Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 562 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 562 Week
» 18614 Month
» 251534 Year
» 1916910 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

24 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) BR (Dept) BR (Dept 97) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5050 24050 27/11/1959 CW March 04/10/1975 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 17.02
D5051 05/12/1959 CW March 02/12/1967 8 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1968 8.79
D5052 24052 04/12/1959 CW March 04/12/1976 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1978 18.42
D5053 24053 03/12/1959 CW March 31/01/1976 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1976 16.42
D5054 24054 TDB968008 18/12/1959 CW March 01/07/1976 16.58 Prs Preserved 61.33
D5055 24055 18/12/1959 CW March 04/10/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 16.97
D5056 24056 11/12/1959 CW March 04/10/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1976 16.90
D5057 24057 22/12/1959 CW March 15/01/1978 18.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1978 18.37
D5058 24058 01/01/1960 CW March 04/10/1975 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1976 16.76
D5059 24059 29/12/1959 CW March 04/10/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1977 17.18
D5060 24060 02/01/1960 CW March 04/10/1975 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1977 17.01
D5061 24061 TDB968007 97201 15/01/1960 CW March 01/08/1975 15.58 Prs Preserved 61.26
D5062 24062 18/01/1960 CW March 04/10/1974 14.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1976 16.72
D5063 24063 26/01/1960 CW March 09/04/1979 19.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1979 19.44
D5064 24064 27/01/1960 CW March 31/01/1976 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 16.86
D5065 24065 02/02/1960 CW March 31/12/1976 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1977 17.34
D5066 24066 19/12/1959 DE March 02/02/1976 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1978 18.63
D5067 24/12/1959 DE March 09/10/1972 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1973 13.78
D5068 31/12/1959 DE March 09/10/1972 12.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/04/1973 13.26
D5069 24069 01/01/1960 DE March 01/12/1976 16.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1977 17.68
D5070 24070 23/01/1960 DE March 02/02/1976 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1976 16.37
D5071 24071 06/02/1960 DE March 16/08/1975 15.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1977 16.92
D5072 24072 17/02/1960 DE March 05/10/1975 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1977 17.80
D5073 24073 04/03/1960 DE March 02/02/1976 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1978 18.76
D5074 24074 14/03/1960 DE March 04/10/1975 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/05/1976 16.14
D5075 24075 26/03/1960 DE March 31/01/1976 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1976 16.28
D5076 24076 10/02/1960 CW March 04/10/1975 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1977 16.90
D5077 24077 17/02/1960 CW March 17/07/1976 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1978 18.30
D5078 24078 18/02/1960 CW March 24/04/1976 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1978 18.30
D5079 24079 25/02/1960 CW March 17/07/1976 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1978 18.53
D5080 24080 01/03/1960 CW March 22/09/1976 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1978 18.26
D5081 24081 19/03/1960 CW March 05/10/1980 20.58 Prs Preserved 20.51
D5082 24082 29/03/1960 CW March 01/03/1979 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1979 19.02
D5083 24083 08/04/1960 CW March 27/03/1976 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1977 17.07
D5084 24084 25/04/1960 CW March 17/07/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1978 18.61
D5085 24085 20/08/1960 CW Willesden 17/07/1976 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1978 18.13
D5086 24086 21/05/1960 CW Willesden 04/01/1976 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1977 16.63
D5087 24087 09/06/1960 CW Willesden 01/02/1978 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1978 18.16
D5088 13/06/1960 CW Cricklewood East 27/06/1970 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/01/1972 11.56
D5089 24089 20/06/1960 CW Cricklewood East 04/01/1976 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1977 17.04
D5090 24090 18/06/1960 CW Cricklewood East 02/02/1976 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1978 17.55
D5091 24091 25/06/1960 CW Cricklewood East 20/11/1977 17.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1978 17.95
D5092 24092 15/07/1960 CW Cricklewood East 04/10/1975 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 16.39
D5093 28/07/1960 CW Cricklewood East 14/08/1969 9.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1970 9.97
D5094 24094 18/02/1960 DA March 29/09/1976 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1977 17.55
D5095 24095 23/03/1960 DA March 16/08/1975 15.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1976 16.20
D5096 24096 09/04/1960 DA Gateshead 16/08/1975 15.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1976 16.32
D5097 24097 05/05/1960 DA Gateshead 02/02/1976 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1977 16.76
D5098 24098 26/05/1960 DA Heaton 16/08/1975 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1976 15.94
D5099 24099 03/06/1960 DA Heaton 02/02/1976 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1977 17.17
