EE & RSH Ltd 20 Bo-Bo
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
18/06/1957 | To Service | 8000 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
08/07/1957 | To Service | 8001 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
25/07/1957 | To Service | 8002 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
09/08/1957 | To Service | 8004 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
23/08/1957 | To Service | 8003 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
24/08/1957 | Reallocation | 8000 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1D | Toton | |
07/09/1957 | Reallocation | 8000 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
09/09/1957 | To Service | 8005 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
16/09/1957 | To Service | 8006 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
19/09/1957 | To Service | 8007 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
01/10/1957 | To Service | 8008 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
08/10/1957 | To Service | 8009 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
16/10/1957 | To Service | 8010 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
29/10/1957 | To Service | 8011 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
11/11/1957 | To Service | 8012 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
26/11/1957 | To Service | 8013 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
16/12/1957 | To Service | 8014 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
20/12/1957 | To Service | 8015 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
30/12/1957 | To Service | 8016 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
08/01/1958 | Reallocation | 8010 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
08/01/1958 | Reallocation | 8011 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
10/01/1958 | To Service | 8017 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
07/02/1958 | To Service | 8018 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
08/02/1958 | Reallocation | 8010 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
08/02/1958 | Reallocation | 8011 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 8010 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
22/02/1958 | Reallocation | 8011 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
04/03/1958 | To Service | 8019 | NEW | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
05/07/1958 | Reallocation | 8000 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1D | Toton | |
12/07/1958 | Reallocation | 8002 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 2A | Rugby | |
09/08/1958 | Reallocation | 8004 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 5B | Crewe South | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 8001 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 5B | Crewe South | |
06/09/1958 | Reallocation | 8003 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 5B | Crewe South | |
20/09/1958 | Reallocation | 8000 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 5B | Crewe South | |
20/09/1958 | Reallocation | 8000 | 5B | Crewe South | 5B | Toton | |
27/09/1958 | Reallocation | 8000 | 5B | Crewe South | 5B | Crewe South | |
04/10/1958 | Reallocation | 8002 | 2A | Rugby | 5B | Crewe South | |
25/10/1958 | Reallocation | 8006 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
08/11/1958 | Reallocation | 8006 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
18/09/1959 | To Service | 8035 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
26/09/1959 | Reallocation | 8035 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1A | Willesden | |
03/10/1959 | To Service | 8020 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
03/10/1959 | To Service | 8036 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
09/10/1959 | To Service | 8037 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
10/10/1959 | Reallocation | 8036 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1A | Willesden | |
17/10/1959 | Reallocation | 8037 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
17/10/1959 | To Service | 8038 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
20/10/1959 | To Service | 8021 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
24/10/1959 | Reallocation | 8038 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
24/10/1959 | To Service | 8039 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
29/10/1959 | To Service | 8022 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
30/10/1959 | To Service | 8040 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 8039 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Devons Road (Bow) | |
06/11/1959 | To Service | 8041 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
11/11/1959 | To Service | 8042 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
13/11/1959 | To Service | 8023 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 8041 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Devons Road (Bow) | |
14/11/1959 | Reallocation | 8042 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
14/11/1959 | To Service | 8043 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 8043 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
24/11/1959 | To Service | 8044 | NEW | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
25/11/1959 | To Service | 8024 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
27/11/1959 | To Service | 8025 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
28/11/1959 | Reallocation | 8044 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
04/12/1959 | To Service | 8026 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
04/12/1959 | To Service | 8045 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
05/12/1959 | Reallocation | 8039 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
05/12/1959 | Reallocation | 8040 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
11/12/1959 | To Service | 8027 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
12/12/1959 | To Service | 8046 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
18/12/1959 | To Service | 8028 | NEW | 64H | Leith Central | ||
18/12/1959 | To Service | 8047 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
28/12/1959 | To Service | 8029 | NEW | 64H | Leith Central | ||
31/12/1959 | To Service | 8030 | NEW | 64H | Leith Central | ||
31/12/1959 | To Service | 8048 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
31/12/1959 | To Service | 8049 | NEW | 34B | Hornsey | ||
02/01/1960 | Reallocation | 8041 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 8028 | 64H | Leith Central | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 8029 | 64H | Leith Central | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 8030 | 64H | Leith Central | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
20/01/1960 | To Service | 8031 | NEW | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
18/02/1960 | To Service | 8032 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
18/02/1960 | To Service | 8033 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
05/03/1960 | Reallocation | 8037 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1B | Camden | |
05/03/1960 | Reallocation | 8039 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1B | Camden | |
12/03/1960 | To Service | 8034 | NEW | 60A | Inverness | ||
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8020 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8021 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8022 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8023 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8024 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8025 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8026 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8027 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8045 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8046 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8047 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8048 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
30/04/1960 | Reallocation | 8049 | 34B | Hornsey | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
21/05/1960 | Reallocation | 8004 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
17/09/1960 | Reallocation | 8002 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
29/10/1960 | Reallocation | 8000 | 5B | Crewe South | 1B | Camden | |
29/10/1960 | Reallocation | 8001 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
29/10/1960 | Reallocation | 8003 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
26/11/1960 | Reallocation | 8038 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
03/12/1960 | Reallocation | 8020 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
02/03/1961 | To Service | 8050 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
10/03/1961 | To Service | 8051 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 8030 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/03/1961 | To Service | 8052 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
06/04/1961 | To Service | 8053 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
08/04/1961 | Reallocation | 8030 | 65A | Eastfield | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
14/04/1961 | To Service | 8055 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
26/04/1961 | To Service | 8056 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
01/05/1961 | To Service | 8057 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 8034 | 60A | Inverness | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
08/05/1961 | To Service | 8058 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
12/05/1961 | To Service | 8059 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
24/05/1961 | To Service | 8060 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
24/05/1961 | To Service | 8061 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
29/05/1961 | To Service | 8062 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
05/06/1961 | To Service | 8063 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
12/06/1961 | To Service | 8054 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
12/06/1961 | To Service | 8064 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
19/06/1961 | To Service | 8065 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
19/06/1961 | To Service | 8066 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
26/06/1961 | To Service | 8067 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
26/06/1961 | To Service | 8068 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
30/06/1961 | To Service | 8069 | NEW | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
30/06/1961 | To Service | 8070 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/07/1961 | To Service | 8071 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/07/1961 | To Service | 8072 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
19/07/1961 | To Service | 8073 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
19/07/1961 | To Service | 8074 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/07/1961 | To Service | 8075 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/07/1961 | To Service | 8076 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
28/07/1961 | To Service | 8077 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
28/07/1961 | To Service | 8078 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 8005 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
28/08/1961 | To Service | 8079 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
28/08/1961 | To Service | 8080 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
31/08/1961 | To Service | 8081 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
31/08/1961 | To Service | 8082 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
12/09/1961 | To Service | 8083 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
12/09/1961 | To Service | 8084 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
18/09/1961 | To Service | 8085 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
18/09/1961 | To Service | 8086 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/09/1961 | To Service | 8087 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/09/1961 | To Service | 8088 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
