CLOSED |
Kelvedon |
Tollesbury |
07/05/1951 |
The Kelvedon-Tollesbury line was closed on 7th May, 1951. |
CLOSED |
Bourne |
Essendine |
18/06/1951 |
The Bourne-Essendine branch was closed from 18th June, 1951. |
CLOSED |
Felixstowe Pier |
|
02/07/1951 |
Felixstowe Pier station was closed on 2nd July, 1951. |
CLOSED |
Nottingham Suburban Line |
|
31/07/1951 |
The freight service on the Nottingham Suburban Line (already closed for passenger traffic) was completely withdrawn on 31st July, 1951 and St. Annes Well, Thorneywood and Sherwood stations were closed. |
CLOSED |
Wymondham |
Forncett |
04/08/1951 |
The Wymondham-Forncett branch will be closed on 4th August. |
CLOSED |
Glasgow |
Aberfoyle |
01/10/1951 |
An announcement made on 3rd September, states that the Glasgow-Aberfoyle train service is to be withdrawn from 1st October, involving the closing of 10 stations. |
CLOSED |
Louth |
Bardney |
03/11/1951 |
The Louth-Bardney branch was closed to passenger traffic on 3/11/1951: Passenger services were withdrawn from Donington-on-Bain, South Willingham, Withcall, Hallington, Wragby, Kingthorpe and East Barkwith. |
CLOSED |
Dumfries |
Lockerbie |
15/05/1952 |
It is now reported that the Dumfries-Lockerbie service is to cease on 15th May. |
CLOSED |
Lochmaben |
Dumfries |
19/05/1952 |
On May 19th the Lochmaben-Dumfries line will close to passenger traffic. |
CLOSED |
Merstone |
Ventnor West |
15/09/1952 |
Closing Of The Merstone-Ventnor West Branch Line - The Southern Region of British Railways withdrew the passenger and freight services from the Ventnor West branch on and from Monday, 15th September, and the stations at Godshill, Whitwell, St. Lawrence and Ventnor West were closed. |
CLOSED |
Kirkby Stephen |
Penrith |
27/11/1952 |
Passenger services between Kirkby Stephen and Penrith have been withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Sunderland |
Pittington |
03/01/1953 |
The Sunderland-Pittington line was closed to regular passenger traffic on 3rd January, the last train being worked from Pittington by "A.8" No. [69853]. The line may be opened for the Durham Miners' Gala Day in July. |
CLOSED |
Cheddington |
Aylesbury |
02/02/1953 |
It is officially announced that British Railways are to withdraw the passenger train service on the Cheddington-Aylesbury Branch on and from Monday, 2nd February. |
CLOSED |
Swindon Junction |
Highworth |
02/03/1953 |
It is officially announced that the passenger train service between Swindon Junction and Highworth will be withdrawn from 2nd March. |
CLOSED |
Margate East Station |
|
04/05/1953 |
Margate East Station will be closed from 4th May. |
CLOSED |
Market Harborough |
Nottingham (Victoria) |
07/12/1953 |
British Railways have announced the closing of the following sections of line: Market Harborough to Nottingham (Victoria) |
CLOSED |
Leicester (Belgrave Road) |
Grantham |
07/12/1953 |
British Railways have announced the closing of the following sections of line: Leicester (Belgrave Road) to Grantham |
CLOSED |
Blackhill |
Scotswood |
01/02/1954 |
The Blackhill-Scotswood section of the Newcastle-Consett line have been closed to passenger traffic, necessitating the re-routing of services via Birtley. |
CLOSED |
Nantymoel branch |
|
05/05/1958 |
Nantymoel branch passenger traffic is to be withdrawn w.e.f. 5th May. |
CLOSED |
Moreton Hampstead branch |
|
28/02/1959 |
Moreton Hampstead branch passenger services to be withdrawn from 28/2/1959. |
CLOSED |
Hawes |
Garsdale Junction |
16/03/1959 |
Hawes-Garsdale Junction - this branch will close completely from 16th March. |
CLOSED |
St. Ives |
Kettering |
15/06/1959 |
Cambridge to Kettering (between St. Ives and Kettering) closes to passenger traffic. Lifting has commenced from Kimbolton eastwards already. |
CLOSED |
Higham Ferrers |
|
15/06/1959 |
The Higham Ferrers branch closes to passengers on 15th June. |
CLOSED |
Rugby |
Leamington |
15/06/1959 |
Rugby-Leamington closes to passengers on 15th June. |
CLOSED |
Southwell |
|
15/06/1959 |
Southwell branch closes to passengers on 15th June. |
CLOSED |
Stamford |
Essendine |
15/06/1959 |
Stamford to Essendine closes to passengers on 15th June. |
CLOSED |
Wallingford |
|
15/06/1959 |
The Wallingford branch closes to passengers on 15th June. |
CLOSED |
Ledbury |
Gloucester |
13/07/1959 |
Ledbury-Gloucester closes w.e.f. 13th July, 1959. |
CLOSED |
Bridgend Junc. |
Middlemuir Junc. |
02/11/1959 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bridgend Junc.-Middlemuir Junc. |
CLOSED |
Bala |
Blaenau Festiniog |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Bala to Blaenau Festiniog. |
CLOSED |
Bidston |
Seacombe |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Bidston to Seacombe (but Wrexham trains will travel to and from New Brighton instead). |
CLOSED |
Blisworth |
Northampton |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Blisworth to Northampton (and Blisworth is to close). |
CLOSED |
Lambourn |
Newbury |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Lambourn to Newbury. |
CLOSED |
Northampton |
Market Harborough |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Northampton to Market Harborough. |
CLOSED |
Northwich |
Sandbach |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Northwich to Sandbach. |
CLOSED |
Wigan North Western |
Blackburn via White Bear |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Wigan North Western to Blackburn via White Bear. |
CLOSED |
Wigan Wallgate |
Blackburn |
04/01/1960 |
The passenger service is due to be withdrawn on the following branch:- Wigan Wallgate to Blackburn. |
CLOSED |
Inverteil Junc. |
Auchtertool |
01/10/1960 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Inverteil Junc.-Auchtertool. |
CLOSED |
Banbury |
Buckingham |
31/12/1960 |
Banbury-Buckingham branch closed to passengers. |
CLOSED |
Bothwell |
Shettleston |
06/06/1961 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bothwell-Shettleston. |
CLOSED |
Grimsby |
Immingham |
02/07/1961 |
The Grimsby-Immingham tramway will be closed completely after Saturday, 1st July. |
CLOSED |
Ashchurch |
Upton on Severn |
14/08/1961 |
The service from Ashchurch-Upton on Severn is to cease w.e.f. 14th August. |
CLOSED |
Barnard Castle |
Penrith |
22/01/1962 |
As from 22nd January, the passenger services between Barnard Castle and Penrith were withdrawn and the line closed completely between-Barnard Castle and the quarry east of Kirkby Stephen, Tebay and Kirkby Stephen and Clifton Moor (nr. Eden Valley Junc.) and Appleby. The last train on the section was the return R.C.T.S. Special to Darlington, on Saturday evening, 20th January, hauled by [77003 and 76049{22/1/1962}]. |
CLOSED |
Eyemouth |
|
05/02/1962 |
As from 5th February the Eyemouth branch is to be closed completely. |
CLOSED |
Galashiels |
Peebles |
05/02/1962 |
The Galashiels via Peebles branch is to be closed completely from 5th February. |
CLOSED |
Bedford |
Northampton |
05/03/1962 |
As from 5th March, passenger services are to be withdrawn from the Bedford-Northampton branch. |
CLOSED |
Ormskirk |
Southport |
05/03/1962 |
Local services between Ormskirk and Southport cease w.e.f. 5th March, when the curve between Burscough Bridge and Burscough Junc. is closed. |
CLOSED |
Uplawmoor |
Neilston High |
02/04/1962 |
The Uplawmoor branch service is to be cut back to Neilston High as from 2nd April. |
CLOSED |
Newport |
Blaenavon L.L. |
30/04/1962 |
Newport to Blaenavon L.L. branch (which will close completely as goods traffic is dealt with at the H.L. station of former L & NW Railway |
CLOSED |
Brynmawr/Ebbw Vale |
|
30/04/1962 |
Brynmawr/Ebbw Vale branches. |
CLOSED |
Chester |
Ruthin |
30/04/1962 |
Chester-Denbigh-Ruthin passenger service with complete closure between Ruthin and Corwen and Denbigh and Rhydymwyn. |
CLOSED |
Meon Valley |
|
30/04/1962 |
Complete closure of truncated portion of one-time Meon Valley line, Droxford-Knowle Junction (nr. Fareham). |
CLOSED |
Coniston branch |
|
30/04/1962 |
The Coniston branch closed completely from 30th April. |
CLOSED |
Leith North |
|
30/04/1962 |
Leith North lost its passenger service from 30th April. |
CLOSED |
Botley |
Bishops Waltham |
30/04/1962 |
The Botley-Bishops Waltham goods branch is to close completely w.e.f. 30th April. |
CLOSED |
Hoddlesden Jcn. |
Hoddlesden |
03/05/1962 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hoddlesden Jcn.-Hoddlesden. |
REOPENED |
Washingboro' Jc.-Greetwell Jc. (Lincoln). |
|
03/06/1962 |
Washingboro' Jc.-Greetwell Jc. (Lincoln). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Washingboro' Jc.-Greetwell Jc. (Lincoln). |
|
03/06/1962 |
Washingboro' Jc.-Greetwell Jc. (Lincoln). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Washingborough Jc.-Pelham St. (Lincoln) Jc. |
|
03/06/1962 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Washingborough Jc.-Pelham St. (Lincoln) Jc. |
CLOSED |
Washingborough Jc. |
Pelham Street (Lincoln) Jc. |
03/06/1962 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Washingborough Jc.-Pelham Street (Lincoln) Jc. |
CLOSED |
Fairford branch |
|
18/06/1962 |
The Fairford branch closes to passengers from 18th June and Witney-Fairford will be closed completely. |
CLOSED |
Mildenhall branch |
|
18/06/1962 |
The Mildenhall branch closes to passengers from 18th June. |
CLOSED |
Leighton Buzzard |
Luton |
02/07/1962 |
The Leighton Buzzard-Luton branch loses its passenger service from 2nd July |
CLOSED |
Wellington |
Much Wenlock |
23/07/1962 |
The passenger service on the Wellington-Much Wenlock branch will be withdrawn from 23rd July. |
CLOSED |
Wellington |
Much Wenlock |
23/07/1962 |
Wellington-Much Wenlock passenger service to be withdrawn as from 23rd July. |
CLOSED |
Stourbridge Junc. |
Wolverhampton L.L. |
30/07/1962 |
The passenger service on the Stourbridge Junc. - Wolverhampton L.L. line will be withdrawn from 23rd July |
CLOSED |
Tenbury Wells |
Bewdley |
30/07/1962 |
Tenbury Wells-Bewdley passenger service to be withdrawn as from 30th July. |
CLOSED |
Tenbury Wells |
Bewdley |
01/08/1962 |
Tenbury Wells-Bewdley now loses its passenger service from Wednesday, 1st Aug. |
CLOSED |
Highworth |
|
06/08/1962 |
Highworth station is to be closed to all traffic from 6th Aug |
CLOSED |
Foulford |
Auchtertool Junc. |
06/08/1962 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Foulford-Auchtertool Junc.. |
CLOSED |
Stratton |
Highworth |
06/08/1962 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Stratton-Highworth. |
CLOSED |
Highworth |
Kingsdown Road box |
06/08/1962 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Highworth-Kingsdown Road box |
CLOSED |
Aldridge |
Walsall Wood |
03/09/1962 |
The truncated portion of the former M.R. Brownhills branch (lifted beyond Walsall Wood), Aldridge-Walsall Wood, is to be closed to freight traffic. |
CLOSED |
Hexthorpe Jc. |
Bentley Jc. |
08/09/1962 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- Hexthorpe Jc.-Bentley Jc. (Doncaster avoiding line). |
CLOSED |
Ashburton branch |
|
10/09/1962 |
The Ashburton branch closed completely from 10th Sept. |
CLOSED |
Coaley |
Dursley |
10/09/1962 |
Coaley to Dursley is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Edinburgh Circle |
|
10/09/1962 |
Edinburgh Circle line (and Rosewell and Hawthornden) is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
West Drayton |
Uxbridge Vine St. |
10/09/1962 |
West Drayton to Uxbridge Vine St. is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Taunton |
Castle Cary |
10/09/1962 |
Local services between Taunton and Castle Cary |
CLOSED |
Saxondale Jc. |
Barnstone A.P.C.M. Siding |
10/09/1962 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Saxondale Jc.-Barnstone A.P.C.M. Siding |
CLOSED |
Mahon East |
Pilmoor |
10/09/1962 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Mahon East-Pilmoor (Scarborough-Newcastle Summer SO trains ceased running). |
CLOSED |
Blackburn |
Hellifield |
10/09/1962 |
Blackburn to Hellifield is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Cardiff |
Pontypridd |
10/09/1962 |
Cardiff and Cadoxton to Pontypridd via Efail Isaf is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Didcot |
Newbury |
10/09/1962 |
Didcot to Newbury is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Ditton Junc. |
Manchester Oxford Road |
10/09/1962 |
Ditton Junc. to Manchester Oxford Road is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Taunton |
Chard |
10/09/1962 |
Taunton to Chard and Chard Junc. is to lose it's passenger service. |
CLOSED |
Whitland |
Cardigan |
10/09/1962 |
Whitland to Cardigan is to lose it's passenger service; goods traffic is not to be discontinued yet on the Cardigan branch |
CLOSED |
Wrexham |
Ellesmere |
10/09/1962 |
Wrexham to Ellesmere is to lose it's passenger service; branch is to be closed completely between Bangor on Dee and Wrexham. |
CLOSED |
Stathern Junc. |
Saxondale Junc. |
10/09/1962 |
The former GN/LNW line between Stathern Junc. and Saxondale Junc. (near Nottingham) was closed completely w.e.f. 10th Sept. |
CLOSED |
Kelvedon |
Tiptree |
01/10/1962 |
From 1st October the remainder of the former Tollesbury Lt. Rly. (Kelvedon-Tiptree) and the section of line between Broom Junc. and Evesham are to be closed completely. In the latter case the Redditch-Ashchurch service is still with the T.U.C.C. but the Engineer has refused to be responsible for any further traffic between Broom and Evesham after Saturday, 29th September. This section of line has the new sleepers waiting for installation, but apparently the expenditure will not be sanctioned. It is understood that buses will operate between Evesham and Alcester (or Redditch) from 1/10 to replace the passenger trains, and goods traffice will be suspended except that Alcester will be open for goods traffic (via Redditch). On Saturday, 22nd September, 42400/17/21 were all working on the branch trains through from Birmingham New St.-Ashchurch and Jinty" 47308 replaced 42421 on the 11-38 a.m. Redditch-Ashchurch, back with the 1-15 p.m. from Ashchurch-Redditch. 42421 resumed with the 2-55 p.m. ex Redditch and apparently this has been a regular working of a Jinty on Saturdays. MR Class 3s (and GW PTs) have been noted but it is believed that GW PTs cannot work the Redditch sidings-wherefore the keeping of 47296 at Bromsgrove to change with 47308. |
CLOSED |
Alcester |
Evesham |
01/10/1962 |
The line from Alcester (excl.) to Evesham (ex-LMR) (excl.) will be closed entirely-thus confirming the "temporaryā€¯ closure from 1st October, 1962. |
CLOSED |
Neath |
Brecon |
15/10/1962 |
From 15th October passenger services will be withdrawn from Neath-Brecon. |
CLOSED |
Lugton |
Beith |
15/10/1962 |
From 15th October passenger services will be withdrawn from Lugton-Beith |
CLOSED |
Kingham |
Cheltenham |
15/10/1962 |
From 15th October passenger services will be withdrawn from Kingham-Cheltenham. |
CLOSED |
Craig-y-nos |
Brecon |
15/10/1962 |
Complete closure between Craig-y-nos and Brecon. |
CLOSED |
Bourton-on-the-Water |
Cheltenham |
15/10/1962 |
Complate closure between Bourton-on-the-Water and Cheltenham. |
CLOSED |
Ludlow |
Bitterley |
15/10/1962 |
The Ludlow-Bitterley (foot of Clee Hill incline) goods line was closed w.e.f. 15th October |
CLOSED |
Brecon |
|
05/11/1962 |
All the Brecon passenger services (from Newport, Moat Lane and Hereford) are withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Three Cocks |
Eardisley |
05/11/1962 |
The Three Cocks-Eardisley section closed completely. |
CLOSED |
Llanidloes |
Talyllyn Junc. |
05/11/1962 |
The Llanidloes-Talyllyn Junc. section closed completely. |
CLOSED |
Pengam |
New Tredegar |
05/11/1962 |
The Pengam-New Tredegar section closed completely. |
CLOSED |
Napton |
Southam |
05/11/1962 |
On the Weedon-Leamington branch a short stretch (2m. 12c) has been closed completely between Napton station and Southam since 5th Nov. since when all traffic for Southam Mills has run via Rugby and reversed at Marton Junc. |
CLOSED |
Lugton |
Beith |
05/11/1962 |
The passenger services on the Lugton-Beith branch are now to be withdrawn w.e.f. 5th November |
CLOSED |
Helston |
|
05/11/1962 |
The passenger services on the Helston branch will be withdrawn on w.e.f. 5th November. |
CLOSED |
Henley in Arden |
|
05/11/1962 |
The Henley in Arden goods line (i.e. the new connection installed from the N. Warwicks. line when built, to the old Henley terminus) was closed w.e.f. 5th November. |
CLOSED |
Lugton |
Beith |
05/11/1962 |
The passenger service on the Lugton-Beith branch is now to be withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Malmesbury |
|
12/11/1962 |
The Malmesbury branch closes completely w.e.f. 12th November. |
CLOSED |
Blackhill Junc. |
Germinston Junc. |
19/11/1962 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Blackhill Junc.-Germinston Junc.. |
CLOSED |
West Bay |
Bridport |
03/12/1962 |
The West Bay-Bridport section closes completely w.e.f. 3rd December. |
CLOSED |
Kingham |
Chipping Norton |
03/12/1962 |
The passenger service between Kingham and Chipping Norton will be withdrawn w.e.f. 3rd December. |
CLOSED |
Swansea |
Treherbert |
03/12/1962 |
The passenger service between Swansea and Treherbert will be withdrawn w.e.f. 3rd December. However, a d.m.u. service will operate between Bridgend, Cymmer Afan and Treherbert and also Dyffryn Rhondda halt will have a workmen's service from Cymner Afan. |
CLOSED |
Swadlincote |
Woodville loop |
08/12/1962 |
The Swadlincote-Woodville loop has been closed to all passenger traffic; the 1Ast passenger train over the branch was on 8th Dec. 1962. |
CLOSED |
Henley in Arden |
|
31/12/1962 |
Henley in Arden Goods branch official closure date has now been amended to 31st December, 1962. |
CLOSED |
Brecon |
|
31/12/1962 |
All passenger services to Brecon cease w.e.f. 31st December and goods services will operate as previously recorded. |
CLOSED |
Gunhouse Jc. |
Gunness Wharf. |
07/01/1963 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Gunhouse Jc.-Gunness Wharf. |
CLOSED |
Oldham Werneth |
Middleton Jcn. |
07/01/1963 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Oldham Werneth-Middleton Jcn. |
CLOSED |
Oldham Werneth |
Chadderton Jcn |
07/01/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Oldham Werneth-Chadderton Jcn. |
CLOSED |
Alsager Yard |
Silverdale |
07/01/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Alsager Yard-Silverdale. |
CLOSED |
Alsager East Junct. |
Silverdale |
07/01/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Alsager East Junct.-Silverdale (Alsager East Junct. to Diglake NCB opencast site retained pending NCB developments, which did not materialise; line severed 1966/7 between Alsager Yard and Diglake for Motorway; Alsager East Junct. to Yard finally put out of use 22.9.1968). |
