Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 891 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18694 Week
» 71710 Month
» 191237 Year
» 3218090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
NCB Manvers Main Colliery - Tuesday 03/08/1971
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2209 |
|
|
14/03/1953 |
27/07/1968 |
Around the works - Named 'Traciy', formerly 'Ernie'. In yellow livery. |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2213 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
17/08/1968 |
Around the works - Stored |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2225 |
|
|
15/10/1955 |
19/04/1969 |
Around the works - Usable. Named 'Debra'. In yellow livery. |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2238 |
|
|
10/05/1956 |
27/07/1968 |
Around the works - Named 'Carol', formerly 'Tom'. In yellow livery. |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2248 |
|
|
08/01/1957 |
29/06/1970 |
Around the works - In BR livery. |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2326 |
|
|
02/06/1961 |
20/08/1968 |
Around the works - Stored |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2332 |
|
|
10/07/1961 |
06/1969 |
Around the works - Named 'Lloyd'. In yellow livery. |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2336 |
|
|
24/08/1961 |
15/07/1968 |
Around the works - Stored |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2337 |
|
|
30/08/1961 |
15/07/1968 |
Around the works - Named 'Dorothy'. In yellow livery. |
|