29/09/1961 | To Service | 8090 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
03/10/1961 | To Service | 8089 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/10/1961 | To Service | 8091 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/10/1961 | To Service | 8092 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
14/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8035 | 1A | Willesden | 5B | Crewe South | |
17/10/1961 | To Service | 8093 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
17/10/1961 | To Service | 8094 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8071 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8071 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8072 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8072 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8073 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8073 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8074 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8074 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8081 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8081 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8083 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8083 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8084 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 8084 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
26/10/1961 | To Service | 8095 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/10/1961 | To Service | 8096 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
08/11/1961 | To Service | 8097 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
08/11/1961 | To Service | 8098 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
15/11/1961 | To Service | 8099 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
22/11/1961 | To Service | 8100 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
22/11/1961 | To Service | 8101 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
01/12/1961 | To Service | 8102 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
01/12/1961 | To Service | 8103 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
08/12/1961 | To Service | 8104 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
08/12/1961 | To Service | 8105 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
12/12/1961 | To Service | 8106 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
20/12/1961 | To Service | 8107 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
20/12/1961 | To Service | 8108 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
29/12/1961 | To Service | 8109 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/01/1962 | To Service | 8110 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
18/01/1962 | To Service | 8111 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
26/01/1962 | To Service | 8112 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
01/02/1962 | To Service | 8113 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
08/02/1962 | To Service | 8114 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
08/02/1962 | To Service | 8115 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 8035 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
10/02/1962 | Reallocation | 8038 | 1A | Willesden | 5B | Crewe South | |
15/02/1962 | To Service | 8116 | NEW | 65A | Eastfield | ||
23/02/1962 | To Service | 8117 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
08/03/1962 | To Service | 8118 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
08/03/1962 | To Service | 8119 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
16/03/1962 | To Service | 8120 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
16/03/1962 | To Service | 8121 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
22/03/1962 | To Service | 8122 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
29/03/1962 | To Service | 8123 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
13/04/1962 | To Service | 8124 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 8043 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 8044 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
25/04/1962 | To Service | 8125 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
12/05/1962 | Reallocation | 8021 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/05/1962 | Reallocation | 8023 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
12/05/1962 | Reallocation | 8024 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
15/05/1962 | To Service | 8126 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
26/05/1962 | Reallocation | 8022 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | |
02/06/1962 | Reallocation | 8038 | 5B | Crewe South | 1A | Willesden | |
16/07/1962 | To Service | 8127 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 8085 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
15/09/1962 | Reallocation | 8020 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 8086 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 8117 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
29/09/1962 | Reallocation | 8118 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
02/03/1963 | Reallocation | 8021 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 34G | Finsbury Park | |
20/07/1963 | Reallocation | 8041 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
20/07/1963 | Reallocation | 8042 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
14/09/1963 | Reallocation | 8040 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1B | Camden | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 8118 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8006 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8007 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8008 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8009 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8010 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8011 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8012 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 1A | Willesden | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8013 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8014 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8015 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8016 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8017 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8018 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
15/02/1964 | Reallocation | 8019 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 30A | Stratford | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8022 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8023 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8024 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8050 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8051 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8052 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8053 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8054 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8055 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8056 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8057 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8058 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8059 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8060 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8061 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8062 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8063 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8064 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8065 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8066 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8067 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8068 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/04/1964 | Reallocation | 8069 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 41A | Tinsley | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 8113 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 8114 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 8115 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 8116 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 8117 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
06/06/1965 | Reallocation | 8069 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Cardiff Canton | |
22/06/1965 | Reallocation | 8069 | 41A | Tinsley | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8022 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8023 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8024 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8050 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8051 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8052 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/08/1965 | Reallocation | 8053 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
18/09/1965 | Reallocation | 8056 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
02/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8000 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
09/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8013 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8014 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8054 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8055 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
09/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8057 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8031 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 60A | Inverness | |
30/10/1965 | Reallocation | 8034 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 60A | Inverness | |
01/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8039 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
01/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8040 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
03/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8037 | 1B | Camden | 1A | Willesden | |
12/01/1966 | To Service | 8128 | NEW | 41A | Tinsley | ||
15/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8041 | 1A | Willesden | 1A | Bescot | |
15/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8066 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8058 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8066 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8069 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
22/01/1966 | Reallocation | 8069 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
05/02/1966 | Reallocation | 8128 | 41A | Tinsley | 8B | Warrington Dallam | |
12/02/1966 | To Service | 8129 | NEW | 41A | Tinsley | ||
17/02/1966 | To Service | 8130 | NEW | 41A | Tinsley | ||
26/02/1966 | Reallocation | 8058 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/02/1966 | Reallocation | 8064 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
26/02/1966 | Reallocation | 8128 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/02/1966 | To Service | 8131 | NEW | 41A | Tinsley | ||
05/03/1966 | To Service | 8132 | NEW | 41A | Tinsley | ||
12/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8041 | 1A | Willesden | 2F | Bescot | |
12/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8042 | 1A | Willesden | 2F | Bescot | |
12/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8043 | 1A | Willesden | 2F | Bescot | |
17/03/1966 | To Service | 8133 | NEW | 41A | Tinsley | ||
18/03/1966 | To Service | 8134 | NEW | 2F | Bescot | ||
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8028 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8029 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8030 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/03/1966 | Reallocation | 8064 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
26/03/1966 | To Service | 8135 | NEW | 2F | Bescot | ||
