EE & RSH Ltd 20 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (20/0) | BR (20/0 (R)) | BR (20/3 (BR)) | BR (20/3 (RFS)) | BR (20/9) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D8000 | 20050 | 18/06/1957 | 1D 18A 1D 18A 5B 5B 1B 1A D01 D16 41A 64B 65A 64B TO TO W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Toton (on loan) Devons Road (Bow) (returned from loan) Toton (on loan) Crewe South Crewe South (returned from loan) Camden Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Toton Toton Withdrawn |
18/06/1957 24/08/1957 07/09/1957 05/07/1958 20/09/1958 27/09/1958 29/10/1960 02/10/1965 18/04/1966 09/08/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/02/1973 21/04/1973 10/11/1973 09/08/1975 08/11/1975 14/12/1980 |
14/12/1980 | ||||
D8001 | 20001 | 08/07/1957 | 1D 5B 1A D01 D16 41A 64B D16 TO TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Crewe South Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Nottingham Division Toton Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/07/1957 06/09/1958 29/10/1960 18/04/1966 09/08/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/03/1973 09/08/1975 08/11/1975 11/1978 20/04/1988 |
20/04/1988 | ||||
D8002 | 20002 | 25/07/1957 | 1D 2A 5B 1A D01 D16 ED W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Rugby Crewe South Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/07/1957 12/07/1958 04/10/1958 17/09/1960 18/04/1966 09/08/1969 11/05/1974 19/02/1988 |
19/02/1988 | ||||
D8003 | 20003 | 23/08/1957 | 1D 5B 1A D01 D16 TI ED IM ZL W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Crewe South Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Immingham Swindon Works (on loan) Withdrawn |
23/08/1957 06/09/1958 29/10/1960 18/04/1966 09/08/1969 06/10/1973 09/1977 26/07/1981 16/08/1981 16/08/1981 |
16/08/1981 | ||||
D8004 | 20004 | 09/08/1957 | 1D 5B 1A D01 D16 41A 64B TO TO TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Crewe South Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Toton Toton Tinsley Withdrawn |
09/08/1957 09/08/1958 21/05/1960 18/04/1966 09/08/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 01/09/1973 09/08/1975 08/11/1975 11/1978 11/10/1990 |
11/10/1990 | ||||
D8005 | 20005 | 09/09/1957 | 1D 1A D01 D16 41A 64B D16 TO TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Nottingham Division Toton Tinsley Withdrawn |
09/09/1957 26/08/1961 18/04/1966 09/08/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/03/1973 09/08/1975 08/11/1975 11/1978 27/07/1989 |
27/07/1989 | ||||
D8006 | 20006 | 16/09/1957 | 1D 61A 1D 1A D01 D16 TO LR WG W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Kittybrewster Devons Road (Bow) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Toton Leicester Midland (on loan) Wigston (on loan) Withdrawn |
16/09/1957 25/10/1958 08/11/1958 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 12/07/1969 09/08/1975 08/11/1975 04/10/1981 20/10/1981 02/10/1990 |
02/10/1990 | ||||
D8007 | 20007 | 19/09/1957 | 1D 1A D01 D16 41A 64B 65A 64B IM TI ED R W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Immingham Tinsley Eastfield Reinstated Withdrawn |
19/09/1957 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 12/07/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/02/1973 21/04/1973 12/10/1974 08/03/1975 09/1977 09/1981 01/07/1993 |
01/07/1993 | ||||
D8008 | 20008 | 01/10/1957 | 1D 1A D01 D16 41A 64B D16 TO TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Nottingham Division Toton Tinsley Withdrawn |
01/10/1957 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 12/07/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/03/1973 08/11/1975 17/04/1976 11/1978 20/02/1989 |
20/02/1989 | ||||
D8009 | 20009 | 08/10/1957 | 1D 1A D01 D16 TI TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/10/1957 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 12/07/1969 11/1978 26/07/1981 19/07/1989 |
19/07/1989 | ||||
D8010 | 20010 | 16/10/1957 | 1D 56G 56G 1D 1A D01 D16 41A 64B IM TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Devons Road (Bow) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
16/10/1957 08/01/1958 08/02/1958 22/02/1958 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 12/07/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 12/10/1974 08/03/1975 09/12/1991 |
09/12/1991 | ||||
D8011 | 20011 | 29/10/1957 | 1D 56G 56G 1D 1A D01 D16 ED TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Bradford Hammerton Street Bradford Hammerton Street Devons Road (Bow) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
29/10/1957 08/01/1958 08/02/1958 22/02/1958 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 12/07/1969 01/09/1973 26/07/1981 02/02/1987 |
02/02/1987 | ||||
D8012 | 20012 | 11/11/1957 | 1D 1A D01 D16 W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
11/11/1957 15/02/1964 18/04/1966 10/05/1969 08/11/1975 21/02/1976 27/03/1976 |
27/03/1976 | ||||
D8013 | 20013 | 26/11/1957 | 1D 30A 40B 41A D16 D01 D16 R LR WG W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Immingham Tinsley Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Reinstated Leicester Midland (on loan) Wigston (on loan) Withdrawn |
26/11/1957 15/02/1964 09/10/1965 08/10/1966 19/08/1967 16/09/1967 10/05/1969 08/11/1975 07/08/1976 04/10/1981 20/10/1981 13/12/1991 |
13/12/1991 | ||||
D8014 | 20014 | 16/12/1957 | 1D 30A 40B 41A D16 D01 D16 W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Immingham Tinsley Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
16/12/1957 15/02/1964 09/10/1965 08/10/1966 19/08/1967 16/09/1967 10/05/1969 08/11/1975 20/12/1975 27/03/1976 |
27/03/1976 | ||||
D8015 | 20015 | 20/12/1957 | 1D 30A 41A D16 D01 D16 ED W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Tinsley Nottingham Division London Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/12/1957 15/02/1964 23/04/1966 19/08/1967 16/09/1967 08/02/1969 01/09/1973 13/07/1987 |
13/07/1987 | ||||
D8016 | 20016 | 30/12/1957 | 1D 30A 41A D16 TO LR R |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Tinsley Nottingham Division Toton Leicester Midland (on loan) Reinstated |
30/12/1957 15/02/1964 23/04/1966 06/04/1968 08/11/1975 08/11/1975 04/10/1981 01/11/1981 |
04/1995 | ||||
D8017 | 20017 | 10/01/1958 | 1D 30A 41A D16 41A 64B IM HA TI W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Haymarket Immingham Haymarket Tinsley Withdrawn |
