Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 484 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 484 Week
» 18536 Month
» 251456 Year
» 1916832 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

24 Bo-Bo


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
05/09/1958 To Service 5000   NEW 5B Crewe South  
29/10/1958 To Service 5001   NEW 5B Crewe South  
01/11/1958 Reallocation 5001 5B Crewe South 5B Derby  
03/12/1958 To Service 5002   NEW 17A Derby  
12/12/1958 To Service 5003   NEW 17A Derby  
22/12/1958 To Service 5004   NEW 17A Derby  
03/01/1959 To Service 5005   NEW 17A Derby  
03/01/1959 To Service 5006   NEW 17A Derby  
27/01/1959 Reallocation 5000 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
04/02/1959 Reallocation 5001 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
07/02/1959 To Service 5007   NEW 17A Derby  
28/02/1959 To Service 5008   NEW 17A Derby  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 5002 17A Derby 17A Hither Green  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 5003 17A Derby 17A Hither Green  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 5004 17A Derby 17A Hither Green  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 5005 17A Derby 17A Hither Green  
11/03/1959 Reallocation 5006 17A Derby 17A Hither Green  
14/03/1959 To Service 5009   NEW 17A Derby  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 5007 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 5008 17A Derby 17A Hither Green  
21/03/1959 To Service 5010   NEW 17A Derby  
28/03/1959 Reallocation 5009 17A Derby 73C Hither Green  
28/03/1959 To Service 5011   NEW 5B Crewe South  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 5010 17A Derby 73C Hither Green  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 5011 17A Derby 73C Hither Green  
11/04/1959 To Service 5012   NEW 5B Crewe South  
18/04/1959 Reallocation 5012 17A Derby 73C Hither Green  
18/04/1959 To Service 5013   NEW 5B Crewe South  
25/04/1959 Reallocation 5008 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
25/04/1959 Reallocation 5008 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
25/04/1959 Reallocation 5013 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
09/05/1959 Reallocation 5008 5B Crewe South 18A Toton  
09/05/1959 To Service 5014   NEW 5B Crewe South  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 5014 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
30/05/1959 To Service 5015   NEW 5B Crewe South  
30/05/1959 To Service 5016   NEW 5B Crewe South  
06/06/1959 To Service 5017   NEW 5B Crewe South  
06/06/1959 To Service 5030   NEW 31B March  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 5015 5B Crewe South 5B Crewe South  
13/06/1959 Reallocation 5016 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
25/06/1959 To Service 5031   NEW 31B March  
27/06/1959 To Service 5018   NEW 5B Crewe South  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 5017 17A Derby 73C Hither Green  
11/07/1959 To Service 5019   NEW 5B Crewe South  
29/07/1959 To Service 5032   NEW 31B March  
05/08/1959 To Service 5033   NEW 31B March  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 5031 31B March 30A Stratford  
08/08/1959 Reallocation 5033 31B March 31B March  
20/08/1959 To Service 5020   NEW 32B Ipswich  
20/08/1959 To Service 5021   NEW 32B Ipswich  
29/08/1959 Reallocation 5015 5B Crewe South 1B Camden  
31/08/1959 To Service 5035   NEW 31B March  
03/09/1959 To Service 5034   NEW 31B March  
03/09/1959 To Service 5036   NEW 31B March  
07/09/1959 To Service 5022   NEW 32B Ipswich  
07/09/1959 To Service 5037   NEW 31B March  
15/09/1959 To Service 5038   NEW 32B Ipswich  
19/09/1959 Reallocation 5015 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
25/09/1959 To Service 5023   NEW 32B Ipswich  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 5008 18A Toton 17A Derby  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 5016 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 5018 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 5019 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
26/09/1959 Reallocation 5022 32B Ipswich 32A Norwich Thorpe  
28/09/1959 To Service 5041   NEW 32B Ipswich  
02/10/1959 To Service 5024   NEW 32B Ipswich  
12/10/1959 To Service 5040   NEW 32B Ipswich  
12/10/1959 To Service 5042   NEW 32B Ipswich  
16/10/1959 To Service 5025   NEW 32B Ipswich  
16/10/1959 To Service 5043   NEW 32B Ipswich  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 5015 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 5016 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 5018 5B Crewe South 1B Camden  
17/10/1959 Reallocation 5019 5B Crewe South 1B Camden  
22/10/1959 To Service 5026   NEW 32B Ipswich  
23/10/1959 To Service 5044   NEW 32B Ipswich  
24/10/1959 Reallocation 5008 17A Derby 1B Camden  
24/10/1959 Reallocation 5033 31B March 30A Stratford  
24/10/1959 To Service 5039   NEW 32B Ipswich  
29/10/1959 To Service 5046   NEW 31B March  
31/10/1959 To Service 5027   NEW 32B Ipswich  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 5042 32B Ipswich 31B March  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 5043 32B Ipswich 31B March  
31/10/1959 Reallocation 5044 32B Ipswich 31B March  
05/11/1959 To Service 5048   NEW 31B March  
07/11/1959 Reallocation 5022 32A Norwich Thorpe 32B Ipswich  
12/11/1959 To Service 5045   NEW 31B March  
13/11/1959 To Service 5028   NEW 32B Ipswich  
21/11/1959 To Service 5047   NEW 31B March  
27/11/1959 To Service 5050   NEW 31B March  
28/11/1959 To Service 5029   NEW 32B Ipswich  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 5040 32B Ipswich 31B March  
28/11/1959 Reallocation 5041 32B Ipswich 31B March  
03/12/1959 To Service 5053   NEW 31B March  
04/12/1959 To Service 5052   NEW 31B March  
05/12/1959 Reallocation 5039 32B Ipswich 31B March  
05/12/1959 To Service 5051   NEW 31B March  
11/12/1959 To Service 5056   NEW 31B March  
18/12/1959 To Service 5054   NEW 31B March  
18/12/1959 To Service 5055   NEW 31B March  
19/12/1959 To Service 5066   NEW 31B March  
22/12/1959 To Service 5057   NEW 31B March  
24/12/1959 To Service 5067   NEW 31B March  
29/12/1959 To Service 5059   NEW 31B March  
31/12/1959 To Service 5068   NEW 31B March  
01/01/1960 To Service 5058   NEW 31B March  
01/01/1960 To Service 5069   NEW 31B March  
02/01/1960 To Service 5060   NEW 31B March  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 5008 1B Camden 1B Hither Green  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 5030 31B March 30A Stratford  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 5032 31B March 30A Stratford  
09/01/1960 Reallocation 5038 32B Ipswich 31B March  
15/01/1960 To Service 5061   NEW 31B March  
16/01/1960 Reallocation 5004 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
18/01/1960 To Service 5062   NEW 31B March  
23/01/1960 To Service 5070   NEW 31B March  
26/01/1960 To Service 5063   NEW 31B March  
27/01/1960 To Service 5064   NEW 31B March  
02/02/1960 To Service 5065   NEW 31B March  
06/02/1960 To Service 5071   NEW 31B March  
10/02/1960 To Service 5076   NEW 31B March  
17/02/1960 To Service 5072   NEW 31B March  
17/02/1960 To Service 5077   NEW 31B March  
18/02/1960 To Service 5078   NEW 31B March  
18/02/1960 To Service 5094   NEW 31B March  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 5034 31B March 30A Stratford  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 5035 31B March 30A Stratford  
25/02/1960 To Service 5079   NEW 31B March  
01/03/1960 To Service 5080   NEW 31B March  
04/03/1960 To Service 5073   NEW 31B March  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 5006 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
14/03/1960 To Service 5074   NEW 31B March  
19/03/1960 To Service 5081   NEW 31B March  
23/03/1960 To Service 5095   NEW 31B March  
26/03/1960 To Service 5075   NEW 31B March  
29/03/1960 To Service 5082   NEW 31B March  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5072 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5073 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5074 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5078 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5079 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5080 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5081 31B March 1A Willesden  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 5082 31B March 1A Willesden  
04/04/1960 To Service 5049   NEW 31B March  
08/04/1960 To Service 5083   NEW 31B March  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 5075 31B March 1A Willesden  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 5080 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 5083 31B March 1A Willesden  
09/04/1960 To Service 5096   NEW 52A Gateshead  
23/04/1960 To Service 5114   NEW 60A Inverness  
25/04/1960 To Service 5084   NEW 31B March  
30/04/1960 Reallocation 5003 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
30/04/1960 Reallocation 5084 31B March 2A Rugby  
