24 Bo-Bo
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tue 09/06/1959 | D5015, D5016, D5016 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/6) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/6) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/6) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Tue 09/06/1959 | D5015, D5016, D5016 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/6) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/6) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/6) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Wed 10/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Wed 10/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Thu 11/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Thu 11/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Fri 12/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Fri 12/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Sat 13/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) 08:05 Birmingham - Newcastle between Derby and York (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Sat 13/06/1959 | D5015, D5017, D5017 |
5B, 17A, MRM1 |
12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) 12:48 Newcastle - Bristol between York and Derby (D5015/7) |
Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Wed 17/06/1959 | D5030 | 31B | 08:40 Crewe - Shrewsbury | Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Wed 17/06/1959 | D5030 | 31B | 12:15 Shrewsbury - Crewe | Trains Illustrated 8/59 | ||
Sat 20/06/1959 | D5007, D5010 |
5B, 73C |
D5007/10 worked the 3:42 SO relief from Victoria - Folkestone Harbour D5007/10 worked the 3:42 SO relief from Victoria - Folkestone Harbour |
The Early Years of London Diesels | ||
Sat 22/08/1959 | D5003, D5003, D5009 |
17A, MRM1, 73C |
D5003/9 worked the 12:13 Ramsgate - Derby Friargate holiday train as far as Kensington Olympia. Black five 45260 completed the journey D5003/9 worked the 12:13 Ramsgate - Derby Friargate holiday train as far as Kensington Olympia. Black five 45260 completed the journey D5003/9 worked the 12:13 Ramsgate - Derby Friargate holiday train as far as Kensington Olympia. Black five 45260 completed the journey - All over green |
The Early Years of London Diesels | ||
Sat 11/02/1961 | D5107, D5108, D5148, D5149 |
52A, 52A, 52A, 52A |
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Crossing. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Crossing. |
|||
Sat 18/02/1961 | D5012, D5014 |
73C, 5B |
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sat 25/02/1961 | D5018, D5023, D5026, D5035, D5073, D5075, D5076, D5080, D5081, D5081, D5082, D5086, D5086, D5142, D5142, D5145, D5146 |
1B, 32B, 1B, 30A, 1A, 1A, 1A, 1A, 1C, W2W, 1A, 14A, MRM15, 9A, W16, 1A, 1A |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop. |
|||
Sat 25/02/1961 | D5012, D5014 |
73C, 5B |
Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sat 11/11/1961 | D5096, D5101, D5102, D5149 |
52A, 52A, 52A, 52A |
Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Crossing. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Crossing. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | D5140, D5140 |
9A, W16 |
Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 26/11/1961 | D5003, D5006, D5011 |
5B, 5B, 73C |
Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 02/12/1961 | D5050 | 34G | Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Weigh house. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 15/12/1961 | D5016, D5019, D5091, D5091 |
1B, 1B, 14A, MRM15 |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Fri 16/03/1962 | D5018, D5022, D5023, D5023, D5026, D5035, D5035, D5073, D5075, D5076, D5080, D5081, D5081, D5082, D5086, D5086, D5089, D5089, D5092, D5092, D5133, D5145 |
1B, 1B, 1C, W2W, 1B, 1C, W2W, 1A, 1A, 1A, 1A, 1C, W2W, 1A, 14A, MRM15, 14A, MRM15, 14A, MRM15, 1A, 1A |
Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Works sidings. Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Derby shed. |
|||