D5100 24100 25/06/1960 DA Gateshead 02/02/1976 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1976 15.78
D5101 24101 09/07/1960 DA Gateshead 02/02/1976 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1976 15.65
D5102 24102 16/07/1960 DA Gateshead 02/02/1976 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1978 17.72
D5103 24103 06/08/1960 DA Gateshead 01/12/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1977 16.91
D5104 24104 27/08/1960 DA Gateshead 31/12/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1977 17.02
D5105 24105 10/09/1960 DA Gateshead 05/10/1975 15.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1978 17.48
D5106 24106 24/09/1960 DA Gateshead 31/12/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1977 17.03
D5107 24107 08/10/1960 DA Gateshead 01/12/1976 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1977 16.66
D5108 24108 22/10/1960 DA Gateshead 18/07/1976 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1978 17.29
D5109 24109 05/11/1960 DA Gateshead 02/02/1976 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1978 17.33
D5110 24110 16/11/1960 DA Gateshead 01/12/1976 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1977 16.38
D5111 24111 26/11/1960 DA Gateshead 02/02/1976 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1978 17.19
D5112 24112 30/12/1960 DA Gateshead 31/12/1976 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1977 16.76
D5113 24113 28/01/1961 DA Gateshead 31/12/1976 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1977 16.68
D5114 23/04/1960 DE Inverness 09/10/1972 12.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1973 13.45
D5115 24115 30/04/1960 DE Inverness 31/12/1976 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1977 17.10
D5116 24116 07/05/1960 DE Inverness 15/09/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1977 17.16
D5117 24117 14/05/1960 DE Inverness 02/02/1976 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1977 16.65
D5118 24118 21/05/1960 DE Inverness 31/12/1976 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1977 17.04
D5119 24119 28/05/1960 DE Inverness 18/07/1976 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1977 16.94
D5120 24120 04/06/1960 DE Inverness 31/12/1976 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1977 17.17
D5121 24121 11/06/1960 DE Inverness 31/12/1976 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1978 17.90
D5122 18/06/1960 DE Inverness 02/10/1968 8.33 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/03/1971 10.71
D5123 24123 25/06/1960 DE Inverness 18/07/1976 16.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1977 17.03
D5124 24124 02/07/1960 DE Inverness 01/12/1976 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1977 16.84
D5125 24125 14/07/1960 DE Inverness 27/03/1976 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1977 16.98
D5126 24126 23/07/1960 DE Inverness 02/02/1976 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1977 16.95
D5127 24127 30/07/1960 DE Inverness 02/02/1976 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 16.60
D5128 24128 13/08/1960 DE Inverness 18/07/1976 15.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1977 17.15
D5129 24129 27/08/1960 DE Inverness 31/12/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1977 16.61
D5130 24130 03/09/1960 DE Inverness 01/12/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1977 16.92
D5131 17/09/1960 DE Inverness 11/09/1971 11 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/11/1971 11.13
D5132 24132 23/09/1960 DE Inverness 02/02/1976 15.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1976 15.45
D5133 24133 24/09/1960 DE Longsight 12/03/1978 17.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1978 17.95
D5134 24134 06/10/1960 DE Longsight 04/12/1976 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1978 17.92
D5135 24135 08/10/1960 DE Longsight 04/01/1976 15.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1977 16.74
D5136 24136 22/10/1960 DE Longsight 04/10/1975 15 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1977 16.21
D5137 24137 18/10/1960 DE Longsight 17/07/1976 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1978 17.96
D5138 27/10/1960 DE Longsight 10/08/1969 8.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1970 9.64
D5139 29/10/1960 DE Longsight 10/08/1969 8.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1970 9.63
D5140 24140 05/11/1960 DE Longsight 31/01/1976 15.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1976 15.83
D5141 24141 12/11/1960 DE Longsight 17/07/1976 15.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1978 17.56
D5142 24142 TDB968009 19/11/1960 DE Longsight 01/07/1976 15.67 Cut Coopers Metals (Sheffield) 01/09/1984 23.80
D5143 24143 26/11/1960 DE Willesden 31/01/1976 15.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1976 15.44
D5144 24144 03/12/1960 DE Willesden 31/01/1976 15.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1976 15.76
D5145 24145 07/12/1960 DE Willesden 31/01/1976 15.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1976 15.49
D5146 24146 10/12/1960 DE Willesden 31/01/1976 15.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1976 15.82
D5147 24147 17/12/1960 DE Gateshead 18/07/1976 15.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1977 16.88
D5148 24148 23/12/1960 DE Gateshead 05/10/1975 14.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1977 16.95
D5149 07/02/1961 DE Gateshead 09/10/1972 11.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/04/1973 12.15
D5150 24150 27/02/1961 DE Gateshead 01/12/1976 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1977 16.44