Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D9526 | 06/01/1965 | 30/11/1968 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9527 | 18/01/1965 | 03/05/1969 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9528 | 21/01/1965 | 02/03/1969 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9529 | 26/01/1965 | 01/04/1968 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9530 | 02/02/1965 | 05/10/1968 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9531 | 02/02/1965 | 30/12/1967 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9532 | 18/02/1965 | 01/04/1968 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9533 | 19/02/1965 | 01/04/1968 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9534 | 02/03/1965 | 01/04/1968 | Under construction, frames with motors fitted | |||||
D9523 | 01/12/1964 | 01/04/1968 | Construction Completed | |||||
D9524 | 11/12/1964 | 03/05/1969 | Construction Completed | |||||
D9525 | 13/01/1965 | 01/04/1968 | Construction Completed | |||||
D9535 | 08/03/1965 | 21/12/1968 | Under construction (frames only) | |||||
D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D602 | 83D | Laira | 03/11/1958 | 31/12/1967 | In 'A' shop | |
D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D603 | 83D | Laira | 21/11/1958 | 31/12/1967 | Yard | |
PWM | 0-6-0 | PWM653 | 08/1959 | In 'A' shop | ||||
42 | B-B | D803 | 83D | Laira | 16/03/1959 | 01/01/1972 | In 'A' shop | |
42 | B-B | D808 | 83D | Laira | 08/07/1959 | 03/10/1971 | In 'A' shop | |
42 | B-B | D814 | 83D | Laira | 01/01/1960 | 07/11/1972 | Yard | |
42 | B-B | D827 | 83D | Laira | 04/10/1960 | 01/01/1972 | Yard | |
42 | B-B | D830 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 19/01/1961 | 26/03/1969 | Weigh shed | |
43 | B-B | D853 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 30/08/1961 | 03/10/1971 | In 'A' shop | |
43 | B-B | D859 | 83D | Laira | 09/01/1962 | 27/03/1971 | Yard | |
43 | B-B | D860 | 83D | Laira | 22/01/1962 | 27/03/1971 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1006 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 06/07/1962 | 06/04/1975 | Weigh shed | |
52 | C-C | D1025 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 01/11/1963 | 06/10/1975 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1037 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 31/08/1962 | 24/05/1976 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1039 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 07/09/1962 | 21/07/1973 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1041 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10/10/1962 | 23/02/1977 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1053 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 11/02/1963 | 15/11/1976 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1055 | 87E | Landore | 02/03/1963 | 05/01/1976 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1057 | 87E | Landore | 06/04/1963 | 02/05/1976 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1064 | 87E | Landore | 24/05/1963 | 11/12/1975 | In 'A' shop | |
52 | C-C | D1068 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 12/07/1963 | 12/10/1976 | In 'A' shop | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2086 | 82C | Swindon | 05/06/1959 | 13/11/1983 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2088 | 82C | Swindon | 01/07/1959 | 08/06/1972 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2126 | 82C | Swindon | 16/12/1959 | 09/10/1971 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2146 | 82C | Swindon | 14/02/1961 | 21/09/1968 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2188 | 82C | Swindon | 20/03/1961 | 11/05/1968 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2192 | 82C | Swindon | 05/05/1961 | 25/01/1969 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2193 | 82C | Swindon | 15/05/1961 | 25/01/1969 | Inside the stock shed | |
03 | 0-6-0 | D2194 | 82C | Swindon | 23/05/1961 | 21/09/1968 | Inside the stock shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3025 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 05/09/1953 | 17/07/1983 | Yard | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3027 | 84B | Oxley | 03/10/1953 | 25/09/1983 | In 'A' shop | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3437 | 87B | Margam | 16/06/1958 | 12/09/1988 | In 'A' shop | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3743 | 87E | Landore | 20/06/1959 | 30/04/2006 | In 'A' shop | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3761 | 81C | Southall | 13/11/1959 | 20/07/2001 | In 'A' shop | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3803 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 05/12/1958 | 27/07/1980 | In 'A' shop | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3815 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 04/03/1959 | In 'A' shop | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3820 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 02/04/1959 | In 'A' shop | ||