Sun 25/03/1962 | D5108 | 52A | Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed. | SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 06/04/1962 | D5020, D5022, D5028, D5029, D5030, D5076, D5086, D5086, D5088, D5088, D5089, D5089, D5091, D5091, D5092, D5092, D5133, D5136, D5136, D5137, D5137 |
1A, 1B, 1A, 1A, 1A, 1A, 14A, MRM15, 14A, MRM15, 14A, MRM15, 14A, MRM15, 14A, MRM15, 1A, 9A, W16, 9A, W16 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Works sidings. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | D5003, D5009, D5019, D5030, D5090, D5090, D5140, D5140 |
1A, 5A, 1B, 1A, 14A, MRM15, 9A, W16 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. |
SLS 7/1962 | ||
Sat 03/09/1966 | D5000 | D01 | Last day of through services on the Great Central main line: Worked the 14:38 Marylebone-Nottingham Victoria | Last Years of the Great Central Mainline (Robert Robotham) | ||
Tue 11/1967 | D5051 | 65A | Caught fire while working a Waterside (Ayrshire) coal train. Damage was so severe that the loco was condemned and became the only Sulzer Type 2 broken up at Inverurie Works. | |||
Sun 05/11/1967 | D5094 | 64B | Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. | RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Thu 15/08/1968 | D5051, D5120, D5128 |
Wdn, 60A, 60A |
Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Derelict shell in the yard Inverurie Works visit: In Works Inverurie Works visit: In Works |
RO 10/1968 | ||
Tue 27/08/1968 | D5070 | 64B | Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed | RO 12/1968 | ||
Tue 27/08/1968 | D5095, D5115, D5127 |
64B, 60A, 60A |
Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed |
RO 12/1968 | ||
Wed 28/08/1968 | D5116, D5123, D5126, D5130, D5132 |
60A, 60A, 60A, 60A, 60A |
Inverness depot: On shed Inverness depot: On shed Inverness depot: On shed Inverness depot: On shed Inverness depot: On shed |
RO 11/1968 | ||
Wed 28/08/1968 | D5051, D5120, D5128, D5129 |
Wdn, 60A, 60A, 60A |
Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Dumped at station end of works yard Inverurie Works visit: In Works - In the shops Inverurie Works visit: In Works - In the shops Inverurie Works visit: In Works - In the shops |
RO 11/1968 | ||
Mon 09/09/1968 | D5122 | 60A | D5122 crashed into the back of the 08:46 Glasgow - Edinburgh DMU at Castlecary. Both enginemen lost their lives. - Green livery | RO 11/1968 | ||
Sat 19/10/1968 | D5122 | Wdn | Glasgow Works visit: In Works - Outside the works - damaged | RO 12/1968 | ||
Sun 05/01/1969 | D5137 | D05 | Crewe North depot: Stabled in depot | RO 9/1969 | ||
Tue 15/07/1969 | D5117, D5120, D5123, D5124 |
60A, 60A, 60A, 60A |
Inverness shed and environs: On shed Inverness shed and environs: On shed Inverness shed and environs: On shed Inverness shed and environs: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Thu 17/07/1969 | D5099, D5109, D5122 |
55A, 52A, Wdn |
Glasgow Works visit: In Works Glasgow Works visit: In Works Glasgow Works visit: In Works |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 03/08/1969 | D5066, D5099, D5109 |
64B, 55A, 52A |
Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Sat 18/12/1971 | D5088 | Wdn | G. Cohens scrapyad, Kettering | RO 3/1972 | ||
Mon 27/12/1971 | D5021, D5022, D5026, D5046, D5052, D5057, D5058, D5059, D5075, D5080, D5081, D5082, D5133, D5135, D5136, D5141, D5142, D5146 |
D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05 |
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot |
RO 517 | ||
Tue 28/12/1971 | D5024, D5029, D5037, D5049, D5054, D5079, D5089, D5140 |
D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05, D05 |
Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot Stabled at Birkenhead depot: Stabled on Birkenhead depot |
RO 517 | ||
Sun 06/02/1972 | D5058, D5074, D5083 |
D05, D05, D05 |
Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sun 16/01/1977 | 24015 | Wdn | Derelict shell at Doncaster Works | John Woolley | ||
Sat 02/04/1977 | 24004 | Wdn | On St. Rollox Works | |||
Sat 02/04/1977 | 24065, 24069, 24094, 24106, 24112, 24113, 24115, 24120, 24124, 24130, 24150 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Millerhill depot: On shed |