10/01/1958 15/02/1964 23/04/1966 06/04/1968 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 12/10/1974 19/10/1974 04/07/1976 05/12/1982 |
05/12/1982 | ||||
D8018 | 20018 | 07/02/1958 | 1D 30A 41A 66A 52A 55B 52A 41A 64B TO W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Tinsley Polmadie Gateshead York (North) Gateshead Tinsley Haymarket Toton Withdrawn |
07/02/1958 15/02/1964 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 24/06/1967 22/06/1968 06/06/1970 10/10/1970 09/10/1971 12/10/1974 17/04/1976 04/12/1976 |
04/12/1976 | ||||
D8019 | 20019 | 04/03/1958 | 1D 30A 41A 66A 52A 30A 55B 52A 41A 64B IM HA TI IM W |
Devons Road (Bow) (New) Stratford Tinsley Polmadie Gateshead Stratford York (North) Gateshead Tinsley Haymarket Immingham Haymarket Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
04/03/1958 15/02/1964 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 24/06/1967 17/08/1968 11/10/1969 18/04/1970 10/10/1970 09/10/1971 12/10/1974 19/10/1974 12/12/1976 26/07/1981 15/11/1991 |
15/11/1991 | ||||
D8020 | 20020 | 03/10/1959 | 34B 34G 41A 34G 40B 41A 66A 52A 41A ED R ED W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Sheffield Darnall Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Polmadie Gateshead Tinsley Eastfield Reinstated Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/10/1959 30/04/1960 03/12/1960 15/09/1962 23/04/1966 08/10/1966 28/01/1967 15/07/1967 10/10/1970 07/1977 09/1981 09/1981 01/10/1990 |
01/10/1990 | ||||
D8021 | 20021 | 20/10/1959 | 34B 34G 41A 34G 40B 66A 52A 41A W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Sheffield Darnall Finsbury Park Immingham Polmadie Gateshead Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/10/1959 30/04/1960 12/05/1962 02/03/1963 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 12/08/1967 10/10/1970 08/03/1991 |
08/03/1991 | ||||
D8022 | 20022 | 29/10/1959 | 34B 34G 41A 41A 40B 66A 52A 41A W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Immingham Polmadie Gateshead Tinsley Withdrawn |
29/10/1959 30/04/1960 26/05/1962 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 28/01/1967 29/07/1967 10/10/1970 16/08/1988 |
16/08/1988 | ||||
D8023 | 20023 | 20023 | 20301 | 13/11/1959 | 34B 34G 41A 41A 40B 30A 66A 52A 41A IM TI W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Immingham Stratford Polmadie Gateshead Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
13/11/1959 30/04/1960 12/05/1962 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 03/12/1966 28/01/1967 30/09/1967 10/10/1970 29/01/1978 02/1978 17/05/1991 |
17/05/1991 | ||
D8024 | 20024 | 25/11/1959 | 34B 34G 41A 41A 40B 66A 52A 55B 65A HA ED HA ED W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Sheffield Darnall Tinsley Immingham Polmadie Gateshead York (North) Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/11/1959 30/04/1960 12/05/1962 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 28/01/1967 30/09/1967 27/06/1970 09/10/1971 26/10/1974 24/05/1975 21/06/1975 23/08/1975 02/05/1977 |
02/05/1977 | ||||
D8025 | 20025 | 27/11/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 66A 52A 41A IM W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Polmadie Gateshead Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
27/11/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 29/07/1967 10/10/1970 10/1977 19/09/1991 |
19/09/1991 | ||||
D8026 | 20026 | 04/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 66A 52A 41A IM TI IM W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Polmadie Gateshead Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
04/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 30/09/1967 10/10/1970 19/05/1973 02/06/1973 11/05/1974 10/10/1990 |
10/10/1990 | ||||
D8027 | 20027 | 11/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 66A 52A 55B 40B 65A HA ED HA ED W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Polmadie Gateshead York (North) Immingham Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
11/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 28/01/1967 15/07/1967 06/06/1970 10/10/1970 09/10/1971 26/10/1974 24/05/1975 21/06/1975 23/08/1975 19/12/1982 |
19/12/1982 | ||||
D8028 | 20028 | 18/12/1959 | 64H 61A 64B 52A 40B W |
Leith Central (New) Kittybrewster Haymarket Gateshead Immingham Withdrawn |
18/12/1959 16/01/1960 26/03/1966 24/06/1967 10/10/1970 15/11/1991 |
15/11/1991 | ||||
D8029 | 20029 | 28/12/1959 | 64H 61A 64B 52A 55B 40B LR W |
Leith Central (New) Kittybrewster Haymarket Gateshead York (North) Immingham Leicester Midland (on loan) Withdrawn |
28/12/1959 16/01/1960 26/03/1966 26/08/1967 18/04/1970 10/10/1970 04/10/1981 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||||
D8030 | 20030 | 31/12/1959 | 64H 61A 65A 61A 64B D16 30A 55B 30A 65A IM HA 91M W |
Leith Central (New) Kittybrewster Eastfield Kittybrewster Haymarket Nottingham Division Stratford York (North) Stratford Eastfield Immingham Haymarket To London Midland Region Withdrawn |
31/12/1959 16/01/1960 11/03/1961 08/04/1961 26/03/1966 08/06/1968 14/09/1968 11/10/1969 01/11/1969 09/10/1971 12/10/1974 19/10/1974 06/03/1976 01/10/1990 |
01/10/1990 | ||||
D8031 | 20031 | 20/01/1960 | 61A 60A 66A 64B D16 30A 55B 52A 40B W |
Kittybrewster (New) Inverness Polmadie Haymarket Nottingham Division Stratford York (North) Gateshead Immingham Withdrawn |
20/01/1960 30/10/1965 26/11/1966 30/09/1967 08/06/1968 14/09/1968 01/11/1969 27/06/1970 10/10/1970 14/09/1990 |
14/09/1990 | ||||
D8032 | 20032 | 18/02/1960 | 60A 64B D16 30A 41A |
Inverness (New) Haymarket Nottingham Division Stratford Tinsley |
18/02/1960 26/11/1966 06/07/1968 14/09/1968 15/05/1971 |
04/1993 | ||||
D8033 | 20033 | 18/02/1960 | 60A 66A 64B D16 30A 41A W |
Inverness (New) Polmadie Haymarket Nottingham Division Stratford Tinsley Withdrawn |
18/02/1960 26/11/1966 30/09/1967 08/06/1968 14/09/1968 24/10/1970 23/11/1977 |
23/11/1977 | ||||
D8034 | 20034 | 12/03/1960 | 60A 61A 60A 66A D16 41A 65A HA ED TI W |
Inverness (New) Kittybrewster Inverness Polmadie Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
12/03/1960 06/05/1961 30/10/1965 26/11/1966 05/07/1969 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 26/10/1974 24/05/1975 12/12/1976 01/10/1990 |
01/10/1990 | ||||
