Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 399 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2987 Week
» 32485 Month
» 369331 Year
» 1590896 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Timelines

Hither Green depot - Sunday 27/10/1968
Class Wheels Loco Code Allocation To Service Withdrawn Details Rep Num
03 0-6-0 D2003 73C Hither Green 12/12/1957 07/05/1969 On shed  
03 0-6-0 D2042 73C Hither Green 27/04/1959 07/1969 On shed  
04 0-6-0 D2252 Withdrawn 17/04/1957 27/10/1968 On shed  
04 0-6-0 D2269 Withdrawn 13/02/1958 25/08/1968 On shed  
08 0-6-0 D3471 5A Crewe Diesel 28/08/1957 06/01/1987 On shed  
09 0-6-0 D3665 73C Hither Green 02/02/1959 On shed  
09 0-6-0 D3670 73C Hither Green 25/03/1959 On shed  
09 0-6-0 D4107 73C Hither Green 16/11/1961 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6555 73C Hither Green 20/05/1961 23/09/1987 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6562 73C Hither Green 15/07/1961 11/09/1987 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6565 73C Hither Green 19/08/1961 12/02/1993 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6583 73C Hither Green 06/01/1962 13/02/1997 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6592 73C Hither Green 16/03/1962 On shed  
33 Bo-Bo D6593 73C Hither Green 23/03/1962 01/02/1997 On shed  
12 0-6-0 15212 73C Hither Green 09/04/1949 31/12/1971 On shed  
73 Bo-Bo E6004     06/07/1962 On shed  
73 Bo-Bo E6009 75D Stewarts Lane 10/1965 On shed  
73 Bo-Bo E6035     06/1966 On shed  
73 Bo-Bo E6036     07/1966 On shed