CLOSED |
Tattenhall Junction |
Whitchurch |
07/01/1963 |
The section of line between Tattenhall Junction and Whitchurch closes completely w.e.f. 7th Jan. 1963. |
CLOSED |
Pinxton |
|
07/01/1963 |
Pinxton branch passenger services cease w.e.f. 7th Jan., 1963. |
REOPENED |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Canal Jct. |
18/02/1963 |
Carlisle Kingmoor-Canal Jct. (Stainton Xg.). (Re-opened to Freight) |
REOPENED |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Canal Jcn. |
28/02/1963 |
Carlisle Kingmoor-Canal Jcn. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Bulwell Common |
Newstead East |
04/03/1963 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Bulwell Common-Newstead East (workmen's). |
CLOSED |
Husthwaite Gate |
Pilmoor |
19/03/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Husthwaite Gate-Pilmoor (junction at Pilmoor severed by mishap and not replaced). |
CLOSED |
Pant Jcn. |
Deri Jcn. |
01/04/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pant Jcn.-Deri Jcn. |
REOPENED |
Llanfair Caereinion |
Castle Caereinion. |
06/04/1963 |
Llanfair Caereinion-Castle Caereinion. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Niddrie North |
Wanton Walls |
08/04/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Niddrie North-Wanton Walls. |
CLOSED |
Ystrad Mynach North |
Hengoed H.L. |
06/05/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ystrad Mynach North-Hengoed H.L. |
CLOSED |
Loddington mineral branch |
|
06/05/1963 |
The Loddington mineral branch (from Kettering) was closed w.e.f. 6th May |
CLOSED |
Churston |
Brixham |
13/05/1963 |
The Churston-Brixham branch was closed entirely w.e.f. 13th May. |
CLOSED |
Cardigan branch |
|
27/05/1963 |
The Cardigan branch was closed completely w.e.f. 27th May. |
CLOSED |
Middleton Top |
.Steeplehouse Goods |
03/06/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Middleton Top-.Steeplehouse Goods |
CLOSED |
Middleton Top |
Middle Peak Wharf |
03/06/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Middleton Top-Middle Peak Wharf |
CLOSED |
Wrington |
Congresbury |
10/06/1963 |
The Wrington-Congresbury section of the former Blagdon branch was completely closed w.e.f. 10th June (Blagdon-Wrington section closed 1st November, 1950, and passenger services over the branch from 14th Sept., 1931). The 1Ast coal traffic was worked by 41249 on 7th June. |
CLOSED |
Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane) |
Pennington South Junc. |
17/06/1963 |
The Atherton Junc. (Bag Lane)-Pennington South Junc. section of the former LNWR Kenyon Junc.-Bolton Gt. Moor St. branch is to be officially closed w.e.f. 17th June, 1963. |
CLOSED |
Westcraigs Junc. |
Shotts East |
17/06/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Westcraigs Junc.-Shotts East. |
CLOSED |
Boston Grand Sluice Junction |
Coningsby Junction |
17/06/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Boston Grand Sluice Junction-Coningsby Junction. |
CLOSED |
Goxhill |
Killingholme, Yorkshire Tar Distillers Sdg. |
17/06/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Goxhill-Killingholme, Yorkshire Tar Distillers Sdg. ("temporary" closure). |
CLOSED |
Seacombe Goods |
Bidston, Seacombe Junct. |
17/06/1963 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Seacombe Goods-Bidston, Seacombe Junct. |
CLOSED |
Cresswell |
Cheadle |
17/06/1963 |
Cresswell-Cheadle passenger services will be withdrawn w.e.f. 17th June |
CLOSED |
Redditch |
Ashchurch |
17/06/1963 |
Redditch-Ashchurch passenger services (including the "temporary" bus service between Redditch and Evesham which commenced 1st October, 1962) will be withdrawn w.e.f. 17th June |
CLOSED |
Boston |
Woodhall Junc. |
17/06/1963 |
Boston-Woodhall Junc. passenger service was withdrawn w.e.f. 17th June. |
CLOSED |
Goxhill |
Immingham Dock |
17/06/1963 |
The Goxhill-Immingham Dock passenger service was withdrawn w.e.f. 17th June but the service between Ulceby and Immingham Dock (previously unadvertised) will remain in operation; |
CLOSED |
Tonteg Junc. |
Cadoxton North |
17/06/1963 |
Freight services on the Barry line between Tonteg Junc. and Cadoxton North were withdrawn w.e.f. 17th June and all traffic now diverted via Radyr and Penarth N. curve. The Barry line from Tyn-y-Caeau-Penrhos was closed to through traffic after a fire at Tyn-y-Caeau signal box on 30th March. |
CLOSED |
Chesterfield |
Heath |
17/06/1963 |
The Chesterfield-Heath section of the Chesterfield loop (G.C.R.) was closed w.e.f. 17th June. |
REOPENED |
Swansea High St. Loop East |
Felin Fran West |
23/06/1963 |
Swansea High St. Loop East-Felin Fran West (Sundays only, to 8.9.1963 incl.) (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Carlisle Down Tower |
Canal Jcn. |
27/06/1963 |
Carlisle Down Tower-Canal Jcn. (North British Departure line). (Re-opened to Freight) |
REOPENED |
Acton Canal Wharf |
Willesden Jcn. No. 7 |
22/07/1963 |
Acton Canal Wharf-Willesden Jcn. No. 7. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Ludgershall |
Tidworth |
31/07/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ludgershall-Tidworth (WD line lifted 8/5/64). |
CLOSED |
Deri Junc. |
Pant Junc. |
05/08/1963 |
The section of the B. and M. line between Deri Junc. and Pant Junc. was closed w.e.f. 5th August |
CLOSED |
Facit |
Whitworth |
12/08/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Facit-Whitworth |
CLOSED |
Welshpool |
Raven Square |
17/08/1963 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Last train between Welshpool and Raven Square (line severed two days later). |
CLOSED |
Bankend |
Coalburn |
19/08/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bankend-Coalburn. |
CLOSED |
Chester |
Broughton and Bretton |
02/09/1963 |
The following service is withdrawn:- The Chester-Broughton and Bretton workmen's service was withdrawn w.e.f. 2nd September. |
CLOSED |
Hertford N. |
Hertford E. |
09/09/1963 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Official complete closure date of Hertford N.-Hertford E.; all regular traffic ceased but there were one or two un-official trips made for local convenience after that date. |
CLOSED |
Tondu |
Pyle. |
09/09/1963 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Tondu-Pyle. |
CLOSED |
Swansea High St. Loop East |
Felin Fran West |
09/09/1963 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Swansea High St. Loop East-Felin Fran West (Sunday trains withdrawn). |
REOPENED |
Nuneaton TV |
Abbey Junct. |
15/09/1963 |
Nuneaton TV-Abbey Junct. (Sundays only, to 15.6.1964 incl.) (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Kingsbridge branch |
|
16/09/1963 |
Kingsbridge branch is postponed till 16th Sept.; |
CLOSED |
Epworth |
Hatfield Moor |
30/09/1963 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Epworth-Hatfield Moor. |
CLOSED |
Liverpool Exchange Jcn. |
Gt. Howard St. Goods |
30/09/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Liverpool Exchange Jcn.-Gt. Howard St. Goods. |
CLOSED |
Brymbo and Bwlchgwyn |
|
01/10/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Brymbo and Bwlchgwyn, including Llanfynydd private siding (former Wrexham and Minera Jt., GW/LNW) |
CLOSED |
Brymbo East |
Bwlchgwyn Sdg. (Ffrith) |
01/10/1963 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Brymbo East-Bwlchgwyn Sdg. (Ffrith) |
CLOSED |
Ashbourne |
Hartington |
07/10/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Ashbourne (excl.) to Hartington (excl.) |
CLOSED |
Heanor South GN |
|
07/10/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Heanor South GN branch (branch remaining open from Stanton Junc.-Nutbrook sidings) |
CLOSED |
Humber Rd. Junc. |
Gosford Green |
07/10/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Coventry avoiding line from Humber Rd. Junc.-Gosford Green goods (Humber Rd. Junction to be taken out 13th Oct.), |
CLOSED |
Bangor |
Bethesda |
07/10/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Bangor-Bethesda |
CLOSED |
Wrexham |
Rhos and Pant |
14/10/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Wrexham to Rhos and Pant |
CLOSED |
Rhos Jc. |
Pant |
14/10/1963 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Rhos Jc.-Pant |
CLOSED |
Hawcoat Branch GF. Barrow in Furness |
Hawcoat |
20/10/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hawcoat Branch GF. Barrow in Furness-Hawcoat |
CLOSED |
Barrhead South |
Chain Road, Ferguslie |
28/10/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Barrhead South-Chain Road, Ferguslie |
CLOSED |
Harborne branch |
|
04/11/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Harborne branch |
CLOSED |
Hayling Island branch |
|
04/11/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Hayling Island branch |
CLOSED |
Marefield Junc. |
Welham Junc. |
04/11/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Marefield Junc. (nr. Leicester) to Welham Junc. (Nr. Market Harboro) |
CLOSED |
Whitchurch |
Tattenhall Junc. |
04/11/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Whitchurch-Tattenhall Junc. |
CLOSED |
White Moss Crossing |
Skelmersdale |
04/11/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- White Moss Crossing-Skelmersdale |
CLOSED |
Wingate |
Castle Eden West |
04/11/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wingate-Castle Eden West |
CLOSED |
Wingate Colliery box |
Colliery (Grange Level crossing) |
04/11/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wingate Colliery box-Colliery (Grange Level crossing) |
CLOSED |
Trimdon Grange |
Kelloe Bankfoot GF |
04/11/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Trimdon Grange-Kelloe Bankfoot GF |
CLOSED |
Ormskirk Branch Sdas. |
Skelmersdale |
18/11/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ormskirk Branch Sdas.-Skelmersdale |
CLOSED |
Cheddington |
Aylesbury High Street. |
02/12/1963 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Cheddington-Aylesbury High Street. |
CLOSED |
Shefford |
Hitchin Goods Yard (Mid.) |
02/12/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Shefford-Hitchin Goods Yard (Mid.) |
CLOSED |
Thornton West Junct. |
Wemyss Castle |
02/12/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Thornton West Junct.-Wemyss Castle |
CLOSED |
Shrewsbury |
Alveley Colliery |
04/12/1963 |
(subject to postponement)-Severn valley line between Shrewsbury and Alveley Colliery |
CLOSED |
Longville |
Buildwas |
04/12/1963 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Longville-Much Wenlock-Buildwas |
CLOSED |
Niddrie North |
Niddrie West |
23/12/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Niddrie North-Niddrie West. |
CLOSED |
Park Hall Colliery |
Normacot Jcn. |
23/12/1963 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Park Hall Colliery-Normacot Jcn. (lifted 13th July, 1964). |
CLOSED |
Irlam, LMR/MSC Exchange |
Irlam CWS Factory (MSC Railway). |
31/12/1963 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Irlam, LMR/MSC Exchange-Irlam CWS Factory (MSC Railway). |
CLOSED |
Hitchin Goods Yard (Mid.) |
Cambridge Jct. |
01/01/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hitchin Goods Yard (Mid.)-Cambridge Jct. |
CLOSED |
Longbridge |
Halesowen |
06/01/1964 |
The following branch is closing completely:- Longbridge-Halesowen (GW/Mid. Jt.). |
CLOSED |
Helsby & Alvanley |
West Cheshire Junction |
06/01/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Helsby & Alvanley-West Cheshire Junction (workmen's service). |
CLOSED |
Oldham Werneth |
Chadderton Jn. |
06/01/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Oldham Werneth-Chadderton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Kelty North |
Blairenbathie |
06/01/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kelty North-Blairenbathie (Blairadam branch). |
CLOSED |
Tunstall Jcn. |
Longport Jcn. |
17/02/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Tunstall Jcn.-Longport Jcn. (not retained for diversions). |
CLOSED |
Crombie RNAD branch jct. |
Charlestown |
24/02/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crombie RNAD branch jct.-Charlestown |
CLOSED |
Pontypool Road South Jn. |
West Jn. |
28/02/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pontypool Road South Jn.-West Jn. |
CLOSED |
Kipps |
Rigghead |
02/03/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kipps-Rigghead. |
CLOSED |
Burton, Uxbridge St. Jc. |
Bond End branch |
02/03/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Burton, Uxbridge St. Jc.-Bond End branch |
CLOSED |
Summit Sdg. (Birchenwood Coke Co.) |
Newchapel & Golden Hill |
02/03/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Summit Sdg. (Birchenwood Coke Co.)-Newchapel & Golden Hill (retained temporarily, as a through siding, during period of engineering work in the area). |
CLOSED |
Curran's Sdg., Riverside Branch North SB |
Cardiff Clarence Road |
16/03/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Curran's Sdg., Riverside Branch North SB-Cardiff Clarence Road |
CLOSED |
Cradley Heath |
Old Hill Goods (Spinners End) |
06/04/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Cradley Heath-Old Hill Goods (Spinners End). |
CLOSED |
South Witham |
Buckminster sidings |
06/04/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: South Witham-Buckminster sidings, the line between Pain's Siding and Buckminster is also out of regular use |
CLOSED |
Old Fold Colliery |
Haydock Jn. |
06/04/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Old Fold Colliery-Haydock Jn. |
CLOSED |
Carr Mill Jn. |
Marsh's sidings |
06/04/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Carr Mill Jn.-Marsh's sidings |
CLOSED |
Greenfield |
Oldham G. Rd. |
13/04/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Greenfield-Oldham G. Rd. |
CLOSED |
Crumlin Jcn. |
Llanhilleth Middle |
30/04/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crumlin Jcn.-Llanhilleth Middle (line severed 17th May, 1964). |
CLOSED |
Oundle |
Thrapston |
04/05/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Oundle-Thrapston. |
CLOSED |
Brackley Colliery |
Little Hulton Jn. |
11/05/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Brackley Colliery-Little Hulton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Little Hulton Junct. |
Little Hulton Colly. |
11/05/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Little Hulton Junct.-Little Hulton Colly. (Brackley Colly). |
CLOSED |
Southampton Terminus |
Southampton Old Docks, Channel Islands Boat Platform |
11/05/1964 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Southampton Terminus - Southampton Old Docks, Channel Islands Boat Platform (retained for Summer-only use until 27.9.1964). |
CLOSED |
Polton |
Esk Valley Junct. |
18/05/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Polton-Esk Valley Junct. |
CLOSED |
Marlborough H.L. (GW) |
Marlborough L.L. |
19/05/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Marlborough H.L. (GW)-Marlborough L.L. (MSWJ) |
REOPENED |
South Yard (Naval Store Office) |
Saw Mills |
31/05/1964 |
South Yard (Naval Store Office)-Saw Mills (Devonport Dockyard Railway) (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Distington Joint Jn. |
Calva Jn. |
01/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Distington Joint Jn.-Calva Jn. |
CLOSED |
Cockermouth Jcn. |
Cockermouth Old Goods Station |
01/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cockermouth Jcn.-Cockermouth Old Goods Station. |
REOPENED |
Castle Caereinion |
Sylfaen. |
06/06/1964 |
Castle Caereinion-Sylfaen. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Kirriemuir branch |
|
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kirriemuir branch. |
CLOSED |
Careston |
Justinhaugh |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Careston-Justinhaugh. |
CLOSED |
Windsor Bridge No. 2 |
New Barns Jn. |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Windsor Bridge No. 2-New Barns Jn. |
CLOSED |
Ystrad Mynach South Jcn. |
Ystrad Mynach |
15/06/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Ystrad Mynach South Jcn.-Ystrad Mynach (Nelson branch platforms) (Workmen's). |
CLOSED |
Distington Joint Jcn. |
Calva Jcn. |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Distington Joint Jcn.-Calva Jcn. |
CLOSED |
Harrington Jcn. |
Wilkinson's Sdg. |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Harrington Jcn.-Wilkinson's Sdg. (Derwent branch). |
CLOSED |
Maerdy |
Maerdy Jc. |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Maerdy-Maerdy Jc. |
CLOSED |
Senghenydd |
Windsor Colliery North GF |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Senghenydd-Windsor Colliery North GF |
CLOSED |
Bridgend & Coity Goods |
|
15/06/1964 |
Cowbridge Road Jn.-Bridgend & Coity Goods |
CLOSED |
Great Bridge South (Horseley Bridge and Thos. Piggott's Sdg.) |
Horsley Fields Jct. |
15/06/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Great Bridge South (Horseley Bridge and Thos. Piggott's Sdg.)-Horsley Fields Jct. (regular traffic ceased; subsequently used for diversions; last train over section (special DMU) ran 5.7.67; line officially closed 1.1.68). |
CLOSED |
Nuneaton T.V. |
Abbey Junct. |
15/06/1964 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Nuneaton T.V.-Abbey Junct. (Sunday-only trains withdrawn). |
CLOSED |
Bramley |
Laisterdyke |
16/06/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Bramley-Laisterdyke (via Pudsey Greenside). |
CLOSED |
Nuneaton TV |
Abbey Junct. |
16/06/1964 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Nuneaton TV-Abbey Junct. (Sunday trains withdrawn). |
OPENED |
Craig-y-Nos |
Colbren Junction |
01/07/1964 |
Line reopened: Goods : Craig-y-Nos-Colbren Junction. (Opened to Goods) |
CLOSED |
Little Weighton |
Springbank Junc (Hull) |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Little Weighton-Springbank Junc (Hull). |
CLOSED |
Horninglow Bridge |
Wharf |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Horninglow Bridge-Wharf. |
CLOSED |
Clifton Moor |
Eden Valley June. |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Clifton Moor-Eden Valley June.. |
CLOSED |
Balloch (F&C Junc.) |
Balloch (Jamestown) |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Balloch (F&C Junc.)-Balloch (Jamestown). |
CLOSED |
Dawley & Stirchley |
Hadley Junction |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dawley & Stirchley-Hadley Junction. |
CLOSED |
Jamestown |
Croftengear Sdg. |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Jamestown-Croftengear Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Bramley |
Pudsey Greenside-Laisterdyke |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Bramley-Pudsey Greenside-Laisterdyke |
CLOSED |
Ketley |
Horsehay Iron Works |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ketley-Horsehay Iron Works |
CLOSED |
Lancing Station g.f. |
Lancing Works (Workmen) |
