Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16418 Week
» 69434 Month
» 188961 Year
» 3215814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
11 0-6-0
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
Notes |
7122 |
LMS |
Big Four |
12035 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
|
30/06/1945 |
|
7124 |
|
Big Four |
12037 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
|
31/10/1945 |
|
7130 |
|
Big Four |
12043 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
7120 |
|
Big Four |
12033 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
|
7121 |
|
Big Four |
12034 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
7123 |
LMS |
Big Four |
12036 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
7131 |
|
Big Four |
12044 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
10/02/1951 |
|
7125 |
|
Big Four |
12038 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
|
7126 |
|
Big Four |
12039 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
on |
25/01/1952 |
|
7127 |
|
Big Four |
12040 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
08/03/1952 |
|
7128 |
|
Big Four |
12041 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
29/03/1952 |
|
7129 |
|
Big Four |
12042 |
BR |
1955 Num |
Post Nationalisation |
w/e |
12/09/1953 |
|