Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5101 | 2-6-2T | 4113 | 20/10/1936 | 18/11/1965 | Dumped | |||
5101 | 2-6-2T | 4161 | 14/09/1948 | 18/11/1965 | Dumped | |||
6100 | 2-6-2T | 6111 | 08/1931 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
6100 | 2-6-2T | 6136 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
6100 | 2-6-2T | 6141 | 11/1932 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6827 | 26/02/1937 | 25/09/1965 | Dumped - Being cut up. | |||
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 25/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
4900 | 4-6-0 | 6923 | 24/07/1941 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
4900 | 4-6-0 | 6937 | 11/07/1942 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
4900 | 4-6-0 | 6953 | 27/02/1943 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
6959 | 4-6-0 | 6991 | 23/11/1948 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
6959 | 4-6-0 | 6999 | 10/02/1949 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82041 | 17/06/1955 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 01/08/1958 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | 28/11/1958 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92250 | 31/12/1958 | 31/12/1965 | Dumped | |||
4P | 2-6-4T | 42247 | 11/10/1946 | 14/08/1965 | Dumped |