Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 479 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 479 Week
» 18531 Month
» 251451 Year
» 1916827 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

24 Bo-Bo


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date Notes
D5041 BR Pre TOPS 24041 BR Tops TOPS   09/1973  
D5065 BR Pre TOPS 24065 BR Tops TOPS   10/1973  
D5082 BR Pre TOPS 24082 BR Tops TOPS   10/1973  
D5095 BR Pre TOPS 24095 BR Tops TOPS   10/1973  
D5100 BR Pre TOPS 24100 BR Tops TOPS   10/1973  
D5110 BR Pre TOPS 24110 BR Tops TOPS   10/1973  
D5000 BR Pre TOPS 24005 BR Tops TOPS   11/1973  
D5046 BR Pre TOPS 24046 BR Tops TOPS on 05/11/1973  
D5053 BR Pre TOPS 24053 BR Tops TOPS on 09/11/1973  
D5108 BR Pre TOPS 24108 BR Tops TOPS on 16/11/1973  
D5102 BR Pre TOPS 24102 BR Tops TOPS on 23/11/1973  
D5073 BR Pre TOPS 24073 BR Tops TOPS   12/1973  
D5011 BR Pre TOPS 24011 BR Tops TOPS 3w/e 01/12/1973  
D5013 BR Pre TOPS 24013 BR Tops TOPS 3w/e 01/12/1973  
D5069 BR Pre TOPS 24069 BR Tops TOPS 5w/e 05/01/1974  
D5070 BR Pre TOPS 24070 BR Tops TOPS 5w/e 05/01/1974  
D5097 BR Pre TOPS 24097 BR Tops TOPS w/e 05/01/1974  
D5042 BR Pre TOPS 24042 BR Tops TOPS on 21/01/1974  
D5107 BR Pre TOPS 24107 BR Tops TOPS w/e 26/01/1974  
D5037 BR Pre TOPS 24037 BR Tops TOPS on 31/01/1974  
D5052 BR Pre TOPS 24052 BR Tops TOPS on 31/01/1974  
D5004 BR Pre TOPS 24004 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5024 BR Pre TOPS 24024 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5031 BR Pre TOPS 24031 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5038 BR Pre TOPS 24038 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5047 BR Pre TOPS 24047 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5048 BR Pre TOPS 24048 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5049 BR Pre TOPS 24049 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5054 BR Pre TOPS 24054 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5055 BR Pre TOPS 24055 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5056 BR Pre TOPS 24056 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5058 BR Pre TOPS 24058 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5059 BR Pre TOPS 24059 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5062 BR Pre TOPS 24062 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5064 BR Pre TOPS 24064 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5075 BR Pre TOPS 24075 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5081 BR Pre TOPS 24081 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5086 BR Pre TOPS 24086 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5087 BR Pre TOPS 24087 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5098 BR Pre TOPS 24098 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5103 BR Pre TOPS 24103 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5105 BR Pre TOPS 24105 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5106 BR Pre TOPS 24106 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5109 BR Pre TOPS 24109 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5133 BR Pre TOPS 24133 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5134 BR Pre TOPS 24134 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5140 BR Pre TOPS 24140 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5141 BR Pre TOPS 24141 BR Tops TOPS   02/1974  
D5111 BR Pre TOPS 24111 BR Tops TOPS w/e 02/02/1974  
D5032 BR Pre TOPS 24032 BR Tops TOPS   03/1974  
D5033 BR Pre TOPS 24033 BR Tops TOPS   03/1974  
D5034 BR Pre TOPS 24034 BR Tops TOPS   03/1974  
D5084 BR Pre TOPS 24084 BR Tops TOPS   03/1974  
D5001 BR Pre TOPS 24001 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5002 BR Pre TOPS 24002 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5003 BR Pre TOPS 24003 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5006 BR Pre TOPS 24006 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5007 BR Pre TOPS 24007 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5009 BR Pre TOPS 24009 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5010 BR Pre TOPS 24010 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5015 BR Pre TOPS 24015 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5016 BR Pre TOPS 24016 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5017 BR Pre TOPS 24017 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5018 BR Pre TOPS 24018 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5020 BR Pre TOPS 24020 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5022 BR Pre TOPS 24022 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5035 BR Pre TOPS 24035 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5071 BR Pre TOPS 24071 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5072 BR Pre TOPS 24072 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5076 BR Pre TOPS 24076 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5077 BR Pre TOPS 24077 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5080 BR