16 W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
12/08/1966 17/08/1968 09/11/1968 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D7618
|
25902
|
25268
|
|
|
18/08/1966 |
65A D10 D16 D02 D16 SP W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
18/08/1966 03/08/1968 09/11/1968 07/11/1970 08/01/1972 09/1981 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7619
|
|
25269
|
|
|
20/08/1966 |
65A D10 D16 D02 D16 BS W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Bescot Withdrawn |
20/08/1966 27/07/1968 09/11/1968 07/11/1970 08/01/1972 07/1981 02/04/1986 |
02/04/1986 |
D7620
|
|
25270
|
|
|
26/08/1966 |
65A D10 D16 BS TO W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Bescot Toton Withdrawn |
26/08/1966 20/07/1968 09/11/1968 10/11/1973 08/06/1974 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7621
|
|
25271
|
|
|
29/08/1966 |
65A D10 D16 D02 D01 D02 W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
29/08/1966 20/07/1968 09/11/1968 07/11/1970 06/02/1971 10/07/1971 11/10/1981 |
11/10/1981 |
D7622
|
|
25272
|
|
|
02/09/1966 |
65A D10 D16 D02 W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
02/09/1966 20/07/1968 09/11/1968 07/11/1970 12/07/1981 |
12/07/1981 |
D7623
|
|
25273
|
|
|
08/09/1966 |
65A D10 D16 D02 W |
Eastfield (New) Preston Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
08/09/1966 20/07/1968 23/11/1968 07/11/1970 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D7624
|
|
25274
|
|
|
30/07/1965 |
41A 41C 55A 86B 84A BR LA BS W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Holbeck (MR) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Bescot Withdrawn |
30/07/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 07/11/1970 09/12/1972 06/10/1973 09/03/1974 23/08/1975 02/05/1982 |
02/05/1982 |
D7625
|
|
25275
|
|
|
30/07/1965 |
41A 41C 55A 86B 82A 86A 84A BR LA BS W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Holbeck (MR) Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Bescot Withdrawn |
30/07/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 07/11/1970 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 09/12/1972 06/10/1973 09/03/1974 23/08/1975 18/04/1982 |
18/04/1982 |
D7626
|
25903
|
25276
|
|
|
05/08/1965 |
41A 41C 55A D09 D02 D10 D01 D16 D01 D16 D10 SP BS W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Holbeck (MR) Manchester Division Birmingham Division Preston Division London Division Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Bescot Withdrawn |
05/08/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 20/07/1968 09/11/1968 09/05/1970 08/05/1971 09/10/1971 06/05/1972 19/08/1972 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 06/10/1973 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7627
|
|
25277
|
|
|
12/08/1965 |
41A 41C ML D16 D02 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
12/08/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 15/04/1984 |
15/04/1984 |
D7628
|
|
25278
|
|
|
12/08/1965 |
41A 41C ML D16 D02 LO SP CW W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
12/08/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 11/05/1974 07/12/1974 08/05/1976 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7629
|
|
25279
|
|
|
07/09/1965 |
41A 41C ML 9A D09 D10 D02 D01 D02 D08 CW TO W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Preston Division Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
07/09/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 25/01/1969 06/02/1971 04/11/1972 10/02/1973 08/05/1976 11/1978 18/03/1987 |
18/03/1987 |
D7630
|
|
25280
|
|
|
16/09/1965 |
41A 41C ML 41C ML 9A D09 D10 D02 CD BS TO W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Preston Division Birmingham Division Crewe Diesel Bescot Toton Withdrawn |
16/09/1965 23/04/1966 15/07/1967 22/07/1967 12/08/1967 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 23/11/1968 25/01/1969 11/10/1975 08/11/1975 07/08/1976 01/11/1981 |
01/11/1981 |
D7631
|
|
25281
|
|
|
29/09/1965 |
41A 41C ML 9A D09 D02 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Longsight Manchester Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
29/09/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 25/01/1969 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D7632
|
|
25282
|
|
|
08/10/1965 |
41A 41C ML D02 8F D08 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Line Power Controller, Derby Birmingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
08/10/1965 23/04/1966 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 15/06/1968 17/06/1968 10/03/1986 |
10/03/1986 |
D7633
|
25904
|
25283
|
|
|
30/10/1965 |
41A 41C 8F D08 D02 D01 D08 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division London Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
