Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08 | 0-6-0 | D3297 | 67A | Corkerhill | 04/02/1957 | 01/11/1983 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3396 | 67A | Corkerhill | 08/11/1957 | 01/11/1983 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3898 | 67A | Corkerhill | 23/08/1960 | On shed | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3923 | 67A | Corkerhill | 20/01/1961 | 10/09/1993 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3925 | 67A | Corkerhill | 01/02/1961 | On shed | ||
27 | Bo-Bo | D5364 | 65A | Eastfield | 13/12/1961 | 12/05/1986 | On shed | |
27 | Bo-Bo | D5405 | 65A | Eastfield | 24/07/1962 | 11/05/1986 | On shed | |
20 | Bo-Bo | D8076 | 66A | Polmadie | 26/07/1961 | 04/05/1988 | On shed | |
17 | Bo-Bo | D8548 | 66A | Polmadie | 27/09/1963 | 31/12/1971 | On shed |