08 |
0-6-0 |
D3460 |
73C |
Hither Green |
21/06/1957 |
08/11/1991 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3462 |
73C |
Hither Green |
27/06/1957 |
26/06/1983 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5003 |
5B |
Crewe South |
12/12/1958 |
16/08/1975 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5006 |
5B |
Crewe South |
03/01/1959 |
16/08/1975 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5011 |
73C |
Hither Green |
28/03/1959 |
05/10/1975 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
33 |
Bo-Bo |
D6530 |
73C |
Hither Green |
12/11/1960 |
01/02/1988 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
33 |
Bo-Bo |
D6563 |
73C |
Hither Green |
22/07/1961 |
30/10/1987 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
12 |
0-6-0 |
15211 |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
31/12/1971 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3798 |
NPT |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
02/12/1938 |
19/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4616 |
70D |
Basingstoke |
23/04/1942 |
19/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4626 |
72B |
Salisbury |
15/09/1942 |
10/03/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
7782 |
82F |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
11/1930 |
19/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9629 |
89A |
Oswestry |
13/12/1945 |
09/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73018 |
71G |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
04/10/1951 |
09/07/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73020 |
71G |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
16/10/1951 |
09/07/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73113 |
70A |
Nine Elms |
10/1956 |
22/01/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 4MT |
4-6-0 |
75079 |
70D |
Basingstoke |
20/01/1956 |
20/11/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76059 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
06/1955 |
25/09/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 4MT Tank |
2-6-4T |
80154 |
75A |
Brighton |
26/03/1957 |
02/04/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92239 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
30/09/1958 |
17/11/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
USA |
0-6-0T |
30065 |
SOT |
Southampton Docks |
1943 |
06/10/1962 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
T9 |
4-4-0 |
30120 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
08/1899 |
07/1963 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
N15 |
4-6-0 |
30782 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
07/1925 |
15/09/1962 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
LN |
4-6-0 |
30858 |
|
|
01/1929 |
19/08/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
LN |
4-6-0 |
30859 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
03/1929 |
09/12/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
V |
4-4-0 |
30918 |
|
|
06/1933 |
14/10/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
U |
2-6-0 |
31808 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
07/1928 |
05/01/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
K |
2-6-0 |
32343 |
75A |
Brighton |
11/1916 |
23/12/1962 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
K |
2-6-0 |
32349 |
75E |
Three Bridges |
12/1920 |
24/11/1962 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
33023 |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
06/1942 |
14/06/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
33033 |
TON |
Tonbridge |
11/1942 |
14/06/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
33040 |
70B |
Feltham |
12/1942 |
14/06/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
M7 |
0-4-4T |
30247 |
|
|
04/1897 |
14/10/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
M7 |
0-4-4T |
30023 |
|
|
01/1899 |
07/10/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
M7 |
0-4-4T |
30057 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
01/1906 |
23/06/1963 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
M7 |
0-4-4T |
30059 |
|
|
03/1906 |
25/02/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
Q |
0-6-0 |
30531 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
06/1938 |
19/07/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
415 |
4-4-2T |
30584 |
|
|
12/1885 |
28/01/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34007 |
70A |
Nine Elms |
08/1945 |
17/10/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34015 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
11/1945 |
16/04/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34016 |
71A |
Eastleigh |
11/1945 |
14/06/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34033 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
06/1946 |
19/12/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34057 |
75A |
Brighton |
03/1947 |
07/05/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34072 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
04/1948 |
25/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34094 |
70A |
Nine Elms |
10/1949 |
30/08/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34103 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
02/1950 |
26/09/1965 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
WCBB |
4-6-2 |
34110 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
01/1951 |
16/11/1963 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
MN |
4-6-2 |
35006 |
SAL |
Salisbury |
12/1941 |
16/08/1964 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
MN |
4-6-2 |
35008 |
71B |
Bournemouth |
06/1942 |
09/07/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
MN |
4-6-2 |
35009 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
07/1942 |
07/09/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
MN |
4-6-2 |
35010 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
08/1942 |
11/09/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
MN |
4-6-2 |
35018 |
70A |
Nine Elms |
05/1945 |
09/08/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41206 |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
28/12/1946 |
12/03/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41216 |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
18/09/1948 |
12/03/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41270 |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
09/1950 |
05/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41275 |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
10/1950 |
03/10/1965 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41301 |
75A |
Brighton |
03/1952 |
10/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41324 |
75A |
Brighton |
03/1952 |
03/10/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|