30/10/1965 23/04/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 19/08/1972 06/01/1973 10/02/1973 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7634
|
|
25284
|
|
|
19/10/1965 |
41A 41C 8F D08 TI SP W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Tinsley Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
19/10/1965 23/04/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 25/08/1973 20/10/1973 21/01/1985 |
21/01/1985 |
D7635
|
|
25285
|
|
|
05/11/1965 |
41A 41C 8F D08 D10 D08 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Preston Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
05/11/1965 23/04/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 17/01/1970 08/05/1971 17/03/1986 |
17/03/1986 |
D7636
|
25905
|
25286
|
|
|
15/11/1965 |
41A 41C 8F D08 D10 D08 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Preston Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
15/11/1965 23/04/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 17/01/1970 08/05/1971 01/09/1986 |
01/09/1986 |
D7637
|
|
25287
|
|
|
22/12/1965 |
41A 41C 8F D08
R W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division
Reinstated Withdrawn |
22/12/1965 23/04/1966 14/10/1967 17/06/1968 04/07/1976 25/09/1976 02/12/1985 |
02/12/1985 |
D7638
|
|
25288
|
|
|
30/01/1965 |
41A 41C 10A 10A WL 8F D08 W |
Tinsley (New) Wath Carnforth Carnforth Western Lines (LMR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
30/01/1965 23/04/1966 15/07/1967 22/07/1967 22/07/1967 18/05/1968 17/06/1968 19/02/1987 |
19/02/1987 |
D7639
|
|
25289
|
|
|
23/12/1965 |
41A 41C D01 D16 8F D08 D01 D16 D10 SP HA SP BS W |
Tinsley (New) Wath London Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division London Division Nottingham Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Bescot Withdrawn |
23/12/1965 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 08/04/1967 22/07/1967 17/06/1968 18/03/1972 19/08/1972 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 12/10/1974 09/11/1974 07/1977 17/01/1984 |
17/01/1984 |
D7640
|
|
25290
|
|
|
31/12/1965 |
41A 41C D01 D16 8F D08 D02 SP LO CD BS W |
Tinsley (New) Wath London Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe Diesel Bescot Withdrawn |
31/12/1965 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 08/04/1967 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 11/05/1974 06/07/1974 11/10/1975 06/1977 04/10/1981 |
01/10/1981 |
D7641
|
|
25291
|
|
|
14/01/1966 |
41A 41C D01 D16 8F D08 D02 SP LO CD W |
Tinsley (New) Wath London Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
14/01/1966 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 08/04/1967 16/09/1967 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 11/05/1974 06/07/1974 11/10/1975 03/05/1981 |
03/05/1981 |
D7642
|
|
25292
|
|
|
28/01/1966 |
41A 41C D01 D16 8F 8F D08 D02 SP LO CD W |
Tinsley (New) Wath London Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
28/01/1966 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 08/04/1967 09/09/1967 16/09/1967 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 11/05/1974 06/07/1974 11/10/1975 18/10/1981 |
18/10/1981 |
D7643
|
|
25293
|
|
|
08/02/1966 |
41A 41C D01 D16 8F D08 D01 D02 D08 D02 LO CD W |
Tinsley (New) Wath London Division Nottingham Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Liverpool Division London Division Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
08/02/1966 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 08/04/1967 09/09/1967 17/06/1968 09/08/1969 11/10/1969 07/01/1970 09/05/1970 06/07/1974 11/10/1975 01/02/1981 |
01/02/1981 |
D7644
|
|
25294
|
|
|
23/03/1966 |
41A 41C D01 D02 LO CD W |
Tinsley (New) Wath London Division Birmingham Division Longsight Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
23/03/1966 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 09/05/1970 06/07/1974 11/10/1975 10/10/1982 |
10/10/1982 |
D7645
|
|
25295
|
|
|
15/03/1966 |
41A 41E D01 D02 D09 D01 CW W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) London Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
15/03/1966 10/12/1966 01/04/1967 27/06/1970 06/02/1971 10/03/1973 12/01/1974 10/06/1978 |
10/06/1978 |
D7646
|
25906
|
25296
|
|
|
25/03/1966 |
41A 41E D01 D08 D02 D09 D10 SP W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) London Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
25/03/1966 10/12/1966 01/04/1967 11/10/1969 27/06/1970 06/02/1971 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 01/10/1986 |
01/10/1986 |
D7647
|
25907
|
25297
|
|
|
30/03/1966 |
41A 41E D16 D02 9A D09 D16 LO SP W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
30/03/1966 10/12/1966 07/01/1967 22/04/1967 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 12/01/1974 11/05/1974 01/09/1986 |