D8035 | 20035 | 18/09/1959 | 32A 1A 5B 1A D01 D02 D16 TI W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Willesden Crewe South Willesden London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Withdrawn |
18/09/1959 26/09/1959 14/10/1961 10/02/1962 18/04/1966 11/11/1967 14/09/1968 11/1978 01/05/1991 |
01/05/1991 | ||||
D8036 | 20036 | 03/10/1959 | 32A 1A D01 D02 D16 ED W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Willesden London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/10/1959 10/10/1959 18/04/1966 11/11/1967 14/09/1968 01/09/1973 11/06/1984 |
11/06/1984 | ||||
D8037 | 20037 | 09/10/1959 | 32A 1D 1B 1A D01 D16 R LR W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) Camden Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Reinstated Leicester Midland (on loan) Withdrawn |
09/10/1959 17/10/1959 05/03/1960 03/01/1966 18/04/1966 16/09/1967 07/08/1976 10/1976 04/10/1981 21/01/1987 |
21/01/1987 | ||||
D8038 | 20038 | 17/10/1959 | 32A 1D 1A 5B 1A D01 D16 W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) Willesden Crewe South Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
17/10/1959 24/10/1959 26/11/1960 10/02/1962 02/06/1962 18/04/1966 16/09/1967 08/11/1975 27/03/1976 |
27/03/1976 | ||||
D8039 | 20039 | 24/10/1959 | 32A 1D 1D 1B 1A D01 D16 HA ED HA ED W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) (on loan) Devons Road (Bow) (loan made permanent) Camden Willesden London Division Nottingham Division Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
24/10/1959 31/10/1959 05/12/1959 05/03/1960 01/01/1966 18/04/1966 16/09/1967 01/09/1973 24/05/1975 21/06/1975 23/08/1975 23/09/1986 |
23/09/1986 | ||||
D8040 | 20040 | 30/10/1959 | 32A 1D 1D 1B 1A D01 D02 D16 LR WG W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) (on loan) Devons Road (Bow) (loan made permanent) Camden Willesden London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Wigston (on loan) Withdrawn |
30/10/1959 30/10/1959 05/12/1959 14/09/1963 01/01/1966 18/04/1966 10/06/1967 14/09/1968 04/10/1981 20/10/1981 13/09/1991 |
13/09/1991 | ||||
D8041 | 20041 | 20904 | 06/11/1959 | 32A 1D 1D 1A 2F 2F D02 D01 D02 D16 41A 65A TO |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) (on loan) Devons Road (Bow) (loan made permanent) Willesden Bescot (on loan) Bescot (loan made permanent) Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Tinsley Eastfield Toton |
06/11/1959 14/11/1959 02/01/1960 20/07/1963 15/01/1966 12/03/1966 18/04/1966 09/07/1966 22/04/1967 14/09/1968 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 01/09/1973 |
||||
D8042 | 20042 | 20312 | 11/11/1959 | 32A 1D 1A 2F D02 D01 D02 D16 ZL |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) Willesden Bescot Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Swindon Works (on loan) |
11/11/1959 14/11/1959 20/07/1963 12/03/1966 18/04/1966 09/07/1966 01/10/1966 25/01/1969 10/1981 |
||||
D8043 | 20043 | 14/11/1959 | 32A 1D 1A 2F D02 D01 D02 D16 LR W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) Willesden Bescot Birmingham Division London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Withdrawn |
14/11/1959 21/11/1959 21/04/1962 12/03/1966 18/04/1966 09/07/1966 01/10/1966 25/01/1969 04/10/1981 27/06/1991 |
27/06/1991 | ||||
D8044 | 20044 | 24/11/1959 | 32A 1D 1A D01 D02 D16 LR W |
Norwich Thorpe (New) Devons Road (Bow) Willesden London Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Withdrawn |
24/11/1959 28/11/1959 21/04/1962 18/04/1966 01/10/1966 25/01/1969 04/10/1981 11/09/1989 |
11/09/1989 | ||||
D8045 | 20045 | 04/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 52A 52A D16 D16 LR W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead (on loan) Gateshead (loan made permanent) Nottingham Division (on loan) Nottingham Division (loan made permanent) Leicester Midland (on loan) Withdrawn |
04/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 09/09/1967 30/09/1967 18/11/1967 12/1967 04/10/1981 10/10/1990 |
10/10/1990 | ||||
D8046 | 20046 | 12/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 52A 52A D16 D16 41A 65A ED W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead (on loan) Gateshead (loan made permanent) Nottingham Division (on loan) Nottingham Division (loan made permanent) Tinsley Eastfield Eastfield Withdrawn |
12/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 09/09/1967 30/09/1967 18/11/1967 12/1967 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 24/07/1976 09/06/1993 |
09/06/1993 | ||||
D8047 | 20047 | 20301 | 18/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 52A 52A D16 D16 |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead (on loan) Gateshead (loan made permanent) Nottingham Division (on loan) Nottingham Division (loan made permanent) |
18/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 09/09/1967 30/09/1967 18/11/1967 31/12/1967 |
||||
D8048 | 20048 | 31/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B 52A 52A D16 D16 41A 65A 91M W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Gateshead (on loan) Gateshead (loan made permanent) Nottingham Division (on loan) Nottingham Division (loan made permanent) Tinsley Eastfield To London Midland Region Withdrawn |
31/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 09/09/1967 30/09/1967 18/11/1967 12/1967 17/10/1970 09/10/1971 06/03/1976 01/11/1990 |
01/11/1990 | ||||
D8049 | 20049 | 31/12/1959 | 34B 34G 40B TI ED W |
Hornsey (New) Finsbury Park Immingham Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
31/12/1959 30/04/1960 23/04/1966 02/06/1973 07/1977 01/05/1987 |
01/05/1987 | ||||
D8050 | 20128 | 20307 | 02/03/1961 | 41A 41A 40B TI |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley |
02/03/1961 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 06/10/1973 |
||||
D8051 | 20051 | 10/03/1961 | 41A 41A 40B W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
10/03/1961 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 | ||||
D8052 | 20052 | 24/03/1961 | 41A 41A 40B 41A 40B W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
24/03/1961 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 11/03/1967 12/08/1967 17/11/1990 |
17/11/1990 | ||||
D8053 | 20053 | 06/04/1961 | 41A 41A 40B 30A 40B 41A 40B W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Withdrawn |
06/04/1961 26/04/1964 07/08/1965 03/12/1966 07/01/1967 11/03/1967 12/08/1967 10/10/1990 |
10/10/1990 | ||||