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8000 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8001 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8002 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8003 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8004 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8005 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8006 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8007 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8008 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8009 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8010 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8011 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8012 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8035 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8036 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8037 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8038 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8039 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8040 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8041 | 2F | Bescot | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8042 | 2F | Bescot | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8043 | 2F | Bescot | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8044 | 1A | Willesden | D01 | London Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8134 | 2F | Bescot | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8135 | 2F | Bescot | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
18/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8136 | D02 | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8015 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8016 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8017 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8018 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8019 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8020 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8021 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8025 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8026 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8027 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8045 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8046 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8047 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8048 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8049 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 40B | Immingham | |
23/04/1966 | To Service | 8138 | NEW | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
26/04/1966 | To Service | 8139 | NEW | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
30/04/1966 | Reallocation | 8139 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
21/05/1966 | To Service | 8140 | NEW | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
21/05/1966 | To Service | 8141 | NEW | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
21/05/1966 | To Service | 8142 | NEW | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8060 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8061 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8062 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8067 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8129 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8131 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
28/05/1966 | Reallocation | 8133 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
10/06/1966 | To Service | 8145 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
10/06/1966 | To Service | 8146 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
18/06/1966 | Reallocation | 8063 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
18/06/1966 | Reallocation | 8128 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
18/06/1966 | Reallocation | 8130 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
18/06/1966 | Reallocation | 8132 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
23/06/1966 | To Service | 8147 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
27/06/1966 | To Service | 8148 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
28/06/1966 | To Service | 8144 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
05/07/1966 | To Service | 8149 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
05/07/1966 | To Service | 8150 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
06/07/1966 | To Service | 8143 | NEW | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
09/07/1966 | Reallocation | 8041 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D01 | London Division | |
09/07/1966 | Reallocation | 8042 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D01 | London Division | |
09/07/1966 | Reallocation | 8043 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D01 | London Division | |
09/07/1966 | Reallocation | 8138 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
09/07/1966 | Reallocation | 8139 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
12/07/1966 | To Service | 8151 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
15/08/1966 | To Service | 8152 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
15/08/1966 | To Service | 8153 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
15/08/1966 | To Service | 8154 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
23/08/1966 | To Service | 8155 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
26/08/1966 | To Service | 8156 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
02/09/1966 | To Service | 8157 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
02/09/1966 | To Service | 8158 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
09/09/1966 | To Service | 8159 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
19/09/1966 | To Service | 8160 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
19/09/1966 | To Service | 8161 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
19/09/1966 | To Service | 8162 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
23/09/1966 | To Service | 8163 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 8042 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 8043 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 8044 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
05/10/1966 | To Service | 8164 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
05/10/1966 | To Service | 8165 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 8013 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 8014 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 8020 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1966 | To Service | 8166 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
17/10/1966 | To Service | 8167 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
19/10/1966 | To Service | 8168 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/10/1966 | To Service | 8169 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/10/1966 | To Service | 8170 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
27/10/1966 | To Service | 8171 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
28/10/1966 | To Service | 8172 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
04/11/1966 | To Service | 8174 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
08/11/1966 | To Service | 8175 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
16/11/1966 | To Service | 8176 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
18/11/1966 | To Service | 8177 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 8031 | 60A | Inverness | 66A | Polmadie | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 8032 | 60A | Inverness | 64B | Haymarket | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 8033 | 60A | Inverness | 66A | Polmadie | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 8034 | 60A | Inverness | 66A | Polmadie | |
03/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8023 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
03/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8053 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
03/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8054 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
03/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8055 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
08/12/1966 | To Service | 8173 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
16/12/1966 | To Service | 8178 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
16/12/1966 | To Service | 8179 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
16/12/1966 | To Service | 8180 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
16/12/1966 | To Service | 8182 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
16/12/1966 | To Service | 8183 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
19/12/1966 | To Service | 8181 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
19/12/1966 | To Service | 8184 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
31/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8072 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
31/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8075 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
31/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8076 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
31/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8077 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
31/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8106 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
31/12/1966 | Reallocation | 8110 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
07/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8053 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
07/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8054 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
07/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8055 | 30A | Stratford | 40B | Immingham | |
21/01/1967 | To Service | 8186 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
21/01/1967 | To Service | 8187 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
21/01/1967 | To Service | 8188 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
21/01/1967 | To Service | 8189 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8018 | 41A | Tinsley | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8019 | 41A | Tinsley | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8020 | 41A | Tinsley | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8021 | 40B | Immingham | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8022 | 40B | Immingham | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8023 | 30A | Stratford | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8024 | 40B | Immingham | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8025 | 40B | Immingham | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8026 | 40B | Immingham | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | Reallocation | 8027 | 40B | Immingham | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/01/1967 | To Service | 8190 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8185 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8191 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8192 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8193 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8194 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8195 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8196 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
25/02/1967 | To Service | 8197 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8052 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8053 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8054 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8055 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8056 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8057 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8072 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 66A | Polmadie | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8075 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 66A | Polmadie | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8076 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 66A | Polmadie | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8077 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 65A | Eastfield | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8106 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 66A | Polmadie | |
