EE & RSH Ltd 20 Bo-Bo
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 26/02/1961 | D8027 | 34G | Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - New erecting shop. | |||
Fri 15/12/1961 | D8016, D8037 |
1D, 1B |
Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Finishing shop. Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Diesel erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 08/04/1962 | D8005, D8015, D8019 |
1A, 1D, 1D |
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - New erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop yard. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Fri 08/06/1962 | D8005 | 1A | Derby Works visit: Around the works - ex Works on shed. | SLS 7/1962 | ||
Sat 15/07/1967 | D8089, D8101, D8101, D8112 |
65A, 65A, 65A, 65A |
Inverurie Works visit: On works Inverurie Works visit: On works Inverurie Works visit: On works Inverurie Works visit: On works |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 05/11/1967 | D8323 | 64B | Millerhill stabling point: On Millerhill stabling point. | RCTS 1/1968 | ||
Fri 26/04/1968 | D8020 | 52A | On Haymarket depot | RCTS 6/1968 | ||
Thu 15/08/1968 | D8020, D8102, D8102, D8103 |
52A, 65A, 65A, 65A |
Inverurie Works visit: In Works - In the yard Inverurie Works visit: In Works Inverurie Works visit: In Works Inverurie Works visit: In Works |
RO 10/1968 | ||
Wed 28/08/1968 | D8091 | 65A | Inverurie Works visit: In Works - In the shops | RO 11/1968 | ||
Wed 28/08/1968 | D8103, D8316 |
65A, 65A |
Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed |
RO 11/1968 | ||
Sun 15/06/1969 | D8076 | 66A | Corkerhill depot: On shed | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D8083, D8083, D8090, D8319, D8319, D8320 |
65A, 65A, 65A, 65A, 65A, 65A |
Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed Grangemouth depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 12/07/1969 | D8079 | 65A | Stabled at Greenhill Junction | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 13/07/1969 | D8096, D8097, D8098, D8110, D8116, D8117, D8117, D8120, D8120, D8123 |
66A, 65A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A, 66A |
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Thu 17/07/1969 | D8081, D8322 |
65A, 66A |
Glasgow Works visit: In Works Glasgow Works visit: In Works |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Thu 17/07/1969 | D8096, D8122, D8123 |
66A, 66A, 66A |
Motherwell depot: On shed Motherwell depot: On shed Motherwell depot: On shed |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 27/07/1969 | D8025, D8042, D8042, D8172, D8302 |
52A, D16, D16, D16, 55B |
Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop |
RO 9/1969 | ||
Sun 03/08/1969 | D8081, D8322 |
65A, 66A |
Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works |
RO 10/1969 | ||
Fri 20/08/1971 | D8095, D8095, D8117, D8117 |
66A, 66A, 66A, 66A |
Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Shunting - BR blue with full yellow ends. Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Shunting - BR blue with full yellow ends. Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - blue with full yellow ends. Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - blue with full yellow ends. |
Keith Long | ||
Mon 27/12/1971 | D8167 | D16 | Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot | RO 517 | ||
Sun 30/01/1972 | D8115, D8142, D8147, D8151, D8179, D8191, D8302, D8315 |
D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, 41A, 41A |
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings. Severe collision damage. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sun 06/02/1972 | D8002, D8006, D8012, D8014, D8015, D8035, D8036, D8037, D8039, D8040, D8042, D8042, D8043, D8044, D8047, D8047, D8062, D8063, D8064, D8066, D8069, D8071, D8073, D8074, D8076, D8081, D8083, D8083, D8087, D8088, D8136, D8139, D8141, D8145, D8148, D8149, D8153, D8157, D8158, D8159, D8162, D8165, D8166, D8167, D8170, D8172, D8173, D8176, D8177, D8178, D8180, D8183, D8184, D8187, D8187, D8188, D8190, D8190, D8196, D8197, D8199 |
D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16, D16 |
Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed |
RO 4/1972 | ||
Sun 06/02/1972 | D8155 | D16 | Derby Works visit: Around the works - Wagon repair shop. | RO 4/1972 |