30/04/1960 To Service 5115   NEW 60A Inverness  
05/05/1960 To Service 5097   NEW 52A Gateshead  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 5036 31B March 32B Ipswich  
07/05/1960 Reallocation 5037 31B March 32B Ipswich  
07/05/1960 To Service 5116   NEW 60A Inverness  
14/05/1960 To Service 5117   NEW 60A Inverness  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 5081 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 5082 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
21/05/1960 Reallocation 5083 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
21/05/1960 To Service 5086   NEW 1A Willesden  
21/05/1960 To Service 5118   NEW 60A Inverness  
26/05/1960 To Service 5098   NEW 52B Heaton  
28/05/1960 To Service 5119   NEW 60A Inverness  
03/06/1960 To Service 5099   NEW 52B Heaton  
04/06/1960 Reallocation 5005 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
04/06/1960 To Service 5120   NEW 60A Inverness  
09/06/1960 To Service 5087   NEW 1A Willesden  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 5038 31B March 32B Ipswich  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 5039 31B March 32B Ipswich  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 5040 31B March 32B Ipswich  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 5041 31B March 32B Ipswich  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 5042 31B March 32B Ipswich  
11/06/1960 Reallocation 5087 1A Willesden 1A Willesden  
11/06/1960 To Service 5121   NEW 60A Inverness  
13/06/1960 To Service 5088   NEW 14A Cricklewood East  
18/06/1960 To Service 5090   NEW 14A Cricklewood East  
18/06/1960 To Service 5122   NEW 60A Inverness  
20/06/1960 To Service 5089   NEW 14A Cricklewood East  
25/06/1960 Reallocation 5089 14A Cricklewood East 14A Cricklewood East  
25/06/1960 To Service 5091   NEW 14A Cricklewood East  
25/06/1960 To Service 5100   NEW 52A Gateshead  
25/06/1960 To Service 5123   NEW 60A Inverness  
02/07/1960 To Service 5124   NEW 60A Inverness  
09/07/1960 Reallocation 5082 2A Rugby 1A Willesden  
09/07/1960 To Service 5101   NEW 52A Gateshead  
14/07/1960 To Service 5125   NEW 60A Inverness  
15/07/1960 To Service 5092   NEW 14A Cricklewood East  
16/07/1960 Reallocation 5092 14A Cricklewood East 14A Cricklewood East  
16/07/1960 To Service 5102   NEW 52A Gateshead  
23/07/1960 Reallocation 5043 31B March 32B Ipswich  
23/07/1960 Reallocation 5044 31B March 32B Ipswich  
23/07/1960 To Service 5126   NEW 60A Inverness  
28/07/1960 To Service 5093   NEW 14A Cricklewood East  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 5076 31B March 1A Willesden  
30/07/1960 Reallocation 5077 31B March 1A Willesden  
30/07/1960 To Service 5127   NEW 60A Inverness  
06/08/1960 To Service 5103   NEW 52A Gateshead  
13/08/1960 To Service 5128   NEW 60A Inverness  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 5005 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 5079 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
20/08/1960 Reallocation 5081 2A Rugby 1A Willesden  
20/08/1960 To Service 5085   NEW 1A Willesden  
27/08/1960 To Service 5104   NEW 52A Gateshead  
27/08/1960 To Service 5129   NEW 60A Inverness  
03/09/1960 To Service 5130   NEW 60A Inverness  
10/09/1960 Reallocation 5080 2A Rugby 1A Willesden  
10/09/1960 To Service 5105   NEW 52A Gateshead  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5026 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5027 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5028 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5029 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5045 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5046 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5047 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5048 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5049 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 5050 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/09/1960 To Service 5131   NEW 60A Inverness  
23/09/1960 To Service 5132   NEW 60A Inverness  
24/09/1960 Reallocation 5079 2A Rugby 1A Willesden  
24/09/1960 To Service 5106   NEW 52A Gateshead  
24/09/1960 To Service 5133   NEW 9A Longsight  
06/10/1960 To Service 5134   NEW 9A Longsight  
08/10/1960 Reallocation 5079 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
08/10/1960 To Service 5107   NEW 52A Gateshead  
08/10/1960 To Service 5135   NEW 9A Longsight  
15/10/1960 Reallocation 5079 9A Longsight 12B Carlisle Upperby  
18/10/1960 To Service 5137   NEW 9A Longsight  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 5059 31B March 1A Willesden  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 5061 31B March 1A Willesden  
22/10/1960 To Service 5108   NEW 52A Gateshead  
22/10/1960 To Service 5136   NEW 9A Longsight  
27/10/1960 To Service 5138   NEW 9A Longsight  
29/10/1960 Reallocation 5060 31B March 9A Longsight  
29/10/1960 To Service 5139   NEW 9A Longsight  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 5060 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 5063 31B March 1A Willesden  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 5064 31B March 1A Willesden  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 5065 31B March 1A Willesden  
05/11/1960 Reallocation 5083 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
05/11/1960 To Service 5109   NEW 52A Gateshead  
05/11/1960 To Service 5140   NEW 9A Longsight  
12/11/1960 Reallocation 5060 1A Willesden 1A Willesden  
12/11/1960 Reallocation 5061 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
12/11/1960 Reallocation 5133 9A Longsight 5A Crewe North  
12/11/1960 To Service 5141   NEW 9A Longsight  
16/11/1960 To Service 5110   NEW 52A Gateshead  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5026 30A Stratford 1B Camden  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5060 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5070 31B March 30A Stratford  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5071 31B March 30A Stratford  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5074 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5081 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5083 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
19/11/1960 Reallocation 5117 60A Inverness 65A Eastfield  
19/11/1960 To Service 5142   NEW 9A Longsight  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 5043 32B Ipswich 31B March  
26/11/1960 To Service 5111   NEW 52A Gateshead  
26/11/1960 To Service 5143   NEW 1A Willesden  
03/12/1960 To Service 5144   NEW 1A Willesden  
07/12/1960 To Service 5145   NEW 1A Willesden  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 5032 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 5062 31B March 30F Parkeston Quay  
10/12/1960 To Service 5146   NEW 1A Willesden  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 5027 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 5069 31B March 30A Stratford  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 5084 2A Rugby 14A Cricklewood East  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 5087 1A Willesden 14A Cricklewood East  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 5116 60A Inverness 66A Polmadie  
17/12/1960 To Service 5147   NEW 52A Gateshead  
23/12/1960 To Service 5148   NEW 52A Gateshead  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 5133 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
30/12/1960 To Service 5112   NEW 52A Gateshead  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 5044 32B Ipswich 32B Ipswich  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 5069 30A Stratford 34G Finsbury Park  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 5070 30A Stratford 30A Stratford  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 5070 30A Stratford 34G Finsbury Park  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 5030 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 5051 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 5052 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 5060 9A Longsight 5A Crewe North  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 5055 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 5086 1A Willesden 14A Cricklewood East  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 5031 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 5054 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 5067 31B March 30A Stratford  
28/01/1961 Reallocation 5085 1A Willesden 14A Cricklewood East  
28/01/1961 To Service 5113   NEW 52A Gateshead  
07/02/1961 To Service 5149   NEW 52A Gateshead  
11/02/1961 Reallocation 5057 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
11/02/1961 Reallocation 5059 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
11/02/1961 Reallocation 5060 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
11/02/1961 Reallocation 5063 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
18/02/1961 Reallocation 5056 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