06/07/1964 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Lancing Station g.f.-Lancing Works (Workmen). |
CLOSED |
Airdrie East |
Calder, Imperial Tube Works |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Airdrie East-Calder, Imperial Tube Works |
CLOSED |
Kings Inch |
Porterfield-Renfrew South No. 4 |
06/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kings Inch-Porterfield-Renfrew South No. 4 |
CLOSED |
Mildenhall |
Barnwell Junc. |
13/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Mildenhall-Barnwell Junc.. |
CLOSED |
West Drayton |
Uxbridge Vine Str. |
13/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- West Drayton-Uxbridge Vine Str.. |
CLOSED |
Hengoed H.L. |
L.L. |
13/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hengoed H.L.-L.L. |
CLOSED |
Hindley North No. 2 |
De Trafford Jn.-Standish Jn. |
15/07/1964 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Hindley North No. 2-De Trafford Jn.-Standish Jn. (retained for Summer use). |
CLOSED |
Dereliam South |
West |
22/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Dereliam South-West. |
CLOSED |
Boskell sdg. |
Lanfalon |
27/07/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Boskell sdg.-Lanfalon (part of Trenance branch, St. Austell). |
CLOSED |
Letterston Junc |
Trecwm |
01/08/1964 |
The passenger service on the Letterston Junc.-Trecwm (Workmen's service) line is to be withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Upton |
Newbury |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Upton-Newbury (Didcot to Upton will be singled and worked as a siding). |
CLOSED |
Enborne Junc. |
Winnall Sidings |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Enborne Junc.-Winnall Sidings (between Kings Worthy and Winchester Chesil). |
CLOSED |
Amotherby |
Husthwaite Gate |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Amotherby-Husthwaite Gate |
CLOSED |
Gilling |
Kirby Moorside |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gilling-Kirby Moorside. |
CLOSED |
Pickering |
Thornton Dale |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pickering-Thornton Dale. |
CLOSED |
Dalkeith branch |
|
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dalkeith branch. |
CLOSED |
Jedburgh branch |
|
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Jedburgh branch. |
CLOSED |
Lochty branch |
|
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lochty branch. |
CLOSED |
Birchills CEA |
Short Heath |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Birchills CEA-Short Heath (postponed from 2nd March). |
CLOSED |
Didcot |
Newbury |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Didcot-Newbury (Didcot-Upton not retained). |
CLOSED |
Newbury, Enborne Junct. |
Winchester Chesil |
10/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Newbury, Enborne Junct.-Winchester Chesil |
CLOSED |
Ruabon |
Gardden Lodge |
31/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ruabon-Gardden Lodge. |
CLOSED |
Guisboro' |
Nunthorpe E. |
31/08/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Guisboro'-Nunthorpe E. |
CLOSED |
Balloch, Jamestown |
Croftengea Sdg. |
01/09/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Balloch, Jamestown-Croftengea Sdg. |
REOPENED |
Slateford Junct. |
Granton Junct. |
07/09/1964 |
Slateford Junct.-Granton Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Granton Junct. |
Edinburgh, Haymarket Central Junct., Duff Street Junct. |
07/09/1964 |
Granton Junct.-Edinburgh, Haymarket Central Junct., Duff Street Junct. (junction installed 30.8.1964). (Re-opened to All traffic) |
CLOSED |
Carlisle |
Silloth |
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Carlisle-Silloth (7th September; freight services were withdrawn 1st June) |
CLOSED |
Wolverton |
Newport Pagnell |
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Wolverton-Newport Pagnell. |
CLOSED |
Nottingham Vic. |
Derby F. |
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Nottingham Vic.-Derby F. |
CLOSED |
Devonport Junc. |
St. Budeaux Victoria Road |
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Devonport Junc.-St. Budeaux Victoria Road (LSW line) (the 1941 St. Budeaux Ferry Road to Victoria Road connection will be brought into regular passenger use). |
CLOSED |
Musselburgh branch |
|
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Musselburgh branch |
CLOSED |
Glasgow (Queen St.) |
Kirkintilloch |
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Glasgow (Queen St.)-Kirkintilloch. |
CLOSED |
Portishead branch |
|
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Portishead branch. |
CLOSED |
Romsey |
Andover Junc. |
07/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Romsey-Andover Junc. |
CLOSED |
Oldbury (G.W.) branch |
|
07/09/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Part of Oldbury (G.W.) branch, 7th September. |
CLOSED |
Glasson Dock-Freeman's Wood Siding |
|
07/09/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Glasson Dock-Freeman's Wood Siding (1m. 143 yds. from Lancaster C.). |
CLOSED |
Wakefield, Balne Lane |
Dewsbury C.-Adwalton Jn. |
07/09/1964 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Wakefield, Balne Lane-Dewsbury C.-Adwalton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Kirkham & Wesham North Jn. |
Marton-Blackpool South |
07/09/1964 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Kirkham & Wesham North Jn.-Marton-Blackpool South (two Sunday only trains ran until 3.1.65 incl.; retained for Summer use until 3.9.66). |
CLOSED |
Bude |
Bude Harbour. |
07/09/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bude-Bude Harbour. |
CLOSED |
Chinley East |
Chinley South |
21/09/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Chinley East-Chinley South. |
CLOSED |
Southampton Terminus |
Southampton Old Docks, Channel Islands Boat Platform |
27/09/1964 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (date shown is last day of operation) :- Southampton Terminus - Southampton Old Docks, Channel Islands Boat Platform. |
CLOSED |
Heniarth Gate |
Sylfaen |
28/09/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Heniarth Gate-Sylfaen (temporary closure). |
CLOSED |
Dereham |
Wells |
05/10/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Dereham-Wells. |
CLOSED |
Mundesley on Sea |
North Walsham |
05/10/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Mundesley on Sea-North Walsham. |
CLOSED |
Finsbury Park |
Drayton Park, LTB. |
05/10/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Finsbury Park-Drayton Park, LTB. |
CLOSED |
Finsbury Park |
Drayton Park, LTB. |
05/10/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Finsbury Park-Drayton Park, LTB. |
CLOSED |
Hull |
Withernsea |
19/10/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Hull-Withernsea. |
CLOSED |
Hull |
Hornsea |
19/10/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Hull-Hornsea. |
CLOSED |
Newton Hall (Durham) |
Leamside and Finchdale siding. |
22/10/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Newton Hall (Durham)-Leamside and Finchdale siding. |
CLOSED |
Pennington South Junc. |
Bickershaw Colliery |
31/10/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Pennington South Junc.-Bickershaw Colliery. |
CLOSED |
Hereford |
Gloucester |
02/11/1964 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Hereford-Gloucester. |
CLOSED |
Great Harwood |
Padiham Junction |
02/11/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Great Harwood-Padiham Junction. |
CLOSED |
Padiham |
Great Harwood Jn. |
02/11/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Padiham-Great Harwood Jn. |
CLOSED |
Pateley Bridge |
Ripley (Nidd Bridge) |
02/11/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pateley Bridge-Ripley (Nidd Bridge). |
CLOSED |
Wigan Cent. |
Wigan Cent. Goods. |
02/11/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Wigan Cent.-Wigan Cent. Goods. |
CLOSED |
Catterick Bridge |
Catterick Camp |
02/11/1964 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Catterick Bridge-Catterick Camp (Ministry of Defence railway; latterly only traversed by unadvertised B.R. trains on Mondays only; last trains ran 26.10.1964) |
CLOSED |
Stockingford Colliery branch |
|
17/11/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Stockingford Colliery branch. |
CLOSED |
Middle Peak Wharf |
Steeplehouse, Middleton branch Jn. |
02/12/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Middle Peak Wharf-Steeplehouse, Middleton branch Jn. |
CLOSED |
Bishopsgate |
Spitalfields |
05/12/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bishopsgate-Spitalfields |
CLOSED |
Bonnybridge Canal branch |
|
07/12/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Bonnybridge Canal branch (not retained for private siding). |
CLOSED |
Willenhall Stafford Street |
Short Heath |
07/12/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Willenhall Stafford Street-Short Heath. |
CLOSED |
Rigley's Wagon Works (Bulwell Forest) |
Leen Valley Junc.-Basford North |
31/12/1964 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Rigley's Wagon Works (Bulwell Forest)-Leen Valley Junc.-Basford North. |
CLOSED |
Brentford Town |
Dock |
31/12/1964 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Brentford Town-Dock. |
CLOSED |
Hindley South |
Lowton St. Mary's |
04/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Hindley South-Lowton St. Mary's. |
CLOSED |
Redheugh (Gateshead) |
Watergate Colliery (Tanfield) |
04/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Redheugh (Gateshead)-Watergate Colliery (Tanfield). |
CLOSED |
Cheadle Village Jn. |
Davenport Jn. |
04/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Cheadle Village Jn.-Davenport Jn., regular traffic ceased |
CLOSED |
Bootle Oriel Rd. |
Bankfield Goods |
04/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bootle Oriel Rd.-Bankfield Goods. |
CLOSED |
Lichfield Rd. Junction |
North Walsall Junc. |
07/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Lichfield Rd. Junction-North Walsall Junc. |
CLOSED |
Atherton Jn. |
Howe Bridge West Jn. |
18/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Atherton Jn.-Howe Bridge West Jn. |
CLOSED |
Howe Bridge Jc. West |
Atherton Bag Lane Jc. |
18/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Howe Bridge Jc. West-Atherton Bag Lane Jc. |
CLOSED |
Bala |
Bala Junc.-Morfa Mawddach |
18/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Bala-Bala Junc.-Morfa Mawddach |
CLOSED |
Preston W.L. Goods |
-Penwortham Junct. |
25/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Preston W.L. Goods--Penwortham Junct. |
CLOSED |
Whitehouse South Junct. |
Penwortham Junct. |
25/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Whitehouse South Junct.-Penwortham Junct. |
CLOSED |
Preston W.L. Goods |
Penwortham Junct |
27/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Preston W.L. Goods-Penwortham Junct |
CLOSED |
Whitehouse South Junct. |
Penwortham Junct. |
27/01/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Whitehouse South Junct.-Penwortham Junct. |
CLOSED |
Aldeby |
Haddiscoe |
01/02/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Aldeby-Haddiscoe (postponed to the end of the sugar beet season). |
CLOSED |
Daren Colly |
Clydach on Tawe North-Monds Nickel GF |
01/02/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Daren Colly-Clydach on Tawe North-Monds Nickel GF |
CLOSED |
Whaley Bridge |
Shallcross Yard (C&HP) |
01/02/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Whaley Bridge-Shallcross Yard (C&HP) |
CLOSED |
Adwalton Jn. |
Roundwood Colliery |
15/02/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Adwalton Jn.-Roundwood Colliery |
CLOSED |
Wrenthorpe West Jn. |
South Jn. |
15/02/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Wrenthorpe West Jn.-South Jn. |
CLOSED |
Hindley South |
Amberswood Junction East |
22/02/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hindley South-Amberswood Junction East. |
OPENED |
Newark new curve |
|
28/02/1965 |
Newark new curve opened to freight traffic; Sunday passenger services commenced to use curve on 20/6/1965. (Opened to Freight) |
OPENED |
Newark GN Crossing |
|
01/03/1965 |
At Newark GN Crossing (goods link from North Gate towards Lincoln). (Opened to Goods) |
CLOSED |
Hindley South |
Amberswood Jn. East |
01/03/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Hindley South-Amberswood Jn. East. |
CLOSED |
Byfield Ironstone Sdg. |
Woodford Halse No. 4 |
01/03/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Byfield Ironstone Sdg.-Woodford Halse No. 4 (actual closure; 'official' date 5th July, 1965. |
CLOSED |
Blidworth Jct. |
Southwell |
01/03/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Blidworth Jct.-Southwell |
CLOSED |
Rolleston West Jct. |
Fiskerton Jct. |
01/03/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Rolleston West Jct.-Fiskerton Jct. |
REOPENED |
Aldwarke Junction |
|
07/03/1965 |
Aldwarke Junction. (Re-opened to Goods) |
OPENED |
Aldwarke Jn. |
|
15/03/1965 |
At Aldwarke Jn. (goods links between Midland and GC lines, in both directions, north of Rotherham; passenger trains commenced 5th April). (Opened to Goods) |
CLOSED |
Staines Central (west curve) |
|
22/03/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Staines Central (west curve). |
CLOSED |
Cobnarwood GF |
Nesfield |
29/03/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cobnarwood GF-Nesfield. |
CLOSED |
Middleton in Teesdale |
Forcett Junc. |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Middleton in Teesdale-Forcett Junc. |
CLOSED |
Epworth and Fockerby |
Marshland Junc. (Goole) |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Epworth and Fockerby-Marshland Junc. (Goole). |
CLOSED |
St. Dennis Junc. |
Parkandillack |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- St. Dennis Junc.-Parkandillack (2m. 10c.). |
CLOSED |
Reading Gen. Main Line E. |
Reading Junc. (S.R. Old Junction) |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Reading Gen. Main Line E.-Reading Junc. (S.R. Old Junction) although part of this will be used in new electric line to General Station. |
CLOSED |
Easton |
Weymouth |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Easton-Weymouth. |
CLOSED |
Wigan Central |
Hindley South |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Wigan Central-Hindley South. |
CLOSED |
Dearne Junction |
Mexboro' West Junction |
05/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dearne Junction-Mexboro' West Junction. |
CLOSED |
Corngreaves branch, Cradley Heath |
|
12/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Corngreaves branch, Cradley Heath. |
CLOSED |
Dunstable North |
Welwyn Garden City |
26/04/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Dunstable North-Welwyn Garden City. |
CLOSED |
New Caudledown siding |
Carbean (1m. 77c.) |
29/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- New Caudledown siding-Carbean (1m. 77c.) (line severed). |
CLOSED |
Denham East Junct. |
Harefield Embankment g.f. |
30/04/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Denham East Junct.-Harefield Embankment g.f. (last train, to Esso siding, ran February 1965; junction points removed 7.11.1965; private siding "officially" closed 1.1.1967). |
CLOSED |
Kirkudbright branch |
|
03/05/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Kirkudbright branch |
CLOSED |
Ballinluig Junc. |
Aberfeldy |
03/05/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Ballinluig Junc.-Aberfeldy. |
CLOSED |
South Acton |
Hammersmith and Chiswick |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- South Acton-Hammersmith and Chiswick. |
CLOSED |
Fraserburgh |
St. Combs |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Fraserburgh-St. Combs. |
CLOSED |
Ballinluig Junc. |
Aberfeldy |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Ballinluig Junc.-Aberfeldy. |
CLOSED |
Smeaton Junc. |
Saltoun |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Smeaton Junc.-Saltoun. |
CLOSED |
Dearne Jn. |
Mexborough West Jn. |
03/05/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Dearne Jn.-Mexborough West Jn. |
CLOSED |
Mexborough No. 1 |
No. 3. |
03/05/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Mexborough No. 1-No. 3. |
CLOSED |
Dearne Jn. |
Mexborough West Jn. |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Dearne Jn.-Mexborough West Jn. |
CLOSED |
Holmfirth |
Brockholes |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Holmfirth-Brockholes. |
CLOSED |
Harrisons Siding |
Coppice Colliery (Five Ways branch) |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Harrisons Siding-Coppice Colliery (Five Ways branch). |
CLOSED |
Conduit Jn. |
Norton Crossing Tn. |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Conduit Jn.-Norton Crossing Tn. |
CLOSED |
Hornsea Bridge |
Wilmington |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Hornsea Bridge-Wilmington. |
CLOSED |
Withernsea |
Hedon |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Withernsea-Hedon. |
CLOSED |
Rugby Mid. |
Newbold Wharf |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Rugby Mid.-Newbold Wharf (southern end of Mid. Leicester-Rugby line). |
CLOSED |
Trimdon Grange |
Kelloe Bank Foot |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Trimdon Grange-Kelloe Bank Foot. |
CLOSED |
Jordanhill |
Whiteinch Park |
03/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Jordanhill-Whiteinch Park. |
OPENED |
Anlaby Road |
Walton Street, Hull |
10/05/1965 |
Between Anlaby Road and Walton Street, Hull (goods line replaces Hessle Road-Cottingham South line). (Opened to Goods) |
CLOSED |
Hull Hessle Road |
Cottingham South |
10/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Hull Hessle Road-Cottingham South. |
CLOSED |
Oakwood branch, Tufts Jn. |
Princess Royal Colliery |
17/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Oakwood branch, Tufts Jn.-Princess Royal Colliery (last train ran 5/2/1965). |
CLOSED |
Elliott Junc. |
Carmyllie |
24/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Elliott Junc.-Carmyllie. |
CLOSED |
Smeaton Junction |
Saltoun |
24/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Smeaton Junction-Saltoun branch. |
CLOSED |
Boness |
Bridgeness |
31/05/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Boness-Bridgeness. |
REOPENED |
Aldwarke Junction |
|
05/06/1965 |
Aldwarke Junction. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Thrapston Bridge Street |
Irthlingborough |
07/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Thrapston Bridge Street-Irthlingborough. |
REOPENED |
Swansea Loop West |
Landore. |
14/06/1965 |
Swansea Loop West-Landore. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Wortley West Junct. |
Wortley South Junct. |
14/06/1965 |
Wortley West Junct.-Wortley South Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Dumfries |
