Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17138 Week
» 70154 Month
» 189681 Year
» 3216534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: C F Booth Rotherham
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47489 |
18/02/1964 |
31/10/2007 |
43.729 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47363 |
02/07/1965 |
31/10/2007 |
42.359 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08296 |
31/05/1957 |
30/10/1988 |
31.438 |
|
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08512 |
28/05/1958 |
03/12/1977 |
19.532 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08698 |
19/12/1959 |
04/10/1981 |
21.808 |
|
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37077 |
12/10/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
46.000 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2239 |
18/05/1956 |
30/09/1971 |
15.378 |
|
|
|
0000 |
|
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2258 |
28/09/1957 |
05/09/1970 |
12.945 |
|
|
|
0000 |
|
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50045 |
18/10/1968 |
11/12/1990 |
22.162 |
-90.718 |
|
|
04/1900 |
-68.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3155 |
17/02/1955 |
17/09/1967 |
12.589 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1968 |
12.918 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3159 |
12/08/1955 |
17/09/1967 |
12.107 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1968 |
12.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3161 |
07/09/1955 |
17/09/1967 |
12.036 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1968 |
12.364 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3163 |
20/09/1955 |
17/09/1967 |
12.000 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1968 |
12.329 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3153 |
07/02/1955 |
15/07/1967 |
12.441 |
0.589 |
|
|
02/1968 |
13.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3154 |
17/02/1955 |
15/07/1967 |
12.414 |
0.589 |
|
|
02/1968 |
13.003 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3166 |
12/10/1955 |
15/07/1967 |
11.764 |
0.589 |
|
|
02/1968 |
12.353 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12008 |
11/09/1939 |
15/07/1967 |
27.860 |
0.589 |
|
|
02/1968 |
28.449 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2500 |
31/12/1955 |
13/05/1967 |
11.373 |
0.841 |
|
|
03/1968 |
12.214 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2502 |
25/01/1956 |
07/10/1967 |
11.707 |
0.438 |
|
|
03/1968 |
12.145 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2503 |
31/01/1956 |
05/08/1967 |
11.518 |
0.611 |
|
|
03/1968 |
12.129 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2504 |
22/02/1956 |
18/03/1967 |
11.074 |
0.995 |
|
|
03/1968 |
12.068 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2505 |
27/03/1956 |
19/08/1967 |
11.403 |
0.573 |
|
|
03/1968 |
11.975 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2508 |
31/05/1956 |
13/05/1967 |
10.956 |
0.841 |
|
|
03/1968 |
11.797 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/7 |
0-6-0 |
D2509 |
18/06/1956 |
05/08/1967 |
11.137 |
0.611 |
|
|
03/1968 |
11.748 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/12 |
0-6-0 |
D2510 |
28/08/1961 |
26/08/1967 |
5.997 |
0.553 |
|
|
03/1968 |
6.551 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/12 |
0-6-0 |
D2512 |
11/09/1961 |
13/05/1967 |
5.671 |
0.841 |
|
|
03/1968 |
6.512 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/12 |
0-6-0 |
D2514 |
16/10/1961 |
05/08/1967 |
5.805 |
0.611 |
|
|
03/1968 |
6.416 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/12 |
0-6-0 |
D2516 |
10/11/1961 |
05/08/1967 |
5.737 |
0.611 |
|
|
03/1968 |
6.348 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2565 |
15/06/1957 |
25/03/1967 |
9.781 |
0.975 |
|
|
03/1968 |
10.756 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2603 |
16/09/1960 |
12/08/1967 |
6.907 |
0.592 |
|
|
03/1968 |
7.499 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2266 |
09/01/1958 |
27/11/1967 |
9.888 |
0.384 |
|
|
04/1968 |
10.271 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2402 |
29/09/1956 |
10/09/1967 |
10.953 |
0.597 |
|
|
04/1968 |
11.551 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2552 |
07/02/1956 |
24/06/1967 |
11.384 |
0.811 |
|
|
04/1968 |
12.195 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2557 |
16/08/1956 |
15/04/1967 |
10.668 |
1.003 |
|
|
04/1968 |
11.671 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2558 |
11/10/1956 |
15/07/1967 |
10.764 |
0.753 |
|
|
04/1968 |
11.518 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2563 |
15/06/1957 |
05/08/1967 |
10.145 |
0.696 |
|
|
04/1968 |
10.841 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2564 |
15/06/1957 |
05/08/1967 |
10.145 |
0.696 |
|
|
04/1968 |
10.841 |
Diesel |
BR |
D1/1 |
0-4-0 |
D2951 |
25/12/1954 |
30/12/1967 |
13.022 |
0.293 |
|
|
04/1968 |
13.315 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/11 |
0-4-0 |
D2999 |
04/09/1960 |
15/10/1967 |
7.115 |
0.501 |
|
|
04/1968 |
7.616 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3156 |
02/03/1955 |
15/07/1967 |
12.378 |
0.753 |
|
|
04/1968 |
13.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/5 |
0-6-0 |
D3165 |
06/10/1955 |
08/07/1967 |
11.762 |
0.773 |
|
|
04/1968 |
12.534 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12005 |
27/05/1939 |
09/09/1967 |
28.307 |
0.600 |
|
|
04/1968 |
28.907 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12028 |
11/03/1942 |
24/06/1967 |
25.304 |
0.781 |
|
|
04/04/1968 |
26.085 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2609 |
13/12/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
7.049 |
0.375 |
|
|
05/1968 |
7.425 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2551 |
08/10/1955 |
06/01/1968 |
12.255 |
0.441 |
|
|
06/1968 |
12.696 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2553 |
08/02/1956 |
06/01/1968 |
11.918 |
0.441 |
|
|
06/1968 |
12.359 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2555 |
05/06/1956 |
13/01/1968 |
11.614 |
0.422 |
|
|
06/1968 |
12.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2566 |
04/08/1957 |
06/01/1968 |
10.430 |
0.441 |
|
|
06/1968 |
10.871 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9501 |
27/07/1964 |
31/03/1968 |
3.679 |
0.208 |
85A |
Worcester |
06/1968 |
3.888 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2610 |
21/12/1960 |
04/12/1967 |
6.956 |
0.699 |
|
|
08/1968 |
7.655 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2615 |
08/03/1961 |
30/12/1967 |
6.816 |
0.627 |
|
|
08/1968 |
7.444 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3449 |
08/11/1957 |
30/12/1967 |
10.148 |
0.627 |
|
|
08/1968 |
10.775 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3499 |
28/12/1957 |
20/01/1968 |
10.068 |
0.655 |
|
|
09/1968 |
10.723 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3628 |
16/10/1958 |
30/12/1967 |
9.211 |
0.712 |
|
|
09/1968 |
9.923 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2273 |
18/04/1958 |
16/10/1967 |
9.501 |
1.085 |
|
|
11/1968 |
10.586 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2316 |
14/02/1961 |
10/02/1968 |
6.992 |
0.764 |
|
|
11/1968 |
7.756 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4080 |
16/12/1961 |
11/02/1968 |
6.159 |
0.762 |
|
|
11/1968 |
6.921 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4081 |
11/01/1962 |
30/06/1968 |
6.471 |
0.378 |
|
|
11/1968 |
6.849 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4082 |
17/01/1962 |
30/06/1968 |
6.455 |
0.378 |
|
|
11/1968 |
6.833 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9543 |
28/06/1965 |
01/04/1968 |
2.762 |
0.625 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
11/1968 |
3.386 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9546 |
28/06/1965 |
01/04/1968 |
2.762 |
0.625 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
11/1968 |
3.386 |
Diesel |
BR |
14 |
0-6-0 |
D9550 |
27/08/1965 |
01/04/1968 |
2.597 |
0.625 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
11/1968 |
3.222 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2312 |
05/01/1961 |
03/02/1968 |
7.082 |
0.866 |
|
|
12/1968 |
7.948 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2320 |
14/03/1961 |
10/02/1968 |
6.915 |
0.932 |
|
|
01/1969 |
7.847 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3442 |
08/10/1957 |
29/09/1968 |
10.984 |
0.296 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.279 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3447 |