27/02/1961 To Service 5150   NEW 52A Gateshead  
04/03/1961 Reallocation 5058 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 5063 1C Watford 1C Finsbury Park  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 5064 1A Willesden 34G Finsbury Park  
11/03/1961 Reallocation 5094 31B March 30A Stratford  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5020 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5022 32B Ipswich 1B Camden  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5023 32B Ipswich 1C Watford  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5024 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5024 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5034 30A Stratford 30A Stratford  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5045 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5046 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5048 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5049 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5050 30A Stratford 34G Finsbury Park  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5059 1B Camden 34G Finsbury Park  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5060 1A Willesden 34G Finsbury Park  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5061 2A Rugby 1A Willesden  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5066 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5067 30A Stratford 34G Finsbury Park  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5071 30A Stratford 34G Finsbury Park  
18/03/1961 Reallocation 5083 9A Longsight 1A Willesden  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 5035 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 5053 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
25/03/1961 Reallocation 5062 30F Parkeston Quay 34G Finsbury Park  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5021 32B Ipswich 30A Stratford  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5034 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5047 30A Stratford 32B Ipswich  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5059 34G Finsbury Park 34G Finsbury Park  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5060 34G Finsbury Park 34G Finsbury Park  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5063 1C Watford 34G Finsbury Park  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5066 34G Finsbury Park 34G Finsbury Park  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 5094 30A Stratford 34G Finsbury Park  
08/04/1961 Reallocation 5035 1A Willesden 1A Willesden  
08/04/1961 Reallocation 5117 65A Eastfield 65A Inverness  
11/04/1961 Reallocation 5028 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
11/04/1961 Reallocation 5029 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
11/04/1961 Reallocation 5033 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
11/04/1961 Reallocation 5034 1A Willesden 1A Willesden  
15/04/1961 Reallocation 5065 1A Willesden 31B Finsbury Park  
15/04/1961 Reallocation 5068 31B March 31B Finsbury Park  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 5020 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 5021 30A Stratford 1A Willesden  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 5065 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
29/04/1961 Reallocation 5068 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
06/05/1961 Reallocation 5072 1A Willesden 34G Finsbury Park  
20/05/1961 Reallocation 5146 1A Willesden 21E Monument Lane  
06/1961 Reallocation 5117 65A Eastfield 60A Inverness  
03/06/1961 Reallocation 5079 12B Carlisle Upperby 1A Willesden  
03/06/1961 Reallocation 5116 66A Polmadie 60A Inverness  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 5095 31B March 34G Finsbury Park  
08/07/1961 Reallocation 5043 31B March 32B Ipswich  
08/07/1961 Reallocation 5146 21E Monument Lane 1A Willesden  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 5025 32B Ipswich 1A Willesden  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 5061 1A Willesden 34G Finsbury Park  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 5031 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
09/09/1961 Reallocation 5035 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
16/12/1961 Reallocation 5112 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
16/12/1961 Reallocation 5113 52A Gateshead 51L Thornaby  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 5134 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
27/01/1962 Reallocation 5142 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
10/03/1962 Reallocation 5142 1B Camden 17A Derby  
17/03/1962 Reallocation 5003 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
17/03/1962 Reallocation 5006 5B Crewe South 5B Crewe South  
24/03/1962 Reallocation 5142 17A Derby 1B Camden  
07/04/1962 Reallocation 5135 9A Longsight 1B Camden  
07/04/1962 Reallocation 5142 1B Camden 9A Longsight  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 5011 73C Hither Green 5B Crewe South  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 5011 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 5017 73C Hither Green 5B Crewe South  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 5017 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
05/05/1962 Reallocation 5100 52A Gateshead 12C Carlisle Canal  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5006 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe North  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5009 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe North  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5009 73C Hither Green 5B Crewe South  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5012 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe North  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5012 73C Hither Green 5B Crewe South  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5082 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
12/05/1962 Reallocation 5100 12C Carlisle Canal 52A Gateshead  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 5002 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
19/05/1962 Reallocation 5002 17A Derby 5B Crewe South  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 5133 1A Willesden 12C Carlisle Canal  
01/06/1962 Reallocation 5001 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
02/06/1962 Reallocation 5005 5B Crewe South 5A Crewe North  
02/06/1962 Reallocation 5010 73C Hither Green 21D Aston  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5000 1A Willesden 1A Hither Green  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5000 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5001 1A Willesden 1A Hither Green  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5002 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5003 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5004 5B Crewe South 5B Hither Green  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5005 5A Crewe North 2A Rugby  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5007 1A Willesden 1A Hither Green  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5007 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5010 21D Aston 2A Rugby  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5011 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5013 5B Crewe South 5B Crewe South  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5014 5B Crewe South 5B Crewe South  
16/06/1962 Reallocation 5017 1A Willesden 2A Rugby  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 5023 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
30/06/1962 Reallocation 5014 5B Crewe South 2A Rugby  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 5133 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 5133 12C Carlisle Canal 1A Willesden  
21/07/1962 Reallocation 5008 1B Camden 1B Camden  
28/07/1962 Reallocation 5001 1A Willesden 1A Willesden  
28/07/1962 Reallocation 5013 5B Crewe South 2A Rugby  
15/09/1962 Reallocation 5133 9A Longsight 5A Crewe North  
29/09/1962 Reallocation 5004 5B Crewe South 1A Willesden  
06/10/1962 Reallocation 5001 1A Willesden 1C Watford  
13/10/1962 Reallocation 5008 1B Camden 12B Carlisle Upperby  
24/11/1962 Reallocation 5007 1A Willesden 1A Willesden  
22/12/1962 Reallocation 5008 12B Carlisle Upperby 1B Camden  
05/01/1963 Reallocation 5008 1B Camden 5A Crewe North  
05/01/1963 Reallocation 5082 1C Watford 5A Crewe North  
05/01/1963 Reallocation 5083 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
19/01/1963 Reallocation 5017 2A Rugby 5A Crewe North  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 5001 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
16/02/1963 Reallocation 5031 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 5036 32B Ipswich 32B Ipswich  
23/02/1963 Reallocation 5096 52A Gateshead 50A York (North)  
02/03/1963 Reallocation 5099 52B Heaton 50A York (North)  
16/03/1963 Reallocation 5098 52B Heaton 50A York (North)  