Stranraer |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the M. of T.:- Dumfries-Stranraer (boat trains will be diverted via Mauchline and Ayr). |
CLOSED |
Eridge |
Hailsham |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Eridge-Hailsham. |
CLOSED |
Christ's Hospital |
Guildford |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Christ's Hospital-Guildford. |
CLOSED |
Reigate Mill Junc. (Eridge) |
Heathfield |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Reigate Mill Junc. (Eridge)-Heathfield. |
CLOSED |
Christ's Hospital |
Peasmarch Junc. (Guildford) |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Christ's Hospital-Peasmarch Junc. (Guildford). |
CLOSED |
East Boldon |
Tyne Dock |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- East Boldon-Tyne Dock. |
CLOSED |
Spen Valley Jn. |
Farnley Jn. (via Spen) |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Spen Valley Jn.-Farnley Jn. (via Spen) |
CLOSED |
Dumfries |
Dunragit |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Dumfries-Dunragit |
CLOSED |
Southport St. L. |
Pool Hey Jn. (via Blowick) |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Southport St. L.-Pool Hey Jn. (via Blowick) |
CLOSED |
Barlby N. |
Market Weighton W. |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Barlby N.-Market Weighton W. |
CLOSED |
Market Weighton E. |
Driffield |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Market Weighton E.-Driffield. |
CLOSED |
Kingswood Junc. |
Ashley Hill Junction |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kingswood Junc.-Ashley Hill Junction (Bristol). |
CLOSED |
Maxwelltown |
Challoch Junction |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Maxwelltown (Dumfries)-Challoch Junction (Dunragit). |
CLOSED |
Castle Douglas |
Kirkcudbright |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Castle Douglas-Kirkcudbright. |
CLOSED |
Pool Hey Junc. |
Southport St. Lukes |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pool Hey Junc.-Southport St. Lukes. |
CLOSED |
Barlby N. |
Holme Moor |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Barlby N.-Holme Moor. |
CLOSED |
Court Sart Jn. |
Felin Fran-Morlais Jn. |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Court Sart Jn.-Felin Fran-Morlais Jn. |
CLOSED |
Willesden Jn. No. 1 |
Kensington Olympia. |
14/06/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Willesden Jn. No. 1-Kensington Olympia. |
CLOSED |
Harworth Main Colliery |
Scrooby Sdgs. |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Harworth Main Colliery-Scrooby Sdgs. |
CLOSED |
Harworth Colliery |
Scrooby |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Harworth Colliery-Scrooby |
CLOSED |
Heckmondwike Junc. |
Mirfield No. 4. |
14/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Heckmondwike Junc.-Mirfield No. 4. |
CLOSED |
St. Helens |
St. Helens Junction |
14/06/1965 |
The passenger service on the St. Helens-St. Helens Junction line is to be withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Earlestown no. 1 |
Earlestown no. 4 |
14/06/1965 |
The passenger service on the Earlestown no. 1 to Earlestown no. 4 line is to be withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Selby |
Driffield |
14/06/1965 |
The passenger service on the Selby-Driffield line is to be withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Low Moor |
Mirfield |
14/06/1965 |
The passenger service on the Low Moor-Mirfield line is to be withdrawn. |
CLOSED |
Kirriemuir Junction |
Kirriemuir |
21/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kirriemuir Junction-Kirriemuir. |
CLOSED |
Highworth Junction |
Stratton |
24/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Highworth Junction-Stratton. |
CLOSED |
Burry Port Junc. |
Burry Port (BP & GV station) |
27/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Burry Port Junc.-Burry Port (BP & GV station). |
CLOSED |
Lancing Station g.f. |
Lancing Works |
28/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lancing Station g.f.-Lancing Works |
CLOSED |
Thornton |
Bradford, Horton Park station |
28/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Thornton-Bradford, Horton Park station |
CLOSED |
Byfield Ironstone Sdg. |
Fenny Compton |
30/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Byfield Ironstone Sdg.-Fenny Compton (actual closure; 'official' date 5th July, 1965; |
CLOSED |
Williamthorpe Colly. |
Heath |
30/06/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Williamthorpe Colly.-Heath |
CLOSED |
Bolton Fletcher St. |
Little Hulton Jn. |
01/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Bolton Fletcher St.-Little Hulton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Bolton Fletcher Street Jn. |
Little Hulton Jn. |
01/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bolton Fletcher Street Jn.-Little Hulton Jn. (official date; wagons cleared 24.6.65; |
CLOSED |
Plodder Lane |
Little Hulton Jn. |
01/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Plodder Lane-Little Hulton Jn. for running round only |
CLOSED |
Windmill End Junction |
Netherton Goods |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Windmill End Junction-Netherton Goods. |
CLOSED |
Stourbridge Town Goods |
Stourbridge Junction |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Stourbridge Town Goods-Stourbridge Junction (the passenger service is worked on a separate single line and is thus not affected). |
CLOSED |
Tow Law |
Crook |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Tow Law-Crook |
CLOSED |
Ilkley |
Embsay |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ilkley-Embsay |
CLOSED |
Menston Junc.?-. |
|
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Menston Junc.?-Milnerwood Junc. |
CLOSED |
Burley Junc. |
Arthington Juncs. |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Burley Junc.-Arthington Juncs. |
CLOSED |
Buckley Junc. |
Northop Hall |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Buckley Junc.-Northop Hall. |
CLOSED |
Brixancole Siding |
Walsall Wood |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Brixancole Siding-Walsall Wood. |
CLOSED |
Walsall Wood |
Aldridge B.I.C.C. Sdg. |
05/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Walsall Wood-Aldridge B.I.C.C. Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Pontycymmer, International and Ocean Collieries |
Blaengarw |
10/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pontycymmer, International and Ocean Collieries-Blaengarw transferred to NCB. |
REOPENED |
Treeton Jcn. (NE and SE curves) |
Brightside Station Jcn. |
12/07/1965 |
Treeton Jcn. (NE and SE curves)-Brightside Station Jcn. (Re-opened to Freight) |
REOPENED |
Shepcote Lane (Tinsley Yard), NW and SW Connecting lines |
|
12/07/1965 |
Shepcote Lane (Tinsley Yard), NW and SW Connecting lines. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Nunnery Yard |
Sheffield Wharf St. Goods |
12/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Nunnery Yard-Sheffield Wharf St. Goods |
CLOSED |
Grimesthorpe No. 1 |
Sheffield Wicker Goods |
12/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Grimesthorpe No. 1-Sheffield Wicker Goods. |
CLOSED |
St. Boswells |
Greenlaw |
19/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- St. Boswells (Ravenswood Junction)-Greenlaw |
CLOSED |
Holygate |
Drumshoreland |
19/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Holygate-Drumshoreland. |
CLOSED |
Bo'ness |
Kinniel. |
19/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Bo'ness-Kinniel. |
CLOSED |
Denny W. Junc. g.f. |
Carmuirs W. Junc |
20/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Denny W. Junc. g.f.-Carmuirs W. Junc. |
CLOSED |
Belston Junc. |
Dykes Junc. |
26/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Belston Junc.-Dykes Junc. |
CLOSED |
West Kensington |
West Kensington Goods |
30/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- West Kensington-West Kensington Goods (last train ran previous day). |
CLOSED |
Belfast Central line (U.T.A.) |
|
31/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Belfast Central line (U.T.A.). |
CLOSED |
Glasgow Central Low Level Lines |
|
31/07/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Glasgow Central Low Level Lines. |
CLOSED |
Holme Moor |
Market Weighton W. |
02/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Holme Moor-Market Weighton W. |
CLOSED |
Drumshoreland |
Holygate |
02/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Drumshoreland-Holygate. |
CLOSED |
Crew Junc. |
Pilton W. g.f. (Edinburgh) |
02/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crew Junc.-Pilton W. g.f. (Edinburgh). |
CLOSED |
Stokesley |
Battersby |
02/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Stokesley-Battersby. |
CLOSED |
Carlisle, Crown Street |
Upperby. |
02/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Carlisle, Crown Street-Upperby. |
CLOSED |
Crewe Coal Yard |
Salop Goods Jn. |
07/08/1965 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation):- Crewe Coal Yard-Salop Goods Jn. (via Up line; down line : 7.9.63) |
REOPENED |
Heniarth |
Castle Caereinion. |
14/08/1965 |
Heniarth-Castle Caereinion. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Yarnton Jn. |
Banbury RD Jn. |
15/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Yarnton Jn.-Banbury RD Jn. (last train ran this day) |
CLOSED |
Crosshouse |
Irvine |
16/08/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crosshouse-Irvine. |
CLOSED |
Crewe Sorting Sidings North |
Basford Hall Jn. |
04/09/1965 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation):- Crewe Sorting Sidings North-Basford Hall Jn. (via Up line; down line remains in Summer use) |
OPENED |
Reading Junction |
Reading General (Main Line East) |
05/09/1965 |
Line reopened: Passenger : Reading Junction-Reading General (Main Line East). (Opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Reading Junction |
Reading Southern |
05/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Reading Junction-Reading Southern. |
CLOSED |
Reading Junction |
Reading Southern |
05/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Reading Junction-Reading Southern. |
CLOSED |
Leven-St. Andrews.nch |
|
06/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Leven-St. Andrews. |
CLOSED |
Leven |
St. Andrews |
06/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Leven-St. Andrews. |
CLOSED |
Ulverston |
Lakeside |
06/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Ulverston-Lakeside |
CLOSED |
Slateford Junc. |
Edinburgh Princes Street |
06/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Slateford Junc.-Edinburgh Princes Street. |
CLOSED |
Pye Bridge |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
06/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Pye Bridge-Kirkby in Ashfield. |
CLOSED |
Farnley Jc. |
Cleckheaton Spen |
06/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Farnley Jc.-Cleckheaton Spen (temporary closure) |
CLOSED |
Crook |
Wear Valley Jc. |
06/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Crook-Wear Valley Jc. |
CLOSED |
Pendleton Broad St. |
Crow Nest Jcn. |
06/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Pendleton Broad St.-Crow Nest Jcn. (fast lines-amends December, 1965 Puma!, p. 357). |
CLOSED |
Pendleton Broad St. |
Crow Nest Jcn. |
06/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pendleton Broad St.-Crow Nest Jcn. (fast lines) |
CLOSED |
Lye |
Hayes Lane |
06/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lye-Hayes Lane. |
CLOSED |
Edinburgh Princes St. |
Dalry Junct. |
06/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Edinburgh Princes St.-Dalry Junct. ("Temporary" closure; "official" closure 15.8.1966, with closure of Morrison St. Goods). |
CLOSED |
Newmarket, Warrenhill Jc. |
Snailwell Jc. |
13/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Newmarket, Warrenhill Jc.-Snailwell Jc. |
CLOSED |
Ramsey |
St. John's |
13/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Ramsey-St. John's (I.O.M.R.) |
CLOSED |
Ramsey |
St. John's (I.O.M.R.) |
13/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ramsey-St. John's (I.O.M.R.). |
CLOSED |
Chippenham |
Calne |
20/09/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Chippenham-Calne. |
CLOSED |
Buntingford |
St. Margarets |
20/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Buntingford-St. Margarets. |
CLOSED |
Chippenham |
Calne |
20/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Chippenham-Calne. |
CLOSED |
Ramsgate Beach |
Dumpton Park Hereson Rd. |
27/09/1965 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Ramsgate Beach-Dumpton Park Hereson Rd. (Ramsgate Tunnel Railway-last train ran on Sunday, 26th September, 1965). |
CLOSED |
Scotstoun West |
Green Road. |
29/09/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Scotstoun West-Green Road. |
REOPENED |
Sheffield Nunnery Main Line Jn. |
Sheffield Vic. No. 4 |
04/10/1965 |
Sheffield Nunnery Main Line Jn.-Sheffield Vic. No. 4 (Re-opened to Passenger and freight) |
CLOSED |
Cowes |
Smallbrook Junction (Ryde) |
04/10/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Cowes-Smallbrook Junction (Ryde). |
CLOSED |
Shanklin |
Ventnor |
04/10/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Shanklin-Ventnor. |
CLOSED |
Mt. Vernon N. |
Shettleston (Argosy siding) |
04/10/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Mt. Vernon N.-Shettleston (Argosy siding) |
CLOSED |
Crosshouse |
Irvine Goods |
11/10/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Crosshouse-Irvine Goods |
CLOSED |
Crowhurst Jcn. South |
Crowhurst Jcn. North |
25/10/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crowhurst Jcn. South-Crowhurst Jcn. North (regular traffic ceased 1955; last used 3rd January, 1965). |
REOPENED |
Branksome |
Bournemouth West Jn. |
01/11/1965 |
Branksome-Bournemouth West Jn. (Re-opened to Empty coaching stock trains) |
CLOSED |
Bournemouth West Jn. |
Gas Works Jn. |
01/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Bournemouth West Jn.-Gas Works Jn. |
CLOSED |
Swansea High St. |
Wind Street, Burrows Lodge |
01/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Swansea High St.-Wind Street, Burrows Lodge |
CLOSED |
Callander |
Dunblane, Springbank Mill Sdg. |
01/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Callander-Dunblane, Springbank Mill Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Yarnton Jc. |
Banbury Road Jc. |
08/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Yarnton Jc.-Banbury Road Jc. (line last used 29th October, 1965 |
CLOSED |
Douglas |
Pt. Erin |
15/11/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Douglas-Pt. Erin |
CLOSED |
Douglas |
Peel |
15/11/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Douglas-Peel (I.O.M.R.) |
CLOSED |
Douglas |
Peel |
15/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Douglas-Peel. |
CLOSED |
Douglas |
Pt. Erin (I.O.M.R.) |
15/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Douglas-Pt. Erin (I.O.M.R.). |
CLOSED |
Cockett |
Cockett Goods. |
18/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Cockett-Cockett Goods. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Wigan N.W. |
Tyldesley |
27/11/1965 |
Wigan N.W.-Tyldesley, still used by through trains. |
REOPENED |
Farnley Jc. |
Cleckheaton Spen. |
29/11/1965 |
Farnley Jc.-Cleckheaton Spen. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Yeovil Town |
Pen Mill. |
29/11/1965 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Yeovil Town-Pen Mill. |
CLOSED |
Heckmondwike Spen Goods |
Spen Valley Jc. |
29/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Heckmondwike Spen Goods-Spen Valley Jc. |
CLOSED |
Buckingham Jn., connection to West Goods Yard |
Dundee West passenger station. |
30/11/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Buckingham Jn., connection to West Goods Yard -Dundee West passenger station. |
CLOSED |
Blairgowrie |
Coupar Angus. |
06/12/1965 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Blairgowrie-Coupar Angus. |
CLOSED |
Lanark Racecourse |
Smyllum W. Jc. |
20/12/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Lanark Racecourse-Smyllum W. Jc. |
CLOSED |
Wolverton station (North Shunting Frame) |
Triangle ground frame |
30/12/1965 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Wolverton station (North Shunting Frame)-Triangle ground frame taken out of use (north curve to Newport Pagnell branch). |
CLOSED |
North Walsham Main |
North Walsham Town |
01/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- North Walsham Main-North Walsham Town (1960 goods lines connexion). |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Jordanhill |
Whiteinch Park |
03/01/1966 |
Jordanhill-Whiteinch Park, retained for Engineer's traffic |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Highworth Jn. |
Stratton |
03/01/1966 |
Highworth Jn.-Stratton, retained for private sidings, including Vickers Armstrong at Kingsdown Road. |
CLOSED |
Honeybourne Station South |
East Jn.) |
03/01/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Honeybourne Station South-East Jn.) |
CLOSED |
Alford |
Kintore |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Alford-Kintore |
CLOSED |
Old Meldrum |
Inverurie |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Old Meldrum-Inverurie |
CLOSED |
Turriff |
Inveramsay. |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Turriff-Inveramsay. |
CLOSED |
Wennington Jc. |
Lancaster G.A.-Morecambe Prom. |
03/01/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Wennington Jc.-Lancaster G.A.-Morecambe Prom. |
CLOSED |
Torrisholme No. 1 |
No. 2 |
03/01/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Torrisholme No. 1-No. 2 |
CLOSED |
Lancaster C. |
G.A. |
03/01/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Lancaster C.-G.A. |
CLOSED |
Northampton C. |
Blisworth. |
03/01/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Northampton C.- Blisworth. |
CLOSED |
Luton Bute St. (Vauxhall South ground frame) |
Blackbridge Sdg. (Wheathampstead) |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Luton Bute St. (Vauxhall South ground frame)-Blackbridge Sdg. (Wheathampstead) |
CLOSED |
Dalston Jc. |
Dalston Eastern Jc. |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Dalston Jc.-Dalston Eastern Jc. |
CLOSED |
Alford |
Paradise Sdg. (Kemnay) |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Alford-Paradise Sdg. (Kemnay) |
CLOSED |
Lowestoft South Side |
Oulton Broad South Jc. |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Lowestoft South Side-Oulton Broad South Jc. |
CLOSED |
Chorley No. 4 |
Feniscowles |
03/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Chorley No. 4-Feniscowles. |
REOPENED |
Kings Rd. |
Leith E. |
04/01/1966 |
