Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2650 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33300 Week
» 131945 Month
» 334609 Year
» 3361462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Coopers Metals Sheffield
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76029 |
28/12/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
29.581 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.318 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76032 |
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.271 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.008 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76033 |
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.271 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.008 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2327 |
29/05/1961 |
14/08/1968 |
7.216 |
15.345 |
|
|
12/1983 |
22.562 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76031 |
19/06/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.104 |
2.575 |
|
|
02/1984 |
31.679 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2607 |
18/10/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
7.203 |
16.471 |
|
|
06/1984 |
23.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
24142 |
19/11/1960 |
01/07/1976 |
15.625 |
8.214 |
|
|
09/1984 |
23.838 |