25/03/1967 | Reallocation | 8110 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 66A | Polmadie | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 8041 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8198 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8199 | NEW | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8300 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8301 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8302 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8303 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8304 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8305 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
22/04/1967 | To Service | 8306 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8307 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8308 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8309 | NEW | 50A | York (North) | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8310 | NEW | 51L | Thornaby | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8311 | NEW | 51L | Thornaby | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8312 | NEW | 51L | Thornaby | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8313 | NEW | 51L | Thornaby | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8314 | NEW | 51L | Thornaby | ||
20/05/1967 | To Service | 8315 | NEW | 51L | Thornaby | ||
26/05/1967 | To Service | 8316 | NEW | 64B | Haymarket | ||
10/06/1967 | Reallocation | 8040 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 8018 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 8019 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 8028 | 64B | Haymarket | 52A | Gateshead | |
15/07/1967 | Reallocation | 8020 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
15/07/1967 | Reallocation | 8027 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/07/1967 | Reallocation | 8022 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/07/1967 | Reallocation | 8025 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8021 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8052 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8053 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
12/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8054 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
19/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8013 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
19/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8014 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
19/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8015 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
26/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8029 | 64B | Haymarket | 52A | Gateshead | |
26/08/1967 | Reallocation | 8085 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8045 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8046 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8047 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
09/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8048 | 40B | Immingham | 52A | Gateshead | |
16/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8013 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D01 | London Division | |
16/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8014 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D01 | London Division | |
16/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8015 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D01 | London Division | |
16/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8037 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
16/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8038 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
16/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8039 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8023 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8024 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8026 | 66A | Polmadie | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8031 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8033 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8045 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8046 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8047 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8048 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8085 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
30/09/1967 | Reallocation | 8111 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 8055 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 8056 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
07/10/1967 | Reallocation | 8057 | 41A | Tinsley | 40B | Immingham | |
20/10/1967 | To Service | 8323 | NEW | 64B | Haymarket | ||
28/10/1967 | Reallocation | 8078 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/10/1967 | Reallocation | 8081 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
11/11/1967 | Reallocation | 8035 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
11/11/1967 | Reallocation | 8036 | D01 | London Division | D02 | Birmingham Division | |
18/11/1967 | Reallocation | 8045 | 52A | Gateshead | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
18/11/1967 | Reallocation | 8046 | 52A | Gateshead | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
18/11/1967 | Reallocation | 8047 | 52A | Gateshead | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
18/11/1967 | Reallocation | 8048 | 52A | Gateshead | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/11/1967 | To Service | 8317 | NEW | 64B | Haymarket | ||
25/11/1967 | To Service | 8318 | NEW | 64B | Haymarket | ||
25/11/1967 | To Service | 8320 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
12/1967 | Reallocation | 8045 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/1967 | Reallocation | 8046 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/1967 | Reallocation | 8048 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
30/12/1967 | To Service | 8321 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
30/12/1967 | To Service | 8322 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
31/12/1967 | Reallocation | 8047 | D16 | Nottingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8074 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8089 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8092 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8096 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8098 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/01/1968 | To Service | 8319 | NEW | 64B | Haymarket | ||
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8320 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
27/01/1968 | Reallocation | 8321 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
03/02/1968 | Reallocation | 8142 | D02 | Birmingham Division | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | |
03/02/1968 | Reallocation | 8143 | D02 | Birmingham Division | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | |
07/02/1968 | To Service | 8324 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
07/02/1968 | To Service | 8325 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
07/02/1968 | To Service | 8326 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
07/02/1968 | To Service | 8327 | NEW | 66A | Polmadie | ||
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 8322 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 8323 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/02/1968 | Reallocation | 8323 | 64B | Haymarket | 66A | Polmadie | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8016 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8017 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8058 | 41A | Tinsley | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8059 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8060 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8061 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8062 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8063 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8064 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8065 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8066 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8067 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8068 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
06/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8069 | 41A | Tinsley | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8095 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8096 | 66A | Polmadie | 66A | Polmadie | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8310 | 51L | Thornaby | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8311 | 51L | Thornaby | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8312 | 51L | Thornaby | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8313 | 51L | Thornaby | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8314 | 51L | Thornaby | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8325 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
27/04/1968 | Reallocation | 8326 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
25/05/1968 | Reallocation | 8315 | 51L | Thornaby | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8316 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8317 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8318 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8319 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
08/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8030 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8031 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8033 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
17/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8142 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
17/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8143 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
22/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8018 | 52A | Gateshead | 55B | York (North) | |
29/06/1968 | Reallocation | 8080 | 65A | Eastfield | 60A | Inverness | |
06/07/1968 | Reallocation | 8032 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 8055 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 8056 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
10/08/1968 | Reallocation | 8057 | 40B | Immingham | 30A | Stratford | |
17/08/1968 | Reallocation | 8019 | 52A | Gateshead | 30A | Stratford | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8030 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 30A | Stratford | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8031 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 30A | Stratford | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8032 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 30A | Stratford | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8033 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 30A | Stratford | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8035 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8036 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8040 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
14/09/1968 | Reallocation | 8041 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
26/10/1968 | Reallocation | 8080 | 60A | Inverness | 65A | Eastfield | |
26/10/1968 | Reallocation | 8100 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
26/10/1968 | Reallocation | 8101 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
26/10/1968 | Reallocation | 8102 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8042 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8043 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8044 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8075 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8138 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8139 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8140 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/01/1969 | Reallocation | 8141 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/02/1969 | Reallocation | 8015 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/02/1969 | Reallocation | 8137 | D02 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
