06 |
0-4-0 |
D2441 |
|
|
17/08/1960 |
01/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2586 |
|
|
05/11/1959 |
12/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2588 |
|
|
24/11/1959 |
12/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2591 |
|
|
08/12/1959 |
12/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2594 |
|
|
19/01/1960 |
12/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2606 |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2708 |
|
|
16/07/1957 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2709 |
|
|
16/08/1957 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2711 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2712 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
04/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2719 |
|
|
11/11/1957 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2722 |
|
|
04/07/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2732 |
|
|
03/10/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2733 |
|
|
08/10/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2741 |
|
|
16/01/1959 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2742 |
|
|
30/01/1959 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2743 |
|
|
20/03/1959 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2752 |
|
|
15/04/1960 |
04/03/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2900 |
|
|
15/04/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2902 |
|
|
24/04/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2904 |
|
|
19/05/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2906 |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2907 |
|
|
15/08/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2909 |
|
|
11/09/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2910 |
|
|
12/09/1958 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2911 |
|
|
15/12/1959 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2912 |
|
|
28/12/1959 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|
D3/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2913 |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
11/02/1967 |
Noted still intact in the scrapyard of the Slag Reduction Co., Ickles (Rotherham) |
|