Kings Rd.-Leith E. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Newhaven Jc. |
Leith Walk W. |
04/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Newhaven Jc.-Leith Walk W. |
CLOSED |
Seafield |
Connection with Leith E. branch. |
04/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Seafield-Connection with Leith E. branch. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Honeybourne East Jc. |
Station South |
08/01/1966 |
Honeybourne East Jc.-Station South (retained for Stratford-Evesham trains. |
REOPENED |
Ravensthorpe and Thornhill |
Heckmondwike Spen Goods. |
11/01/1966 |
Ravensthorpe and Thornhill-Heckmondwike Spen Goods. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Farnley Jc |
Cleckheaton Spen. |
11/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Farnley Jc-Cleckheaton Spen. |
CLOSED |
Farnley Jcn. |
Liversedge Spen. |
11/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Farnley Jcn.-Liversedge Spen. |
CLOSED |
Llandilo Jcn. East |
Morfa Jcn. |
24/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Llandilo Jcn. East-Morfa Jcn. (Llanelly Docks); |
CLOSED |
Hurlford Mineral Sdgs. |
Hurlford Jcn. |
24/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hurlford Mineral Sdgs.-Hurlford Jcn. |
CLOSED |
Kelvindale Sdg. |
Dawsholm-Bellshaugh Jc. |
31/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Kelvindale Sdg.-Dawsholm-Bellshaugh Jc. |
CLOSED |
Barnsley Court House Jn. |
Court House Goods (Mid.) |
31/01/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Barnsley Court House Jn.-Court House Goods (Mid.) |
CLOSED |
Queensferry Jcn. (Ratho) |
Kirkliston-Dalmeny |
07/02/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Queensferry Jcn. (Ratho)-Kirkliston-Dalmeny. |
CLOSED |
Ratho, Queensferry Junct. |
Kirkliston-Dalmeny, Admiralty Victualling Stores Sdg. |
07/02/1966 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Ratho, Queensferry Junct.-Kirkliston-Dalmeny, Admiralty Victualling Stores Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Totton |
Fawley |
14/02/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Totton-Fawley |
CLOSED |
Kilmacolm |
Greenock (Princes Pier) |
14/02/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Kilmacolm-Greenock (Princes Pier) (Boat Trains); last train ran 20th Nov., 1965. |
CLOSED |
Smallbrook Junc. |
Newport & Cowes. |
21/02/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Smallbrook Junc.-Newport & Cowes. |
CLOSED |
Ballater |
Aberdeen |
28/02/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Ballater-Aberdeen. |
CLOSED |
Lydford |
Launceston |
28/02/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lydford-Launceston. |
REOPENED |
Luton Bute St. (East) |
Luton Mid. Rd. (South) |
03/03/1966 |
Luton Bute St. (East)-Luton Mid. Rd. (South) (Re-opened to Freight) |
REOPENED |
Bare Lane |
Hest Bank. |
03/03/1966 |
Bare Lane-Hest Bank. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Christ's Hospital |
Shoreham-by-Sea |
07/03/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Christ's Hospital-Shoreham-by-Sea. |
CLOSED |
Stranraer Town |
Stranraer Harbour Junc. |
07/03/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Stranraer Town-Stranraer Harbour Junc. |
CLOSED |
Itchingfield Jcn. (Christ's Hospital) |
Beeding Cement Works Sdg. |
07/03/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Itchingfield Jcn. (Christ's Hospital)-Beeding Cement Works Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Stonehouse Bristol Rd. |
Nailsworth |
07/03/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Stonehouse Bristol Rd.-Nailsworth |
CLOSED |
Dudbridge Junc. |
Stroud Wall-bridge |
07/03/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dudbridge Junc.-Stroud Wall-bridge. |
CLOSED |
Rockingham South-Chapeltown Cent. |
Ecclesfield East, Smithywood |
07/03/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Rockingham South-Chapeltown Cent.-Ecclesfield East, Smithywood. |
CLOSED |
Copley Hill Jn. |
Leeds Central 'B' |
28/03/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Copley Hill Jn.-Leeds Central 'B' (line severed previous day). |
REOPENED |
Pains Sdg. |
Buckminster Sdg. |
31/03/1966 |
Pains Sdg.-Buckminster Sdg. (had been temporarily closed since 6.4.64). (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Pains Sdg. |
Saxby. |
31/03/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pains Sdg.-Saxby. |
CLOSED |
Tollcross |
Tollcross East |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Tollcross-Tollcross East |
CLOSED |
Bedlay |
Garngaber Junc. |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bedlay-Garngaber Junc. |
CLOSED |
Broughton |
Symington |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Broughton-Symington |
CLOSED |
Kirkintilloch Basin |
Middlemuir Junc. |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kirkintilloch Basin-Middlemuir Junc. |
CLOSED |
Lennoxtown |
Kelvin Valley W. Junc. |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lennoxtown-Kelvin Valley W. Junc. |
CLOSED |
Twechar |
Lenzie Junc. |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Twechar-Lenzie Junc. |
CLOSED |
Winchester Chesil |
Shawford Junct. |
04/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Winchester Chesil-Shawford Junct. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Lowestoft South Side |
Oulton Broad South Jcn. |
18/04/1966 |
Lowestoft South Side-Oulton Broad South Jcn. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Scalford |
Waltham on the Wold |
18/04/1966 |
Scalford-Waltham on the Wold (including Holwell GN branch) |
CLOSED |
Shanklin |
Ventnor. |
18/04/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger services has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Shanklin-Ventnor. |
CLOSED |
Shanklin |
Ventnor. |
18/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be closed completely:- Shanklin-Ventnor. |
CLOSED |
Patney & Chirton |
Holt Jcn. |
18/04/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Patney & Chirton-Holt Jcn. |
CLOSED |
Bradford Jcns. |
|
18/04/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Bradford Jcns. (North-West curve); |
CLOSED |
Halwill |
Bude |
18/04/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Halwill-Bude |
CLOSED |
Okehampton |
Wadebridge |
18/04/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Okehampton-Wadebridge (subject to bus licences). |
CLOSED |
Ardrossan Montgomerie Pier |
Stevenston No. 1 |
18/04/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Ardrossan Montgomerie Pier-Stevenston No. 1 |
CLOSED |
Halwill |
Bude |
18/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Halwill-Bude |
CLOSED |
Custom House Junct. |
Albert Dock Junct. |
18/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Custom House Junct.-Albert Dock Junct. (A.D. Junct. transferred to PLA on closure of connecting link) |
CLOSED |
Silvertown |
Royal Victoria Dock, South side g.f. |
18/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Silvertown-Royal Victoria Dock, South side g.f. (PLA highlevel line retained for internal movements from this point to Albert Dock Junct., via Swing Bridge). |
CLOSED |
Mells Road |
Radstock West, Kilmersdon Colly. |
25/04/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Mells Road-Radstock West, Kilmersdon Colly. |
CLOSED |
Hirst (Ashington) |
Linton Colliery |
16/05/1966 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Hirst (Ashington)-Linton Colliery |
CLOSED |
Potland signal box |
Ellington Colliery |
16/05/1966 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Potland signal box-Ellington Colliery (N.C.B. workmen's services). |
CLOSED |
North Yard Extension (No. 29 Store) |
South Yard (Saw Mills) |
16/05/1966 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- North Yard Extension (No. 29 Store)-South Yard (Saw Mills) (Devonport Dockyard Railway; last regular passenger train ran Friday, 13th May; special commemorative steam train ran Monday, 16th May). |
REOPENED |
West Drayton |
Middlesex Oil and Chemical Works Sdg. |
23/05/1966 |
West Drayton-Middlesex Oil and Chemical Works Sdg. (Re-opened to Freight) |
REOPENED |
Gartsherrie South Jc. |
Gartcosh Jc. |
24/05/1966 |
Gartsherrie South Jc.-Gartcosh Jc. (" Summer only "-used by Motorail trains during 1966 only) (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Leamington Spa Milverton |
General Station North |
27/05/1966 |
Leamington Spa Milverton-General Station North (entry for 15.5.66); new connecting line partly installed on 15th and 22nd May; finally completed and opened 1130 hrs. Friday 27th May (Re-opened to Unknown) |
CLOSED |
Leamington Spa Avenue box |
General Station South box |
27/05/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Leamington Spa Avenue box-General Station South box (exchange sdg.). |
CLOSED |
Panteg Jn. |
RTB Panteg Steelworks |
06/06/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Panteg Jn.-RTB Panteg Steelworks |
CLOSED |
Nottingham, Manvers St. Goods |
Trent Lane Junct. |
06/06/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Nottingham, Manvers St. Goods-Trent Lane Junct. |
CLOSED |
Kings Cliffe |
Market Harborough No. 3 |
06/06/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kings Cliffe-Market Harborough No. 3 |
CLOSED |
Mkt. Harborough No. 1 |
Rugby MiD No. 1 |
06/06/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Mkt. Harborough No. 1-Rugby MiD No. 1 (down line retained Rugby-Clifton Mill excl. as siding). |
CLOSED |
Yniscedwyn Colly. |
Easton Bros. Sdg. |
13/06/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Yniscedwyn Colly.-Easton Bros. Sdg. (formerly Anglo-Welsh Tinplate Co.'s Yniscedwyn Works at end of Yniscedwyn branch from Gurnos) |
CLOSED |
Clapham Jct. |
Low Gill |
19/06/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Clapham Jct.-Low Gill (officially closed as diversionary route; put out of use 26.7.66). |
CLOSED |
Glasgow St. Enoch |
Shields Junc |
27/06/1966 |
The withdrawal of the following passenger train service has been approved by the Minister of Transport:- Glasgow St. Enoch-Shields Junc |
REOPENED |
Hexthorpe Jc. |
Bentley Jc. |
02/07/1966 |
Hexthorpe Jc.-Bentley Jc. (Doncaster avoiding line-" Summer only ") (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Llandebie |
Pentregwynlais |
09/07/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Llandebie-Pentregwynlais (Limestone branch-transferred to Lime Firms LtD). |
CLOSED |
Llandebie, Limestone Branch g.f. |
Cilyrychen Lime works |
09/07/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Llandebie, Limestone Branch g.f.-Cilyrychen Lime works (transferred to Lime Firms Ltd., finally closed 30.6.1969). |
CLOSED |
Crofton Hall |
Crofton West |
11/07/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crofton Hall-Crofton West |
CLOSED |
Crofton South |
Crofton East. |
11/07/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crofton South-Crofton East. |
CLOSED |
Panteg Jn. |
Panteg (RTB) Steel Works |
31/08/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Panteg Jn.-Panteg (RTB) Steel Works |
CLOSED |
Kirkham & Wesham North Jc. |
Marton-Blackpool South |
03/09/1966 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- Kirkham & Wesham North Jc.-Marton-Blackpool South |
CLOSED |
Rugeley T.V. No. 1 |
Walsall |
03/09/1966 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- Rugeley T.V. No. 1-Walsall |
CLOSED |
Shrewsbury Abbey Foregate |
English Bridge Jc. |
03/09/1966 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- Shrewsbury Abbey Foregate-English Bridge Jc. |
CLOSED |
Grendon Underwood Jn. |
Ashendon Jn. |
05/09/1966 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Grendon Underwood Jn.-Ashendon Jn. (Temporary closure permanent closure was 21/7/1967). |
CLOSED |
Akeman Street |
Ashendon Jn. |
05/09/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Akeman Street (M. of D. Sdg.) -Ashendon Jn. (traffic ceased line finally "officially" closed, to passengers, 21/7/1967 |
CLOSED |
March West Jc. |
Whitemoor Jc. |
11/09/1966 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- March West Jc.-Whitemoor Jc. |
CLOSED |
Gartsherrie South Jc. |
Gartcosh Jc. |
29/09/1966 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- Gartsherrie South Jc.-Gartcosh Jc. |
CLOSED |
Pains Sdg. |
Buckminster Sdg. |
30/09/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pains Sdg.-Buckminster Sdg. (temporary closure; leased and re-opened by Stewarts & Lloyds 2.10.67). |
CLOSED |
Derby South Jc., |
Derby North Jc. |
01/10/1966 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation) :- Derby South Jc.,-Derby North Jc. |
CLOSED |
Ambergate N. Jc. |
W. Jc. |
03/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Ambergate N. Jc.-W. Jc. (line put out of use 26th February, 1967). |
CLOSED |
Round Oak Wallows |
Askew Bridge Jc. |
03/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Round Oak Wallows-Askew Bridge Jc. (Staffs.) (Pensnett Railway's Baggeridge branch). |
CLOSED |
Southwell |
Rolleston Jct. |
03/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Southwell-Rolleston Jct. (box put out of use previous day; irregular private sdg. traffic until then); |
CLOSED |
Rufford Jct. |
Blidworth Jct.-Blidworth Colliery |
03/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Rufford Jct.-Blidworth Jct.-Blidworth Colliery. |
CLOSED |
Ironville Junct. |
Codnor Park Junct. |
03/10/1966 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Ironville Junct.-Codnor Park Junct. |
CLOSED |
Lewes, Friars Walk Goods |
East marshalling yard. |
03/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Lewes, Friars Walk Goods-East marshalling yard. |
CLOSED |
Lochead Colliery |
Methil West |
15/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lochead Colliery-Methil West ("official" closure date; line had been disused for some time; put out of use 30.1.67). |
CLOSED |
Cross Hands |
Cynheidre Colliery. |
17/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cross Hands-Cynheidre Colliery. |
CLOSED |
Norwood Spur Junct. |
Norwood Junct. |
30/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Norwood Spur Junct.-Norwood Junct. (one direction only; put out of use; last regular use 11.9.1959). |
CLOSED |
Staley & Millbrook |
Diggle Jn. |
31/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Staley & Millbrook-Diggle Jn. |
CLOSED |
Laisterdyke Coal Yard |
Quarry Gap |
31/10/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Laisterdyke Coal Yard-Quarry Gap (part of Cutlers Jct.-Quarry Gap link). |
CLOSED |
Gunnislake |
Callington |
07/11/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gunnislake-Callington |
REOPENED |
Heywood Road Jn. |
Hawkeridge. |
07/11/1966 |
Heywood Road Jn.-Hawkeridge. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
West Boldon |
Washington Chemical Works |
21/11/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- West Boldon-Washington Chemical Works |
CLOSED |
Germiston Jn. |
Balornock Jn.,-Robroyston West Jn. |
28/11/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Germiston Jn.-Balornock Jn.,-Robroyston West Jn. |
CLOSED |
Southwell |
Rolleston Jn. |
30/11/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Southwell-Rolleston Jn. |
CLOSED |
Verney Jn. |
Buckingham. |
05/12/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Verney Jn.-Buckingham. |
CLOSED |
Accrington South Jn. |
Stubbins Jn. |
05/12/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Accrington South Jn.-Stubbins Jn. |
REOPENED |
Farnley Jn. |
Whitehall Jn. |
11/12/1966 |
Farnley Jn.-Whitehall Jn. (east-bound traffic commenced, westbound commenced 18th Dec.). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Neath Canalside-No. 1 |
|
30/12/1966 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Neath Canalside-Metal Box Co. Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Partington Junct., LMR/MSC Exchange |
Partington Coaling Basin South |
31/12/1966 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Partington Junct., LMR/MSC Exchange-Partington Coaling Basin South (MSC Railway). |
CLOSED |
Acton Grange, Laporte Chemicals |
Walton Lock |
31/12/1966 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Acton Grange, Laporte Chemicals-Walton Lock (MSC Railway). |
CLOSED |
Attenborough, Long Eaton Jn. |
North Erewash Jn. |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Attenborough, Long Eaton Jn.-North Erewash Jn. |
CLOSED |
Ambergate Station Jn. |
North Jn. |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Ambergate Station Jn.-North Jn. |
CLOSED |
Three Bridges |
Ashurst Jn |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Three Bridges-Ashurst Jn |
CLOSED |
St. Margaret's Jn. |
East GrinsteaD |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- St. Margaret's Jn.-East GrinsteaD |
CLOSED |
Culter |
Ferryhill Jn. |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Culter-Ferryhill Jn. |
CLOSED |
Goodyear Tyre Co. Siding |
Rickmansworth (L.N.W.). |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Goodyear Tyre Co. Siding-Rickmansworth (L.N.W.). |
CLOSED |
St. Margaret's Jn. |
East Grinstead H.L. |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- St. Margaret's Jn.-East Grinstead H.L. |
CLOSED |
Romiley Jn. |
Stockport T.D-Heaton Mersey Station Jn. |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Romiley Jn.-Stockport T.D-Heaton Mersey Station Jn. |
CLOSED |
Three Bridges |
Ashurst Jn. |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Three Bridges-Ashurst Jn. |
CLOSED |
St. Margaret's Jn. |
East Grinstead H.L. |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- St. Margaret's Jn.-East Grinstead H.L. (East Grinstead H.L. coal yard continues to be served by spur from L.L. goods yard) |
CLOSED |
Heaton Mersey East Jn. |
Station Jn. |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Heaton Mersey East Jn.-Station Jn. |
CLOSED |
Attenborough, Long Eaton Jc. |
North Erewash Jc. |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Attenborough, Long Eaton Jc.-North Erewash Jc. (retained for "Summer only" use) |
CLOSED |
North Erewash Jc. |
Trowell Jc. |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- North Erewash Jc.-Trowell Jc. (retained for one Sunday train, also Summer use). |
CLOSED |
Parsley Hay |
Hartington |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Parsley Hay-Hartington (now retained only to supply water to Hartington) |
CLOSED |
Crofton West Jn. |
Pontefract Monkhill West |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Crofton West Jn.-Pontefract Monkhill West (retained for "Summer only" use |
CLOSED |
Sheringham old station |
new halt |
02/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Sheringham old station-new halt |
CLOSED |
Sheringham West |
Sheringham East |
02/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Sheringham West-Sheringham East. |