01/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8085 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8086 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8112 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
01/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8317 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
01/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8322 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
01/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8327 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8071 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8091 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8111 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8114 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8115 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8125 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8070 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8073 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8077 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/03/1969 | Reallocation | 8079 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
10/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8012 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
10/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8013 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
10/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8014 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
10/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8136 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
17/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8058 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 40B | Immingham | |
31/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8078 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8081 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8102 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8112 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8325 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
31/05/1969 | Reallocation | 8326 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 8070 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 8073 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 8074 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 8077 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 8079 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
28/06/1969 | Reallocation | 8092 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
05/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8034 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
05/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8075 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8006 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8007 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8008 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8009 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8010 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
12/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8011 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
26/07/1969 | Reallocation | 8092 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/08/1969 | Reallocation | 8000 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
09/08/1969 | Reallocation | 8001 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
09/08/1969 | Reallocation | 8002 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
09/08/1969 | Reallocation | 8003 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
09/08/1969 | Reallocation | 8004 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
09/08/1969 | Reallocation | 8005 | D01 | London Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8019 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8030 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8057 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8134 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8135 | D02 | Birmingham Division | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8310 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8311 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8312 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8313 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8314 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 41A | Tinsley | |
11/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8315 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 41A | Tinsley | |
25/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8070 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
25/10/1969 | Reallocation | 8112 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8030 | 55B | York (North) | 30A | Stratford | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8031 | 30A | Stratford | 55B | York (North) | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8083 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8092 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8099 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8322 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
01/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8324 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8073 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8076 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8087 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8088 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
08/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8122 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
15/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8113 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
15/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8118 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
15/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8121 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8074 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8077 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8078 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8079 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
29/11/1969 | Reallocation | 8080 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8072 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8074 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8077 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8081 | 65A | Eastfield | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8082 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8090 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8092 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8094 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/02/1970 | Reallocation | 8101 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 8096 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
07/03/1970 | Reallocation | 8098 | 66A | Polmadie | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
28/03/1970 | Reallocation | 8084 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
28/03/1970 | Reallocation | 8093 | 65A | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
18/04/1970 | Reallocation | 8019 | 55B | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
18/04/1970 | Reallocation | 8029 | 52A | Gateshead | 55B | York (North) | |
30/05/1970 | Reallocation | 8092 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
30/05/1970 | Reallocation | 8320 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 8018 | 55B | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
06/06/1970 | Reallocation | 8027 | 52A | Gateshead | 55B | York (North) | |
27/06/1970 | Reallocation | 8024 | 52A | Gateshead | 55B | York (North) | |
27/06/1970 | Reallocation | 8031 | 55B | York (North) | 52A | Gateshead | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8018 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8019 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8020 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8021 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8022 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8023 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8025 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8026 | 52A | Gateshead | 41A | Tinsley | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8027 | 55B | York (North) | 40B | Immingham | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8028 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8029 | 55B | York (North) | 40B | Immingham | |
10/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8031 | 52A | Gateshead | 40B | Immingham | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8000 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8001 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8004 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8005 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8007 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8008 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8010 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8017 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8034 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8041 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8046 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8048 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8059 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8060 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8061 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
17/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8065 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 41A | Tinsley | |
24/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8033 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
31/10/1970 | Reallocation | 8084 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
08/05/1971 | Reallocation | 8058 | 40B | Immingham | 41A | Tinsley | |
15/05/1971 | Reallocation | 8032 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
07/08/1971 | Reallocation | 8082 | 66A | Polmadie | 64B | Haymarket | |
02/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8082 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8000 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8001 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8004 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8005 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8007 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8008 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8010 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8017 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8018 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8019 | 41A | Tinsley | 64B | Haymarket | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8024 | 55B | York (North) | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8027 | 40B | Immingham | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8030 | 30A | Stratford | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8034 | 41A | Tinsley | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8041 | 41A | Tinsley | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8046 | 41A | Tinsley | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8048 | 41A | Tinsley | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8055 | 30A | Stratford | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8056 | 30A | Stratford | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8091 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8096 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8098 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8099 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8101 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8112 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8113 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8118 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8121 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8125 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 66A | Polmadie | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8300 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8301 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8302 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8303 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8304 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8305 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8306 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8307 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8308 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