D8054 | 20054 | 12/06/1961 | 41A 41A 40B 30A 40B 41A 40B TI TO W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Toton Withdrawn |
12/06/1961 26/04/1964 09/10/1965 03/12/1966 07/01/1967 11/03/1967 12/08/1967 11/01/1975 04/10/1987 11/09/1989 |
11/09/1989 | ||||
D8055 | 20055 | 14/04/1961 | 41A 41A 40B 30A 40B 41A 40B 30A 65A TI W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Stratford Immingham Tinsley Immingham Stratford Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
14/04/1961 26/04/1964 09/10/1965 03/12/1966 07/01/1967 11/03/1967 07/10/1967 10/08/1968 09/10/1971 12/12/1976 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8056 | 20056 | 26/04/1961 | 41A 41A 40B 41A 40B 30A 41A |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Stratford Tinsley |
26/04/1961 26/04/1964 18/09/1965 11/03/1967 07/10/1967 10/08/1968 09/10/1971 |
|||||
D8057 | 20057 | 01/05/1961 | 41A 41A 40B 41A 40B 30A 41A |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Immingham Tinsley Immingham Stratford Tinsley |
01/05/1961 26/04/1964 09/10/1965 11/03/1967 07/10/1967 10/08/1968 11/10/1969 |
10/1994 | ||||
D8058 | 20058 | 08/05/1961 | 41A 41A D16 41A 41E 40B 41A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Immingham Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/05/1961 26/04/1964 22/01/1966 26/02/1966 06/04/1968 17/05/1969 08/05/1971 28/02/1992 |
28/02/1992 | ||||
D8059 | 20059 | 20059 | 20302 | 12/05/1961 | 41A 41A D16 41A |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley |
12/05/1961 26/04/1964 06/04/1968 17/10/1970 |
05/1993 | ||
D8060 | 20060 | 20902 | 24/05/1961 | 41A 41A 41E D16 41A |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Tinsley |
24/05/1961 26/04/1964 28/05/1966 06/04/1968 17/10/1970 |
||||
D8061 | 20061 | 24/05/1961 | 41A 41A 41E D16 41A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Tinsley Withdrawn |
24/05/1961 26/04/1964 28/05/1966 06/04/1968 17/10/1970 21/01/1991 |
21/01/1991 | ||||
D8062 | 20062 | 29/05/1961 | 41A 41A 41E D16 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
29/05/1961 26/04/1964 28/05/1966 06/04/1968 18/09/1976 |
18/09/1976 | ||||
D8063 | 20063 | 05/06/1961 | 41A 41A 41E D16 LR WG TO W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Wigston (on loan) Toton Withdrawn |
05/06/1961 26/04/1964 18/06/1966 06/04/1968 04/10/1981 20/10/1981 04/10/1987 01/05/1991 |
01/05/1991 | ||||
D8064 | 20064 | 12/06/1961 | 41A 41A D16 41A D16 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
12/06/1961 26/04/1964 26/02/1966 26/03/1966 06/04/1968 14/09/1990 |
14/09/1990 | ||||
D8065 | 20065 | 19/06/1961 | 41A 41A D16 41A W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Withdrawn |
19/06/1961 26/04/1964 06/04/1968 17/10/1970 08/01/1991 |
08/01/1991 | ||||
D8066 | 20066 | 19/06/1961 | 41A 41A D16 41A D16 |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Nottingham Division |
19/06/1961 26/04/1964 15/01/1966 22/01/1966 06/04/1968 |
|||||
D8067 | 20067 | 26/06/1961 | 41A 41A 41E D16 LR WG W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Wigston (on loan) Withdrawn |
26/06/1961 26/04/1964 28/05/1966 06/04/1968 04/10/1981 20/10/1981 21/01/1987 |
21/01/1987 | ||||
D8068 | 20068 | 26/06/1961 | 41A 41A D16 TI TO R LR TO W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Nottingham Division Tinsley Toton Reinstated Leicester Midland (on loan) Toton (on loan) Withdrawn |
26/06/1961 26/04/1964 06/04/1968 01/1977 02/1977 10/1981 04/10/1981 10/11/1981 16/06/1987 |
16/06/1987 | ||||
D8069 | 20069 | 30/06/1961 | 41A 41A 86A 41A D16 41A D16 W |
Sheffield Darnall (New) Tinsley Cardiff Canton (on loan) Tinsley (returned from loan) Nottingham Division Tinsley Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
30/06/1961 26/04/1964 06/06/1965 22/06/1965 22/01/1966 22/01/1966 06/04/1968 20/05/1991 |
20/05/1991 | ||||
D8070 | 20070 | 30/06/1961 | 65A 66A 65A D16 W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
30/06/1961 29/03/1969 28/06/1969 25/10/1969 11/04/1991 |
11/04/1991 | ||||
D8071 | 20071 | 10/07/1961 | 65A 66A 65A D16 LR R W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Reinstated Withdrawn |
10/07/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 08/03/1969 04/10/1981 01/11/1981 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8072 | 20072 | 10/07/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 62A 66A D16 |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Thornton Junction Polmadie Nottingham Division |
10/07/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 31/12/1966 25/03/1967 28/02/1970 |
01/1992 | ||||
D8073 | 20073 | 19/07/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A D16 W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
19/07/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 29/03/1969 28/06/1969 08/11/1969 23/12/1993 |
23/12/1993 | ||||
D8074 | 20074 | 19/07/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A 66A D16 W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
19/07/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 27/01/1968 28/06/1969 29/11/1969 28/02/1970 31/01/1976 |
31/01/1976 | ||||
D8075 | 20075 | 20308 | 26/07/1961 | 65A 62A 66A 65A D16 |
Eastfield (New) Thornton Junction Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division |
26/07/1961 31/12/1966 25/03/1967 25/01/1969 05/07/1969 |
||||
D8076 | 20076 | 26/07/1961 | 65A 62A 66A D16 W |
Eastfield (New) Thornton Junction Polmadie Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
26/07/1961 31/12/1966 25/03/1967 08/11/1969 04/05/1988 |
04/05/1988 | ||||
D8077 | 20077 | 28/07/1961 | 65A 62A 65A 66A 65A 66A D16 W |
Eastfield (New) Thornton Junction Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
28/07/1961 31/12/1966 25/03/1967 29/03/1969 28/06/1969 29/11/1969 28/02/1970 16/05/1988 |
16/05/1988 | ||||
D8078 | 20078 | 28/07/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A TI W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
28/07/1961 28/10/1967 31/05/1969 29/11/1969 01/04/1972 04/07/1976 10/01/1992 |
10/01/1992 | ||||
D8079 | 20079 | 28/08/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A TI W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
28/08/1961 29/03/1969 28/06/1969 29/11/1969 01/04/1972 04/07/1976 25/04/1977 |
25/04/1977 | ||||
D8080 | 20080 | 28/08/1961 | 65A 60A 65A 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Inverness Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