31/10/1957 |
23/03/1968 |
10.400 |
0.816 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.216 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3450 |
13/11/1957 |
29/06/1968 |
10.633 |
0.548 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.181 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3451 |
18/11/1957 |
14/07/1968 |
10.660 |
0.507 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.167 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3473 |
10/12/1957 |
27/07/1968 |
10.636 |
0.471 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.107 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3474 |
11/12/1957 |
30/06/1968 |
10.559 |
0.545 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.104 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3475 |
18/12/1957 |
13/07/1968 |
10.575 |
0.510 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.085 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3482 |
28/02/1958 |
22/06/1968 |
10.321 |
0.567 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.888 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3490 |
14/04/1958 |
22/06/1968 |
10.197 |
0.567 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.764 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3493 |
30/04/1958 |
22/06/1968 |
10.153 |
0.567 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.721 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3495 |
15/05/1958 |
22/06/1968 |
10.112 |
0.567 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.679 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3498 |
21/12/1957 |
01/06/1968 |
10.452 |
0.625 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.077 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3501 |
11/01/1958 |
29/06/1968 |
10.471 |
0.548 |
|
|
01/1969 |
11.019 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3625 |
02/10/1958 |
27/07/1968 |
9.825 |
0.471 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.296 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3626 |
06/10/1958 |
27/07/1968 |
9.814 |
0.471 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.285 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3627 |
07/10/1958 |
27/07/1968 |
9.811 |
0.471 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.282 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3632 |
28/10/1958 |
27/07/1968 |
9.753 |
0.471 |
|
|
01/1969 |
10.225 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4064 |
07/04/1961 |
27/07/1968 |
7.310 |
0.471 |
|
|
01/1969 |
7.781 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4085 |
08/02/1962 |
30/06/1968 |
6.395 |
0.545 |
|
|
01/1969 |
6.940 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4088 |
02/03/1962 |
11/08/1968 |
6.449 |
0.430 |
|
|
01/1969 |
6.879 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4089 |
08/03/1962 |
18/08/1968 |
6.452 |
0.411 |
|
|
01/1969 |
6.863 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4091 |
25/04/1962 |
11/08/1968 |
6.301 |
0.430 |
|
|
01/1969 |
6.732 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3147 |
12/07/1955 |
06/05/1968 |
12.827 |
0.781 |
|
|
02/1969 |
13.608 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3139 |
12/03/1955 |
10/06/1968 |
13.258 |
0.762 |
|
|
03/1969 |
14.019 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3140 |
29/04/1955 |
10/06/1968 |
13.126 |
0.762 |
|
|
03/1969 |
13.888 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3142 |
08/06/1955 |
26/06/1968 |
13.060 |
0.718 |
|
|
03/1969 |
13.778 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3148 |
15/07/1955 |
05/03/1968 |
12.649 |
1.027 |
|
|
03/1969 |
13.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2222 |
08/09/1955 |
28/10/1968 |
13.148 |
0.463 |
|
|
04/1969 |
13.611 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2309 |
12/12/1960 |
08/07/1968 |
7.575 |
0.770 |
|
|
04/1969 |
8.345 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2323 |
05/04/1961 |
08/07/1968 |
7.263 |
0.770 |
|
|
04/1969 |
8.033 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3150 |
28/07/1955 |
10/06/1968 |
12.879 |
0.847 |
|
|
04/1969 |
13.726 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2401 |
25/07/1956 |
28/12/1968 |
12.436 |
0.378 |
|
|
05/1969 |
12.814 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2403 |
12/10/1956 |
01/02/1969 |
12.315 |
0.282 |
|
|
05/1969 |
12.597 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2404 |
06/11/1956 |
01/02/1969 |
12.247 |
0.282 |
|
|
05/1969 |
12.529 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2407 |
14/01/1957 |
01/02/1969 |
12.058 |
0.282 |
|
|
05/1969 |
12.340 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3453 |
28/11/1957 |
14/07/1968 |
10.633 |
0.836 |
|
|
05/1969 |
11.468 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3481 |
24/02/1958 |
01/12/1968 |
10.775 |
0.452 |
|
|
05/1969 |
11.227 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3487 |
21/03/1958 |
14/07/1968 |
10.323 |
0.836 |
|
|
05/1969 |
11.159 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4076 |
14/10/1961 |
14/07/1968 |
6.753 |
0.836 |
|
|
05/1969 |
7.589 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4083 |
26/01/1962 |
14/07/1968 |
6.468 |
0.836 |
|
|
05/1969 |
7.304 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4084 |
03/02/1962 |
14/07/1968 |
6.447 |
0.836 |
|
|
05/1969 |
7.282 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3443 |
10/10/1957 |
08/12/1968 |
11.170 |
0.518 |
|
|
06/1969 |
11.688 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3478 |
16/01/1958 |
30/06/1968 |
10.460 |
1.041 |
|
|
07/1969 |
11.501 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3622 |
09/09/1958 |
15/03/1969 |
10.521 |
0.334 |
|
|
07/1969 |
10.855 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3623 |
11/09/1958 |
15/03/1969 |
10.515 |
0.334 |
|
|
07/1969 |
10.849 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3624 |
19/09/1958 |
03/11/1968 |
10.132 |
0.696 |
|
|
07/1969 |
10.827 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3645 |
16/12/1958 |
15/03/1969 |
10.252 |
0.334 |
|
|
07/1969 |
10.586 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2214 |
13/11/1954 |
13/07/1968 |
13.674 |
1.090 |
|
|
08/1969 |
14.764 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2221 |
04/09/1955 |
13/07/1968 |
12.866 |
1.090 |
|
|
08/1969 |
13.956 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2394 |
21/07/1961 |
23/11/1968 |
7.348 |
0.726 |
|
|
08/1969 |
8.074 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3621 |
03/09/1958 |
07/1969 |
10.871 |
0.337 |
|
|
11/1969 |
11.208 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2405 |
06/12/1956 |
28/12/1968 |
12.068 |
1.211 |
|
|
03/1970 |
13.279 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/5 |
0-6-0 |
D2409 |
04/03/1957 |
28/12/1968 |
11.827 |
1.211 |
|
|
03/1970 |
13.038 |
Diesel |
BR |
12 |
0-6-0 |
15223 |
01/10/1949 |
09/06/1969 |
19.701 |
1.099 |
|
|
07/1970 |
20.800 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2242 |
26/10/1956 |
31/12/1969 |
13.189 |
0.622 |
|
|
08/1970 |
13.811 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2261 |
12/12/1957 |
15/03/1970 |
12.263 |
0.419 |
|
|
08/1970 |
12.682 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2264 |
28/12/1957 |
31/12/1969 |
12.016 |
0.622 |
|
|
08/1970 |
12.638 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2385 |
24/03/1961 |
15/02/1970 |
8.904 |
0.496 |
|
|
08/1970 |
9.400 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
11/08/1950 |
30/09/1969 |
19.151 |
0.874 |
|
|
08/1970 |
20.025 |
Diesel |
BR |
12 |
0-6-0 |
15218 |
02/07/1949 |
31/01/1970 |
20.597 |
0.537 |
|
|
08/1970 |
21.134 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2265 |
28/12/1957 |
15/03/1970 |
12.219 |
0.504 |
|
|
09/1970 |
12.723 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3647 |
23/12/1958 |
15/03/1970 |
11.233 |
0.504 |
|
|
09/1970 |
11.737 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12112 |
02/07/1952 |
18/10/1969 |
17.307 |
0.910 |
|
|
09/1970 |
18.216 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2001 |
12/12/1957 |
31/05/1969 |
11.474 |
1.375 |
|
|
10/1970 |
12.849 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2040 |
31/03/1959 |
31/05/1969 |
10.175 |
1.375 |
|
|
10/1970 |
11.551 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2030 |
28/10/1958 |
08/1969 |
10.805 |
1.252 |
|
|
11/1970 |
12.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3149 |
21/07/1955 |