30/03/1963 Reallocation 5100 52A Gateshead 50A York (North)  
17/08/1963 Reallocation 5000 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
17/08/1963 Reallocation 5001 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 5000 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 5001 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
14/09/1963 Reallocation 5006 5A Crewe North 1F Rugby  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 5009 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
23/11/1963 Reallocation 5012 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
07/03/1964 Reallocation 5142 9A Longsight 16C Derby  
28/03/1964 Reallocation 5142 16C Derby 9A Longsight  
25/04/1964 Reallocation 5146 1A Willesden 9A Longsight  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 5112 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
20/06/1964 Reallocation 5113 51L Thornaby 52A Gateshead  
29/08/1964 Reallocation 5089 14A Cricklewood East 1A Willesden  
05/09/1964 Reallocation 5089 1A Willesden 14B Cricklewood West  
05/09/1964 Reallocation 5091 14A Cricklewood East 1A Willesden  
28/11/1964 Reallocation 5144 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
28/11/1964 Reallocation 5145 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
05/12/1964 Reallocation 5009 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
05/12/1964 Reallocation 5012 1A Willesden 5A Crewe North  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 5087 14A Cricklewood East 1A Willesden  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 5089 14B Cricklewood West 1A Willesden  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 5090 14A Cricklewood East 1A Willesden  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 5092 14A Cricklewood East 1A Willesden  
12/12/1964 Reallocation 5093 14A Cricklewood East 1A Willesden  
26/12/1964 Reallocation 5014 2A Rugby 9A Longsight  
26/12/1964 Reallocation 5134 1B Camden 1F Rugby  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5000 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5001 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5004 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5007 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5009 5A Crewe North 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5012 5A Crewe North 1F Rugby  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5020 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5021 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5023 1A Willesden 1B Camden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5035 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5074 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5081 1C Watford 1A Willesden  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5144 5A Crewe North 1F Rugby  
09/01/1965 Reallocation 5145 5A Crewe North 1F Rugby  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 5084 14A Cricklewood East D14 London (Midland)  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 5085 14A Cricklewood East D14 London (Midland)  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 5086 14A Cricklewood East D14 London (Midland)  
16/01/1965 Reallocation 5088 14A Cricklewood East D14 London (Midland)  
06/02/1965 Reallocation 5088 D14 London (Midland) 1A Willesden  
27/02/1965 Reallocation 5000 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
27/02/1965 Reallocation 5001 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
27/02/1965 Reallocation 5004 1B Camden 1A Willesden  
13/03/1965 Reallocation 5084 D14 London (Midland) 1A Willesden  
03/04/1965 Reallocation 5085 D14 London (Midland) 1A Willesden  
10/04/1965 Reallocation 5086 D14 London (Midland) 1A Willesden  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 5014 9A Longsight 1F Rugby  
01/05/1965 Reallocation 5134 1F Rugby 9A Longsight  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 5040 32B Ipswich 41A Tinsley  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 5046 32B Ipswich 41A Tinsley  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 5047 32B Ipswich 41A Tinsley  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 5048 32B Ipswich 41A Tinsley  
19/06/1965 Reallocation 5049 32B Ipswich 41A Tinsley  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 5002 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 5003 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 5005 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 5010 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
03/07/1965 Reallocation 5011 2A Rugby 1E Bletchley  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5006 1F Rugby 5A Crewe Diesel  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5040 41A Tinsley 32B Ipswich  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5046 41A Tinsley 32B Ipswich  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5047 41A Tinsley 32B Ipswich  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5048 41A Tinsley 32B Ipswich  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5049 41A Tinsley 32B Ipswich  
17/07/1965 Reallocation 5143 1A Willesden 5A Crewe Diesel  
11/09/1965 Reallocation 5008 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
11/09/1965 Reallocation 5017 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
02/10/1965 Reallocation 5000 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
02/10/1965 Reallocation 5001 1A Willesden 1F Rugby  
02/10/1965 Reallocation 5004 1A Willesden 1F Rugby  
02/10/1965 Reallocation 5006 5A Crewe Diesel 1F Rugby  
16/10/1965 Reallocation 5083 5A Crewe North 1A Willesden  
16/10/1965 Reallocation 5143 5A Crewe Diesel 1A Willesden  
20/11/1965 Reallocation 5014 1F Rugby 9A Longsight  
20/11/1965 Reallocation 5134 9A Longsight 1F Rugby  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5007 1B Camden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5009 1B Camden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5015 1B Camden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5016 1B Camden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5018 1B Camden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5019 1B Camden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5020 1B Camden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5021 1B Camden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5022 1B Camden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5023 1B Camden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5024 1A Willesden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5025 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5026 1B Camden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5029 1A Willesden 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5032 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5040 32B Ipswich 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5083 1A Willesden 5A Crewe Diesel  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5140 9A Longsight 1E Bletchley  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5141 9A Longsight 2F Bescot  
03/01/1966 Reallocation 5143 1A Willesden 5A Crewe Diesel  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5008 1A Willesden 1F Rugby  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5017 1A Willesden 1F Rugby  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5027 1A Willesden 1F Rugby  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5028 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5030 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5033 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
08/01/1966 Reallocation 5034 1A Willesden 1E Bletchley  
12/03/1966 Reallocation 5001 1F Rugby 2F Bescot  
26/03/1966 Reallocation 5002 1E Bletchley 1F Rugby  
26/03/1966 Reallocation 5012 1F Rugby 2F Bescot  
26/03/1966 Reallocation 5018 1E Bletchley 5A Crewe Diesel  
