Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 805 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18608 Week
» 71624 Month
» 191151 Year
» 3218004 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Cardiff Canton departures - Monday 30/06/1969
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9502 |
|
|
27/07/1964 |
03/05/1969 |
Departed for NCB Ashington Colliery, Blyth |
|
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9514 |
|
|
06/10/1964 |
03/05/1969 |
Departed for NCB Ashington Colliery, Blyth |
|
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9518 |
|
|
30/10/1964 |
03/05/1969 |
Departed for NCB Ashington Colliery, Blyth |
|
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9527 |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
03/05/1969 |
Departed for NCB Ashington Colliery, Blyth |
|