09/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8309 | 50A | York (North) | 41A | Tinsley | |
30/10/1971 | Reallocation | 8082 | 64B | Haymarket | 66A | Polmadie | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8078 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8079 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8080 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8082 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8089 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8090 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8091 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8093 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8094 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8095 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8096 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8097 | 65A | Eastfield | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8098 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8099 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8100 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8101 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8106 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8110 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8112 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8113 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8116 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8117 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8118 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8119 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8120 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8121 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8123 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8124 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8125 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8126 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
01/04/1972 | Reallocation | 8127 | 66A | Polmadie | 65A | Eastfield | |
27/01/1973 | Reallocation | 8318 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
27/01/1973 | Reallocation | 8319 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
24/02/1973 | Reallocation | 8000 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/02/1973 | Reallocation | 8007 | 64B | Haymarket | 65A | Eastfield | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8001 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8005 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8008 | 64B | Haymarket | D16 | Nottingham Division | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8179 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 64B | Haymarket | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8184 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 64B | Haymarket | |
24/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8191 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 64B | Haymarket | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8128 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 41A | Tinsley | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8129 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 41A | Tinsley | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8130 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 41A | Tinsley | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8131 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 41A | Tinsley | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8132 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 41A | Tinsley | |
31/03/1973 | Reallocation | 8133 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 41A | Tinsley | |
21/04/1973 | Reallocation | 8000 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
21/04/1973 | Reallocation | 8007 | 65A | Eastfield | 64B | Haymarket | |
12/05/1973 | Reallocation | 8091 | 65A | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
12/05/1973 | Reallocation | 8092 | 65A | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
12/05/1973 | Reallocation | 8127 | 65A | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
19/05/1973 | Reallocation | 8026 | 41A | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8026 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8049 | 40B | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8091 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8092 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
02/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8127 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
16/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8086 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
16/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8179 | 64B | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
16/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8184 | 64B | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
16/06/1973 | Reallocation | 8316 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8004 | 64B | Haymarket | TO | Toton | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8011 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8015 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8036 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8039 | D16 | Nottingham Division | HA | Haymarket | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8041 | 65A | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8082 | 65A | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
01/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8084 | 65A | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
08/09/1973 | Reallocation | 8085 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 8003 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
06/10/1973 | Reallocation | 8050 | 40B | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
13/10/1973 | Reallocation | 8119 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8000 | 64B | Haymarket | TO | Toton | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8090 | 65A | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8097 | 65A | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8111 | D16 | Nottingham Division | HA | Haymarket | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8113 | 65A | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8114 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8115 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
10/11/1973 | Reallocation | 8122 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
29/12/1973 | Reallocation | 8316 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 8002 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 20026 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 20083 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 20137 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
11/05/1974 | Reallocation | 20138 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20007 | 64B | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20010 | 64B | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20017 | 64B | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20018 | 64B | Haymarket | TO | Toton | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20019 | 64B | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
12/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20030 | 65A | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
19/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20017 | IM | Immingham | HA | Haymarket | |
19/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20019 | IM | Immingham | HA | Haymarket | |
19/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20030 | IM | Immingham | HA | Haymarket | |
26/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20024 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
26/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20027 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
26/10/1974 | Reallocation | 20034 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
11/01/1975 | Reallocation | 20054 | 40B | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 20007 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 20010 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 20144 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
08/03/1975 | Reallocation | 20145 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20024 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20027 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20034 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20039 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20085 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20179 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20184 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20216 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20221 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
24/05/1975 | Reallocation | 20223 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
21/06/1975 | Reallocation | 20024 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
21/06/1975 | Reallocation | 20027 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
21/06/1975 | Reallocation | 20039 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
21/06/1975 | Reallocation | 20085 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
23/08/1975 | Reallocation | 20024 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
23/08/1975 | Reallocation | 20027 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
23/08/1975 | Reallocation | 20039 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
23/08/1975 | Reallocation | 20085 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 20050 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 20001 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 20004 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 20005 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 20006 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
08/11/1975 | Reallocation | 20016 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
31/01/1976 | Condemned | 20074 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 20030 | HA | Haymarket | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 20048 | 65A | Eastfield | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 20146 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
06/03/1976 | Reallocation | 20149 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
27/03/1976 | Condemned | 20012 | 98S | COND | |||
27/03/1976 | Condemned | 20014 | 98S | COND | |||
27/03/1976 | Condemned | 20038 | 98S | COND | |||
17/04/1976 | Reallocation | 20008 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20017 | HA | Haymarket | TI | Tinsley | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20078 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20079 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20098 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20200 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20201 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20202 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
04/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20203 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
24/07/1976 | Reallocation | 20046 | 65A | Eastfield | ED | Eastfield | |
07/08/1976 | Reallocation | 20013 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
18/09/1976 | Condemned | 20062 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
10/1976 | Reallocation | 20037 | 98S | TO | Toton | ||
04/12/1976 | Condemned | 20018 | 98S | COND | |||