22 | B-B | D6307 | 83D | Laira | 12/10/1959 | 27/03/1971 | In 'A' shop | |
22 | B-B | D6326 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 16/05/1960 | 03/10/1971 | In 'A' shop | |
22 | B-B | D6330 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 26/07/1960 | 23/09/1971 | In 'A' shop | |
22 | B-B | D6351 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 27/06/1962 | 30/11/1969 | In 'A' shop | |
35 | B-B | D7013 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 14/12/1961 | 01/01/1972 | In 'A' shop | |
35 | B-B | D7031 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 25/04/1962 | 11/05/1973 | In 'A' shop | |
14 | 0-6-0 | D9517 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 12/11/1964 | 05/10/1968 | Inside the stock shed | |
1000 | 4-6-0 | 1011 | 29/01/1946 | 06/11/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1658 | 28/02/1955 | 06/11/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1664 | 29/03/1955 | 06/11/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
2800 | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 12/1905 | 25/10/1963 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3685 | 21/12/1940 | 08/04/1964 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3748 | 18/10/1937 | 06/05/1964 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4615 | 13/04/1942 | 09/10/1964 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4626 | 15/09/1942 | 10/03/1964 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | 07/06/1943 | 06/05/1964 | Around the turntable | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4670 | 26/01/1944 | 09/10/1964 | Dump | |||
4900 | 4-6-0 | 4903 | 85A | Worcester | 12/1928 | 09/10/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |
4900 | 4-6-0 | 4932 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 06/1929 | 06/11/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |
4073 | 4-6-0 | 5054 | 03/06/1936 | 23/10/1964 | In 'C' shop | |||
5600 | 0-6-2T | 5602 | 12/1924 | 07/09/1964 | Dump | |||
5600 | 0-6-2T | 5632 | 09/1925 | 07/09/1964 | Yard | |||
6000 | 4-6-0 | 6010 | 04/1928 | 22/06/1962 | Dump | |||
6100 | 2-6-2T | 6122 | 10/1931 | 21/09/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6430 | 02/03/1937 | 09/10/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6806 | 21/09/1936 | 23/10/1964 | Dump | |||
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6823 | 84B | Oxley | 21/01/1937 | 26/06/1965 | Yard | |
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6824 | 30/01/1937 | 08/04/1964 | Dump | |||
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6827 | 2B | Oxley | 26/02/1937 | 25/09/1965 | Around the turntable | |
6800 | 4-6-0 | 6873 | 03/04/1939 | 15/06/1964 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7782 | 11/1930 | 19/10/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8401 | 31/08/1949 | 07/09/1964 | Dump | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8405 | 31/12/1949 | 07/09/1964 | Yard | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8409 | 04/01/1950 | 10/08/1964 | Around the turntable | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8418 | 31/03/1950 | 10/08/1964 | Dump | |||
4300 | 2-6-0 | 7327 | 02/1932 | 06/11/1964 | Dump | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9425 | 01/09/1950 | 28/11/1963 | Around the turntable | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9457 | 04/10/1951 | 06/07/1964 | Around the turntable | |||
9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9484 | 09/10/1952 | 20/04/1964 | Dump | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9606 | 07/06/1945 | 06/11/1964 | In 'C' shop | |||
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9752 | 31/05/1935 | 28/12/1963 | Dump | |||
Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73012 | 24/08/1951 | 06/11/1964 | Outside the stock shed | |||
Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78009 | 04/1953 | 07/02/1964 | Dump | |||
Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92223 | 2A | Tyseley | 06/06/1958 | 13/04/1968 | In 'A' shop | |
4F | 0-6-0 | 43940 | 1921 | 24/10/1964 | Dump | |||
6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42945 | 9G | Gorton | 21/10/1933 | 26/03/1966 | Yard | |
6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42975 | 21B | Bescot | 25/01/1934 | 26/03/1966 | In 'A' shop | |
4MT | 2-6-0 | 43001 | 5B | Crewe South | 20/12/1947 | 16/09/1967 | Yard | |
4MT | 2-6-0 | 43003 | 5D | Stoke | 17/01/1948 | 16/09/1967 | In 'A' shop | |
4MT | 2-6-0 | 43012 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 10/04/1948 | 05/1967 | In 'A' shop | |
4MT | 2-6-0 | 43112 | 5D | Stoke | 29/03/1951 | 16/09/1967 | In 'A' shop | |
4MT | 2-6-0 | 43137 | 56A | Wakefield | 13/07/1951 | 09/09/1967 | Yard |