01/09/1986 |
D7648
|
|
25298
|
|
|
07/04/1966 |
41A 41E D16 D02 9A D09 D16 D08 W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
07/04/1966 10/12/1966 07/01/1967 22/04/1967 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 11/10/1969 07/11/1970 19/03/1985 |
19/03/1985 |
D7649
|
|
25299
|
|
|
15/04/1966 |
41A 41E D16 D02 9A D09 D16 CD LO BS
|
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Crewe Diesel Longsight Bescot
|
15/04/1966 10/12/1966 07/01/1967 22/04/1967 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 11/10/1975 04/1977 06/1977 04/10/1981 |
05/10/1981 |
D7650
|
|
25300
|
|
|
07/05/1966 |
D16 D01 D16 D02 9A D09 D16 D08 D01 D08 D01 D08 W |
Nottingham Division (New) London Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division London Division Liverpool Division London Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
07/05/1966 07/05/1966 03/12/1966 22/04/1967 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 09/05/1970 03/04/1971 04/11/1972 06/01/1973 10/02/1973 02/12/1985 |
02/12/1985 |
D7651
|
|
25301
|
|
|
09/05/1966 |
D16 D02 9A D09 D16 D10 SP ED TO CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Eastfield Toton Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
09/05/1966 22/04/1967 09/03/1968 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 11/12/1976 26/02/1978 07/1981 11/12/1983 |
11/12/1983 |
D7652
|
|
25302
|
|
|
21/05/1966 |
D16 D02 D05 D16 D08 TI BS WN TO CD SP CW TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Tinsley Bescot Willesden Toton Crewe Diesel Springs Branch (Wigan) Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
21/05/1966 22/04/1967 11/05/1968 09/11/1968 07/11/1970 28/09/1974 11/01/1975 10/05/1975 14/06/1975 11/10/1975 08/11/1975 03/1977 10/1977 14/06/1985 |
14/06/1985 |
D7653
|
|
25303
|
|
|
24/06/1966 |
ML D02 9A D09 D16 D08 LO TO W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) Birmingham Division Longsight Manchester Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Longsight Toton Withdrawn |
24/06/1966 05/07/1967 01/06/1968 17/06/1968 10/05/1969 07/11/1970 06/10/1973 10/01/1976 19/02/1986 |
19/02/1986 |
D7654
|
|
25304
|
|
|
24/06/1966 |
ML D02 D05 D16 D08 D09 CD W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) Birmingham Division Stoke Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
24/06/1966 05/07/1967 15/06/1968 09/11/1968 07/11/1970 06/02/1971 11/10/1975 28/11/1982 |
28/11/1982 |
D7655
|
|
25305
|
|
|
01/07/1966 |
ML D02 ML D16 D01 D02 W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) Birmingham Division Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Withdrawn |
01/07/1966 01/04/1967 08/04/1967 17/06/1968 13/02/1971 10/07/1971 01/07/1983 |
01/07/1983 |
D7656
|
|
25306
|
|
|
05/07/1966 |
ML D01 D16 D08 84A 82A 86A 84A CD W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) London Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
05/07/1966 11/03/1967 07/12/1968 07/11/1970 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 09/12/1972 09/08/1975 25/02/1985 |
25/02/1985 |
D7657
|
25908
|
25307
|
|
|
04/07/1966 |
ML D01 D16 82B 84A 82A 86A 84A CD W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) London Division Nottingham Division St Philips Marsh Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
04/07/1966 11/03/1967 07/12/1968 11/09/1971 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 09/12/1972 09/08/1975 01/11/1986 |
01/11/1986 |
D7658
|
|
25308
|
|
|
19/07/1966 |
ML D01 D16 D02 D01 D16 LO WN HA SP CW TO W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) London Division Nottingham Division Birmingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Longsight Willesden Haymarket Springs Branch (Wigan) Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
19/07/1966 11/03/1967 07/12/1968 12/12/1970 06/02/1971 10/03/1973 07/07/1973 11/08/1973 12/10/1974 09/11/1974 08/05/1976 20/11/1977 16/10/1983 |
16/10/1983 |
D7659
|
25909
|
25309
|
|
|
21/07/1966 |
ML D01 D16 D08 D09 D02 D09 D10 SP LO WN CW TO W |
Line Power Controller, Derby (New) London Division Nottingham Division Liverpool Division Manchester Division Birmingham Division Manchester Division Preston Division Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Willesden Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
21/07/1966 11/03/1967 07/12/1968 09/05/1970 06/02/1971 06/05/1972 08/07/1972 07/10/1972 12/05/1973 07/07/1973 11/08/1973 14/06/1975 20/11/1977 01/09/1986 |
01/09/1986 |
D7660
|
|
25310
|
|
97250
|
31/12/1966 |
D01 CW TO CW TO
R W |
London Division (New) Cricklewood East Toton Cricklewood East Toton
Reinstated Withdrawn |
31/12/1966 14/06/1975 20/11/1977 04/1979 31/10/1979 10/10/1982 06/1983 12/10/1987 |
12/10/1987 |
D7661
|
|
25311
|
|
|
08/11/1966 |
D01 CW TO TO W |