02/07/1970 |
14.959 |
0.373 |
|
|
11/1970 |
15.332 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12106 |
17/05/1952 |
30/07/1970 |
18.214 |
0.463 |
|
|
01/1971 |
18.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12128 |
15/11/1952 |
30/07/1970 |
17.715 |
0.463 |
|
|
01/1971 |
18.178 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4052 |
25/01/1961 |
12/10/1970 |
9.718 |
0.345 |
|
|
02/1971 |
10.063 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3486 |
19/03/1958 |
14/11/1970 |
12.666 |
0.416 |
|
|
04/1971 |
13.082 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4077 |
31/10/1961 |
14/11/1970 |
9.044 |
0.416 |
|
|
04/1971 |
9.460 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2393 |
03/07/1961 |
31/12/1969 |
8.501 |
1.370 |
|
|
05/1971 |
9.871 |
Diesel |
BR |
02 |
0-4-0 |
D2861 |
03/10/1961 |
31/12/1969 |
8.249 |
1.370 |
|
|
05/1971 |
9.619 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3644 |
12/12/1958 |
15/06/1970 |
11.515 |
0.915 |
|
|
05/1971 |
12.430 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3646 |
19/12/1958 |
09/05/1971 |
12.395 |
0.603 |
|
|
12/1971 |
12.997 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2392 |
16/06/1961 |
19/06/1971 |
10.014 |
0.660 |
|
|
02/1972 |
10.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3634 |
03/11/1958 |
19/11/1971 |
13.052 |
0.405 |
36A |
Doncaster |
04/1972 |
13.458 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3650 |
27/01/1959 |
05/12/1971 |
12.863 |
0.362 |
36A |
Doncaster |
04/1972 |
13.225 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3651 |
25/02/1959 |
12/12/1971 |
12.803 |
0.342 |
36A |
Doncaster |
04/1972 |
13.145 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4055 |
08/02/1961 |
31/12/1971 |
10.899 |
0.290 |
36A |
Doncaster |
04/1972 |
11.189 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4060 |
09/03/1961 |
31/12/1971 |
10.819 |
0.290 |
36A |
Doncaster |
04/1972 |
11.110 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12121 |
18/10/1952 |
04/07/1971 |
18.721 |
0.784 |
|
|
04/1972 |
19.504 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3141 |
04/05/1955 |
05/07/1971 |
16.181 |
0.863 |
|
|
05/1972 |
17.044 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4051 |
18/01/1961 |
04/07/1971 |
10.463 |
0.866 |
|
|
05/1972 |
11.329 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4065 |
15/04/1961 |
07/11/1971 |
10.570 |
0.521 |
40A |
Lincoln |
05/1972 |
11.090 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12055 |
08/07/1949 |
17/07/1971 |
22.038 |
0.830 |
|
|
05/1972 |
22.868 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12081 |
30/11/1950 |
20/06/1970 |
19.567 |
1.904 |
|
|
05/1972 |
21.471 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
30/09/1950 |
06/11/1971 |
21.115 |
0.608 |
|
|
06/1972 |
21.723 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12079 |
30/11/1950 |
11/09/1971 |
20.795 |
0.762 |
|
|
06/1972 |
21.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12090 |
17/07/1951 |
17/07/1971 |
20.014 |
0.915 |
|
|
06/1972 |
20.929 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2212 |
23/10/1954 |
14/11/1970 |
16.071 |
1.668 |
|
|
07/1972 |
17.740 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4050 |
18/01/1961 |
31/12/1971 |
10.956 |
0.625 |
40B |
Immingham |
08/1972 |
11.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4053 |
28/01/1961 |
31/12/1971 |
10.929 |
0.625 |
40B |
Immingham |
08/1972 |
11.553 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12065 |
30/12/1949 |
10/05/1971 |
21.373 |
1.268 |
|
|
08/1972 |
22.641 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12094 |
06/10/1951 |
09/10/1971 |
20.022 |
0.852 |
|
|
08/1972 |
20.874 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4057 |
18/02/1961 |
21/01/1972 |
10.929 |
0.652 |
41J |
Shirebrook |
09/1972 |
11.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4061 |
15/03/1961 |
03/01/1972 |
10.811 |
0.701 |
30A |
Stratford |
09/1972 |
11.512 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D4062 |
24/03/1961 |
11/01/1972 |
10.808 |
0.679 |
40B |
Immingham |
09/1972 |
11.488 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3145 |
22/06/1955 |
23/04/1972 |
16.849 |
0.647 |
51L |
Thornaby |
12/1972 |
17.496 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3641 |
05/12/1958 |
05/12/1971 |
13.008 |
1.030 |
36C |
Frodingham |
12/1972 |
14.038 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2088 |
01/07/1959 |
08/06/1972 |
12.948 |
0.767 |
30E |
Colchester |
03/1973 |
13.715 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2130 |
27/01/1960 |
20/08/1972 |
12.573 |
0.567 |
16C |
Derby |
03/1973 |
13.140 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2388 |
06/04/1961 |
30/07/1972 |
11.323 |
0.625 |
16C |
Derby |
03/1973 |
11.948 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2387 |
29/03/1961 |
30/12/1972 |
11.764 |
0.290 |
16C |
Derby |
04/1973 |
12.055 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2065 |
11/08/1959 |
31/12/1972 |
13.400 |
0.537 |
51L |
Thornaby |
07/1973 |
13.937 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3138 |
05/03/1955 |
23/04/1972 |
17.148 |
1.312 |
31B |
March |
08/1973 |
18.460 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2217 |
28/07/1955 |
07/05/1972 |
16.789 |
1.526 |
30A |
Stratford |
11/1973 |
18.315 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03174 |
31/12/1960 |
29/11/1975 |
14.921 |
0.460 |
|
|
05/1976 |
15.381 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03166 |
25/10/1960 |
29/11/1975 |
15.104 |
0.586 |
|
|
30/06/1976 |
15.690 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03050 |
17/01/1959 |
07/08/1978 |
19.567 |
0.770 |
|
|
05/1979 |
20.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08014 |
16/05/1953 |
18/05/1980 |
27.025 |
1.537 |
BV |
Bury |
30/11/1981 |
28.562 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2054 |
11/04/1959 |
19/11/1972 |
13.619 |
9.827 |
55B |
York (North) |
09/1982 |
23.447 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76015 |
23/06/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.096 |
1.652 |
|
|
03/1983 |
31.748 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76034 |
19/04/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.271 |
1.652 |
|
|
03/1983 |
30.923 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76041 |
17/05/1952 |
02/11/1980 |
28.482 |
2.364 |
|
|
03/1983 |
30.847 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76046 |
23/08/1952 |
02/11/1980 |
28.214 |
2.364 |
|
|
03/1983 |
30.578 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76049 |
18/10/1952 |
02/11/1980 |
28.060 |
2.364 |
|
|
03/1983 |
30.425 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76053 |
14/03/1953 |
02/11/1980 |
27.658 |
2.364 |
|
|
03/1983 |
30.022 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03129 |
18/01/1960 |
20/12/1981 |
21.937 |
1.236 |
|
|
16/03/1983 |
23.173 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76001 |
27/10/1950 |
02/11/1980 |
30.038 |
2.449 |
RS |
Reddish |
04/1983 |
32.488 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76016 |
15/05/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.203 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.940 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76021 |
20/10/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
29.770 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.507 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76025 |
19/01/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.521 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.258 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76027 |
16/02/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.444 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.181 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76030 |
19/01/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.521 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
31.258 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76051 |
17/01/1953 |
20/07/1981 |
28.523 |
1.737 |
|
|
04/1983 |
30.260 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03161 |
13/09/1960 |
13/12/1981 |
21.263 |
1.345 |
|
|
18/04/1983 |
22.608 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03160 |
05/09/1960 |
13/12/1981 |
21.285 |
1.356 |
|
|
22/04/1983 |
22.641 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76006 |
13/01/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.537 |
