Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08 | 0-6-0 | 13012 | 73C | Hither Green | 23/12/1952 | 28/01/1973 | Open Day | |
Std 7P | 4-6-2 | 70004 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 30/03/1951 | 30/12/1967 | Open Day - Open day exhibit | |
Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76017 | 71A | Eastleigh | 13/06/1953 | 04/07/1965 | Open Day - Open day exhibit | |
Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82014 | 71A | Eastleigh | 01/08/1952 | 31/05/1964 | Open Day - Open day exhibit | |
0458 | 0-4-0ST | 30458 | 07/1890 | 12/06/1954 | Open Day - Open day exhibit | |||
WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34025 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 03/1946 | 09/07/1967 | Open Day | |
WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34055 | 72B | Salisbury | 02/1947 | 22/06/1963 | Open Day - Open day exhibit | |
MN | 4-6-2 | 35017 | 9E | Nine Elms | 04/1945 | 17/07/1966 | Open Day - Open day exhibit |