London Division (New) Cricklewood East Toton Toton Withdrawn |
08/11/1966 14/06/1975 20/11/1977 31/10/1979 19/03/1986 |
19/03/1986 |
D7662
|
|
25312
|
|
|
17/11/1966 |
D01 D02 D01 WN CW WN CW TO TO W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division London Division Willesden Cricklewood East Willesden Cricklewood East Toton Toton Withdrawn |
17/11/1966 07/12/1968 09/05/1970 09/06/1973 06/04/1974 11/05/1974 14/06/1975 20/11/1977 31/10/1979 13/06/1982 |
13/06/1982 |
D7663
|
|
25313
|
|
|
23/11/1966 |
D01 D02 D01 TO SP W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division London Division Toton Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
23/11/1966 07/12/1968 08/05/1971 20/11/1977 02/1978 18/03/1987 |
18/03/1987 |
D7664
|
|
25314
|
|
|
23/11/1966 |
D01 D02 D01 W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division London Division Withdrawn |
23/11/1966 07/12/1968 08/05/1971 01/03/1983 |
01/03/1983 |
D7665
|
25910
|
25315
|
|
|
07/12/1966 |
D01 D02 D01 WN CW WN CW TO W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division London Division Willesden Cricklewood East Willesden Cricklewood East Toton Withdrawn |
07/12/1966 07/12/1968 10/07/1971 12/01/1974 06/04/1974 11/05/1974 14/06/1975 11/1981 01/03/1987 |
01/03/1987 |
D7666
|
25911
|
25316
|
|
|
16/12/1966 |
D01 D02 D01 R W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division London Division Reinstated Withdrawn |
16/12/1966 06/02/1971 10/07/1971 04/1984 01/09/1986 |
01/09/1986 |
D7667
|
|
25317
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
D01 D02 D08 W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
28/01/1967 06/02/1971 10/02/1973 24/04/1983 |
24/04/1983 |
D7668
|
|
25318
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
D01 D02 D08 W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
28/01/1967 06/02/1971 08/07/1972 01/07/1982 |
01/07/1982 |
D7669
|
|
25319
|
|
|
25/03/1967 |
D01 D02 D08 W |
London Division (New) Birmingham Division Liverpool Division Withdrawn |
25/03/1967 06/02/1971 08/07/1972 20/03/1983 |
20/03/1983 |
D7670
|
|
25320
|
|
|
28/01/1967 |
D01 D16 D02 KM TO W |
London Division (New) Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Toton Withdrawn |
28/01/1967 04/03/1967 22/04/1967 12/05/1973 07/1977 11/12/1983 |
11/12/1983 |
D7671
|
|
25321
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
D01 D16 12B 12A D10 D08 D02 KM TO CW W |
London Division (New) Nottingham Division Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Toton Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 04/03/1967 22/07/1967 17/02/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 08/07/1972 12/05/1973 07/1977 11/1981 29/09/1986 |
29/09/1986 |
D7672
|
25912
|
25322
|
|
|
25/02/1967 |
D16 12B 12A D10 D08 D02 KM CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Birmingham Division Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 15/07/1967 17/02/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 08/07/1972 12/05/1973 28/02/1976 01/09/1991 |
01/09/1991 |
D7673
|
|
25323
|
|
|
25/03/1967 |
D16 12B 12A D10 D08 CD SP W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Preston Division Liverpool Division Crewe Diesel Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
25/03/1967 22/07/1967 17/02/1968 17/06/1968 09/05/1970 10/01/1976 07/1981 19/03/1987 |
19/03/1987 |
D7674
|
|
25324
|
|
|
25/03/1967 |
D16 12B 12A 9A D09 D08 D01 CW W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division London Division Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
25/03/1967 22/07/1967 17/02/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 06/02/1971 08/04/1972 14/06/1975 23/12/1985 |
23/12/1985 |
D7675
|
|
25325
|
|
|
22/04/1967 |
D16 12B 12A 9A D09 D08 84A 86A 84A CW BS W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Cricklewood East Bescot Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 15/07/1967 17/02/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 09/10/1971 13/05/1972 09/12/1972 11/05/1974 12/10/1974 23/12/1985 |
23/12/1985 |
D7676
|
|
25326
|
|
|
22/04/1967 |
D16 12B 12A 9A D09 D08 84A 82A 86A 84A CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 15/07/1967 17/02/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 09/12/1972 09/08/1975 23/01/1985 |
23/01/1985 |
D7677
|
|
25327
|
|
|
29/04/1967 |
D16 12B 12A 9A D09 D08 86B 84A 82A 86A 84A CD W |
Nottingham Division (New) Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Longsight Manchester Division Liverpool Division Ebbw Junction (Newport) Laira Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Laira Crewe Diesel Withdrawn |
29/04/1967 22/07/1967 17/02/1968 11/05/1968 17/06/1968 07/11/1970 24/07/1971 09/10/1971 08/01/1972 13/05/1972 09/12/1972 09/08/1975 02/02/1984 |
02/02/1984 |