1.819 |
|
|
05/1983 |
32.356 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76013 |
19/05/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.192 |
1.819 |
|
|
05/1983 |
32.011 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76014 |
23/06/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.096 |
1.819 |
|
|
05/1983 |
31.915 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76047 |
23/08/1952 |
02/11/1980 |
28.214 |
2.532 |
|
|
05/1983 |
30.745 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76038 |
16/11/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
28.693 |
1.819 |
|
|
05/1983 |
30.512 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76054 |
16/05/1953 |
20/07/1981 |
28.197 |
1.819 |
|
|
05/1983 |
30.016 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76007 |
17/02/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.441 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
32.345 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76008 |
17/03/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.364 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
32.268 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76010 |
17/03/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.364 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
32.268 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76011 |
17/03/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.364 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
32.268 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76035 |
18/05/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.195 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
32.099 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76022 |
20/10/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
29.770 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
31.674 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76024 |
20/10/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
29.770 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
31.674 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76039 |
18/10/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
28.773 |
1.904 |
|
|
06/1983 |
30.677 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76036 |
15/11/1950 |
20/07/1981 |
30.699 |
1.874 |
RS |
Reddish |
04/06/1983 |
32.573 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76009 |
17/03/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.364 |
1.986 |
|
|
07/1983 |
32.351 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76012 |
19/05/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
30.192 |
1.986 |
|
|
07/1983 |
32.178 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76026 |
19/01/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.521 |
1.986 |
|
|
07/1983 |
31.507 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76028 |
16/01/1952 |
20/07/1981 |
29.529 |
1.986 |
|
|
07/1983 |
31.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03389 |
26/04/1961 |
06/02/1983 |
21.797 |
0.458 |
|
|
23/07/1983 |
22.255 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76023 |
20/10/1951 |
20/07/1981 |
29.770 |
2.071 |
|
|
08/1983 |
31.841 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03034 |
21/01/1959 |
06/02/1983 |
24.060 |
0.496 |
|
|
06/08/1983 |
24.556 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76004 |
17/02/1951 |
25/06/1978 |
27.370 |
5.562 |
|
|
01/1984 |
32.932 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2299 |
11/10/1960 |
11/01/1970 |
9.258 |
14.104 |
|
|
02/1984 |
23.362 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76002 |
27/10/1950 |
25/06/1978 |
27.679 |
5.647 |
RS |
Reddish |
02/1984 |
33.326 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76050 |
19/04/1952 |
06/02/1977 |
24.819 |
7.027 |
|
|
02/1984 |
31.847 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76048 |
19/04/1952 |
06/02/1977 |
24.819 |
7.027 |
|
|
02/1984 |
31.847 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76043 |
14/05/1952 |
25/06/1978 |
26.132 |
5.647 |
|
|
02/1984 |
31.778 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76052 |
14/02/1953 |
25/06/1978 |
25.375 |
5.647 |
|
|
02/1984 |
31.022 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
76055 |
20/06/1953 |
06/02/1977 |
23.649 |
7.027 |
|
|
02/1984 |
30.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03026 |
05/09/1958 |
06/02/1983 |
24.438 |
1.230 |
|
|
30/04/1984 |
25.668 |
Diesel |
BR |
D1/3 |
0-4-0 |
D2958 |
28/05/1956 |
14/01/1968 |
11.638 |
16.764 |
|
|
10/1984 |
28.403 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2132 |
12/02/1960 |
24/06/1969 |
9.370 |
15.405 |
|
|
11/1984 |
24.775 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08345 |
14/02/1958 |
01/11/1983 |
25.729 |
1.663 |
AY |
Ayr |
30/06/1985 |
27.392 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
03151 |
16/06/1960 |
07/07/1985 |
25.074 |
0.441 |
|
|
12/1985 |
25.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2057 |
15/05/1959 |
03/10/1971 |
12.395 |
14.542 |
|
|
04/1986 |
26.937 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2093 |
28/05/1960 |
03/10/1971 |
11.356 |
14.542 |
|
|
04/1986 |
25.899 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08679 |
08/08/1959 |
19/06/1976 |
16.877 |
9.827 |
AN |
Allerton |
04/1986 |
26.704 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08293 |
24/05/1957 |
24/12/1985 |
28.605 |
1.808 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10/1987 |
30.414 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08283 |
11/06/1957 |
24/02/1986 |
28.726 |
1.726 |
LO |
Longsight |
16/11/1987 |
30.452 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08396 |
09/05/1958 |
13/03/1986 |
27.863 |
1.718 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
30/11/1987 |
29.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08475 |
10/12/1958 |
09/03/1987 |
28.263 |
0.729 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
30/11/1987 |
28.992 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08284 |
14/06/1957 |
01/05/1985 |
27.899 |
2.625 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
12/1987 |
30.523 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08524 |
18/09/1958 |
06/01/1986 |
27.321 |
1.940 |
LO |
Longsight |
12/1987 |
29.260 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31195 |
26/05/1960 |
04/02/1988 |
27.712 |
0.614 |
|
|
09/1988 |
28.326 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47230 |
07/10/1965 |
14/01/1987 |
21.285 |
2.156 |
|
|
11/03/1989 |
23.441 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47275 |
11/12/1965 |
07/09/1986 |
20.753 |
2.510 |
|
|
11/03/1989 |
23.263 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08395 |
02/05/1958 |
27/07/1988 |
30.258 |
0.759 |
DR |
Doncaster |
30/04/1989 |
31.016 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08170 |
15/02/1956 |
23/03/1986 |
30.121 |
3.118 |
GD |
Gateshead |
04/05/1989 |
33.238 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08456 |
03/01/1959 |
29/04/1988 |
29.340 |
1.170 |
DR |
Doncaster |
30/06/1989 |
30.510 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31183 |
07/04/1960 |
08/07/1988 |
28.271 |
1.019 |
|
|
07/1989 |
29.290 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47437 |
28/01/1964 |
07/04/1987 |
23.205 |
2.258 |
|
|
09/07/1989 |
25.463 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47282 |
08/01/1966 |
17/09/1986 |
20.704 |
2.912 |
|
|
08/1989 |
23.616 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31109 |
23/04/1959 |
11/03/1988 |
28.904 |
1.430 |
|
|
08/1989 |
30.334 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31143 |
29/10/1959 |
12/12/1988 |
29.142 |
0.674 |
|
|
08/1989 |
29.816 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31218 |
25/08/1960 |
20/04/1988 |
27.671 |
1.321 |
SF |
Stratford |
08/1989 |
28.992 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
97203 |
18/01/1962 |
06/07/1987 |
25.479 |
2.364 |
|
|
11/1989 |
27.844 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08210 |
09/11/1956 |
26/09/1988 |
31.901 |
1.104 |
TI |
Tinsley |
03/11/1989 |
33.005 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08244 |
03/07/1956 |
04/05/1986 |
29.855 |
3.548 |
TI |
Tinsley |
19/11/1989 |
33.403 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31280 |
03/08/1961 |
24/10/1988 |
27.244 |
2.312 |
|
|
02/1991 |
29.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47017 |
