Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4P | 4-4-0 | 41066 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | 08/1924 | 10/05/1958 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41098 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 08/1925 | 25/05/1957 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41112 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 11/1925 | 02/11/1957 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41114 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 12/1925 | 17/05/1958 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41123 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 11/1925 | 11/12/1959 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41151 | 8E | Brunswick | 08/1925 | 19/01/1957 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41161 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 09/1925 | 19/11/1955 | In store. - Still has 'LMS' on the tender. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 41170 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 11/1925 | 14/04/1956 | In store. | |
4P | 4-4-0 | 40910 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | 06/1927 | 06/1956 | In store. | |
C13 | 4-4-2T | 67429 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 12/1904 | 18/12/1954 | In store. | |
C13 | 4-4-2T | 67432 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 02/1905 | 12/1954 | In store. | |
C14 | 4-4-2T | 67442 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 05/1907 | 30/11/1957 | In store. | |
C14 | 4-4-2T | 67449 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | 06/1907 | 07/12/1957 | In store. | |
J10 | 0-6-0 | 65139 | 06/1896 | 29/12/1956 | In store. | |||
J10 | 0-6-0 | 65202 | 03/1902 | 22/03/1958 | In store. |