EE & RSH Ltd 20 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (20/0) | BR (20/3 (BR)) | BR (20/0 (R)) | BR (20/9) | BR (20/3 (RFS)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D8041 | 20041 | 20904 | 06/11/1959 | EE | Norwich Thorpe | 64.19 | ||||||||||
D8060 | 20060 | 20902 | 24/05/1961 | RS | Sheffield Darnall | 62.64 | ||||||||||
D8083 | 20083 | 20903 | 12/09/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.34 | ||||||||||
D8101 | 20101 | 20901 | 22/11/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.14 | ||||||||||
D8309 | 20209 | 20907 | 20/05/1967 | EE | York (North) | 24/02/1989 | 21.75 | Cut | Michael Douglas Ltd (Carlisle) | 12/2001 | 34.60 | |||||
D8319 | 20219 | 20906 | 27/01/1968 | EE | Haymarket | 55.96 | ||||||||||
D8325 | 20225 | 20905 | 07/02/1968 | EE | Polmadie | 55.93 |