31/03/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
26.934 |
1.016 |
|
|
06/03/1992 |
27.951 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47412 |
28/02/1963 |
12/05/1987 |
24.216 |
4.841 |
|
|
13/03/1992 |
29.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08808 |
02/07/1960 |
15/05/1990 |
29.888 |
1.868 |
CL |
|
27/03/1992 |
31.756 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31257 |
02/02/1961 |
10/09/1990 |
29.622 |
1.597 |
|
|
04/1992 |
31.219 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31288 |
26/10/1961 |
08/04/1991 |
29.468 |
1.022 |
|
|
04/1992 |
30.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31309 |
31/05/1962 |
08/04/1991 |
28.874 |
1.022 |
|
|
04/1992 |
29.896 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47009 |
26/07/1963 |
01/03/1991 |
27.616 |
1.112 |
|
|
10/04/1992 |
28.729 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47014 |
27/09/1963 |
05/07/1991 |
27.789 |
0.767 |
|
|
10/04/1992 |
28.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47097 |
11/11/1963 |
04/04/1990 |
26.414 |
2.019 |
|
|
10/04/1992 |
28.433 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47012 |
07/09/1963 |
15/12/1989 |
26.290 |
2.356 |
|
|
23/04/1992 |
28.647 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45106 |
15/06/1961 |
20/02/1989 |
27.704 |
3.192 |
|
|
30/04/1992 |
30.896 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50004 |
23/12/1967 |
22/06/1990 |
22.512 |
1.899 |
|
|
05/1992 |
24.411 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08463 |
22/09/1958 |
16/03/1989 |
30.501 |
3.159 |
DY |
Derby |
12/05/1992 |
33.660 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50016 |
24/04/1968 |
10/07/1990 |
22.225 |
1.907 |
|
|
05/06/1992 |
24.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50020 |
29/04/1968 |
27/07/1990 |
22.258 |
1.879 |
|
|
12/06/1992 |
24.137 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50036 |
12/08/1968 |
12/04/1991 |
22.679 |
1.227 |
|
|
03/07/1992 |
23.907 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47003 |
12/06/1963 |
05/07/1991 |
28.082 |
1.036 |
|
|
17/07/1992 |
29.118 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08200 |
29/09/1956 |
13/04/1986 |
29.556 |
6.427 |
TE |
Thornaby |
14/09/1992 |
35.984 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08504 |
24/05/1958 |
30/10/1988 |
30.458 |
3.901 |
TE |
Thornaby |
23/09/1992 |
34.359 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08406 |
06/06/1958 |
20/04/1988 |
29.893 |
4.490 |
CA |
Cambridge |
10/1992 |
34.384 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08549 |
03/09/1959 |
24/11/1985 |
26.244 |
6.899 |
MR |
March |
16/10/1992 |
33.142 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08412 |
20/06/1958 |
24/11/1985 |
27.449 |
6.937 |
MR |
March |
30/10/1992 |
34.386 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08438 |
17/10/1958 |
23/03/1986 |
27.449 |
6.611 |
MR |
March |
30/10/1992 |
34.060 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47852 |
12/02/1965 |
01/03/1991 |
26.063 |
2.041 |
|
|
03/1993 |
28.104 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31429 |
27/04/1961 |
01/11/1991 |
30.534 |
1.455 |
|
|
04/1993 |
31.989 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08085 |
22/03/1955 |
23/03/1986 |
31.025 |
7.071 |
GD |
Gateshead |
16/04/1993 |
38.096 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47459 |
01/05/1964 |
25/03/1992 |
27.918 |
1.118 |
|
|
07/05/1993 |
29.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47006 |
05/07/1963 |
27/09/1991 |
28.249 |
1.630 |
|
|
14/05/1993 |
29.879 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47456 |
25/04/1964 |
21/10/1991 |
27.507 |
1.584 |
|
|
21/05/1993 |
29.090 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47311 |
14/01/1965 |
22/11/1991 |
26.871 |
1.496 |
|
|
21/05/1993 |
28.367 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47450 |
28/03/1964 |
03/05/1991 |
27.115 |
2.071 |
|
|
28/05/1993 |
29.186 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47422 |
14/06/1963 |
01/08/1991 |
28.151 |
1.863 |
|
|
11/06/1993 |
30.014 |
Electric |
BR |
82 |
Bo-Bo |
82003 |
15/08/1960 |
17/07/1983 |
22.934 |
9.926 |
|
|
17/06/1993 |
32.860 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47837 |
01/09/1964 |
01/11/1991 |
27.184 |
1.704 |
|
|
07/1993 |
28.888 |
Electric |
BR |
82 |
Bo-Bo |
82005 |
28/10/1960 |
13/10/1987 |
26.975 |
5.723 |
WN |
Willesden |
02/07/1993 |
32.699 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47477 |
31/07/1964 |
28/10/1992 |
28.263 |
0.734 |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
28.997 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31400 |
07/01/1960 |
01/07/1991 |
31.501 |
2.126 |
|
|
08/1993 |
33.627 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47479 |
21/08/1964 |
11/12/1992 |
28.326 |
0.652 |
|
|
06/08/1993 |
28.978 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47434 |
26/10/1963 |
31/12/1992 |
29.203 |
0.863 |
|
|
11/11/1993 |
30.066 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47327 |
30/01/1965 |
19/02/1993 |
28.074 |
0.729 |
|
|
12/11/1993 |
28.803 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47054 |
08/12/1964 |
17/07/1992 |
27.625 |
1.342 |
|
|
19/11/1993 |
28.967 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47336 |
01/03/1965 |
28/06/1993 |
28.345 |
0.414 |
|
|
26/11/1993 |
28.759 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47461 |
16/05/1964 |
28/03/1991 |
26.882 |
2.726 |
|
|
17/12/1993 |
29.608 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47435 |
25/01/1964 |
15/03/1990 |
26.153 |
3.775 |
|
|
22/12/1993 |
29.929 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47424 |
15/07/1963 |
18/01/1991 |
27.532 |
2.967 |
|
|
05/01/1994 |
30.499 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47324 |
21/01/1965 |
17/07/1992 |
27.504 |
1.477 |
|
|
07/01/1994 |
28.981 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47101 |
21/11/1963 |
13/03/1989 |
25.326 |
4.844 |
|
|
14/01/1994 |
30.170 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47001 |
07/06/1963 |
25/11/1986 |
23.485 |
7.162 |
|
|
21/01/1994 |
30.647 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47011 |
07/09/1963 |
03/04/1987 |
23.586 |
6.808 |
|
|
21/01/1994 |
30.395 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47015 |
05/10/1963 |
11/05/1987 |
23.614 |
6.723 |
|
|
28/01/1994 |
30.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47451 |
28/03/1964 |
24/06/1991 |
27.258 |
2.619 |
|
|
04/02/1994 |
29.877 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47100 |
16/11/1963 |
17/07/1991 |
27.685 |
2.595 |
|
|
18/02/1994 |
30.279 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47454 |
25/04/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
26.866 |
2.992 |
|
|
25/02/1994 |
29.858 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31457 |
04/02/1960 |
01/02/1994 |
34.016 |
0.115 |
|
|
03/1994 |
34.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31404 |
07/04/1960 |
21/02/1991 |
30.896 |
3.063 |
|
|
03/1994 |
33.959 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47445 |
05/03/1964 |
24/06/1991 |
27.321 |
2.734 |
|
|
18/03/1994 |
30.055 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47447 |
14/03/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
26.981 |
3.049 |
|
|
18/03/1994 |
30.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47099 |
08/11/1963 |
12/11/1991 |
28.030 |
2.425 |
|
|
04/1994 |
30.455 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47120 |
17/01/1964 |
01/03/1991 |
27.137 |
3.126 |
|
|
04/1994 |
30.263 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31324 |
04/10/1962 |
16/04/1993 |
30.553 |
1.079 |
|
|
05/1994 |
31.633 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08254 |
19/11/1956 |
02/11/1986 |
29.973 |
7.532 |
GD |
Gateshead |
13/05/1994 |
37.504 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08608 |
11/07/1959 |
07/11/1988 |
29.348 |
5.515 |
GD |
Gateshead |
13/05/1994 |
34.863 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08654 |
08/04/1959 |
25/10/1991 |
32.570 |
2.551 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
13/05/1994 |
35.121 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08671 |
02/01/1960 |
07/11/1988 |
28.868 |
5.515 |
GD |
Gateshead |
13/05/1994 |
34.384 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08741 |
27/10/1960 |
16/04/1991 |
30.488 |
3.077 |
DY |
Derby |
13/05/1994 |
33.564 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08787 |