Pre TOPS 24080 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5090 BR Pre TOPS 24090 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5091 BR Pre TOPS 24091 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5092 BR Pre TOPS 24092 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5094 BR Pre TOPS 24094 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5096 BR Pre TOPS 24096 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5116 BR Pre TOPS 24116 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5123 BR Pre TOPS 24123 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5124 BR Pre TOPS 24124 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5125 BR Pre TOPS 24125 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5129 BR Pre TOPS 24129 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5130 BR Pre TOPS 24130 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5135 BR Pre TOPS 24135 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5136 BR Pre TOPS 24136 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5137 BR Pre TOPS 24137 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5142 BR Pre TOPS 24142 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5147 BR Pre TOPS 24147 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5148 BR Pre TOPS 24148 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5150 BR Pre TOPS 24150 BR Tops TOPS   04/1974  
D5012 BR Pre TOPS 24012 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5014 BR Pre TOPS 24014 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5019 BR Pre TOPS 24019 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5021 BR Pre TOPS 24021 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5023 BR Pre TOPS 24023 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5025 BR Pre TOPS 24025 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5026 BR Pre TOPS 24026 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5027 BR Pre TOPS 24027 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5029 BR Pre TOPS 24029 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5036 BR Pre TOPS 24036 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5040 BR Pre TOPS 24040 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5044 BR Pre TOPS 24044 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5045 BR Pre TOPS 24045 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5050 BR Pre TOPS 24050 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5057 BR Pre TOPS 24057 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5060 BR Pre TOPS 24060 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5061 BR Pre TOPS 24061 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5063 BR Pre TOPS 24063 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5066 BR Pre TOPS 24066 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5074 BR Pre TOPS 24074 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5078 BR Pre TOPS 24078 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5083 BR Pre TOPS 24083 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5085 BR Pre TOPS 24085 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5089 BR Pre TOPS 24089 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5099 BR Pre TOPS 24099 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5101 BR Pre TOPS 24101 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5104 BR Pre TOPS 24104 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5119 BR Pre TOPS 24119 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5121 BR Pre TOPS 24121 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5128 BR Pre TOPS 24128 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5143 BR Pre TOPS 24143 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5144 BR Pre TOPS 24144 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5145 BR Pre TOPS 24145 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5146 BR Pre TOPS 24146 BR Tops TOPS   05/1974  
D5030 BR Pre TOPS 24030 BR Tops TOPS   06/1974  
D5039 BR Pre TOPS 24039 BR Tops TOPS   06/1974  
D5079 BR Pre TOPS 24079 BR Tops TOPS   06/1974  
D5008 BR Pre TOPS 24008 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5112 BR Pre TOPS 24112 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5113 BR Pre TOPS 24113 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5115 BR Pre TOPS 24115 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5117 BR Pre TOPS 24117 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5118 BR Pre TOPS 24118 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5120 BR Pre TOPS 24120 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5126 BR Pre TOPS 24126 BR Tops TOPS   07/1974  
D5127 BR Pre TOPS 24127 BR Tops TOPS   10/1974  
D5132 BR Pre TOPS 24132 BR Tops TOPS   10/1974  
24061 BR TOPS TDB968007 BR Dept Departmental   07/1976  
24054 BR TOPS TDB968008 BR Dept Departmental   08/1976  
24142 BR TOPS TDB968009 BR Dept Departmental   08/1976  
TDB968007 BR Departmental 97201 BR Dept 97 Departmental   18/08/1979