28/08/1961 29/06/1968 26/10/1968 29/11/1969 01/04/1972 10/07/1990 |
10/07/1990 | ||||
D8081 | 20081 | 31/08/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A D16 LR WG |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Wigston (on loan) |
31/08/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 28/10/1967 31/05/1969 28/02/1970 04/10/1981 20/10/1981 |
|||||
D8082 | 20082 | 31/08/1961 | 65A 66A 64B 64B 66A 65A TO W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Haymarket Haymarket Polmadie Eastfield Toton Withdrawn |
31/08/1961 28/02/1970 07/08/1971 02/10/1971 30/10/1971 01/04/1972 01/09/1973 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8083 | 20083 | 20903 | 12/09/1961 | 65A 66A 65A D16 ED TE |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division Eastfield Thornaby |
12/09/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 01/11/1969 11/05/1974 15/05/1988 |
||||
D8084 | 20084 | 20302 | 12/09/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A TO TI IM TO |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Toton Tinsley Immingham Toton |
12/09/1961 21/10/1961 21/10/1961 28/03/1970 31/10/1970 01/09/1973 01/1977 01/1977 02/1977 |
||||
D8085 | 20085 | 18/09/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 66A 65A HA ED HA ED R W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Reinstated Withdrawn |
18/09/1961 08/09/1962 26/08/1967 30/09/1967 01/03/1969 08/09/1973 24/05/1975 21/06/1975 23/08/1975 09/1981 08/03/1991 |
08/03/1991 | ||||
D8086 | 20086 | 18/09/1961 | 65A 66A 65A HA TE W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Thornaby Withdrawn |
18/09/1961 29/09/1962 01/03/1969 16/06/1973 15/05/1988 01/09/1988 |
01/09/1988 | ||||
D8087 | 20087 | 26/09/1961 | 65A D16 LR R |
Eastfield (New) Nottingham Division Leicester Midland (on loan) Reinstated |
26/09/1961 08/11/1969 04/10/1981 01/11/1981 |
04/1995 | ||||
D8088 | 20088 | 26/09/1961 | 65A D16 R LR TO TO |
Eastfield (New) Nottingham Division Reinstated Leicester Midland (on loan) Toton (on loan) Toton |
26/09/1961 08/11/1969 10/1981 04/10/1981 01/11/1981 22/05/1988 |
|||||
D8089 | 20089 | 03/10/1961 | 65A 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
03/10/1961 27/01/1968 01/04/1972 27/04/1987 |
27/04/1987 | ||||
D8090 | 20090 | 29/09/1961 | 65A 66A 65A TO W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Toton Withdrawn |
29/09/1961 28/02/1970 01/04/1972 10/11/1973 06/07/1993 |
06/07/1993 | ||||
D8091 | 20091 | 10/10/1961 | 65A D16 66A 65A IM TI ED W |
Eastfield (New) Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Immingham Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
10/10/1961 08/03/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 12/05/1973 02/06/1973 07/1977 04/09/1978 |
04/09/1978 | ||||
D8092 | 20092 | 10/10/1961 | 65A 66A 65A 64B 65A 66A 65A IM TI |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield Immingham Tinsley |
10/10/1961 27/01/1968 28/06/1969 26/07/1969 01/11/1969 28/02/1970 30/05/1970 12/05/1973 02/06/1973 |
|||||
D8093 | 20093 | 17/10/1961 | 65A 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
17/10/1961 28/03/1970 01/04/1972 20/05/1991 |
20/05/1991 | ||||
D8094 | 20094 | 17/10/1961 | 65A 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
17/10/1961 28/02/1970 01/04/1972 09/06/1993 |
09/06/1993 | ||||
D8095 | 20095 | 20305 | 26/10/1961 | 65A 66A 65A |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield |
26/10/1961 27/04/1968 01/04/1972 |
||||
D8096 | 20096 | 26/10/1961 | 65A 66A 66A D16 66A 65A TI W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Polmadie Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
26/10/1961 27/01/1968 27/04/1968 07/03/1970 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 11/1978 01/06/1992 |
01/06/1992 | ||||
D8097 | 20097 | 08/11/1961 | 65A 65A TO W |
Eastfield (New) Eastfield Toton Withdrawn |
08/11/1961 01/04/1972 10/11/1973 11/09/1989 |
11/09/1989 | ||||
D8098 | 20098 | 08/11/1961 | 65A 66A D16 66A 65A TI W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
08/11/1961 27/01/1968 07/03/1970 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 04/07/1976 24/06/1991 |
24/06/1991 | ||||
D8099 | 20099 | 15/11/1961 | 65A D16 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
15/11/1961 01/11/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 | ||||
D8100 | 20100 | 22/11/1961 | 65A 66A 65A TI ED HA MH W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket (on loan) Millerhill (on loan) Withdrawn |
22/11/1961 26/10/1968 01/04/1972 12/12/1976 05/1977 17/08/1981 10/1981 05/05/1989 |
05/05/1989 | ||||
D8101 | 20101 | 20901 | 22/11/1961 | 65A 66A D16 66A 65A |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield |
22/11/1961 26/10/1968 28/02/1970 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 |
||||
D8102 | 20102 | 20310 | 01/12/1961 | 65A 66A 65A |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield |
01/12/1961 26/10/1968 31/05/1969 |
||||
D8103 | 20103 | 01/12/1961 | 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
01/12/1961 08/03/1991 |
08/03/1991 | ||||
D8104 | 20104 | 20315 | 08/12/1961 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | 08/12/1961 | ||||
D8105 | 20105 | 08/12/1961 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | 08/12/1961 | |||||
D8106 | 20106 | 12/12/1961 | 65A 62A 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Thornton Junction Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
12/12/1961 31/12/1966 25/03/1967 01/04/1972 13/10/1993 |
13/10/1993 | ||||
D8107 | 20107 | 20/12/1961 | 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
20/12/1961 21/01/1991 |
21/01/1991 | ||||
D8108 | 20108 | 20/12/1961 | 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Withdrawn |
20/12/1961 13/09/1991 |
13/09/1991 | ||||
D8109 | 20109 | 29/12/1961 | 65A HA W |
Eastfield (New) Haymarket (on loan) Withdrawn |
29/12/1961 29/11/1981 14/02/1982 |
14/02/1982 | ||||
D8110 | 20110 | 10/01/1962 | 65A 62A 66A 65A AB W |
Eastfield (New) Thornton Junction Polmadie Eastfield Aberdeen Ferryhill (on loan) Withdrawn |
10/01/1962 31/12/1966 25/03/1967 01/04/1972 09/08/1981 14/09/1990 |
14/09/1990 | ||||
D8111 | 20111 | 18/01/1962 | 65A 66A D16 HA W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Nottingham Division Haymarket Withdrawn |