26/03/1966 Reallocation 5133 5A Crewe North 1E Bletchley  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5000 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5001 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5002 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5003 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5004 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5005 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5006 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5007 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5008 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5009 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5010 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5012 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5013 2A Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5014 9A Longsight D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5015 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5016 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5017 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5019 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5020 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5021 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5022 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5023 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5024 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5025 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5026 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5027 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5028 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5029 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5030 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5031 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5032 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5033 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5034 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5035 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5073 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5074 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5075 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5076 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5077 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5078 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5079 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5080 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5081 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5084 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5085 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5086 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5087 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5088 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5090 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5091 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5092 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5093 1A Willesden D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5108 52A Gateshead D05 Stoke Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5133 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5134 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5140 1E Bletchley D01 London Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5141 2F Bescot D02 Birmingham Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5143 5A Crewe Diesel D05 Stoke Division  
18/04/1966 Reallocation 5145 1F Rugby D01 London Division  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 5014 D01 London Division D01 London Division  
23/04/1966 Reallocation 5134 D01 London Division 9A Longsight  
30/04/1966 Reallocation 5013 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5010 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5011 D01   D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5014 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5016 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5017 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5019 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5025 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5027 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5028 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
09/07/1966 Reallocation 5030 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
06/08/1966 Reallocation 5057 34G Finsbury Park D01 London Division  
06/08/1966 Reallocation 5058 34G Finsbury Park D01 London Division  
06/08/1966 Reallocation 5059 34G Finsbury Park D01 London Division  
06/08/1966 Reallocation 5060 34G Finsbury Park D01 London Division  
06/08/1966 Reallocation 5082 5A Crewe North D01 London Division  
06/08/1966 Reallocation 5143 D05 Stoke Division D01 London Division  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5061 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5062 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5064 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5065 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5068 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5069 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5071 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5072 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
13/08/1966 Reallocation 5095 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
20/08/1966 Reallocation 5066 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
09/1966 Reallocation 5067 34G Finsbury Park 34G Haymarket  
03/09/1966 Reallocation 5094 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
24/09/1966 Reallocation 5070 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
24/09/1966 Reallocation 5070 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
24/09/1966 Reallocation 5094 64B Haymarket 64B Haymarket  
10/1966 Reallocation 5067 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5001 D02 Birmingham Division D01 London Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5013 D05 Stoke Division D02 Birmingham Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5018 5A Crewe Diesel D02 Birmingham Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5083 5A Crewe Diesel D01 London Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5133 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5140 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5141 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5143 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5144 1F Rugby D05 Stoke Division  
01/10/1966 Reallocation 5145 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5050 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5051 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5052 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5053 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5054 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5055 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
08/10/1966 Reallocation 5056 34G Finsbury Park 65A Eastfield  
05/11/1966 Reallocation 5031 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
05/11/1966 Reallocation 5032 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
05/11/1966 Reallocation 5033 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
05/11/1966 Reallocation 5063 34G Finsbury Park 64B Haymarket  
26/11/1966 Reallocation 5070 64B Haymarket 64B Haymarket  
26/11/1966 Reallocation 5070 64B Haymarket 64B Haymarket  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5073 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5074 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5075 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5076 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5077 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5078 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/12/1966 Reallocation 5079 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
17/12/1966 Reallocation 5080 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
17/12/1966 Reallocation 5081 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
24/12/1966 Reallocation 5091 D01 London Division 9A Longsight  
24/12/1966 Reallocation 5134 9A Longsight D01 London Division  
31/12/1966 Reallocation 5050 65A Eastfield 64B Haymarket  
07/01/1967 Reallocation 5082 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
07/01/1967 Reallocation 5083 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5034 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5035 D01 London Division D02 Birmingham Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5085 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5086 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5087 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5088 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5089 1A Willesden D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5090 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5091 9A Longsight D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5092 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5093 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
11/03/1967 Reallocation 5134 D01 London Division 9A Longsight  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5000 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5001 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5002 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5003 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5004 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5005 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5006 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
08/04/1967 Reallocation 5007 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
15/04/1967 Reallocation 5057 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
15/04/1967 Reallocation 5058 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
15/04/1967 Reallocation 5059 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
15/04/1967 Reallocation 5060 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 5008 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 5009 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