23/04/1960 |
14/02/1991 |
30.833 |
3.244 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
13/05/1994 |
34.077 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47512 |
25/02/1967 |
01/10/1991 |
24.614 |
2.636 |
|
|
20/05/1994 |
27.249 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47005 |
21/06/1963 |
04/11/1991 |
28.392 |
2.562 |
|
|
27/05/1994 |
30.953 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47460 |
08/05/1964 |
07/02/1992 |
27.770 |
2.301 |
|
|
27/05/1994 |
30.071 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31120 |
02/07/1959 |
27/09/1991 |
32.260 |
2.718 |
|
|
06/1994 |
34.978 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31425 |
29/06/1961 |
01/09/1991 |
30.195 |
2.789 |
|
|
06/1994 |
32.984 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47002 |
14/06/1963 |
24/06/1991 |
28.047 |
2.984 |
|
|
17/06/1994 |
31.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47116 |
21/07/1966 |
27/07/1990 |
24.033 |
3.893 |
|
|
17/06/1994 |
27.926 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33058 |
18/11/1961 |
21/06/1991 |
29.608 |
2.992 |
|
|
17/06/1994 |
32.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33006 |
23/04/1960 |
06/08/1991 |
31.307 |
2.877 |
|
|
21/06/1994 |
34.184 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47007 |
05/07/1963 |
27/09/1991 |
28.249 |
2.789 |
|
|
11/07/1994 |
31.038 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47374 |
13/08/1965 |
31/07/1992 |
26.984 |
2.110 |
|
|
09/09/1994 |
29.093 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08141 |
09/02/1956 |
25/01/1988 |
31.981 |
6.647 |
TI |
Tinsley |
16/09/1994 |
38.627 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08334 |
06/12/1957 |
03/09/1987 |
29.762 |
7.041 |
TE |
Thornaby |
16/09/1994 |
36.803 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47010 |
31/08/1963 |
11/12/1992 |
29.301 |
1.978 |
|
|
03/12/1994 |
31.279 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08583 |
10/08/1959 |
23/07/1993 |
33.975 |
2.238 |
KY |
Knottingley |
18/10/1995 |
36.214 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08595 |
25/11/1959 |
23/07/1993 |
33.682 |
2.238 |
DR |
Doncaster |
18/10/1995 |
35.921 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47448 |
23/03/1964 |
17/05/1991 |
27.167 |
4.830 |
|
|
14/03/1996 |
31.997 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47458 |
02/05/1964 |
27/05/1993 |
29.088 |
2.814 |
|
|
19/03/1996 |
31.901 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37378 |
05/11/1963 |
01/05/1996 |
32.510 |
0.123 |
|
|
06/1996 |
32.633 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56026 |
15/07/1977 |
02/07/1996 |
18.978 |
-0.047 |
|
|
06/1996 |
18.932 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56005 |
14/03/1977 |
02/07/1996 |
19.315 |
0.121 |
|
|
08/1996 |
19.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56024 |
15/06/1977 |
29/10/1996 |
19.386 |
-0.205 |
|
|
08/1996 |
19.181 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08777 |
31/03/1960 |
22/11/1991 |
31.666 |
5.315 |
KY |
Knottingley |
15/03/1997 |
36.981 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31413 |
31/08/1961 |
01/05/1997 |
35.690 |
0.710 |
|
|
01/1998 |
36.400 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56020 |
20/05/1977 |
16/06/1997 |
20.088 |
0.584 |
|
|
01/1998 |
20.671 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47617 |
29/05/1964 |
01/01/1998 |
33.616 |
0.123 |
|
|
02/1998 |
33.740 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47346 |
18/03/1965 |
28/01/1998 |
32.888 |
0.074 |
|
|
24/02/1998 |
32.962 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47249 |
01/01/1966 |
07/03/1996 |
30.200 |
2.022 |
|
|
03/1998 |
32.222 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47359 |
11/06/1965 |
28/01/1998 |
32.655 |
0.115 |
|
|
11/03/1998 |
32.770 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47586 |
02/10/1964 |
01/10/1994 |
30.016 |
3.540 |
|
|
04/1998 |
33.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47190 |
29/06/1965 |
11/11/1994 |
29.389 |
3.408 |
|
|
08/04/1998 |
32.797 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47543 |
29/05/1964 |
25/08/1998 |
34.263 |
-0.340 |
|
|
23/04/1998 |
33.923 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56122 |
03/07/1983 |
09/10/1992 |
9.277 |
5.600 |
|
|
05/1998 |
14.877 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47325 |
26/01/1965 |
07/03/1996 |
31.132 |
2.205 |
|
|
21/05/1998 |
33.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47333 |
25/02/1965 |
21/01/2000 |
34.926 |
-1.603 |
|
|
06/1998 |
33.323 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47321 |
22/01/1965 |
22/09/1995 |
30.685 |
2.789 |
|
|
06/07/1998 |
33.474 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47520 |
02/10/1966 |
25/08/1998 |
31.918 |
-0.112 |
|
|
15/07/1998 |
31.805 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47214 |
11/05/1965 |
11/11/1994 |
29.523 |
3.696 |
|
|
22/07/1998 |
33.219 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47144 |
25/05/1964 |
25/08/1998 |
34.274 |
-0.074 |
|
|
29/07/1998 |
34.200 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47102 |
29/11/1963 |
22/09/1995 |
31.836 |
2.868 |
|
|
04/08/1998 |
34.704 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47222 |
17/06/1965 |
25/08/1998 |
33.211 |
-0.052 |
|
|
06/08/1998 |
33.159 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47378 |
02/09/1965 |
25/08/1998 |
33.000 |
0.058 |
|
|
09/1998 |
33.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47096 |
31/10/1963 |
22/09/1995 |
31.915 |
4.318 |
|
|
01/2000 |
36.233 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37035 |
01/04/1962 |
21/01/2000 |
37.833 |
-0.019 |
|
|
14/01/2000 |
37.814 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08677 |
11/07/1959 |
10/06/1993 |
33.940 |
7.019 |
WN |
Willesden |
06/2000 |
40.959 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08755 |
20/01/1961 |
10/09/1993 |
32.660 |
6.751 |
ML |
Motherwell |
09/06/2000 |
39.411 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08713 |
29/04/1960 |
26/06/1998 |
38.184 |
1.970 |
|
|
14/06/2000 |
40.153 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08609 |
11/07/1959 |
08/11/1993 |
34.353 |
6.858 |
WN |
Willesden |
09/2000 |
41.211 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08793 |
21/05/1960 |
23/07/1993 |
33.195 |
7.321 |
AB |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
11/2000 |
40.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08619 |
26/09/1959 |
12/10/1981 |
22.060 |
19.603 |
|
|
05/2001 |
41.663 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37251 |
30/12/1964 |
07/12/2001 |
36.962 |
-0.186 |
|
|
30/09/2001 |
36.775 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37404 |
01/06/1965 |
01/02/1999 |
33.693 |
2.956 |
|
|
01/2002 |
36.649 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47849 |
23/10/1964 |
01/12/2001 |
37.132 |
0.452 |
|
|
05/2002 |
37.584 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20206 |
22/04/1967 |
12/04/1991 |
23.989 |
11.266 |
|
|
07/2002 |
35.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47584 |
23/10/1964 |
01/03/2000 |
35.378 |
2.625 |
|
|
10/2002 |
38.003 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31545 |
15/02/1962 |
01/05/1997 |
35.230 |
5.460 |
|
|
10/2002 |
40.690 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37088 |
14/01/1963 |
30/09/2002 |
39.737 |
0.008 |
|
|
03/10/2002 |
39.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20133 |
17/03/1966 |
13/09/1991 |
25.510 |
11.132 |
|
|
28/10/2002 |
36.641 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50001 |
09/12/1967 |
19/04/1991 |
23.375 |
11.658 |
|
|
12/12/2002 |
35.033 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37153 |
10/07/1963 |
15/01/2003 |
39.545 |
0.000 |
|
|
01/2003 |
39.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37015 |
19/05/1961 |
01/09/1994 |
33.310 |
8.463 |
|
|
02/2003 |
41.773 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31434 |
09/02/1961 |
01/11/1998 |
37.751 |
4.455 |
|
|
04/2003 |
42.205 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08746 |
26/11/1960 |
31/08/2003 |
42.789 |
0.375 |
|
|
01/2004 |
43.164 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47565 |
17/09/1964 |
01/01/2000 |
35.312 |
4.126 |
|
|
02/2004 |
39.438 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08702 |
12/02/1960 |
28/02/2004 |
44.074 |
-0.036 |
|
|
02/2004 |
