Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D266 | 64B | Haymarket | 21/03/1960 | 05/04/1981 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
40 | 1Co-Co1 | D361 | 64B | Haymarket | 03/10/1961 | 29/12/1980 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3382 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 13/09/1957 | 09/05/1983 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3543 | 63A | Perth South | 29/08/1958 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3931 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 10/03/1961 | 06/10/1989 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5066 | 64B | Haymarket | 19/12/1959 | 02/02/1976 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5099 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 03/06/1960 | 02/02/1976 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5109 | 52A | Gateshead | 05/11/1960 | 02/02/1976 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
26 | Bo-Bo | D5338 | 60A | Inverness | 28/08/1959 | 19/10/1992 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
26 | Bo-Bo | D5345 | 60A | Inverness | 23/10/1959 | 04/07/1983 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
27 | Bo-Bo | D5362 | 65A | Eastfield | 30/11/1961 | 09/04/1984 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
25 | Bo-Bo | D7583 | 65A | Eastfield | 21/01/1964 | 13/03/1983 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
20 | Bo-Bo | D8081 | 65A | Eastfield | 31/08/1961 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | ||
20 | Bo-Bo | D8322 | 66A | Polmadie | 30/12/1967 | 15/12/1987 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
17 | Bo-Bo | D8592 | 52A | Gateshead | 12/05/1964 | 21/09/1971 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |
11 | 0-6-0 | 12034 | 05/06/1945 | 19/10/1968 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works | |||
11 | 0-6-0 | 12035 | 19/06/1945 | 19/10/1968 | In Glasgow Locomotive Works |