Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 311 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 9255 Week
» 311 Month
» 346735 Year
» 3373588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrap Merchant: RFS Engineering Ltd
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08337 |
27/12/1957 |
06/02/1987 |
29.132 |
2.241 |
DR |
Doncaster |
04/05/1989 |
31.373 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08272 |
12/04/1957 |
06/07/1987 |
30.252 |
3.532 |
TI |
Tinsley |
01/1991 |
33.784 |