76 |
Bo+Bo |
26000 |
|
|
19/02/1941 |
22/03/1970 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26011 |
|
|
17/03/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26026 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26033 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26034 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26047 |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
02/11/1980 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
77 |
Co-Co |
27005 |
39a |
Reddish |
11/12/1954 |
05/10/1968 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92014 |
16D |
Annesley |
31/05/1954 |
14/10/1967 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92092 |
38B |
Annesley |
31/12/1956 |
22/10/1966 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92102 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
31/08/1956 |
11/11/1967 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90101 |
27B |
Aintree |
25/01/1943 |
16/05/1964 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90103 |
CLK |
Colwick |
02/1943 |
21/11/1965 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90130 |
34E |
New England |
04/1943 |
17/10/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90133 |
36C |
Frodingham |
04/1943 |
17/10/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90541 |
|
|
07/1943 |
08/05/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90013 |
36C |
Frodingham |
09/1943 |
17/04/1966 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90280 |
40B |
Immingham |
12/1943 |
05/09/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90293 |
36A |
Doncaster |
01/1944 |
26/09/1965 |
Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90300 |
56D |
Mirfield |
02/1944 |
24/06/1967 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90301 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
02/1944 |
26/09/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90302 |
40E |
Langwith Junction |
02/1944 |
18/08/1964 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90305 |
36A |
Doncaster |
02/1944 |
06/03/1966 |
Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90611 |
55D |
Royston |
01/1944 |
17/08/1967 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90368 |
41D |
Canklow |
10/1944 |
20/06/1965 |
Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90447 |
36A |
Doncaster |
03/1944 |
18/11/1963 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90484 |
36A |
Doncaster |
07/1944 |
13/03/1966 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90665 |
NWE |
New England |
10/1944 |
19/12/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90730 |
NWE |
New England |
05/1945 |
03/10/1965 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
J39 |
0-6-0 |
64744 |
39A |
Gorton |
20/07/1928 |
24/03/1962 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63762 |
|
|
08/1912 |
16/03/1962 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63612 |
41H |
Staveley (G.C.) |
01/1914 |
14/11/1965 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
O1 |
2-8-0 |
63689 |
38B |
Annesley |
03/1918 |
17/11/1962 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63704 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
10/1918 |
17/03/1963 |
Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63764 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
03/1918 |
27/02/1966 |
Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63775 |
39A |
Gorton |
04/1918 |
24/03/1962 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63781 |
36C |
Frodingham |
05/1918 |
17/04/1966 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63720 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
05/1919 |
05/03/1964 |
Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63730 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
11/1919 |
02/01/1966 |
Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. |
|