Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
85 | Bo-Bo | E3072 | 06/07/1962 | 04/08/1987 | Paint shop | |||
73 | Bo-Bo | E6012 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 12/1965 | Paint shop | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1504 | 40B | Immingham | 03/01/1963 | 02/03/1986 | Test roads | |
47 | Co-Co | D1872 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 17/06/1965 | 25/08/1998 | Test roads | |
25 | Bo-Bo | D7628 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 12/08/1965 | 01/03/1987 | Test roads | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D201 | D09 | Manchester Division | 03/04/1958 | 23/07/1984 | New erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D235 | D09 | Manchester Division | 28/09/1959 | 13/08/1984 | New erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D254 | 50A | York (North) | 31/12/1959 | 31/12/1977 | New erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D338 | D08 | Liverpool Division | 29/03/1961 | 03/09/1982 | New erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D364 | 64B | Haymarket | 25/10/1961 | 04/07/1983 | New erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D372 | D09 | Manchester Division | 03/01/1962 | 12/09/1983 | New erecting shop | |
81 | Bo-Bo | E3003 | LMW | London Midland - Western Lines | 27/02/1960 | 01/10/1990 | New erecting shop | |
82 | Bo-Bo | E3051 | 28/10/1960 | 13/10/1987 | New erecting shop | |||
85 | Bo-Bo | E3056 | 15/08/1961 | 16/10/1985 | New erecting shop | |||
86 | Bo-Bo | E3176 | 21/08/1965 | New erecting shop | ||||
86 | Bo-Bo | E3193 | 02/12/1965 | 09/1998 | New erecting shop | |||
73 | Bo-Bo | E6013 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 12/1965 | New erecting shop | ||
73 | Bo-Bo | E6025 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 03/1966 | New erecting shop | ||
76 | Bo+Bo | 26023 | 20/10/1951 | 20/07/1981 | New erecting shop | |||
76 | Bo+Bo | 26026 | 19/01/1952 | 20/07/1981 | New erecting shop | |||
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D234 | D09 | Manchester Division | 25/09/1959 | 06/01/1984 | Erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D273 | 55C | Healey Mills | 02/05/1960 | 10/06/1983 | Erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D281 | 52A | Gateshead | 20/06/1960 | 13/02/1983 | Erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D290 | D09 | Manchester Division | 22/08/1960 | 08/11/1983 | Erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D342 | D08 | Liverpool Division | 05/05/1961 | 21/04/1980 | Erecting shop | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D399 | 55B | York (North) | 05/09/1962 | 13/06/1982 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1501 | 40B | Immingham | 13/11/1962 | 01/06/1992 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1503 | 40B | Immingham | 31/12/1962 | 05/06/1987 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1505 | 40B | Immingham | 11/01/1963 | 13/08/1990 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1506 | 40B | Immingham | 18/01/1963 | 13/08/1990 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1507 | 40B | Immingham | 18/01/1963 | 20/07/1986 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1508 | 40B | Immingham | 23/01/1963 | 31/08/1986 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1510 | 41A | Tinsley | 26/02/1963 | 30/06/1989 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1517 | 41A | Tinsley | 19/04/1963 | 04/02/1991 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1620 | D05 | Stoke Division | 17/09/1964 | 01/01/2000 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1623 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 02/10/1964 | 01/10/1994 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1640 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 16/12/1964 | 01/06/2002 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1646 | 87E | Landore | 31/12/1964 | Erecting shop | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1673 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 03/04/1965 | 01/11/1998 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1751 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 14/07/1964 | 01/03/2001 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1769 | 51L | Thornaby | 22/10/1964 | 01/12/1996 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1828 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 10/03/1965 | Erecting shop | ||
47 | Co-Co | D1861 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 28/08/1965 | 31/05/2003 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1867 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 02/07/1965 | 30/06/2005 | Erecting shop | |
47 | Co-Co | D1921 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 03/12/1965 | Erecting shop | ||
25 | Bo-Bo | D7627 | D02 | Birmingham Division | 12/08/1965 | 15/04/1984 | Erecting shop | |
25 | Bo-Bo | D7634 | D08 | Liverpool Division | 19/10/1965 | 21/01/1985 | Erecting shop | |
20 | Bo-Bo | D8025 | 52A | Gateshead | 27/11/1959 | 19/09/1991 | Erecting shop | |
20 | Bo-Bo | D8042 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 11/11/1959 | Erecting shop | ||
20 | Bo-Bo | D8172 | D16 | Nottingham Division | 28/10/1966 | 11/10/1990 | Erecting shop | |
20 | Bo-Bo | D8302 | 50A | York (North) | 22/04/1967 | 08/12/1989 | Erecting shop | |
50 | Co-Co | D400 | D05 | Stoke Division | 07/10/1967 | 01/03/1994 | Erecting shop - collision damage | |
47 | Co-Co | D1908 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 07/10/1965 | 12/08/1969 | Erecting shop - collision damage | |
25 | Bo-Bo | D5272 | D01 | London Division | 22/05/1964 | 02/11/1980 | Erecting shop yard | |
47 | Co-Co | D1617 | D05 | Stoke Division | 04/09/1964 | Erecting shop yard - collision damage | ||
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D311 | D08 | Liverpool Division | 06/12/1960 | 03/05/1981 | Sidings (Arrivals) | |
47 | Co-Co | D1835 | D05 | Stoke Division | 30/04/1965 | 31/03/2003 | Sidings (Arrivals) | |
47 | Co-Co | D1960 | D05 | Stoke Division | 11/11/1967 | Sidings (Arrivals) | ||
81 | Bo-Bo | E3005 | LMW | London Midland - Western Lines | 04/05/1960 | 30/04/1990 | Sidings (Arrivals) | |
82 | Bo-Bo | E3050 | 23/09/1960 | 02/10/1983 | Sidings (Arrivals) | |||
85 | Bo-Bo | E3084 | 07/05/1964 | 17/05/1988 | Sidings (Arrivals - collision damage) | |||
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D267 | D08 | Liverpool Division | 25/03/1960 | 12/07/1981 | Sidings (Departures) | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D347 | 56B | Healey Mills | 31/05/1961 | 07/09/1980 | Sidings (Departures) | |
76 | Bo+Bo | 26008 | 17/03/1951 | 20/07/1981 | Sidings (Departures) | |||
76 | Bo+Bo | 26054 | 16/05/1953 | 20/07/1981 | Sidings (Departures) | |||
48 | Co-Co | D1702 | 41A | Tinsley | 04/11/1965 | 30/09/2004 | Stored | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | 52A | Gateshead | 25/07/1960 | 23/01/1985 | Sidings opposite station - ex works and in blue | |
47 | Co-Co | D1669 | 87E | Landore | 20/03/1965 | 01/09/1990 | Sidings opposite station - ex works and in blue |