Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24 | Bo-Bo | 24065 | 02/02/1960 | 31/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24069 | 01/01/1960 | 01/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24094 | 18/02/1960 | 29/09/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24106 | 24/09/1960 | 31/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24112 | 30/12/1960 | 31/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24113 | 28/01/1961 | 31/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24115 | 30/04/1960 | 31/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24120 | 04/06/1960 | 31/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24124 | 02/07/1960 | 01/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24130 | 03/09/1960 | 01/12/1976 | On shed | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | 24150 | 27/02/1961 | 01/12/1976 | On shed |