Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4MT | 2-6-0 | 43064 | 35A | New England | 17/11/1950 | 20/06/1965 | Around the works. | |
B12 | 4-6-0 | 61538 | GRA | Grantham | 07/1915 | 01/01/1957 | Around the works. | |
D16 | 4-4-0 | 62523 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 03/1902 | 27/08/1956 | Around the works. | |
D16 | 4-4-0 | 62566 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | 05/1908 | 02/12/1958 | Around the works. | |
D16 | 4-4-0 | 62572 | 31B | March | 06/1909 | 28/07/1958 | Around the works. | |
F5 | 2-4-2T | 67201 | STR | Stratford | 11/1904 | 17/12/1956 | Around the works. | |
F6 | 2-4-2T | 67230 | LOW | Lowestoft | 10/1911 | 13/05/1958 | Around the works. | |
J15 | 0-6-0 | 65438 | 31A | Cambridge | 09/1899 | 19/07/1958 | Around the works. | |
J15 | 0-6-0 | 65445 | COL | Colchester | 08/1899 | 01/08/1962 | Around the works. | |
J39 | 0-6-0 | 64708 | 30A | Stratford | 04/11/1926 | 18/08/1960 | Around the works. | |
J39 | 0-6-0 | 64807 | 40D | Tuxford | 07/11/1929 | 05/04/1960 | Around the works. | |
J39 | 0-6-0 | 64970 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 24/08/1938 | 24/05/1961 | Around the works. | |
N2 | 0-6-2T | 69574 | KX | Kings Cross | 11/1928 | 14/02/1961 | Around the works. | |
N7 | 0-6-2T | 69650 | 34C | Hatfield | 12/1926 | 19/05/1959 | Around the works. | |
N7 | 0-6-2T | 69651 | 38B | Annesley | 02/1927 | 13/01/1961 | Around the works. | |
N7 | 0-6-2T | 69725 | STR | Stratford | 07/1928 | 16/09/1962 | Around the works. | |
J17 | 0-6-0 | 65570 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 01/1906 | 22/04/1960 | Around the works. | |
J17 | 0-6-0 | 65572 | 31B | March | 01/1906 | 02/12/1957 | Around the works. |