Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Old Oak Common depot - Sunday 19/12/1971
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
42 |
B-B |
D809 |
|
|
19/08/1959 |
03/10/1971 |
Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7006 |
|
|
06/10/1961 |
11/09/1971 |
Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7058 |
|
|
28/11/1962 |
03/10/1971 |
Around the shed. - Stripping for spares outside the old works. |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7062 |
|
|
31/01/1963 |
03/10/1971 |
Around the shed. - Stripping for spares outside the old works. |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7069 |
|
|
22/02/1963 |
03/10/1971 |
Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7079 |
|
|
16/12/1963 |
03/10/1971 |
Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7081 |
|
|
12/12/1963 |
11/09/1971 |
Around the shed. - Carriage sidings near "Pullman" shop. |
|