18/01/1962 30/09/1967 08/03/1969 10/11/1973 22/04/1987 |
22/04/1987 | ||||
D8112 | 20112 | 26/01/1962 | 65A 66A 65A D16 66A 65A TI W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Tinsley Withdrawn |
26/01/1962 01/03/1969 31/05/1969 25/10/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 11/1978 21/01/1991 |
21/01/1991 | ||||
D8113 | 20113 | 01/02/1962 | 65A 66A D16 66A 65A TO W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Toton Withdrawn |
01/02/1962 30/05/1964 15/11/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 10/11/1973 13/09/1991 |
13/09/1991 | ||||
D8114 | 20114 | 08/02/1962 | 65A 66A D16 ED W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
08/02/1962 30/05/1964 08/03/1969 10/11/1973 31/01/1990 |
31/01/1990 | ||||
D8115 | 20115 | 08/02/1962 | 65A 66A D16 ED W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
08/02/1962 30/05/1964 08/03/1969 10/11/1973 11/01/1987 |
11/01/1987 | ||||
D8116 | 20116 | 15/02/1962 | 65A 66A 65A W |
Eastfield (New) Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
15/02/1962 30/05/1964 01/04/1972 16/01/1987 |
16/01/1987 | ||||
D8117 | 20117 | 20314 | 23/02/1962 | 66A 65A 66A 65A |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Polmadie Eastfield |
23/02/1962 29/09/1962 30/05/1964 01/04/1972 |
||||
D8118 | 20118 | 08/03/1962 | 66A 65A 66A D16 66A 65A W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Polmadie Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
08/03/1962 29/09/1962 25/01/1964 15/11/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 03/03/2000 |
03/03/2000 | ||||
D8119 | 20119 | 08/03/1962 | 66A 65A TI ED W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
08/03/1962 01/04/1972 13/10/1973 07/1977 01/06/1992 |
01/06/1992 | ||||
D8120 | 20120 | 20304 | 16/03/1962 | 66A 65A |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield |
16/03/1962 01/04/1972 |
||||
D8121 | 20121 | 16/03/1962 | 66A D16 66A 65A ML |
Polmadie (New) Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Motherwell |
16/03/1962 15/11/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 09/1981 |
|||||
D8122 | 20122 | 22/03/1962 | 66A D16 ED W |
Polmadie (New) Nottingham Division Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/03/1962 08/11/1969 10/11/1973 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||||
D8123 | 20123 | 29/03/1962 | 66A 65A W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Withdrawn |
29/03/1962 01/04/1972 30/04/1987 |
30/04/1987 | ||||
D8124 | 20124 | 13/04/1962 | 66A 65A W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Withdrawn |
13/04/1962 01/04/1972 07/06/1991 |
07/06/1991 | ||||
D8125 | 20125 | 25/04/1962 | 66A D16 66A 65A W |
Polmadie (New) Nottingham Division Polmadie Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/04/1962 08/03/1969 09/10/1971 01/04/1972 23/09/1986 |
23/09/1986 | ||||
D8126 | 20126 | 15/05/1962 | 66A 65A R ML W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Reinstated Motherwell Withdrawn |
15/05/1962 01/04/1972 09/1981 09/1981 18/09/1989 |
18/09/1989 | ||||
D8127 | 20127 | 20303 | 16/07/1962 | 66A 65A IM TI |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Immingham Tinsley |
16/07/1962 01/04/1972 12/05/1973 02/06/1973 |
||||
D8128 | 20228 | 12/01/1966 | 41A 8B 41A 41E 41A ED ED IM W |
Tinsley (New) Warrington Dallam Tinsley Staveley (Barrow Hill) Tinsley Eastfield Eastfield Immingham Withdrawn |
12/01/1966 05/02/1966 26/02/1966 18/06/1966 31/03/1973 04/10/1987 21/04/1988 22/05/1988 01/05/1991 |
01/05/1991 | ||||
D8129 | 20129 | 12/02/1966 | 41A 41E 41A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Tinsley Withdrawn |
12/02/1966 28/05/1966 31/03/1973 10/10/1990 |
10/10/1990 | ||||
D8130 | 20130 | 17/02/1966 | 41A 41E 41A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Tinsley Withdrawn |
17/02/1966 18/06/1966 31/03/1973 10/10/1990 |
10/10/1990 | ||||
D8131 | 20131 | 20306 | 26/02/1966 | 41A 41E 41A |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Tinsley |
26/02/1966 28/05/1966 31/03/1973 |
||||
D8132 | 20132 | 05/03/1966 | 41A 41E 41A |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Tinsley |
05/03/1966 18/06/1966 31/03/1973 |
|||||
D8133 | 20133 | 17/03/1966 | 41A 41E 41A W |
Tinsley (New) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Tinsley Withdrawn |
17/03/1966 28/05/1966 31/03/1973 13/09/1991 |
13/09/1991 | ||||
D8134 | 20134 | 20134 | 20303 | 18/03/1966 | 2F D02 D16 W |
Bescot (New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
18/03/1966 18/04/1966 11/10/1969 19/07/1989 |
19/07/1989 | ||
D8135 | 20135 | 26/03/1966 | 2F D02 D16 W |
Bescot (New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
26/03/1966 18/04/1966 11/10/1969 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8136 | 20136 | 31/03/1966 | D02 D16 W |
(New) Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
31/03/1966 18/04/1966 10/05/1969 02/10/1990 |
02/10/1990 | ||||
D8137 | 20137 | 12/04/1966 | D16 ED HA W |
(New) Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
12/04/1966 08/02/1969 11/05/1974 09/1981 01/12/1992 |
01/12/1992 | ||||
D8138 | 20138 | 23/04/1966 | D02 D16 D02 D16 ED HA |
Birmingham Division (New) Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Eastfield Haymarket |
23/04/1966 23/04/1966 09/07/1966 25/01/1969 11/05/1974 09/1981 |
|||||
D8139 | 20139 | 26/04/1966 | D02 D16 D02 D16 TO ZL TO W |
Birmingham Division (New) Nottingham Division Birmingham Division Nottingham Division Toton (on loan) Swindon Works (on loan) Toton Withdrawn |
26/04/1966 30/04/1966 09/07/1966 25/01/1969 28/06/1981 10/1981 04/10/1987 01/05/1991 |
01/05/1991 | ||||
D8140 | 20140 | 21/05/1966 | D02 D16 W |
Birmingham Division (New) Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
21/05/1966 25/01/1969 28/04/1993 |
28/04/1993 | ||||
D8141 | 20141 | 21/05/1966 | D02 D16 W |
Birmingham Division (New) Nottingham Division Withdrawn |
21/05/1966 25/01/1969 15/11/1991 |
15/11/1991 | ||||
D8142 | 20142 | 21/05/1966 | D02 ML D16 TI TO |
Birmingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Tinsley Toton |
21/05/1966 03/02/1968 17/06/1968 01/1977 02/1977 |
|||||
D8143 | 20143 | 06/07/1966 | D02 ML D16 TI TO W |
Birmingham Division (New) Line Power Controller, Derby Nottingham Division Tinsley Toton Withdrawn |
06/07/1966 03/02/1968 17/06/1968 01/1977 02/1977 10/01/1992 |
10/01/1992 | ||||
