Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 875 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18678 Week
» 71694 Month
» 191221 Year
» 3218074 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Penarth Curve sidings, near Cardiff Canton - Saturday 22/01/1972
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
35 |
B-B |
D7060 |
|
|
19/12/1962 |
03/10/1971 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7064 |
|
|
29/01/1963 |
03/10/1971 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7070 |
|
|
08/03/1963 |
08/09/1972 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7073 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
10/12/1971 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7083 |
|
|
05/06/1963 |
03/10/1971 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7086 |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
01/01/1972 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|
35 |
B-B |
D7088 |
|
|
29/10/1963 |
01/01/1972 |
Sighted in Penarth Curve sidings near Cardiff Canton |
|