44.038 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08801 |
11/06/1960 |
31/01/2004 |
43.668 |
0.121 |
|
|
03/2004 |
43.789 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56010 |
28/07/1977 |
28/02/2004 |
26.605 |
0.129 |
|
|
04/2004 |
26.734 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47310 |
10/12/1964 |
28/02/2004 |
39.244 |
0.170 |
|
|
30/04/2004 |
39.414 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47476 |
20/07/1964 |
28/02/2004 |
39.636 |
0.211 |
|
|
05/2004 |
39.847 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31201 |
16/06/1960 |
24/03/2000 |
39.797 |
4.145 |
|
|
05/2004 |
43.942 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31273 |
22/06/1961 |
12/04/2001 |
39.833 |
3.093 |
|
|
05/2004 |
42.926 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47513 |
25/02/1967 |
28/02/2004 |
37.033 |
0.205 |
|
|
13/05/2004 |
37.238 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56050 |
25/10/1978 |
04/2004 |
25.490 |
0.167 |
|
|
06/2004 |
25.658 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56075 |
06/04/1980 |
04/2004 |
24.041 |
0.167 |
|
|
06/2004 |
24.208 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37225 |
07/02/1964 |
28/02/2004 |
40.085 |
0.282 |
|
|
10/06/2004 |
40.367 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47291 |
26/03/1966 |
25/08/1998 |
32.438 |
5.816 |
|
|
17/06/2004 |
38.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31146 |
12/11/1959 |
24/03/2000 |
40.392 |
4.312 |
|
|
07/2004 |
44.704 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56023 |
11/07/1977 |
17/12/1993 |
16.447 |
10.668 |
|
|
08/2004 |
27.115 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86254 |
18/02/1966 |
10/2002 |
36.679 |
1.797 |
|
|
01/08/2004 |
38.477 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31442 |
22/12/1960 |
01/09/1993 |
32.715 |
11.047 |
|
|
09/2004 |
43.762 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08751 |
28/12/1960 |
28/02/2004 |
43.197 |
0.518 |
|
|
04/09/2004 |
43.715 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56130 |
01/04/1984 |
04/2004 |
20.052 |
0.501 |
|
|
10/2004 |
20.553 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08610 |
25/07/1959 |
26/06/1998 |
38.948 |
6.351 |
|
|
30/10/2004 |
45.299 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86243 |
12/10/1965 |
11/2002 |
37.118 |
1.962 |
|
|
31/10/2004 |
39.079 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37904 |
08/05/1963 |
01/04/1996 |
32.923 |
8.630 |
|
|
11/2004 |
41.553 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86417 |
02/04/1966 |
09/2001 |
35.479 |
3.132 |
|
|
01/11/2004 |
38.611 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08419 |
11/07/1958 |
23/04/1993 |
34.808 |
11.605 |
CL |
|
27/11/2004 |
46.414 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86261 |
25/09/1965 |
11/2002 |
37.164 |
2.047 |
|
|
01/12/2004 |
39.211 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47193 |
21/05/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
39.389 |
0.178 |
|
|
04/12/2004 |
39.567 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47157 |
07/07/1964 |
30/09/2004 |
40.260 |
0.205 |
|
|
14/12/2004 |
40.466 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86425 |
18/10/1965 |
02/2002 |
36.353 |
2.879 |
|
|
01/01/2005 |
39.233 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47334 |
18/02/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
39.641 |
0.263 |
|
|
04/01/2005 |
39.904 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47287 |
26/02/1966 |
30/09/2004 |
38.619 |
0.288 |
|
|
13/01/2005 |
38.907 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47207 |
06/08/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
39.178 |
0.312 |
|
|
22/01/2005 |
39.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47258 |
27/04/1966 |
30/09/2004 |
38.455 |
0.351 |
|
|
05/02/2005 |
38.805 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47339 |
17/02/1965 |
21/01/2000 |
34.948 |
5.066 |
|
|
12/02/2005 |
40.014 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47353 |
31/03/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
39.529 |
0.386 |
|
|
18/02/2005 |
39.915 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47223 |
28/05/1965 |
31/01/2005 |
39.707 |
0.071 |
|
|
26/02/2005 |
39.778 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86618 |
21/08/1965 |
08/2001 |
36.008 |
3.545 |
|
|
01/03/2005 |
39.553 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86634 |
17/10/1965 |
05/2002 |
36.600 |
2.797 |
|
|
01/03/2005 |
39.397 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47156 |
10/07/1964 |
31/01/2005 |
40.589 |
0.085 |
|
|
03/03/2005 |
40.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47114 |
04/11/1965 |
30/09/2004 |
38.932 |
0.452 |
|
|
14/03/2005 |
39.384 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86416 |
19/06/1965 |
02/2002 |
36.685 |
3.293 |
|
|
01/06/2005 |
39.978 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37334 |
22/09/1965 |
01/03/1997 |
31.460 |
8.463 |
|
|
08/2005 |
39.923 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37068 |
23/11/1962 |
31/05/2005 |
42.548 |
0.219 |
|
|
19/08/2005 |
42.767 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47217 |
02/07/1965 |
30/06/2005 |
40.022 |
0.148 |
|
|
23/08/2005 |
40.170 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08815 |
13/08/1960 |
01/04/1996 |
35.658 |
9.463 |
|
|
09/2005 |
45.121 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37370 |
28/05/1963 |
01/11/2000 |
37.458 |
4.874 |
|
|
09/2005 |
42.332 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47328 |
27/01/1965 |
30/06/2005 |
40.449 |
0.216 |
|
|
17/09/2005 |
40.666 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47536 |
30/01/1965 |
01/11/1996 |
31.775 |
8.959 |
|
|
10/2005 |
40.734 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47573 |
30/10/1964 |
01/05/2001 |
36.526 |
4.460 |
|
|
10/2005 |
40.986 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37071 |
22/08/1962 |
30/06/2004 |
41.885 |
1.293 |
|
|
10/2005 |
43.178 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47576 |
14/10/1964 |
01/11/1996 |
32.071 |
9.044 |
|
|
11/2005 |
41.115 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86603 |
27/09/1965 |
09/1999 |
33.989 |
6.134 |
|
|
01/11/2005 |
40.123 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86426 |
17/12/1965 |
06/2004 |
38.521 |
1.381 |
|
|
01/11/2005 |
39.901 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37074 |
17/09/1962 |
30/06/2005 |
42.814 |
0.342 |
|
|
02/11/2005 |
43.156 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37162 |
23/07/1963 |
30/06/2005 |
41.967 |
0.460 |
|
|
12/2005 |
42.427 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56121 |
19/06/1983 |
06/2005 |
22.005 |
0.501 |
|
|
12/2005 |
22.507 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86430 |
19/06/1965 |
06/2004 |
39.016 |
1.463 |
|
|
01/12/2005 |
40.479 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47241 |
16/11/1965 |
30/06/2005 |
39.647 |
0.545 |
|
|
01/2006 |
40.192 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37230 |
06/03/1964 |
31/08/2005 |
41.515 |
0.375 |
|
|
01/2006 |
41.890 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37185 |
28/12/1963 |
30/06/2005 |
41.534 |
0.562 |
|
|
21/01/2006 |
42.096 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31123 |
23/07/1959 |
16/03/1992 |
32.671 |
13.929 |
|
|
02/2006 |
46.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37797 |
22/11/1962 |
01/02/2003 |
40.222 |
3.041 |
|
|
02/2006 |
43.263 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37376 |
10/10/1963 |
01/10/2000 |
37.003 |
5.342 |
|
|
02/02/2006 |
42.345 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37298 |
12/08/1965 |
30/06/2005 |
39.910 |
0.600 |
|
|
04/02/2006 |
40.510 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37242 |
10/09/1964 |
31/01/2006 |
41.419 |
0.077 |
|
|
28/02/2006 |
41.496 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47566 |
04/10/1964 |
01/11/1996 |
32.099 |
9.373 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.471 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37344 |
14/09/1962 |
01/07/1996 |
33.819 |
9.710 |
|
|
03/2006 |
43.529 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37697 |
17/09/1964 |
01/04/1999 |
34.559 |
6.959 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.518 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56036 |
16/08/1978 |
06/2005 |
26.849 |
0.748 |