D8144 | 20144 | 28/06/1966 | D16 TI W |
Nottingham Division (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
28/06/1966 08/03/1975 08/01/1990 |
08/01/1990 | ||||
D8145 | 20145 | 10/06/1966 | D16 TI TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Tinsley Toton Withdrawn |
10/06/1966 08/03/1975 04/10/1987 19/05/1991 |
19/05/1991 | ||||
D8146 | 20146 | 10/06/1966 | D16 ED TO IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Eastfield Toton Immingham Withdrawn |
10/06/1966 06/03/1976 04/10/1987 15/05/1988 07/12/1988 |
07/12/1988 | ||||
D8147 | 20147 | 23/06/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
23/06/1966 18/05/1989 |
18/05/1989 | ||||
D8148 | 20148 | 27/06/1966 | D16 TI TO TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Tinsley Toton Toton Withdrawn |
27/06/1966 01/1977 02/1977 04/10/1987 15/11/1991 |
15/11/1991 | ||||
D8149 | 20149 | 05/07/1966 | D16 ED W |
Nottingham Division (New) Eastfield Withdrawn |
05/07/1966 06/03/1976 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8150 | 20150 | 05/07/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
05/07/1966 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8151 | 20151 | 12/07/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
12/07/1966 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8152 | 20152 | 15/08/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
15/08/1966 14/04/1988 |
14/04/1988 | ||||
D8153 | 20153 | 15/08/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
15/08/1966 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8154 | 20154 | 15/08/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
15/08/1966 01/04/1993 |
01/04/1993 | ||||
D8155 | 20155 | 23/08/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
23/08/1966 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8156 | 20156 | 26/08/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
26/08/1966 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||||
D8157 | 20157 | 02/09/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
02/09/1966 10/10/1990 |
10/10/1990 | ||||
D8158 | 20158 | 02/09/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
02/09/1966 18/05/1989 |
18/05/1989 | ||||
D8159 | 20159 | 09/09/1966 | D16 TI IM TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Tinsley Immingham Toton Withdrawn |
09/09/1966 01/1977 01/1977 02/1977 13/09/1991 |
13/09/1991 | ||||
D8160 | 20160 | 19/09/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
19/09/1966 17/12/1990 |
17/12/1990 | ||||
D8161 | 20161 | 19/09/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
19/09/1966 02/02/1988 |
02/02/1988 | ||||
D8162 | 20162 | 19/09/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
19/09/1966 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8163 | 20163 | 23/09/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
23/09/1966 25/09/1992 |
25/09/1992 | ||||
D8164 | 20164 | 05/10/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
05/10/1966 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8165 | 20165 | 05/10/1966 | D16 | Nottingham Division (New) | 05/10/1966 | |||||
D8166 | 20166 | 10/10/1966 | D16 | Nottingham Division (New) | 10/10/1966 | |||||
D8167 | 20167 | 17/10/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
17/10/1966 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8168 | 20168 | 20168 | 20304 | 19/10/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
19/10/1966 01/05/1993 |
01/05/1993 | ||
D8169 | 20169 | 25/10/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
25/10/1966 07/12/2001 |
07/12/2001 | ||||
D8170 | 20170 | 25/10/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
25/10/1966 15/11/1991 |
15/11/1991 | ||||
D8171 | 20171 | 27/10/1966 | D16 ED IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Eastfield Immingham Withdrawn |
27/10/1966 21/04/1988 22/05/1988 08/12/1989 |
08/12/1989 | ||||
D8172 | 20172 | 20172 | 20305 | 28/10/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
28/10/1966 11/10/1990 |
11/10/1990 | ||
D8173 | 20173 | 20173 | 20306 | 08/12/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
08/12/1966 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 | ||
D8174 | 20174 | 04/11/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
04/11/1966 06/04/1988 |
06/04/1988 | ||||
D8175 | 20175 | 08/11/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
08/11/1966 13/09/1991 |
13/09/1991 | ||||
D8176 | 20176 | 16/11/1966 | D16 LR R TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Leicester Midland (on loan) Reinstated Toton Withdrawn |
16/11/1966 04/10/1981 01/11/1981 04/10/1987 21/10/1991 |
21/10/1991 | ||||
D8177 | 20177 | 18/11/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
18/11/1966 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8178 | 20178 | 16/12/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
16/12/1966 18/12/1989 |
18/12/1989 | ||||
D8179 | 20179 | 16/12/1966 | D16 64B ED HA ED W |
Nottingham Division (New) Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
16/12/1966 24/03/1973 16/06/1973 24/05/1975 15/05/1988 28/02/1989 |
28/02/1989 | ||||
D8180 | 20180 | 16/12/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
16/12/1966 28/02/1989 |
28/02/1989 | ||||
D8181 | 20181 | 19/12/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
19/12/1966 12/11/1987 |
12/11/1987 | ||||
D8182 | 20182 | 16/12/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
16/12/1966 08/03/1991 |
08/03/1991 | ||||
D8183 | 20183 | 16/12/1966 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
16/12/1966 26/01/1990 |
26/01/1990 | ||||
D8184 | 20184 | 19/12/1966 | D16 64B ED HA W |
Nottingham Division (New) Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
19/12/1966 24/03/1973 16/06/1973 24/05/1975 26/10/1986 |
26/10/1986 | ||||
D8185 | 20185 | 25/02/1967 | D16 ED IM W |
Nottingham Division (New) Eastfield Immingham Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 15/05/1988 22/05/1988 02/10/1992 |
02/10/1992 | ||||
D8186 | 20186 | 21/01/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
21/01/1967 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8187 | 20187 | 20309 | 21/01/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division (New) | 21/01/1967 | ||||
D8188 | 20188 | 21/01/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
21/01/1967 01/01/1990 |
01/01/1990 | ||||
D8189 | 20189 | 21/01/1967 | D16 TO W |
