Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 823 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14229 Week
» 67245 Month
» 186772 Year
» 3213625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
11 0-6-0
Class |
Number |
Built |
Name |
Name Date |
Notes |
Removed |
Date Withdrawn |
11 |
12049 |
31/12/1949 |
|
|
|
|
03/10/1971 |
11 |
12052 |
12/04/1949 |
|
|
|
|
13/06/1971 |
11 |
12061 |
21/11/1949 |
|
|
|
|
09/10/1971 |
11 |
12077 |
31/10/1950 |
|
|
|
|
09/10/1971 |
11 |
12083 |
30/11/1950 |
|
|
|
|
09/10/1971 |
11 |
12093 |
08/09/1951 |
|
|
|
|
16/05/1971 |
11 |
12099 |
22/03/1952 |
|
|
|
|
17/07/1971 |
11 |
12131 |
15/11/1952 |
|
|
|
|
16/04/1969 |