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20019 | HA | Haymarket | TI | Tinsley | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20034 | ED | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20055 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20100 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20204 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20205 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20206 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
12/12/1976 | Reallocation | 20207 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20068 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20084 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20084 | TO | Toton | TI | Tinsley | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20142 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20143 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20148 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20159 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20159 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
01/1977 | Reallocation | 20203 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
02/1977 | Reallocation | 20068 | TI | Tinsley | TO | Toton | |
02/1977 | Reallocation | 20084 | IM | Immingham | TO | Toton | |
02/1977 | Reallocation | 20142 | TI | Tinsley | TO | Toton | |
02/1977 | Reallocation | 20143 | TI | Tinsley | TO | Toton | |
02/1977 | Reallocation | 20148 | TI | Tinsley | TO | Toton | |
02/1977 | Reallocation | 20159 | IM | Immingham | TO | Toton | |
25/04/1977 | Condemned | 20079 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
05/1977 | Reallocation | 20100 | TI | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
02/05/1977 | Condemned | 20024 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
07/1977 | Reallocation | 20020 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 20049 | TI | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 20091 | TI | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
07/1977 | Reallocation | 20119 | TI | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 20003 | TI | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
09/1977 | Reallocation | 20007 | TI | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
10/1977 | Reallocation | 20025 | 41A | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
23/11/1977 | Condemned | 20033 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
29/01/1978 | Reallocation | 20023 | 41A | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
02/1978 | Reallocation | 20023 | IM | Immingham | TI | Tinsley | |
04/09/1978 | Condemned | 20091 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20001 | TO | Toton | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20004 | TO | Toton | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20005 | TO | Toton | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20008 | TO | Toton | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20009 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20035 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20096 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
11/1978 | Reallocation | 20112 | 65A | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
06/08/1979 | Condemned | 20200 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
14/12/1980 | Condemned | 20050 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
28/06/1981 | Reallocation | 20139 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Su | Toton | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 20003 | ED | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 20009 | TI | Tinsley | TI | Tinsley | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 20011 | ED | Eastfield | TI | Tinsley | |
26/07/1981 | Reallocation | 20019 | TI | Tinsley | IM | Immingham | |
09/08/1981 | Reallocation | 20110 | 65A | Eastfield | 98Su | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
16/08/1981 | Reallocation | 20003 | IM | Immingham | 98Su | Swindon Works | |
16/08/1981 | Condemned | 20003 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
17/08/1981 | Reallocation | 20100 | ED | Eastfield | 98Su | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20007 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20020 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20020 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20085 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20121 | 65A | Eastfield | ML | Motherwell | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20126 | 65A | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20126 | HA | Haymarket | ML | Motherwell | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20137 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20138 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
09/1981 | Reallocation | 20201 | ED | Eastfield | HA | Haymarket | |
10/1981 | Reallocation | 20042 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Su | Swindon Works | |
10/1981 | Reallocation | 20068 | TO | Toton | TO | Toton | |
10/1981 | Reallocation | 20088 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TO | Toton | |
10/1981 | Reallocation | 20100 | 98Su | 98Su | Millerhill | ||
10/1981 | Reallocation | 20139 | 98Su | 98Su | Swindon Works | ||
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20006 | TO | Toton | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20013 | TO | Toton | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20016 | TO | Toton | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20029 | 40B | Immingham | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20037 | TO | Toton | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20040 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20043 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20044 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20045 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20063 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20067 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20068 | TO | Toton | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20071 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20081 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20087 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20088 | TO | Toton | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
04/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20176 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 98Ss | Leicester Midland | |
20/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20006 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Wigston | ||
20/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20013 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Wigston | ||
20/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20040 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Wigston | ||
20/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20063 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Wigston | ||
20/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20067 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Wigston | ||
20/10/1981 | Reallocation | 20081 | 98Ss | 98Ss | Wigston | ||
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20016 | 98Ss | TO | Toton | ||
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20071 | 98Ss | TO | Toton | ||
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20087 | 98Ss | TO | Toton | ||
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20088 | 98Ss | 98Su | Toton | ||
01/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20176 | 98Ss | TO | Toton | ||
10/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20068 | 98Ss | 98Su | Toton | ||
29/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20109 | 65A | Eastfield | 98Su | Haymarket | |
29/11/1981 | Reallocation | 20197 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
14/02/1982 | Condemned | 20109 | 98Su | COND | |||
05/12/1982 | Condemned | 20017 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
19/12/1982 | Condemned | 20027 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
11/07/1983 | Condemned | 20207 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
11/06/1984 | Condemned | 20036 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
23/09/1986 | Condemned | 20039 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
23/09/1986 | Condemned | 20125 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
26/10/1986 | Condemned | 20184 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
11/01/1987 | Condemned | 20115 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
16/01/1987 | Condemned | 20116 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
21/01/1987 | Condemned | 20037 | 98Ss | COND | |||
21/01/1987 | Condemned | 20067 | 98Ss | COND | |||
02/02/1987 | Condemned | 20011 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
22/04/1987 | Condemned | 20111 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
27/04/1987 | Condemned | 20089 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
30/04/1987 | Condemned | 20123 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/05/1987 | Condemned | 20049 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
16/06/1987 | Condemned | 20068 | 98Su | COND | |||
13/07/1987 | Condemned | 20015 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20054 | TI | Tinsley | TO | Toton | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20063 | 98Ss | TO | Toton | ||
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20228 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20139 | 98Su | TO | Toton | ||
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20145 | TI | Tinsley | TO | Toton | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20146 | ED | Eastfield | TO | Toton | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20148 | TO | Toton | TO | Toton | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20176 | TO | Toton | TO | Toton | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20189 | D16 | Nottingham Division | TO | Toton | |
04/10/1987 | Reallocation | 20217 | 64B | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20149 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20150 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20153 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20155 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20162 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20164 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20167 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20191 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
09/11/1987 | Condemned | 20216 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
10/11/1987 | Condemned | 20220 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
10/11/1987 | Condemned | 20221 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
10/11/1987 | Condemned | 20223 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
12/11/1987 | Condemned | 20181 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
15/12/1987 | Condemned | 20222 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
02/02/1988 | Condemned | 20161 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
19/02/1988 | Condemned | 20002 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
06/04/1988 | Condemned | 20174 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
14/04/1988 | Condemned | 20152 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
20/04/1988 | Condemned | 20001 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
21/04/1988 | Reallocation | 20228 | ED | Eastfield | ED | Eastfield | |
21/04/1988 | Reallocation | 20171 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