22/04/1967 Reallocation 5084 D01 London Division D05 Stoke Division  
20/05/1967 Reallocation 5100 50A York (North) 55A Holbeck (MR)  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5010 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5011 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5012 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5013 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5014 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5015 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5016 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
03/06/1967 Reallocation 5017 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 5018 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 5019 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 5020 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 5021 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 5022 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
10/06/1967 Reallocation 5023 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1967 Reallocation 5096 50A York (North) 55A Holbeck (MR)  
17/06/1967 Reallocation 5098 50A York (North) 55A Holbeck (MR)  
17/06/1967 Reallocation 5099 50A York (North) 55A Holbeck (MR)  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5024 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5025 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5026 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5027 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5028 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5029 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5030 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5031 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5032 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5033 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5034 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5035 D02 Birmingham Division D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5036 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5037 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5038 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5039 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5040 1E Bletchley D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5041 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5042 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5044 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5045 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5046 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5047 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5048 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1967 Reallocation 5049 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
19/08/1967 Reallocation 5043 32B Ipswich D05 Stoke Division  
07/10/1967 Reallocation 5097 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
07/10/1967 Reallocation 5101 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
07/10/1967 Reallocation 5112 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
04/11/1967 Reallocation 5113 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
02/12/1967 Condemned 5051 65A Eastfield   COND  
02/12/1967 Reallocation 5147 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 5050 64B Haymarket 9A Longsight  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 5062 64B Haymarket 9A Longsight  
13/01/1968 Reallocation 5063 64B Haymarket 9A Longsight  
27/01/1968 Reallocation 5064 64B Haymarket 9A Longsight  
03/02/1968 Reallocation 5061 64B Haymarket 9A Longsight  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 5065 64B Haymarket 65A Eastfield  
30/03/1968 Reallocation 5066 64B Haymarket 65A Eastfield  
06/04/1968 Reallocation 5052 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
06/04/1968 Reallocation 5053 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
06/04/1968 Reallocation 5054 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
06/04/1968 Reallocation 5055 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
06/04/1968 Reallocation 5144 D05 Stoke Division 9A Longsight  
06/04/1968 Reallocation 5145 D05 Stoke Division 9A Longsight  
04/05/1968 Reallocation 5056 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
11/05/1968 Reallocation 5065 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
11/05/1968 Reallocation 5066 65A Eastfield 9A Longsight  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5050 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5052 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5053 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5054 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5055 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5056 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5061 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5062 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5063 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5064 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5065 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5066 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5134 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5135 1B Camden D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5136 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5137 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5138 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5139 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5142 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5144 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5145 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 5146 9A Longsight D09 Manchester Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5050 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5052 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5053 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5054 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5055 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5056 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5061 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
14/09/1968 Reallocation 5062 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
28/09/1968 Reallocation 5148 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
28/09/1968 Reallocation 5149 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
28/09/1968 Reallocation 5150 52A Gateshead 55A Holbeck (MR)  
02/10/1968 Condemned 5122 60A Inverness   COND  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5063 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5064 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5065 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5066 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5134 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5135 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5136 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5137 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5138 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5139 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5142 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5144 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5145 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
09/11/1968 Reallocation 5146 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
25/01/1969 Condemned 5005 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
29/03/1969 Reallocation 5002 D05 Stoke Division D05 Stoke Division  
29/03/1969 Reallocation 5016 D05 Stoke Division D05 Stoke Division  
02/08/1969 Reallocation 5010 98W   D05 Stoke Division  
02/08/1969 Reallocation 5066 D05 Stoke Division 64B Haymarket  
10/08/1969 Condemned 5043 98S     COND  
10/08/1969 Condemned 5138 98S     COND  
10/08/1969 Condemned 5139 98S     COND  
14/08/1969 Condemned 5093 98S     COND  
05/10/1969 Reallocation 5000 98W   55A Holbeck (MR)  
05/10/1969 Reallocation 5001 98W   55A Holbeck (MR)  
11/10/1969 Reallocation 5013 98S   55A Holbeck (MR)  
11/10/1969 Reallocation 5019 98W   55A Holbeck (MR)  
01/11/1969 Reallocation 5012 D05 Stoke Division D05 Stoke Division  
06/12/1969 Reallocation 5090 98S   55A Holbeck (MR)  
27/06/1970 Condemned 5088 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
05/12/1970 Reallocation 5065 D05 Stoke Division 64B Haymarket  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5002 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5003 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5004 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5006 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5007 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5008 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
06/03/1971 Reallocation 5009 D05 Stoke Division 65A Eastfield  
27/03/1971 Reallocation 5066 64B Haymarket 65A Eastfield  
01/05/1971 Reallocation 5066 65A Eastfield 64B Haymarket  
08/05/1971 Reallocation 5019 55A Holbeck (MR) 52A Gateshead  
