Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 892 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14298 Week
» 67314 Month
» 186841 Year
» 3213694 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Birds scrapyard, Long Marston - Saturday 05/07/1969
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2146 |
|
|
14/02/1961 |
21/09/1968 |
In scrapyard |
|
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2187 |
|
|
08/03/1961 |
11/05/1968 |
In scrapyard |
|
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2188 |
|
|
20/03/1961 |
11/05/1968 |
In scrapyard |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2739 |
|
|
11/12/1958 |
04/03/1967 |
In scrapyard |
|
16 |
Bo-Bo |
D8406 |
|
|
16/09/1958 |
30/09/1968 |
In scrapyard |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8556 |
|
|
29/10/1963 |
02/1969 |
In scrapyard |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8560 |
|
|
12/11/1963 |
02/1969 |
In scrapyard |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8564 |
|
|
20/12/1963 |
16/02/1969 |
In scrapyard |
|