04/05/1988 | Condemned | 20076 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20083 | ED | Eastfield | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20086 | HA | Haymarket | TE | Thornaby | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20146 | TO | Toton | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20179 | HA | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20185 | D16 | Nottingham Division | ED | Eastfield | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20201 | HA | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20202 | ED | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20203 | HA | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20204 | ED | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20212 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20213 | 41A | Tinsley | ED | Eastfield | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20218 | 64B | Haymarket | TO | Toton | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20219 | 64B | Haymarket | TO | Toton | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20224 | 64B | Haymarket | TO | Toton | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20225 | 64B | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20226 | 64B | Haymarket | IM | Immingham | |
15/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20227 | 64B | Haymarket | ED | Eastfield | |
16/05/1988 | Condemned | 20077 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20088 | 98Su | TO | Toton | ||
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20228 | ED | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20171 | ED | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
22/05/1988 | Reallocation | 20185 | ED | Eastfield | IM | Immingham | |
12/06/1988 | Reallocation | 20204 | IM | Immingham | ED | Eastfield | |
16/08/1988 | Condemned | 20022 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/09/1988 | Condemned | 20086 | TE | Thornaby | COND | ||
02/09/1988 | Condemned | 20201 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
26/09/1988 | Condemned | 20226 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
07/12/1988 | Condemned | 20146 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
07/12/1988 | Condemned | 20203 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
20/02/1989 | Condemned | 20008 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
24/02/1989 | Condemned | 20907 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
28/02/1989 | Condemned | 20179 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
28/02/1989 | Condemned | 20180 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
05/05/1989 | Condemned | 20100 | 98Su | COND | |||
10/05/1989 | Condemned | 20204 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
18/05/1989 | Condemned | 20147 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
18/05/1989 | Condemned | 20158 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
19/07/1989 | Condemned | 20009 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
19/07/1989 | Condemned | 20134 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
19/07/1989 | Condemned | 20193 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
27/07/1989 | Condemned | 20005 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
31/07/1989 | Condemned | 20217 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
11/09/1989 | Condemned | 20044 | 98Ss | COND | |||
11/09/1989 | Condemned | 20054 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
11/09/1989 | Condemned | 20097 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
11/09/1989 | Condemned | 20192 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
18/09/1989 | Condemned | 20126 | ML | Motherwell | COND | ||
04/10/1989 | Condemned | 20218 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
08/12/1989 | Condemned | 20171 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
08/12/1989 | Condemned | 20202 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
18/12/1989 | Condemned | 20178 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
18/12/1989 | Condemned | 20205 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/01/1990 | Condemned | 20188 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
08/01/1990 | Condemned | 20144 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
26/01/1990 | Condemned | 20183 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
26/01/1990 | Condemned | 20224 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
31/01/1990 | Condemned | 20114 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
18/06/1990 | Condemned | 20199 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
10/07/1990 | Condemned | 20080 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/09/1990 | Condemned | 20189 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
14/09/1990 | Condemned | 20031 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
14/09/1990 | Condemned | 20064 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
14/09/1990 | Condemned | 20110 | 98Su | COND | |||
01/10/1990 | Condemned | 20020 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/10/1990 | Condemned | 20030 | 91M | To London Midland Region | COND | ||
01/10/1990 | Condemned | 20034 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
02/10/1990 | Condemned | 20006 | 98Ss | COND | |||
02/10/1990 | Condemned | 20136 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 20026 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 20045 | 98Ss | COND | |||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 20053 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 20129 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 20130 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
10/10/1990 | Condemned | 20157 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
11/10/1990 | Condemned | 20004 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
11/10/1990 | Condemned | 20172 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
01/11/1990 | Condemned | 20048 | 91M | To London Midland Region | COND | ||
17/11/1990 | Condemned | 20052 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
17/12/1990 | Condemned | 20160 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
08/01/1991 | Condemned | 20065 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
21/01/1991 | Condemned | 20061 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
21/01/1991 | Condemned | 20107 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
21/01/1991 | Condemned | 20112 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
04/02/1991 | Condemned | 20051 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
04/02/1991 | Condemned | 20099 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
04/02/1991 | Condemned | 20173 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
04/02/1991 | Condemned | 20208 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
08/03/1991 | Condemned | 20021 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
08/03/1991 | Condemned | 20085 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
08/03/1991 | Condemned | 20103 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
08/03/1991 | Condemned | 20182 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
11/04/1991 | Condemned | 20070 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
12/04/1991 | Condemned | 20206 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
12/04/1991 | Condemned | 20213 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/05/1991 | Condemned | 20035 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/05/1991 | Condemned | 20063 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
01/05/1991 | Condemned | 20228 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
01/05/1991 | Condemned | 20139 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
17/05/1991 | Condemned | 20023 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
19/05/1991 | Condemned | 20145 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
20/05/1991 | Condemned | 20069 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
20/05/1991 | Condemned | 20093 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
07/06/1991 | Condemned | 20124 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
24/06/1991 | Condemned | 20098 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
27/06/1991 | Condemned | 20043 | 98Ss | COND | |||
05/07/1991 | Condemned | 20029 | 98Ss | COND | |||
05/07/1991 | Condemned | 20122 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
05/07/1991 | Condemned | 20156 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
05/07/1991 | Condemned | 20198 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
05/07/1991 | Condemned | 20211 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
05/07/1991 | Condemned | 20212 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
13/09/1991 | Condemned | 20040 | 98Ss | COND | |||
13/09/1991 | Condemned | 20108 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
13/09/1991 | Condemned | 20113 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
13/09/1991 | Condemned | 20133 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
13/09/1991 | Condemned | 20159 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
13/09/1991 | Condemned | 20175 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
19/09/1991 | Condemned | 20025 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
21/10/1991 | Condemned | 20176 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
15/11/1991 | Condemned | 20019 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
15/11/1991 | Condemned | 20028 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
15/11/1991 | Condemned | 20141 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
15/11/1991 | Condemned | 20148 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
15/11/1991 | Condemned | 20170 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/12/1991 | Condemned | 20010 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
13/12/1991 | Condemned | 20013 | 98Ss | COND | |||
01/1992 | Condemned | 20072 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
10/01/1992 | Condemned | 20078 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
10/01/1992 | Condemned | 20143 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
28/02/1992 | Condemned | 20058 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/03/1992 | Condemned | 20215 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/06/1992 | Condemned | 20096 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/06/1992 | Condemned | 20119 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
25/09/1992 | Condemned | 20163 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
02/10/1992 | Condemned | 20185 | IM | Immingham | COND | ||
01/12/1992 | Condemned | 20137 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
04/1993 | Condemned | 20032 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/04/1993 | Condemned | 20154 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
28/04/1993 | Condemned | 20140 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
28/04/1993 | Condemned | 20196 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
28/04/1993 | Condemned | 20210 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
05/1993 | Condemned | 20059 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/05/1993 | Condemned | 20168 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
09/06/1993 | Condemned | 20046 | ED | Eastfield | COND | ||
09/06/1993 | Condemned | 20094 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
09/06/1993 | Condemned | 20214 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
01/07/1993 | Condemned | 20007 | HA | Haymarket | COND | ||
06/07/1993 | Condemned | 20090 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20055 | TI | Tinsley | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20071 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20082 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20135 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20151 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20177 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20186 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
23/07/1993 | Condemned | 20195 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
13/10/1993 | Condemned | 20106 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
23/12/1993 | Condemned | 20073 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND | ||
10/1994 | Condemned | 20057 | 41A | Tinsley | COND | ||
04/1995 | Condemned | 20016 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
04/1995 | Condemned | 20087 | TO | Toton | COND | ||
03/03/2000 | Condemned | 20118 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
07/12/2001 | Condemned | 20169 | D16 | Nottingham Division | COND |