08/05/1971 Reallocation 5090 55A Holbeck (MR) 52A Gateshead  
08/05/1971 Reallocation 5096 55A Holbeck (MR) 52A Gateshead  
31/07/1971 Reallocation 5099 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
31/07/1971 Reallocation 5100 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
31/07/1971 Reallocation 5101 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
11/09/1971 Condemned 5131 60A Inverness   COND  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5010 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5011 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5012 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5014 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5015 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5016 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5017 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5018 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
09/10/1971 Reallocation 5073 D05 Stoke Division 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5000 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5001 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5013 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5019 52A Gateshead 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5090 52A Gateshead 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5096 52A Gateshead 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5097 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5098 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5112 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5113 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5147 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5148 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5149 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
16/10/1971 Reallocation 5150 55A Holbeck (MR) 66A Polmadie  
30/10/1971 Reallocation 5149 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
30/10/1971 Reallocation 5150 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
03/1972 Reallocation 5001 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5000 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5010 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5011 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5012 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5013 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5014 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5015 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5016 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5017 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5018 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5019 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5073 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5090 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5096 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5097 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5098 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5099 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5100 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5101 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5112 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5113 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5147 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
01/04/1972 Reallocation 5148 66A Polmadie 65A Eastfield  
08/04/1972 Reallocation 5020 D05 Stoke Division D09 Manchester Division  
08/04/1972 Reallocation 5021 D05 Stoke Division D09 Manchester Division  
08/04/1972 Reallocation 5022 D05 Stoke Division D09 Manchester Division  
08/04/1972 Reallocation 5023 D05 Stoke Division D09 Manchester Division  
08/04/1972 Reallocation 5024 D05 Stoke Division D09 Manchester Division  
29/04/1972 Reallocation 5113 65A Eastfield 60A Inverness  
04/06/1972 Condemned 5028 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
01/07/1972 Reallocation 5024 D09 Manchester Division D05 Stoke Division  
07/10/1972 Reallocation 5024 D05 Stoke Division D09 Manchester Division  
09/10/1972 Condemned 5067 64B Haymarket   COND  
09/10/1972 Condemned 5068 64B Haymarket   COND  
09/10/1972 Condemned 5114 60A Inverness   COND  
09/10/1972 Condemned 5149 65A Eastfield   COND  
24/02/1973 Reallocation 5101 65A Eastfield 60A Inverness  
24/02/1973 Reallocation 5101 65A Eastfield 65A Eastfield  
12/05/1973 Reallocation 5025 D05 Stoke Division LO Longsight  
12/05/1973 Reallocation 5026 D05 Stoke Division LO Longsight  
12/05/1973 Reallocation 5029 D05 Stoke Division LO Longsight  
06/10/1973 Reallocation 5027 D05 Stoke Division LO Longsight  
06/10/1973 Reallocation 5029 LO Longsight CE Crewe Diesel  
03/11/1973 Reallocation 5113 60A Inverness ED Eastfield  
23/02/1974 Reallocation 5112 65A Eastfield IS Inverness  
23/02/1974 Reallocation 5113 ED Eastfield IS Inverness  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 5026 LO Longsight CD Crewe Diesel  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 24111 52A Gateshead HA Haymarket  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 24107 52A Gateshead HA Haymarket  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 24108 D05 Stoke Division HA Haymarket  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 24109 52A Gateshead HA Haymarket  
27/04/1974 Reallocation 24107 HA Haymarket ED Eastfield  
27/04/1974 Reallocation 24108 HA Haymarket ED Eastfield  
27/04/1974 Reallocation 24109 HA Haymarket ED Eastfield  
27/04/1974 Reallocation 24111 HA Haymarket ED Eastfield  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 24102 52A Gateshead IS Inverness  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 24103 52A Gateshead IS Inverness  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 24104 52A Gateshead IS Inverness  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 24105 52A Gateshead ED Eastfield  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 24106 52A Gateshead ED Eastfield  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 24110 52A Gateshead HA Haymarket  
04/10/1974 Condemned 24062 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
28/12/1974 Reallocation 24111 ED Eastfield IS Inverness  
11/01/1975 Reallocation 24005 65A Eastfield LO Longsight  
11/01/1975 Reallocation 24001 65A Eastfield LO Longsight  
11/01/1975 Reallocation 24004 65A Eastfield LO Longsight  
11/01/1975 Reallocation 24026 CD Crewe Diesel LO Longsight  
11/01/1975 Reallocation 24029 CE Crewe Diesel LO Longsight  
08/02/1975 Reallocation 24001 LO Longsight ED Eastfield  
08/02/1975 Reallocation 24004 LO Longsight ED Eastfield  
08/03/1975 Reallocation 24029 LO Longsight CD Crewe Diesel  
29/03/1975 Reallocation 24111 IS Inverness ED Eastfield  
10/05/1975 Reallocation 24025 LO Longsight CD Crewe Diesel  
10/05/1975 Reallocation 24026 LO Longsight CD Crewe Diesel  
24/05/1975 Reallocation 24065 64B Haymarket ED Eastfield  
24/05/1975 Reallocation 24110 HA Haymarket IS Inverness  
07/1975 Reallocation 24001 ED Eastfield 98Ss Carlisle Kingmoor  
01/08/1975 Condemned 24061 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
09/08/1975 Reallocation 24023 D09 Manchester Division CD Crewe Diesel  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24020 98S     COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24021 98S     COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24024 98S     COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24026 98S     COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24029 98S     COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24042 98S     COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24045 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
10/08/1975 Condemned 24048 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24003 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24006 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24008 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24012 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24015 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24016 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24018 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24071 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24095 98S     COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24096 65A Eastfield   COND  
16/08/1975 Condemned 24098 65A Eastfield   COND  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24037 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24041 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24046 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24049 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24106 ED Eastfield HA Haymarket  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24107 ED Eastfield HA Haymarket  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24108 ED Eastfield HA Haymarket  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24109 ED Eastfield HA Haymarket  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24111 ED Eastfield HA Haymarket  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24147 65A Eastfield HA Haymarket  