Nottingham Division (New) Toton Withdrawn |
21/01/1967 04/10/1987 01/09/1990 |
01/09/1990 | ||||
D8190 | 20190 | 20311 | 28/01/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division (New) | 28/01/1967 | ||||
D8191 | 20191 | 25/02/1967 | D16 64B W |
Nottingham Division (New) Haymarket Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 24/03/1973 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8192 | 20192 | 25/02/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 11/09/1989 |
11/09/1989 | ||||
D8193 | 20193 | 25/02/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 19/07/1989 |
19/07/1989 | ||||
D8194 | 20194 | 20194 | 20307 | 20313 | 25/02/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division (New) | 25/02/1967 | ||
D8195 | 20195 | 25/02/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 23/07/1993 |
23/07/1993 | ||||
D8196 | 20196 | 20196 | 20308 | 25/02/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
25/02/1967 28/04/1993 |
28/04/1993 | ||
D8197 | 20197 | 25/02/1967 | D16 R |
Nottingham Division (New) Reinstated |
25/02/1967 29/11/1981 |
|||||
D8198 | 20198 | 22/04/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||||
D8199 | 20199 | 22/04/1967 | D16 W |
Nottingham Division (New) Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 18/06/1990 |
18/06/1990 | ||||
D8300 | 20200 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 04/07/1976 06/08/1979 |
06/08/1979 | ||||
D8301 | 20201 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED HA IM W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Immingham Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 04/07/1976 09/1981 15/05/1988 02/09/1988 |
02/09/1988 | ||||
D8302 | 20202 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED IM W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Immingham Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 04/07/1976 15/05/1988 08/12/1989 |
08/12/1989 | ||||
D8303 | 20203 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED HA IM W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Haymarket Immingham Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 04/07/1976 01/1977 15/05/1988 07/12/1988 |
07/12/1988 | ||||
D8304 | 20204 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED IM ED W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Immingham Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 12/12/1976 15/05/1988 12/06/1988 10/05/1989 |
10/05/1989 | ||||
D8305 | 20205 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 12/12/1976 18/12/1989 |
18/12/1989 | ||||
D8306 | 20206 | 22/04/1967 | 50A 41A ED W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
22/04/1967 09/10/1971 12/12/1976 12/04/1991 |
12/04/1991 | ||||
D8307 | 20207 | 20/05/1967 | 50A 41A ED W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 09/10/1971 12/12/1976 11/07/1983 |
11/07/1983 | ||||
D8308 | 20208 | 20/05/1967 | 50A 41A W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 09/10/1971 04/02/1991 |
04/02/1991 | ||||
D8309 | 20209 | 20907 | 20/05/1967 | 50A 41A W |
York (North) (New) Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 09/10/1971 24/02/1989 |
24/02/1989 | |||
D8310 | 20210 | 20/05/1967 | 51L 50B 41A W |
Thornaby (New) Hull Dairycoates Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 27/04/1968 11/10/1969 28/04/1993 |
28/04/1993 | ||||
D8311 | 20211 | 20/05/1967 | 51L 50B 41A W |
Thornaby (New) Hull Dairycoates Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 27/04/1968 11/10/1969 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||||
D8312 | 20212 | 20/05/1967 | 51L 50B 41A ED W |
Thornaby (New) Hull Dairycoates Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 27/04/1968 11/10/1969 15/05/1988 05/07/1991 |
05/07/1991 | ||||
D8313 | 20213 | 20/05/1967 | 51L 50B 41A ED W |
Thornaby (New) Hull Dairycoates Tinsley Eastfield Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 27/04/1968 11/10/1969 15/05/1988 12/04/1991 |
12/04/1991 | ||||
D8314 | 20214 | 20/05/1967 | 51L 50B 41A W |
Thornaby (New) Hull Dairycoates Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 27/04/1968 11/10/1969 09/06/1993 |
09/06/1993 | ||||
D8315 | 20215 | 20/05/1967 | 51L 50B 41A W |
Thornaby (New) Hull Dairycoates Tinsley Withdrawn |
20/05/1967 25/05/1968 11/10/1969 01/03/1992 |
01/03/1992 | ||||
D8316 | 20216 | 26/05/1967 | 64B 65A HA ED HA W |
Haymarket (New) Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
26/05/1967 01/06/1968 16/06/1973 29/12/1973 24/05/1975 09/11/1987 |
09/11/1987 | ||||
D8317 | 20217 | 25/11/1967 | 64B 65A 64B ED W |
Haymarket (New) Eastfield Haymarket Eastfield Withdrawn |
25/11/1967 01/06/1968 01/03/1969 04/10/1987 31/07/1989 |
31/07/1989 | ||||
D8318 | 20218 | 25/11/1967 | 64B 65A 64B TO W |
Haymarket (New) Eastfield Haymarket Toton Withdrawn |
25/11/1967 01/06/1968 27/01/1973 15/05/1988 04/10/1989 |
04/10/1989 | ||||
D8319 | 20219 | 20906 | 27/01/1968 | 64B 65A 64B TO |
Haymarket (New) Eastfield Haymarket Toton |
27/01/1968 01/06/1968 27/01/1973 15/05/1988 |
||||
D8320 | 20220 | 25/11/1967 | 66A 65A 64B W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
25/11/1967 27/01/1968 30/05/1970 10/11/1987 |
10/11/1987 | ||||
D8321 | 20221 | 30/12/1967 | 66A 65A HA W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
30/12/1967 27/01/1968 24/05/1975 10/11/1987 |
10/11/1987 | ||||
D8322 | 20222 | 30/12/1967 | 66A 65A 66A 64B W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Polmadie Haymarket Withdrawn |
30/12/1967 24/02/1968 01/03/1969 01/11/1969 15/12/1987 |
15/12/1987 | ||||
D8323 | 20223 | 20/10/1967 | 64B 66A 65A HA W |
Haymarket (New) Polmadie Eastfield Haymarket Withdrawn |
20/10/1967 24/02/1968 24/02/1968 24/05/1975 10/11/1987 |
10/11/1987 | ||||
D8324 | 20224 | 07/02/1968 | 66A 64B TO W |
Polmadie (New) Haymarket Toton Withdrawn |
07/02/1968 01/11/1969 15/05/1988 26/01/1990 |
26/01/1990 | ||||
D8325 | 20225 | 20905 | 07/02/1968 | 66A 65A 64B IM |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Haymarket Immingham |
07/02/1968 27/04/1968 31/05/1969 15/05/1988 |
||||
D8326 | 20226 | 07/02/1968 | 66A 65A 64B IM W |
Polmadie (New) Eastfield Haymarket Immingham Withdrawn |
07/02/1968 27/04/1968 31/05/1969 15/05/1988 26/09/1988 |
26/09/1988 | ||||
D8327 | 20227 | 07/02/1968 | 66A 64B ED |
Polmadie (New) Haymarket Eastfield |
07/02/1968 01/03/1969 15/05/1988 |