CLOSED |
Niddrie South (Millerhill) |
Niddrie North-Leith South Jc. (Portobello) (via Lothian Lines) |
09/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Niddrie South (Millerhill)-Niddrie North-Leith South Jc. (Portobello) (via Lothian Lines) |
CLOSED |
Wanton Walls |
Niddrie North |
09/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wanton Walls-Niddrie North (Lothian Lines; official closure-out of regular use since 8th April, 1963 |
CLOSED |
Hamilton Allanshaw Sdg. |
Cadzow Jn. G.F. |
09/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hamilton Allanshaw Sdg.-Cadzow Jn. G.F. |
CLOSED |
Spink Hill |
Langwith Colliery Jn. |
09/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Spink Hill-Langwith Colliery Jn. |
REOPENED |
Newburgh |
Clatchard Craig Sdg. |
16/01/1967 |
Newburgh-Clatchard Craig Sdg. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Bodmin Road |
Padstow |
30/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Bodmin Road-Padstow |
CLOSED |
Bodmin North |
Boscarne Jn. |
30/01/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Bodmin North-Boscarne Jn. |
CLOSED |
Wadebridge West |
Padstow |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wadebridge West-Padstow |
CLOSED |
Dummere Jn. GF |
Bodmin North. |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dummere Jn. GF-Bodmin North. |
CLOSED |
Horwich Fork |
Horwich Loco. Jc. |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Horwich Fork-Horwich Loco. Jc. |
CLOSED |
Lochhead Colilery |
Methil West |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lochhead Colilery -Methil West (line put out of use-traffic diverted to NCB line some time ago) |
CLOSED |
Old Mill Lane SE |
St. Helens, Pilkingtons Sdg. |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Old Mill Lane SE-St. Helens, Pilkingtons Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Stretton Jn. |
Horninglow |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Stretton Jn.-Horninglow |
CLOSED |
Gartsherrie East Junct. |
Gunnie (North) |
30/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gartsherrie East Junct.-Gunnie (North) (Gartsherrie East Junct. box burnt out; not re-opened) |
CLOSED |
Bowesfield |
Redmarshall |
31/01/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bowesfield-Redmarshall (regular traffic diverted via Norton South; "official" closure date 3.7.67). |
CLOSED |
Mary Pit |
Kelty, Lochore Engineer's Coup. |
03/02/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Mary Pit-Kelty, Lochore Engineer's Coup. |
CLOSED |
Thame |
Morris Cowley |
06/02/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Thame-Morris Cowley (regular traffic ceased, but line retained for diversions and possible future traffic) |
CLOSED |
Kirkham & Wesham North Jc. |
Marton-Blackpool South |
13/02/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kirkham & Wesham North Jc.-Marton-Blackpool South |
CLOSED |
Ambergate N. Jc. |
Station Jc. |
26/02/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Ambergate N. Jc.-Station Jc. put out of use (no regular traffic since passenger trains were withdrawn 2nd January, 1967). |
REOPENED |
Landor Street Jc. |
Camp Hill-Lifford Station Jc. |
06/03/1967 |
Landor Street Jc.-Camp Hill-Lifford Station Jc. (previously " Summer only," now daily all-year) (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Lifford Station Jc. |
Bournville |
06/03/1967 |
Lifford Station Jc.-Bournville (Re-opened to Not specified) |
REOPENED |
Wolverhampton HL North Jct. |
Victoria Basin |
06/03/1967 |
Wolverhampton HL North Jct.-Victoria Basin (regular traffic commenced, although line had been used previously for trials). (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
St. Ives |
March S. Jn. |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- St. Ives-March S. Jn. |
CLOSED |
Burton |
Millers Dale |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Burton-Millers Dale |
CLOSED |
Buxton |
Manchester C. |
06/03/1967 |
Buxton-Manchester C. service. |
CLOSED |
Manchester C. |
Derby |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Manchester C.-Derby expresses directed via Hope Valley and Chesterfield (Local Service to run between Derby and Matlock only). |
CLOSED |
Buxton |
Millers Dale Jn. |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Buxton-Millers Dale Jn. |
CLOSED |
Buxton Jn. |
Peak Forest Jn. |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Buxton Jn.-Peak Forest Jn. |
CLOSED |
Matlock |
Chinley North Jn. |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Matlock-Chinley North Jn. |
CLOSED |
Priestfield Jn. |
Dudley-Stourbridge Jn. North |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line #- Priestfield Jn.-Dudley-Stourbridge Jn. North ("Sunday only" service withdrawn). |
CLOSED |
Buxton MiD |
Buxton East Jn. |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Buxton MiD-Buxton East Jn. |
CLOSED |
Thame |
Morris Cowley. |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Thame-Morris Cowley. |
CLOSED |
Sidmouth Jc. |
Sidmouth |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Sidmouth Jc.-Sidmouth |
CLOSED |
Exmouth |
Tipton St. John's |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Exmouth-Tipton St. John's |
CLOSED |
Appledore |
New Romney. |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Appledore-New Romney. |
CLOSED |
Church Road Jc. |
Birmingham Central Goods |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Church Road Jc.-Birmingham Central Goods |
CLOSED |
New Romney |
Romney Jn. |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- New Romney-Romney Jn. (C.E.G.B. Sdg. at 74 m.p.) |
CLOSED |
Trent Station Jc. |
Sawley Jc. via N. curve. |
06/03/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Trent Station Jc.-Sawley Jc. via N. curve. |
CLOSED |
Millers Dale ,Jc. |
Buxton Jc. |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Millers Dale ,Jc.-Buxton Jc. |
CLOSED |
Harrogate, Dragon |
Bilton |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Harrogate, Dragon-Bilton |
CLOSED |
Melmerby South |
Northallerton |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Melmerby South-Northallerton |
CLOSED |
March South Jct. |
St. Ives |
06/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- March South Jct.-St. Ives. |
REOPENED |
Ryde |
Shanklin |
20/03/1967 |
Ryde-Shanklin (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Bury Loop Jc. |
Bury Loco. Jc. |
24/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bury Loop Jc.-Bury Loco. Jc. (Bury Loop Jc s.b. destroyed by fire). |
CLOSED |
Penicuik |
Hardengreen Jc. |
27/03/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Penicuik-Hardengreen Jc. |
CLOSED |
Lumphinnans East Jn. |
Keltey South |
03/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lumphinnans East Jn.-Keltey South |
CLOSED |
Lumphinnans Central Jn. |
North Jn. |
03/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lumphinnans Central Jn.-North Jn. |
CLOSED |
High Peak Jn. |
Steeplehouse Goods-Derbyshire Stone Quarries |
03/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- High Peak Jn.-Steeplehouse Goods-Derbyshire Stone Quarries Middleton Branch Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Coed Ely |
Clydach Vale. |
03/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Coed Ely-Clydach Vale. |
CLOSED |
Billington Road Crossing |
Dunstable North |
03/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Billington Road Crossing-Dunstable North (official closure date; line temporarily closed from 10.1.66; down line still retained by Engineers for training staff on ballast tamping machines and was traversed by weed-killing train in June 1967) |
CLOSED |
Cambrian Colliery |
Clydach Vale-Coed Ely South GF |
03/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cambrian Colliery-Clydach Vale-Coed Ely South GF (last train 31.3.67). |
CLOSED |
East Grinstead low level yard |
high level coal sidings |
10/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: East Grinstead low level yard-high level coal sidings (through siding). |
CLOSED |
Coalville Jc. |
Charnwood Forest Jc.-Coalville East |
17/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Coalville Jc.-Charnwood Forest Jc.-Coalville East (Whitwick Granite Co. g.f.). |
CLOSED |
Haverthwaite |
Ulverston Plumpton Jn. |
24/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Haverthwaite-Ulverston Plumpton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Trent station N. Jc. |
Sawley Jc. |
30/04/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Trent station N. Jc.-Sawley Jc. (via N. curve) put out of use (no regular traffic since passenger trains were withdrawn 6th March, 1967). |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Goodyear Tyre Co. Sdg. |
Rickmansworth |
01/05/1967 |
Goodyear Tyre Co. Sdg.-Rickmansworth (LNW) (retained for 'run round facilities) |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Leeds Holbeck Jc. |
Whitehall Jc. |
01/05/1967 |
Leeds Holbeck Jc.-Whitehall Jc. |
REOPENED |
Moorthorpe |
South Kirkby Jc. |
01/05/1967 |
Moorthorpe-South Kirkby Jc. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Leeds Holbeck Jc |
Whitehall Jc. |
01/05/1967 |
Leeds Holbeck Jc-Whitehall Jc. (Re-opened to Not specified) |
REOPENED |
Scotswood |
Blaydon-N. Wylam |
01/05/1967 |
Scotswood-Blaydon-N. Wylam (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Scotswood |
Blaydon |
01/05/1967 |
Scotswood-Blaydon (Re-opened to Freight) |
REOPENED |
Scotswood Blaydon |
West Wylam |
01/05/1967 |
Scotswood Blaydon-West Wylam (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Torrisholme Jc. No. 1 |
Wennington |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Torrisholme Jc. No. 1-Wennington |
CLOSED |
Leeds Central |
Wortley North |
01/05/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Leeds Central-Wortley North |
CLOSED |
Leeds Central |
Holbeck Jn. |
01/05/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Leeds Central-Holbeck Jn. (Station closes 18.10 hrs. Sat., 29th April) |
CLOSED |
Singer Jn. |
Singer Works Platform |
01/05/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Singer Jn.-Singer Works Platform (workmen's) |
CLOSED |
Glendon South Jn. |
Manton Jn. |
01/05/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Glendon South Jn.-Manton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Melton Jn. |
Nottingham London Road. Jn. |
01/05/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Melton Jn.-Nottingham London Road. Jn. |
CLOSED |
Wellington No. 4 |
Nantwich, Market Drayton Jn. |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wellington No. 4-Nantwich, Market Drayton Jn. |
CLOSED |
Cruckmeole Jn. |
Minsterley |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cruckmeole Jn.-Minsterley |
CLOSED |
Caerphilly West |
Penrhos Jn. |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Caerphilly West-Penrhos Jn. |
CLOSED |
Watford Crossing |
Beddau Loop. |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Watford Crossing-Beddau Loop. |
CLOSED |
Bury K. St. W. |
Bury Bolton St. S. |
01/05/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Bury K. St. W.-Bury Bolton St. S. |
CLOSED |
Redruth W. Jc. |
Redruth Old Station |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Redruth W. Jc.-Redruth Old Station (original Hayle Rly. station); |
CLOSED |
New Dynant N. g.f. |
Cwm Mawr |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- New Dynant N. g.f.-Cwm Mawr (¼ mile) |
CLOSED |
Thame |
Morris Cowley |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Thame-Morris Cowley |
CLOSED |
Humberstone (GN) Jc. |
|
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Humberstone (GN) Jc. with line from Humberstone Rd. (Leicester Belgrave Rd. still served) |
CLOSED |
North Walsall Jc. |
Lichfield R. Jc. |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- North Walsall Jc.-Lichfield R. Jc. (Birchills Power station traffic now reversed at Pleck Jc.-N. Walsall Jc.). |
CLOSED |
North Walsall Jn. |
Lichfield Road Jn. |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- North Walsall Jn.-Lichfield Road Jn. |
CLOSED |
Middleton Top |
Friden |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Middleton Top-Friden (line cut 3 May 1967) |
CLOSED |
Leeds Central B- |
Holbeck Junct. (West). |
01/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Leeds Central B-Holbeck Junct. (West). |
CLOSED |
Sidmouth Jn. |
Sidmouth |
08/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Sidmouth Jn.-Sidmouth |
CLOSED |
Albert Hill Jn. |
Field Crossing |
21/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Albert Hill Jn.-Field Crossing (the historic Fighting Cocks section of the Stockton and Darlington Railway that included the flat crossing of the East Coast main line). |
CLOSED |
Oldham Sheepwashers Lane |
O.A. & G.B. Jn. |
22/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Oldham Sheepwashers Lane-O.A. & G.B. Jn. |
CLOSED |
Wolverton South Jn. |
Newport Pagnell. |
22/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wolverton South Jn.-Newport Pagnell. |
CLOSED |
Newport Pagnell |
Wolverton Triangle GF |
22/05/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Newport Pagnell-Wolverton Triangle GF (access to coal depot at Wolverton North now via Wolverton South GF (from up slow line) and triangle GF |
REOPENED |
Douglas |
Peel |
03/06/1967 |
Ceremonial re-opening of Douglas-Peel section of Isle of Man Railway (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Douglas |
Peel |
04/06/1967 |
Douglas-Peel (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
St. Johns |
Ramsey |
04/06/1967 |
St. Johns-Ramsey (I. of M.R. regular services including Sundays recommenced). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Renfrew Wharf |
Arkleston Jn. |
05/06/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Renfrew Wharf-Arkleston Jn. |
CLOSED |
Wennington Jn. |
Lancaster G.A. (excl.) |
05/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wennington Jn.-Lancaster G.A. (excl.) |
CLOSED |
Lancaster G.A. (excl.) |
Torrisholme No. 1 |
05/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lancaster G.A. (excl.)-Torrisholme No. 1 (White Lund Gas Board Sdgs. served via Torrisholme No. 1) |
CLOSED |
Tiverton Jc. |
Tiverton |
05/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Tiverton Jc.-Tiverton |
CLOSED |
Glasgow St. Enoch |
Clyde Jc. |
05/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Glasgow St. Enoch-Clyde Jc. |
CLOSED |
Wennington Jn. |
Lancaster Ladies Walk |
05/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wennington Jn.-Lancaster Ladies Walk |
CLOSED |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
White Lund (NWGB) Sdg. GF |
05/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lancaster Green Ayre-White Lund (NWGB) Sdg. GF (Lancaster Castle No. 4 to Lancaster Ladies Walk, via Green Ayre, retained as single siding; White Lund to Torrisholme No. 1 retained as double siding) |
CLOSED |
Bullo Pill W. |
Cinderford Town |
12/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bullo Pill W.-Cinderford Town ("Target" date) |
CLOSED |
Montrose E. (Cal.) |
Broomfield Jc. |
19/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Montrose E. (Cal.)-Broomfield Jc. |
CLOSED |
Montrose N. (NB) |
Broomfield Jc.-Broomfield siding |
19/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Montrose N. (NB)-Broomfield Jc.-Broomfield siding |
CLOSED |
Montrose S. (NB) |
Harbour. |
19/06/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Montrose S. (NB)-Harbour. |
REOPENED |
Cudworth Station Jn. |
|
03/07/1967 |
Cudworth Station Jn.-connection with GC & H&B line at 55½ m.p., towards Stairfoot Station Jn. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Netherfield Jc. |
Nottingham Weekday Cross Jc. |
03/07/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Netherfield Jc.-Nottingham Weekday Cross Jc. |
CLOSED |
Sankey Jc. |
Padgate Jc. |
03/07/1967 |
Passenger train service have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Sankey Jc.-Padgate Jc. (via avoiding line). |
CLOSED |
Wigston S. |
Wigston Central Jc. |
03/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Wigston S.-Wigston Central Jc. |
CLOSED |
Salthouse Jn. |
Barrow Island Rd. |
03/07/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Salthouse Jn.-Barrow Island Rd. (Shipyard sta.) |
CLOSED |
St. Luke's Jn. |
Loco Jn. (Barrow) |
03/07/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- St. Luke's Jn.-Loco Jn. (Barrow) (Workmen's services). |
CLOSED |
Loco Jn. (Barrow) |
Shipyard (Island Road) |
03/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Loco Jn. (Barrow)-Shipyard (Island Road) |
CLOSED |
Shipyard Jn. |
Ramsden Dock. |
03/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Shipyard Jn.-Ramsden Dock. |
CLOSED |
Cudworth Yard South |
|
03/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cudworth Yard South-new connection from Midland line at 55½ m.p. towards Stairfoot Station Jn. (GC & H&B line) |
REOPENED |
Crayford Spur B |
Spur A. |
10/07/1967 |
Crayford Spur B-Spur A. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Metropolitan Jc. |
Cannon Street. |
10/07/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Metropolitan Jc.-Cannon Street. |
CLOSED |
Avonmouth Dock Jn. |
Gloucester Road-St. Andrews Jn. |
10/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Avonmouth Dock Jn.-Gloucester Road-St. Andrews Jn. |
REOPENED |
Douglas |
Castletown |
11/07/1967 |
Douglas-Castletown (I. of M. R.). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Mansfield Colly. Jn. |
Mansfield Colly. Sdgs. |
17/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Mansfield Colly. Jn.-Mansfield Colly. Sdgs. (excl) (former Midland branch) |
REOPENED |
Methley North Jn. |
Whitwood |
31/07/1967 |
Methley North Jn.-Whitwood (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Pontypridd P.C. & N. |
Glyntaff |
31/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pontypridd P.C. & N.-Glyntaff (interchange sidings g.f.). |
CLOSED |
Wern Tarw West GF |
Wern Tarw East GF |
31/07/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wern Tarw West GF-Wern Tarw East GF |
CLOSED |
Parkend |
Coleford Jn.-Coleford-Whitecliffe |
01/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Parkend-Coleford Jn.-Coleford-Whitecliffe |
CLOSED |
Bullo Pill West |
Bilson Jn.-Cinderford Town |
01/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bullo Pill West-Bilson Jn.-Cinderford Town |
CLOSED |
Ringwood |
Wimborne. |
07/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed :- Ringwood-Wimborne. |
CLOSED |
Ringwood |
West Moors (M. of D. Sdg.) |
07/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ringwood-West Moors (M. of D. Sdg.) |
