|
|
D4113 |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
31/08/2005 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - engines in. |
|
|
|
D4114 |
|
|
21/01/1962 |
01/10/2005 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - engines in. |
|
|
|
D4115 |
|
|
18/01/1962 |
07/05/1993 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - frames. |
|
|
|
D4116 |
|
|
26/01/1962 |
|
Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - frames. |
|
|
|
D4111 |
|
|
15/12/1961 |
|
Around the Works - Paint shop. |
|
|
|
D4112 |
|
|
22/12/1961 |
|
Around the Works - Erecting shop - completed. |
|
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12004 |
21B |
Bescot |
26/05/1939 |
09/12/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12014 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
09/03/1940 |
21/10/1967 |
Around the Works - Diesel test house. |
|
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12020 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
15/06/1940 |
18/11/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12027 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
19/02/1942 |
04/11/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76051 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
31/08/1956 |
29/04/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76079 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
30/01/1957 |
02/12/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
43856 |
9G |
Gorton |
1918 |
26/09/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
43976 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
1922 |
11/04/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48136 |
|
|
08/1941 |
11/03/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48164 |
18D |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
03/1943 |
21/10/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48201 |
18A |
Toton |
06/1942 |
09/03/1968 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48333 |
18A |
Toton |
11/1943 |
26/06/1965 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48338 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
01/1944 |
08/06/1968 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48423 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
18/12/1943 |
03/08/1968 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48522 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
11/1944 |
19/08/1967 |
Around the Works - Casual repair shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48536 |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
06/1945 |
21/01/1967 |
Around the Works - Casual repair shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48558 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
08/1945 |
09/10/1965 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48634 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
08/1943 |
14/08/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48717 |
13D |
Northwich |
07/1944 |
01/04/1967 |
Around the Works - Casual repair shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48741 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
02/1946 |
28/10/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
8F |
2-8-0 |
48770 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
05/1946 |
08/04/1967 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44056 |
25D |
Mirfield |
05/1925 |
11/10/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44146 |
71G |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
11/1925 |
13/11/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44152 |
|
|
12/1925 |
09/1961 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44277 |
20F |
Skipton |
12/1926 |
22/05/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44342 |
5E |
Alsager |
12/1926 |
26/10/1963 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44352 |
5E |
Alsager |
05/1927 |
10/1963 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44367 |
6K |
Rhyl |
06/1927 |
12/09/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44373 |
99C |
Crewe Works |
10/1927 |
26/12/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44481 |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
12/1927 |
28/11/1964 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44564 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
07/1937 |
19/09/1964 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44602 |
17D |
Rowsley |
08/1940 |
09/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
1351 |
0-6-0T |
51537 |
|
|
10/1897 |
21/09/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - being cut up. |
|
3F |
0-6-0T |
47402 |
99H |
Horwich Works |
12/1926 |
29/12/1962 |
Around the Works - Works shunter. |
|
3F |
0-6-0T |
47429 |
99H |
Horwich Works |
10/1926 |
04/12/1965 |
Around the Works - Works shunter. |
|
1008 |
2-4-2T |
50621 |
|
|
02/1889 |
18/09/1954 |
Around the Works - Paint shop. |
|
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42953 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
13/12/1933 |
15/01/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42982 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
08/02/1934 |
13/11/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42983 |
5B |
Crewe South |
09/03/1934 |
15/01/1966 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43007 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
21/02/1948 |
16/09/1967 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43009 |
12H |
Tebay |
06/03/1948 |
26/11/1966 |
Around the Works - Casual repair shop. |
|
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43052 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
10/07/1950 |
05/11/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42702 |
55F |
Manningham |
03/09/1926 |
24/01/1966 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42703 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
08/10/1926 |
03/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42717 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
14/05/1927 |
17/10/1964 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42763 |
17B |
Burton |
01/07/1927 |
06/06/1964 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42799 |
17B |
Burton |
11/12/1927 |
23/01/1965 |
Around the Works - Paint shop. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42827 |
21A |
Saltley |
12/11/1929 |
21/08/1965 |
Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42862 |
25A |
Wakefield |
02/04/1930 |
30/11/1962 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42863 |
25A |
Wakefield |
05/04/1930 |
17/08/1966 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42893 |
|
|
02/08/1930 |
22/07/1961 |
Around the Works - Scrap yard - remains. |
|
3P |
2-6-2T |
40132 |
|
|
28/09/1935 |
21/10/1961 |
Around the Works - Works yard. |
|