Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 553 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 553 Week
» 18605 Month
» 251525 Year
» 1916901 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

24 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) BR (Dept) BR (Dept 97) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D5000 24005 05/09/1958 DE Crewe South 31/01/1976 Longsight 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1977 18.66
D5001 24001 29/10/1958 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/11/1977 19.10
D5002 24002 03/12/1958 DE Derby 05/10/1975 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/07/1977 18.67
D5003 24003 12/12/1958 DE Derby 16/08/1975 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/07/1976 17.65
D5004 24004 22/12/1958 DE Derby 05/10/1975 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 30/04/1977 18.37
D5005 03/01/1959 DE Derby 25/01/1969 10 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 12/1969 10.96
D5006 24006 03/01/1959 DE Derby 16/08/1975 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/12/1980 22.01
D5007 24007 07/02/1959 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/01/1978 18.99
D5008 24008 28/02/1959 DE Derby 16/08/1975 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/05/1976 17.27
D5009 24009 14/03/1959 DE Derby 18/07/1976 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/11/1977 18.73
D5010 24010 21/03/1959 DE Derby 05/10/1975 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1977 17.96
D5011 24011 28/03/1959 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 16.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 30/04/1977 18.10
D5012 24012 11/04/1959 DE Crewe South 16/08/1975 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/02/1976 16.90
D5013 24013 18/04/1959 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1978 18.88
D5014 24014 09/05/1959 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 16.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1978 18.91
D5015 24015 30/05/1959 DE Crewe South 16/08/1975 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1977 17.61
D5016 24016 30/05/1959 DE Crewe South 16/08/1975 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 17.77
D5017 24017 06/06/1959 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1977 17.75
D5018 24018 27/06/1959 DE Crewe South 16/08/1975 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1976 16.94
D5019 24019 11/07/1959 DE Crewe South 05/10/1975 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1978 18.82
D5020 24020 20/08/1959 DE Ipswich 10/08/1975 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1977 17.63
D5021 24021 20/08/1959 DE Ipswich 10/08/1975 16 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1977 17.63
D5022 24022 07/09/1959 DE Ipswich 31/01/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1978 18.91
D5023 24023 25/09/1959 DE Ipswich 03/09/1978 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1978 19.12
D5024 24024 02/10/1959 DE Ipswich 10/08/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1977 17.51
D5025 24025 16/10/1959 DE Ipswich 31/01/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1977 17.72
D5026 24026 22/10/1959 DE Ipswich 10/08/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1977 17.21
D5027 24027 31/10/1959 DE Ipswich 17/07/1976 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1977 17.51
D5028 13/11/1959 DE Ipswich 04/06/1972 12.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 01/09/1972 12.81
D5029 24029 28/11/1959 DE Ipswich 10/08/1975 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1977 17.27
D5030 24030 06/06/1959 CW March 17/07/1976 17.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1977 17.92
D5031 24031 25/06/1959 CW March 04/10/1975 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 17.45
D5032 24032 29/07/1959 CW March 17/07/1976 17 Prs Preserved 61.57
D5033 24033 05/08/1959 CW March 04/10/1975 16.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1977 17.58
D5034 24034 03/09/1959 CW March 31/01/1976 16.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1977 17.67
D5035 24035 31/08/1959 CW March 15/10/1978 19.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1979 19.35
D5036 24036 03/09/1959 CW March 20/11/1977 18.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1978 18.76
D5037 24037 07/09/1959 CW March 17/07/1976 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1977 17.75
D5038 24038 15/09/1959 CW Ipswich 17/07/1976 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1977 17.72
D5039 24039 24/10/1959 CW Ipswich 17/07/1976 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1978 18.70
D5040 24040 12/10/1959 CW Ipswich 04/01/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1977 17.32
D5041 24041 28/09/1959 CW Ipswich 17/07/1976 16.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1978 18.69
D5042 24042 12/10/1959 CW Ipswich 10/08/1975 15.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1976 16.32
D5043 16/10/1959 CW Ipswich 10/08/1969 9.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1970 10.67
D5044 24044 23/10/1959 CW Ipswich 31/01/1976 16.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1977 17.21
D5045 24045 12/11/1959 CW March 10/08/1975 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1976 17.07
D5046 24046 29/10/1959 CW March 17/07/1976 16.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1977 17.68
D5047 24047 21/11/1959 CW March 16/11/1978 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1979 19.21
D5048 24048 05/11/1959 CW March 10/08/1975 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1976 16.33
D5049 24049 04/04/1960 CW March 31/01/1976 15.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1976 16.59