CLOSED |
West Boldon |
Hedworth Lane |
07/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- West Boldon-Hedworth Lane |
CLOSED |
Cudworth, Monckton Empty Sdgs. |
Wrangbrook |
07/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Cudworth, Monckton Empty Sdgs.-Wrangbrook |
CLOSED |
Wrangbrook |
Sprotborough-Middleton Sdg. |
07/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wrangbrook-Sprotborough-Middleton Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Hemsworth East |
South; Pickburn & Brodsworth-Brodsworth Main Colliery |
07/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hemsworth East-South; Pickburn & Brodsworth-Brodsworth Main Colliery. |
CLOSED |
Whitworth |
Rochdale E. Jc. |
14/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Whitworth-Rochdale E. Jc. |
CLOSED |
Lancaster No. 1 |
Old station |
14/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lancaster No. 1-Old station |
CLOSED |
Ponteland |
Prestwick ICI siding. |
14/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ponteland-Prestwick ICI siding. |
CLOSED |
Lancaster No. 1 |
Lancaster Old station |
14/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lancaster No. 1-Lancaster Old station (Official closure date; regular traffic already ceased; line still retained and occasionally used for GPO telegraph poles-also temporarily for stabling Engineer's Dept. trains) |
CLOSED |
Salisbury Milford |
Milford Jn. |
21/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Salisbury Milford-Milford Jn. |
CLOSED |
Penshaw North Jn |
Cox Green. |
21/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Penshaw North Jn-Cox Green. |
CLOSED |
Rochdale East Jn. |
Whitworth |
21/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Rochdale East Jn.-Whitworth |
CLOSED |
Attenborough, Long Eaton Jn. |
North Erewash Jn. |
26/08/1967 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation):- Attenborough, Long Eaton Jn.-North Erewash Jn. |
CLOSED |
Langholm |
Riddings Jn. |
28/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Langholm-Riddings Jn. |
CLOSED |
Llanidloes |
Moat Lane East |
31/08/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Llanidloes-Moat Lane East (last train previous day) |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Thame |
Morris Cowley |
04/09/1967 |
Thame-Morris Cowley |
CLOSED |
Stanley Jn. |
Forfar-Kinnaber Jn. |
04/09/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Stanley Jn.-Forfar-Kinnaber Jn. |
CLOSED |
Forfar North Jn. |
Bridge of Dun. |
04/09/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Forfar North Jn.-Bridge of Dun. |
CLOSED |
Nottingham Victoria |
Arkwright Street |
04/09/1967 |
Passenger train service have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Nottingham Victoria-Arkwright Street. |
CLOSED |
Aldewarke Jn. |
Rotherham C. - Woodburn Jn. |
04/09/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Aldewarke Jn.-Rotherham C. - Woodburn Jn. |
CLOSED |
Edinburgh, Granton Jct. |
Newhaven Jct. |
04/09/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Edinburgh, Granton Jct.-Newhaven Jct. |
CLOSED |
Felixstowe Town |
Felixstowe Beach |
10/09/1967 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation):- Felixstowe Town-Felixstowe Beach |
CLOSED |
Pool Dam |
Ketley's Sidings. |
11/09/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Pool Dam-Ketley's Sidings. |
CLOSED |
Andover Town |
Andover Jn. |
18/09/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Andover Town-Andover Jn. |
CLOSED |
Ardrossan Montoomerie Pier |
Stevenston No. 1 |
25/09/1967 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (dates shown are last days of operation):- Ardrossan Montoomerie Pier-Stevenston No. 1 |
CLOSED |
Blisworth (SMJ) excl. |
R.T.B. Ironstone Sdg. |
30/09/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Blisworth (SMJ) excl.-R.T.B. Ironstone Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Yate ML Jct. |
Thornbury |
30/09/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Yate ML Jct.-Thornbury ("official" closure of remaining private sdg., but traffic continued until last train six weeks later-2.11.67). |
CLOSED |
Briggs siding (Hindlow) |
Parsley Hay-Hartington |
02/10/1967 |
The following line will be completely closed:- Briggs siding (Hindlow)-Parsley Hay-Hartington |
CLOSED |
Parsley Hay |
Friden. |
02/10/1967 |
The following line will be completely closed:- Parsley Hay-Friden. |
CLOSED |
Banbury Pin Hill |
Wroxton |
02/10/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Banbury Pin Hill-Wroxton (Oxfordshire Ironstone Co.'s workmen's service). |
CLOSED |
Banbury Ironstone Sidings |
Wroxton |
02/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Banbury Ironstone Sidings-Wroxton (Oxfordshire Ironstone Co.'s main line.) |
CLOSED |
Glyn Neath |
Hirwaun Pond |
02/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Glyn Neath-Hirwaun Pond |
CLOSED |
Sutton in Ashfield Cent. |
Mansfield Colly. (GC) |
02/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Sutton in Ashfield Cent.-Mansfield Colly. (GC) |
CLOSED |
Parsley Hay |
Hartington |
02/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Parsley Hay-Hartington (permanent closure date; freight traffic ceased 2.1.67, water supply ceased 4.9.67) |
CLOSED |
Dowlow Sdg., Hindlow-Parsley Hay |
Friden |
02/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dowlow Sdg., Hindlow-Parsley Hay-Friden |
CLOSED |
Llanidloes |
Moat Lane Junct. East |
02/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Llanidloes-Moat Lane Junct. East ("official" date; last train ran 30.8.1967). |
CLOSED |
Swan Village Gas Sdgs. |
Great Bridge South |
06/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Swan Village Gas Sdgs.-Great Bridge South (Horseley Bridge & Thos. Piggott's Sdg.) (last train 4.10.67; "official" closure 1.1.68). |
CLOSED |
Leslie |
Auchmuty Jct. GF |
09/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Leslie-Auchmuty Jct. GF (amends no. 511, p. 61). |
CLOSED |
Balerno |
Balerno Jct. |
09/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Balerno-Balerno Jct. (regular traffic ceased; "official" date 4th December, 1967). |
CLOSED |
Coutaulds No. 2 GF |
Longridge |
16/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Coutaulds No. 2 GF-Longridge (line severed; official closure date 6.11.67) |
CLOSED |
Bolton Gt. Moor St. |
Hultons Sdgs. |
16/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bolton Gt. Moor St.-Hultons Sdgs. (latterly, irregularly used) |
CLOSED |
Ruddington |
Ruddington Factory passenger platform |
29/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ruddington-Ruddington Factory passenger platform (branch put out of use; parallel branch to Ruddington stores and Disposal Depot remains open). |
CLOSED |
Kings Cross Goods and Mineral Junct. |
Caledonian Road (GN) Goods. |
30/10/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kings Cross Goods and Mineral Junct.-Caledonian Road (GN) Goods. |
CLOSED |
Birkenhead Woodside |
Rock Ferry |
05/11/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Birkenhead Woodside-Rock Ferry (last train will run on Saturday, 4th November). |
REOPENED |
Bury Bolton St. South |
Knowsley St. West |
06/11/1967 |
Bury Bolton St. South-Knowsley St. West (one train weekdays) (Re-opened to ?) |
REOPENED |
Tredegar Jn. Lower |
Bird in Hand-Penar Jn. |
06/11/1967 |
Tredegar Jn. Lower-Bird in Hand-Penar Jn. (This and Halls Road routes to Penar Jc. both in use for a fortnight). (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
North Erewash Jn. |
Trowell Jn. |
06/11/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- North Erewash Jn.-Trowell Jn. (Sunday train withdrawn; daily local trains ceased 2.1.67 and last Summer only train ran 26.8.67); |
CLOSED |
Trent Station North Jn. |
Sawley Jn. |
06/11/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Trent Station North Jn.-Sawley Jn. (via North curve; permanent closure date-temporarily closed since 6.3.67) |
CLOSED |
Trent Station North Jn. |
North Erewash Jn. |
06/11/1967 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Trent Station North Jn.-North Erewash Jn. (Sunday only train withdrawn). |
CLOSED |
Linwood |
Blackstone Jn. |
06/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Linwood-Blackstone Jn. |
CLOSED |
Wigan Central Goods |
Bickershaw Jn. |
06/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Wigan Central Goods-Bickershaw Jn. |
CLOSED |
Barnsley Court House Jn. |
Central Goods (GC) |
06/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Barnsley Court House Jn.-Central Goods (GC) |
CLOSED |
South Queensferry |
Dalmeny Jc. |
06/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- South Queensferry-Dalmeny Jc. |
CLOSED |
Lea Bridge Jct. |
Hall Farm Jct. |
06/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lea Bridge Jct.-Hall Farm Jct. |
CLOSED |
Trent Station North Junct. |
Sawley Junct., via North Curve |
06/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Trent Station North Junct.-Sawley Junct., via North Curve ("official" closure; "temporary" closure 6.3.1967; put out of use 30.4.1967). |
CLOSED |
Halls Road Jn. |
Penar Jn. |
20/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Halls Road Jn.-Penar Jn. |
CLOSED |
Machen |
Caerphilly West. |
20/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Machen-Caerphilly West. |
CLOSED |
Merthyr Plymouth St. |
Brandy Bridge Jn. |
27/11/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Merthyr Plymouth St.-Brandy Bridge Jn. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Accrington South Jn. |
West Jn. |
04/12/1967 |
Accrington South Jn.-West Jn. (triangle retained for turning movements- |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Brackley Colly. |
Little Hutton Jn. |
04/12/1967 |
Brackley Colly.-Little Hutton Jn. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
North Rhondda Colly. |
South Pit |
04/12/1967 |
North Rhondda Colly.-South Pit |
CLOSED |
Balerno |
Balerno Jc. (Slateford) |
04/12/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Balerno-Balerno Jc. (Slateford) |
CLOSED |
Exmouth |
Exmouth Dock |
04/12/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Exmouth-Exmouth Dock |
CLOSED |
Gorgie East |
Cattle Market Sdgs. |
04/12/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gorgie East-Cattle Market Sdgs. |
CLOSED |
Gorgie Cattle Market Sdg. |
Gorgie Mills Sdg. |
04/12/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gorgie Cattle Market Sdg.-Gorgie Mills Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Swan Village Gas Sdgs. |
Swan Village Jct. South |
05/12/1967 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Swan Village Gas Sdgs.-Swan Village Jct. South (last train previous day; "official" closure 1.1.68). |
CLOSED |
Oxford N. Jc. |
Bletchley |
01/01/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Oxford N. Jc.-Bletchley |
CLOSED |
Bedford St. Johns |
Cambridge S. |
01/01/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Bedford St. Johns-Cambridge S. (subject to provision of bus services). |
CLOSED |
Hawkins Lane Jct. |
Burton, Horninglow Street |
01/01/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hawkins Lane Jct.-Burton, Horninglow Street (LNW Goods) |
CLOSED |
Swan Village Jct. South |
Horsley Fields Jct. |
01/01/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Swan Village Jct. South-Horsley Fields Jct. ("official" closure date; see above for dates traffic ceased). |
CLOSED |
Slough West |
Slough Bath Road |
01/01/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Slough West-Slough Bath Road (last regular booked working -ECS). |
CLOSED |
Douglas Colliery, Ponfeigh |
Smyllum (East) Jct. |
15/01/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Douglas Colliery, Ponfeigh-Smyllum (East) Jct. |
CLOSED |
Bury Bolton Street South |
Knowsley Street West |
05/02/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Bury Bolton Street South-Knowsley Street West. |
CLOSED |
Corstorphine |
Haymarket West Jct. |
05/02/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Corstorphine-Haymarket West Jct. |
CLOSED |
Leith Citadel |
Bonnington GF |
05/02/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Leith Citadel-Bonnington GF. |
CLOSED |
Panteg Steelworks (33m. 26ch.) |
Pontypool Road South Jct.-Pontypool Road Station South |
12/02/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Panteg Steelworks (33m. 26ch.)-Pontypool Road South Jct.-Pontypool Road Station South. |
CLOSED |
Parkhead North Jct. |
Garngad, Haghill Jct. |
19/02/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Parkhead North Jct.-Garngad, Haghill Jct. (Parkhead North Jct. box burned down previous day). |
CLOSED |
Blaenrhondda |
Cymmer Afan |
26/02/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Blaenrhondda-Cymmer Afan ("temporarily"). |
CLOSED |
Blaenrhondda |
Gelli GF (Blaengwynfi) |
26/02/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Blaenrhondda-Gelli GF (Blaengwynfi) ("temporarily"). |
CLOSED |
Hardingstone Jct. |
Piddington |
01/03/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hardingstone Jct.-Piddington (transferred to MoD). |
CLOSED |
Penarth |
Cadoxton, Biglis Jct. |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Penarth-Cadoxton, Biglis Jct. |
CLOSED |
Okehampton |
Bere Alston |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Okehampton-Bere Alston |
CLOSED |
Touch North Jct. |
Dunfermline, Townhill Jct. |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Touch North Jct.-Dunfermline, Townhill Jct. |
CLOSED |
Yeovil South Jct. |
Yeovil Jct. |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Yeovil South Jct.-Yeovil Jct. |
CLOSED |
Bradford Jcts. |
Chippenham, Thingley Jct. |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Bradford Jcts.-Chippenham, Thingley Jct. (retained for Summer only use) |
CLOSED |
Reading West Jct. |
Oxford Road Jct. |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Reading West Jct.-Oxford Road Jct. (retained for Summer only use) |
CLOSED |
Cairnie Jct. |
Elgin East |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Cairnie Jct.-Elgin East via Coast |
CLOSED |
Keith Jct. |
Craigellachie-Elgin Centre |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Keith Jct.- Craigellachie-Elgin Centre. |
CLOSED |
Scotswood |
North Wylam-West Wylam |
11/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Scotswood-North Wylam-West Wylam. |
CLOSED |
Honeybourne East Jct. |
Cheltenham Spa, Lansdown Jct. |
25/03/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Honeybourne East Jct.-Cheltenham Spa, Lansdown Jct. |
CLOSED |
Gravesend West |
Southfleet private sdg. |
25/03/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gravesend West-Southfleet private sdg. |
CLOSED |
Accrington South |
Accrington West |
31/03/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Accrington South-Accrington West (Put out of use; last used, for turning Flying Scotsman and Oliver Cromwell 17.3.1968). |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Johnston |
Neyland |
01/04/1968 |
Johnston-Neyland (although traffic has been irregular, line never completely closed). |
CLOSED |
Haddington |
Longniddry |
01/04/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Haddington-Longniddry. |
CLOSED |
Congleton Brunswick Wharf |
Biddulph, Victoria Colly. |
01/04/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Congleton Brunswick Wharf-Biddulph, Victoria Colly. |
CLOSED |
Kelso |
St. Boswells, Kelso Jct. |
01/04/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kelso-St. Boswells, Kelso Jct. |
CLOSED |
Warrington Arpley, LMR/MSC Exchange |
Partington North Side (MSC Railway). |
01/04/1968 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Warrington Arpley, LMR/MSC Exchange-Partington North Side (MSC Railway). |
CLOSED |
Ulceby Jct. |
Brocklesby Jct. |
06/05/1968 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line :- Ulceby Jct.-Brocklesby Jct. |
CLOSED |
Meldon Quarry |
Bere Alston |
06/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Meldon Quarry-Bere Alston |
CLOSED |
Egginton Jct. |
Ilkeston, Stanton Jct. |
06/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Egginton Jct.-Ilkeston, Stanton Jct. |
CLOSED |
Skegby Jct. |
Teversal East-Teversal and Silverhill Collieries |
06/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Skegby Jct.-Teversal East-Teversal and Silverhill Collieries. |
CLOSED |
East Rudham |
South Lynn Junct. |
06/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- East Rudham-South Lynn Junct. |
CLOSED |
Lostock Hall Junct. |
Farington Junct. |
06/05/1968 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Lostock Hall Junct.-Farington Junct. (Sunday-only trains withdrawn). |
CLOSED |
Gorgie Mills Sdg. |
Gorgie (East) Junct. |
25/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Gorgie Mills Sdg.-Gorgie (East) Junct. |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Moor End points |
Claytons Moor End Works |
27/05/1968 |
23/12/1963#Freight#Moor End points-Claytons Moor End Works (Middleton Rly.; official opening ceremony-regular traffic has not yet commenced due to fire at factory, but occasional consignments have been handled). |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Panteg Steel Works (33m. 26ch.) |
Pontypool Road New Sdgs. |
27/05/1968 |
12/2/1968#Freight#Panteg Steel Works (33m. 26ch.)-Pontypool Road New Sdgs. (former Down Yard) (had been closed 2nd August, 1966). |
CLOSED |
Nottingham Weekday Cross Jct. |
Shirebrook North, Langwith Jct. |
27/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Nottingham Weekday Cross Jct.-Shirebrook North, Langwith Jct. |
CLOSED |
Bagthorpe Jct. |
Stanton Jct.-Stanton Works |
27/05/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bagthorpe Jct.-Stanton Jct.-Stanton Works. |
REOPENED |
Clapham Junct., Pouparts Junct. |
Longhedge Junct.-Battersea Pier Junct. |
17/06/1968 |
(temporary): Clapham Junct., Pouparts Junct.-Longhedge Junct.-Battersea Pier Junct. (withdrawn 8 September 1969). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Latchmere Junct. |
Clapham Junct. |
17/06/1968 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Latchmere Junct.-Clapham Junct. (Central side) (workmen's service temporarily diverted to Western side; retained for Summer-only trains). |
CLOSED |
Nine Elms North Viaduct box |
South Viaduct-Loco Junct. Nine Elms North Viaduct box.-"A" box. |
01/07/1968 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Nine Elms North Viaduct box-South Viaduct-Loco Junct. Nine Elms North Viaduct box.-"A" box. |
CLOSED |
Padgate Junct. |
Sankey Junct. |
22/07/1968 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Padgate Junct.-Sankey Junct. (Warrington Central avoiding line; regular traffic ceased 20.5.1968; subsequently used on four occasions only, until closure). |