23/08/1975 Reallocation 24150 65A Eastfield HA Haymarket  
27/09/1975 Reallocation 24009 98S   HA Haymarket  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24031 98S     COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24033 98S     COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24050 98S     COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24055 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24056 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24058 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24059 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24060 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24074 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24076 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24092 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
04/10/1975 Condemned 24136 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24001 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24002 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24004 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24007 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24010 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24011 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24013 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24014 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24017 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24019 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24072 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24105 98S     COND  
05/10/1975 Condemned 24148 98S     COND  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24110 IS Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24113 IS Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24115 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24116 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24118 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24120 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24121 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24123 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24125 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24126 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
25/10/1975 Reallocation 24128 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24106 98S   HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24112 IS Inverness HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24119 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24124 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24127 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24129 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
15/11/1975 Reallocation 24130 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
29/11/1975 Reallocation 24117 60A Inverness HA Haymarket  
20/12/1975 Reallocation 24027 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
20/12/1975 Reallocation 24038 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
20/12/1975 Reallocation 24041 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
20/12/1975 Reallocation 24046 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
03/01/1976 Reallocation 24065 98S   HA Haymarket  
03/01/1976 Reallocation 24069 98S   HA Haymarket  
03/01/1976 Reallocation 24094 64B Haymarket HA Haymarket  
04/01/1976 Condemned 24040 98S     COND  
04/01/1976 Condemned 24086 98S     COND  
04/01/1976 Condemned 24089 98S     COND  
04/01/1976 Condemned 24135 98S     COND  
24/01/1976 Reallocation 24041 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24005 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24022 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24025 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24034 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24044 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24049 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24053 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24064 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24075 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24140 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24143 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24144 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24145 98S     COND  
31/01/1976 Condemned 24146 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24066 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24070 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24073 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24090 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24097 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24099 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24100 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24101 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24102 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24109 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24111 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24117 HA Haymarket   COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24126 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24127 98S     COND  
02/02/1976 Condemned 24132 98S     COND  
20/03/1976 Reallocation 24137 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
27/03/1976 Condemned 24083 98S     COND  
27/03/1976 Condemned 24125 98S     COND  
24/04/1976 Condemned 24078 98S     COND  
01/05/1976 Reallocation 24103 98S   HA Haymarket  
01/05/1976 Reallocation 24104 98S   HA Haymarket  
01/07/1976 Condemned 24054 98S     COND  
01/07/1976 Condemned 24142 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24027 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24030 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24032 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24037 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24038 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24039 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24041 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24046 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24077 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24079 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24084 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24085 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24137 98S     COND  
17/07/1976 Condemned 24141 98S     COND  
18/07/1976 Condemned 24009 98S     COND  
18/07/1976 Condemned 24108 98S     COND  
18/07/1976 Condemned 24119 98S     COND  
18/07/1976 Condemned 24123 98S     COND  
18/07/1976 Condemned 24128 98S     COND  
18/07/1976 Condemned 24147 98S     COND  
24/07/1976 Reallocation 24087 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
15/09/1976 Condemned 24116 HA Haymarket   COND  
22/09/1976 Condemned 24080 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
29/09/1976 Condemned 24094 HA Haymarket   COND  
02/10/1976 Reallocation 24082 98S   CD Crewe Diesel  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24069 98S     COND  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24103 98S     COND  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24107 HA Haymarket   COND  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24110 HA Haymarket   COND  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24124 98S     COND  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24130 HA Haymarket   COND  
01/12/1976 Condemned 24150 HA Haymarket   COND  
04/12/1976 Condemned 24052 98S     COND  
04/12/1976 Condemned 24134 98S     COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24065 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24104 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24106 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24112 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24113 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24115 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24118 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24120 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24121 HA Haymarket   COND  
31/12/1976 Condemned 24129 HA Haymarket   COND  
20/11/1977 Condemned 24036 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
20/11/1977 Condemned 24091 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
15/01/1978 Condemned 24057 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
01/02/1978 Condemned 24087 CD Crewe Diesel   COND  
12/03/1978 Condemned 24133 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
03/09/1978 Condemned 24023 CD Crewe Diesel   COND  
15/10/1978 Condemned 24035 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
16/11/1978 Condemned 24047 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
01/03/1979 Condemned 24082 CD Crewe Diesel   COND  
09/04/1979 Condemned 24063 D05 Stoke Division   COND  
05/10/1980 Condemned 24081 D05 Stoke Division   COND