EE & RSH Ltd 20 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (20/0) | BR (20/3 (BR)) | BR (20/0 (R)) | BR (20/9) | BR (20/3 (RFS)) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D8042 | 20042 | 20312 | 11/11/1959 | EE | Norwich Thorpe | 64.22 | ||||||||||
D8047 | 20047 | 20301 | 18/12/1959 | EE | Hornsey | 64.12 | ||||||||||
D8050 | 20128 | 20307 | 02/03/1961 | RS | Sheffield Darnall | 62.91 | ||||||||||
D8075 | 20075 | 20308 | 26/07/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.51 | ||||||||||
D8084 | 20084 | 20302 | 12/09/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.38 | ||||||||||
D8095 | 20095 | 20305 | 26/10/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.26 | ||||||||||
D8102 | 20102 | 20310 | 01/12/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.16 | ||||||||||
D8104 | 20104 | 20315 | 08/12/1961 | RS | Eastfield | 62.14 | ||||||||||
D8117 | 20117 | 20314 | 23/02/1962 | RS | Polmadie | 61.93 | ||||||||||
D8120 | 20120 | 20304 | 16/03/1962 | RS | Polmadie | 61.87 | ||||||||||
D8127 | 20127 | 20303 | 16/07/1962 | RS | Polmadie | 61.54 | ||||||||||
D8131 | 20131 | 20306 | 26/02/1966 | EE | Tinsley | 57.92 | ||||||||||
D8187 | 20187 | 20309 | 21/01/1967 | EE | Nottingham Division | 57.02 | ||||||||||
D8190 | 20190 | 20311 | 28/01/1967 | EE | Nottingham Division | 57.00 | ||||||||||
D8194 | 20194 | 20307 | 20194 | 20313 | 25/02/1967 | EE | Nottingham Division | 56.92 |