CLOSED |
Kew East Junct. |
New Kew Junct. Clapham Junct. "A"-Longhedge Junct. |
10/08/1968 |
Passenger trains (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (date shown is last day of operation): Kew East Junct.-New Kew Junct. Clapham Junct. "A"-Longhedge Junct. (Note: retained for seasonal "Senior Citizens" unadvertised w.t.t. trains) |
CLOSED |
Droylsden Station Junct. |
Ashton Moss Junct. |
17/08/1968 |
Passenger train services (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (date shown is last day of operation):- 17th August, 1968: Droylsden Station Junct.-Ashton Moss Junct. |
CLOSED |
Worcester Tunnel Junct. |
Worcester Goods Yard |
19/08/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Worcester Tunnel Junct.-Worcester Goods Yard (Tunnel Junct. connexions severed; portions of line at Goods Yard end retained as sidings). |
CLOSED |
Pleck Junct. |
Darlaston Junct. |
31/08/1968 |
Passenger trains (Summer only) have been withdrawn from the following section of line (date shown is last day of operation): Pleck Junct.-Darlaston Junct. |
CLOSED |
Edge Hill Viaduct Junct. |
Top of Grid g.f. |
30/09/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Edge Hill Viaduct Junct.-Top of Grid g.f. (Wapping Grid feeding line; put out of use 13.4.1969) |
CLOSED |
Sheerness station |
Sheerness Harbour private sdg. |
07/10/1968 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Sheerness station-Sheerness Harbour private sdg. (former Dockyard stn.); |
CLOSED |
Sheerness Dockyard g.f. |
Sheerness Harbour private sdg. |
07/10/1968 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Sheerness Dockyard g.f.-Sheerness Harbour private sdg. |
CLOSED |
Ashburys West Junct. |
Midland Junct.-Philips Park No. 1 |
07/10/1968 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Ashburys West Junct.-Midland Junct.-Philips Park No. 1 (retained for Summer-only trains). |
CLOSED |
Harwich, Parkeston Goods Junct. |
Parkeston Quay West |
08/11/1968 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Harwich, Parkeston Goods Junct.-Parkeston Quay West (retained for trains in connection with relief sailings only). |
CLOSED |
Scotstoun West |
Balmoral St. Crossing |
18/11/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Scotstoun West-Balmoral St. Crossing (Whiteinch Tramway line). |
CLOSED |
Glasgow, Sighthill East |
Braby's Sdg.-Germiston Junct. |
30/11/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Glasgow, Sighthill East-Braby's Sdg.-Germiston Junct. (Germiston branch). |
CLOSED |
Edinburgh, Bonnington Goods |
Bonnington South Junct. |
02/12/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Edinburgh, Bonnington Goods-Bonnington South Junct. |
CLOSED |
Brent Junct. No.1 |
No.2 |
09/12/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Brent Junct. No.1-No.2 via single track Engine Line. |
REOPENED |
Codnor Park Junct. |
Ironville Junct. |
23/12/1968 |
Codnor Park Junct.-Ironville Junct. (Re-opened to Freight) |
CLOSED |
Crich Junct., General Refractories g.f. |
Butterley, Swanwick Sdgs. |
23/12/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Crich Junct., General Refractories g.f.-Butterley, Swanwick Sdgs. |
CLOSED |
Riddings Jct. |
Ironville Jct. |
23/12/1968 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Riddings Jct.-Ironville Jct. |
CLOSED |
Hatfield No. 3 |
Smallford, Hill End Cold Store. |
01/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Hatfield No. 3-Smallford, Hill End Cold Store. |
REOPENED |
Forest Gate Junct. |
Woodgrange Park Junct. |
06/01/1969 |
Forest Gate Junct.-Woodgrange Park Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Blisworth |
Duston Junct. North |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Blisworth-Duston Junct. North |
CLOSED |
Duston West |
Northampton Bridge St. Junct. |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Duston West-Northampton Bridge St. Junct. (one track retained as siding) (both routes put out of use 23.2.1969) |
CLOSED |
Blandford Forum |
Broadstone |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Blandford Forum-Broadstone |
CLOSED |
Carlisle No. 3 |
Canal Junct. |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Carlisle No. 3-Canal Junct. |
CLOSED |
Ashurst Junct. |
Groombridge. |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Ashurst Junct.-Groombridge. |
CLOSED |
Gosport |
Bedenham Sdg. |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Gosport-Bedenham Sdg. |
CLOSED |
Lewes East marshalling yard |
East box. |
06/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Lewes East marshalling yard-East box. |
CLOSED |
South Shieds, Westoe Colly. |
Whitburn Colly. |
13/01/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- South Shieds, Westoe Colly.- Whitburn Colly. (SSMWC Rly.) |
CLOSED |
Kenilworth Junct. |
Berkswell |
17/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Kenilworth Junct.-Berkswell (due to track damage; last train ran previous day). |
CLOSED |
Bathgate |
Polkemmet Junct.-Whitrigg Colly. |
20/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Bathgate-Polkemmet Junct.-Whitrigg Colly. |
CLOSED |
Polkemmet Junct. |
Whitrigg Colly. |
20/01/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Polkemmet Junct.-Whitrigg Colly. |
CLOSED |
Muirkirk |
Cronberry, Gasswater Sdg. g.f. |
31/01/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Muirkirk-Cronberry, Gasswater Sdg. g.f. ("official" date; retained until 7.2.1969 for running round purposes). |
CLOSED |
Bradwell Sidings |
Parkhouse Colliery |
03/02/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Bradwell Sidings-Parkhouse Colliery (Chesterton branch) |
CLOSED |
Aldridge Junct. |
BICC Siding. |
10/02/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Aldridge Junct.-BICC Siding. |
CLOSED |
Lewes Main Junct. |
Uckfield |
24/02/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Lewes Main Junct.-Uckfield ("temporary" closure; "official" closure 5.5.1969). |
CLOSED |
Kilmarnock No. 2 |
Ayr Barassie Jc. |
03/03/1969 |
Passenger services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Kilmarnock No. 2-Ayr Barassie Jc. |
CLOSED |
Egremont |
Sellafield School-train |
03/03/1969 |
Passenger services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Egremont-Sellafield School-train service. |
CLOSED |
Glasgow, Balmoral Street Crossing |
Meadowside Granary Sdg. |
03/03/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Glasgow, Balmoral Street Crossing-Meadowside Granary Sdg. (Whiteinch Tramway line) |
CLOSED |
Catterick Bridge |
Richmond |
03/03/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Catterick Bridge-Richmond |
REOPENED |
Warren St. |
Victoria |
07/03/1969 |
Warren St.-Victoria (commissioned 3.2.1969; full service commenced as ECS for trials 24.2.1969). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Wicklow Old station |
Wicklow Junct. |
10/03/1969 |
Wicklow Old station-Wicklow Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Tamworth High Level |
Low Level |
10/03/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Tamworth High Level-Low Level (put out of use). |
CLOSED |
Dunmow |
Easton Lodge, Geests' Sdg. |
24/03/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Dunmow-Easton Lodge, Geests' Sdg. |
REOPENED |
Laisterdyke West |
Bowling Junct. |
31/03/1969 |
Laisterdyke West-Bowling Junct. (one train, pending TUCC procedure). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Glasgow, Craighall Depot |
Pt. Dundas East. |
31/03/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Glasgow, Craighall Depot-Pt. Dundas East. |
CLOSED |
Dunmow |
Easton Lodge, Geest's Sdg. |
01/04/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Dunmow-Easton Lodge, Geest's Sdg. |
REOPENED |
Buckfastleigh |
Totnes, Riverside |
05/04/1969 |
Buckfastleigh-Totnes, Riverside (Dart Valley Light Railway). (Re-opened to Passenger (Summer only)) |
CLOSED |
Branches Fork |
Pontnewynydd Junct.-Trevethin Junct. |
07/04/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Branches Fork-Pontnewynydd Junct.-Trevethin Junct. |
REOPENED |
Rotherham Masborough South Junction |
Holmes Junct. |
25/04/1969 |
(Summer-only Motorail): Rotherham Masborough South Junction-Holmes Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Hawick |
Gorebridge, Lady Victoria Pit. |
28/04/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hawick-Gorebridge, Lady Victoria Pit. |
CLOSED |
Tredegar Junct. Lower |
Tredegar. |
30/04/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Tredegar Junct. Lower-Tredegar. |
CLOSED |
Uckfield |
Lewes Main Junct. |
04/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Uckfield-Lewes Main Junct. ("official" closure; temporary closure 24.2.1969). |
REOPENED |
Kensington Olympia |
Clapham Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Kensington Olympia-Clapham Junct. (Western side) (previously unadvertised workmen-now advertised). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Filton Junct. |
Stoke Gifford West |
05/05/1969 |
Filton Junct.-Stoke Gifford West (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Westerleigh West Junct. |
Yate South Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Westerleigh West Junct.-Yate South Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Cornbrook Junct. East |
Cornbrook West Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Cornbrook Junct. East-Cornbrook West Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger (all year)) |
CLOSED |
Manchester Central Station |
|
05/05/1969 |
Manchester Central Station was closed on 5th May. |
CLOSED |
Rugby |
Nottingham Arkwright Street |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Rugby-Nottingham Arkwright Street (subject to granting of bus licences) |
CLOSED |
Hunstanton |
Kings Lynn Jc. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger services have been/will be withdrawn from the following sections of line:- Hunstanton-Kings Lynn Jc. |
CLOSED |
Eastleigh East |
Romsey |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Eastleigh East-Romsey |
CLOSED |
Stratford upon Avon |
Honeybourne Station South |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Stratford upon Avon-Honeybourne Station South |
CLOSED |
Manchester Central |
Cornbrook West Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Manchester Central-Cornbrook West Junct. |
CLOSED |
Throstle Nest East Junct. |
Chorlton Junct.-New Mills South Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Throstle Nest East Junct.-Chorlton Junct.-New Mills South Junct. |
CLOSED |
Chorlton Junct. |
Fairfield Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Chorlton Junct.-Fairfield Junct. |
CLOSED |
Tyseley South Junct. |
Henley in Arden-Bearley West Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Tyseley South Junct.-Henley in Arden-Bearley West Junct. |
CLOSED |
Newport on Tay branch |
|
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Newport on Tay branch |
CLOSED |
Eccles |
Tyldesley-Kenyon Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Eccles-Tyldesley-Kenyon Junct. |
CLOSED |
Rugby Cent. |
Leicester Goods North |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Rugby Cent.-Leicester Goods North |
CLOSED |
Leicester, Abbey Lane |
East Leake |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Leicester, Abbey Lane-East Leake |
CLOSED |
Stratford upon Avon |
Long Marston |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Stratford upon Avon-Long Marston (regular traffic ceased, but line retained for two years for engineering diversions, as are Honeybourne East Loop-Cheltenham Spa, Lansdown Junct. and Honeybourne Station South-Honeybourne West Loop) (amends no. 521, p. 382) |
CLOSED |
Chorlton Junct. |
Cheadle North Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Chorlton Junct.-Cheadle North Junct. |
CLOSED |
Manchester Central |
Cornbrook Junct. West |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Manchester Central-Cornbrook Junct. West |
CLOSED |
Hunstanton |
Kings Lynn Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Hunstanton-Kings Lynn Junct. |
CLOSED |
Tyseley South Junct. |
Henley in Arden-Bearley West Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Tyseley South Junct.-Henley in Arden-Bearley West Junct. |
CLOSED |
Bristol Dr. Day's Bridge Junct. |
North Somerset Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Bristol Dr. Day's Bridge Junct.-North Somerset Junct. (retained for Summer only use); |
CLOSED |
Newport on Tay East |
Tay Bridge South box |
05/05/1969 |
Passenger train services have been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line:- Newport on Tay East-Tay Bridge South box. |
CLOSED |
Rugby Cent. |
East Leake |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Rugby Cent.-East Leake |
CLOSED |
Droylsden Station Junct. |
Ashton Moss Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Droylsden Station Junct.-Ashton Moss Junct. |
CLOSED |
Eccles Junct. |
Kenyon Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Eccles Junct.-Tyldesley -Kenyon Junct. |
CLOSED |
Newport on Tay East |
Tay Bridge South box. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been completely closed:- Newport on Tay East-Tay Bridge South box. |
CLOSED |
Cornbrook West Junct. |
Old Trafford Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Cornbrook West Junct.-Old Trafford Junct. |
CLOSED |
Throstle Nest East Junct. |
Chorlton Junct.-Fairfield Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Throstle Nest East Junct.-Chorlton Junct.-Fairfield Junct. |
CLOSED |
Chorlton Junct. |
Cheadle Heath North Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Chorlton Junct.-Cheadle Heath North Junct. (Sundays-only; last train ran 27.4.69) |
CLOSED |
Cheadle Heath North Junct. |
New Mills South Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Cheadle Heath North Junct.-New Mills South Junct. (Sundays-only; last train ran 27.4.69, but retained for Summer-only trains) |
CLOSED |
Landor St. Junct. |
St. Andrews Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Landor St. Junct.-St. Andrews Junct. (retained for Summer-only trains) |
CLOSED |
Bordesley Junct. |
Bournville, Lifford curve junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Bordesley Junct.-Bournville, Lifford curve junct. (retained for Summer-only trains) |
CLOSED |
Blackburn, Daisyfield Junct. |
Hellifield South Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Blackburn, Daisyfield Junct.-Hellifield South Junct. (Sundays -only trains withdrawn) |
CLOSED |
Lostock Hall Junct. |
Farington Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Lostock Hall Junct.-Farington Junct. (Sundays only trains withdrawn). |
CLOSED |
Lewes West box |
Friars Walk Goods |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Lewes West box-Friars Walk Goods |
CLOSED |
Chorlton Junct. |
Cheadle Heath North Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Chorlton Junct.-Cheadle Heath North Junct. |
CLOSED |
Throstle Nest East Junct. |
South Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Throstle Nest East Junct.-South Junct. |
CLOSED |
Manchester Central |
Cornbrook West Junct.-Old Trafford Junct. |
05/05/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Manchester Central-Cornbrook West Junct.-Old Trafford Junct. |
REOPENED |
Earlestown No. 1 |
Earlestown No. 4 |
11/05/1969 |
(Sundays-only): Earlestown No. 1-Earlestown No. 4 (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Hawkeridge |
Heywood Road Junct. |
11/05/1969 |
Hawkeridge-Heywood Road Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Bristol T.M. West |
Marsh Junct.-North Somerset Junct. |
19/05/1969 |
(Summer-only Motorail): Bristol T.M. West-Marsh Junct.-North Somerset Junct. (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Douglas |
Port Erin |
25/05/1969 |
Douglas-Port Erin (Isle of Man Railway). (Re-opened to Passenger (Summer only)) |
REOPENED |
Crewe Coal Yard |
Salop Goods Junct. |
14/06/1969 |
(Summer-only): Crewe Coal Yard-Salop Goods Junct. (up and down lines). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
REOPENED |
Denton Junct. |
Ashton Moss Junct.-O.A. & G.B. Junct. |
07/07/1969 |
(all-year): Denton Junct.-Ashton Moss Junct.-O.A. & G.B. Junct. (previously Summer-only). (Re-opened to Passenger) |
CLOSED |
Pemberton Junct. |
Westwood Park-Hindley North (No. 3) |
14/07/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Pemberton Junct.-Westwood Park-Hindley North (No. 3) (Wigan LYR avoiding line). |
CLOSED |
Grassington |
Rylstone |
11/08/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Grassington-Rylstone |
CLOSED |
Clapham Junct., Pouparts Junct. |
Longhedge Junct.-Battersea Park Junct. |
08/09/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Clapham Junct., Pouparts Junct.-Longhedge Junct.-Battersea Park Junct. |
CLOSED |
Wareham, Worgret Junct. |
|
06/10/1969 |
Swanage-Wareham, Worgret Junct. |
CLOSED |
Swanage |
Corfe Castle, Furzebrook Sdgs. |
06/10/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed:- Swanage-Corfe Castle, Furzebrook Sdgs. |
CLOSED |
Liss (LMR) |
Longmoor Downs |
31/10/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Liss (LMR)-Longmoor Downs (Longmoor Military workmen's). |
CLOSED |
Liss (LMR) |
Oakhanger |
31/10/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Liss (LMR)-Oakhanger |
CLOSED |
Longmoor Downs |
Hollywater-Whitehill |
31/10/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Longmoor Downs-Hollywater-Whitehill |
CLOSED |
Liss (BR) |
Liss Junct. (LMR) |
31/10/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Liss (BR)-Liss Junct. (LMR) (Longmoor Military Railway). |
CLOSURE CANCELLED |
Uckfield |
Lewes Main Junct. |
29/12/1969 |
Uckfield-Lewes Main Junct. |
CLOSED |
Yate South Junct. |
Mangotsfield-Bristol T.M. East. |
29/12/1969 |
The passenger train services has been/will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Yate South Junct.-Mangotsfield-Bristol T.M. East. |
CLOSED |
Mangotsfield North Junct. |
Bristol, Lawrence Hill Junct. |
29/12/1969 |
The following line has been/will be completely closed: Mangotsfield North Junct.-Bristol, Lawrence Hill Junct. |
CLOSED |
Lowestoft Central |
Yarmouth South Town |
04/05/1970 |
Passenger Services will be withdrawn from the following section of line: Lowestoft Central-Yarmouth South Town. |
CLOSED |
Barnstaple |
Ilfracombe |
05/10/1970 |
The Barnstaple-Ilfracombe service is to be withdrawn from 5th October |
CLOSED |
Cambridge |
St. Ives |
05/10/1970 |
The service between Cambridge and St. Ives is to be withdrawn from 5th October. |
CLOSED |
Bolton |
Rochdale |
05/10/1970 |
The service between Bolton, Bury (Knowsley Street) and Rochdale is to be withdrawn from 5th October. |