|
|
03/2006 |
27.597 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37686 |
06/09/1963 |
01/07/2000 |
36.844 |
5.792 |
|
|
04/2006 |
42.636 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20073 |
19/07/1961 |
23/12/1993 |
32.452 |
12.315 |
|
|
14/04/2006 |
44.767 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37040 |
01/06/1962 |
30/06/2005 |
43.110 |
0.833 |
|
|
30/04/2006 |
43.942 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47567 |
03/10/1964 |
01/02/2003 |
38.356 |
3.370 |
|
|
06/2006 |
41.726 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56132 |
10/06/1984 |
06/2005 |
21.027 |
1.000 |
|
|
06/2006 |
22.027 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47146 |
04/06/1964 |
30/06/2005 |
41.099 |
0.981 |
|
|
23/06/2006 |
42.079 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08642 |
23/01/1959 |
31/05/2006 |
47.384 |
0.077 |
|
|
28/06/2006 |
47.460 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47338 |
12/02/1965 |
30/04/2007 |
42.238 |
-0.792 |
|
|
07/2006 |
41.447 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56004 |
28/02/1977 |
06/2005 |
28.312 |
1.082 |
|
|
07/2006 |
29.395 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33056 |
28/10/1961 |
04/02/1991 |
29.290 |
15.485 |
|
|
27/07/2006 |
44.775 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47624 |
03/04/1965 |
01/11/1998 |
33.603 |
7.877 |
|
|
09/2006 |
41.479 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37131 |
29/03/1963 |
30/06/2005 |
42.285 |
1.786 |
|
|
13/04/2007 |
44.071 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47298 |
01/08/1966 |
30/04/2007 |
40.773 |
0.049 |
|
|
18/05/2007 |
40.822 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31200 |
16/06/1960 |
30/06/2007 |
47.068 |
-0.041 |
|
|
06/2007 |
47.027 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31319 |
23/08/1962 |
30/04/2007 |
44.715 |
0.126 |
|
|
06/2007 |
44.841 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31420 |
18/02/1960 |
01/01/2001 |
40.899 |
6.537 |
|
|
07/2007 |
47.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37010 |
24/02/1961 |
30/06/2005 |
44.375 |
2.071 |
|
|
26/07/2007 |
46.447 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31427 |
26/05/1960 |
01/02/1999 |
38.712 |
8.540 |
|
|
08/2007 |
47.252 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56044 |
14/05/1978 |
08/2005 |
27.274 |
2.085 |
|
|
09/2007 |
29.359 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56034 |
25/08/1977 |
06/2005 |
27.825 |
2.419 |
|
|
11/2007 |
30.244 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56063 |
06/09/1979 |
08/2005 |
25.959 |
2.252 |
|
|
11/2007 |
28.211 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56131 |
29/04/1984 |
08/2005 |
21.310 |
2.334 |
|
|
12/2007 |
23.644 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37379 |
14/02/1964 |
01/12/2001 |
37.822 |
6.126 |
|
|
01/2008 |
43.948 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37513 |
28/09/1962 |
01/11/2000 |
38.121 |
7.293 |
|
|
02/2008 |
45.414 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37519 |
15/09/1961 |
01/11/1999 |
38.153 |
8.375 |
|
|
03/2008 |
46.529 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37708 |
18/01/1963 |
01/10/2002 |
39.729 |
5.458 |
|
|
03/2008 |
45.186 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37887 |
29/03/1963 |
01/10/1999 |
36.534 |
8.545 |
|
|
04/2008 |
45.079 |
Diesel |
BR |
09 |
0-6-0 |
09021 |
29/11/1961 |
31/12/2007 |
46.118 |
0.540 |
|
|
07/2008 |
46.658 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08493 |
28/02/1958 |
30/06/2008 |
50.370 |
0.126 |
|
|
08/2008 |
50.496 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08529 |
12/03/1959 |
30/06/2005 |
46.334 |
3.129 |
|
|
08/2008 |
49.463 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08819 |
20/08/1960 |
30/06/2008 |
47.893 |
0.126 |
|
|
08/2008 |
48.019 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37677 |
08/04/1963 |
01/12/2002 |
39.677 |
5.877 |
|
|
10/2008 |
45.553 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37796 |
16/01/1963 |
01/10/2000 |
37.734 |
8.381 |
|
|
02/2009 |
46.115 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37293 |
01/07/1965 |
30/09/2008 |
43.279 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/2009 |
43.658 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20119 |
08/03/1962 |
01/06/1992 |
30.255 |
16.721 |
|
|
02/2009 |
46.975 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56043 |
31/03/1978 |
09/2008 |
30.482 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/2009 |
30.901 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56076 |
20/04/1980 |
09/2008 |
28.425 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/2009 |
28.844 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56089 |
25/01/1981 |
09/2008 |
27.658 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/2009 |
28.077 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37238 |
12/06/1964 |
30/09/2008 |
44.332 |
0.455 |
|
|
03/2009 |
44.786 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56025 |
15/07/1977 |
09/2008 |
31.192 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/2009 |
31.688 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56064 |
17/09/1979 |
09/2008 |
29.016 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/2009 |
29.512 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56084 |
26/10/1980 |
09/2008 |
27.907 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/2009 |
28.403 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08509 |
11/07/1958 |
30/09/2008 |
50.258 |
0.540 |
|
|
04/2009 |
50.797 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37717 |
24/08/1962 |
01/12/2004 |
42.301 |
4.373 |
|
|
04/2009 |
46.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37058 |
10/10/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
46.005 |
0.540 |
|
|
04/2009 |
46.545 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56011 |
29/06/1977 |
06/2008 |
30.984 |
0.833 |
|
|
04/2009 |
31.816 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56052 |
06/12/1978 |
09/2008 |
29.797 |
0.581 |
|
|
04/2009 |
30.378 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56082 |
24/08/1980 |
09/2008 |
28.079 |
0.581 |
|
|
04/2009 |
28.660 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37196 |
06/04/1964 |
30/09/2008 |
44.515 |
0.622 |
|
|
05/2009 |
45.137 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37221 |
17/01/1964 |
30/09/2008 |
44.734 |
0.622 |
|
|
05/2009 |
45.356 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56027 |
19/09/1977 |
09/2008 |
31.011 |
0.663 |
|
|
05/2009 |
31.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08775 |
26/03/1960 |
30/09/2008 |
48.548 |
0.707 |
|
|
06/2009 |
49.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08919 |
15/10/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
45.992 |
0.707 |
|
|
06/2009 |
46.699 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31415 |
23/11/1961 |
01/07/1995 |
33.625 |
13.967 |
|
|
06/2009 |
47.592 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47641 |
27/03/1965 |
01/07/2003 |
38.288 |
6.044 |
|
|
07/2009 |
44.332 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08510 |
20/05/1958 |
30/09/2008 |
50.400 |
0.789 |
|
|
07/2009 |
51.189 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08582 |
04/08/1959 |
30/09/2008 |
49.192 |
0.789 |
|
|
07/2009 |
49.981 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08890 |
28/02/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
46.619 |
0.789 |
|
|
07/2009 |
47.408 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08955 |
02/11/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
45.942 |
0.789 |
|
|
07/2009 |
46.732 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37798 |
20/01/1961 |
01/01/2005 |
43.978 |
4.537 |
|
|
07/2009 |
48.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37692 |
10/04/1963 |
01/12/2004 |
41.674 |
4.622 |
|
|
07/2009 |
46.296 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08535 |
07/05/1959 |
01/10/2000 |
41.433 |
8.962 |
|
|
09/2009 |
50.395 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37046 |
13/07/1962 |
30/09/2008 |
46.249 |
0.959 |
|
|
09/2009 |
47.208 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37377 |
15/10/1963 |
01/12/2001 |
38.156 |
7.877 |
|
|
10/2009 |
46.033 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08728 |
12/08/1960 |
12/10/1987 |
27.184 |
22.110 |
ML |
Motherwell |
11/2009 |
49.293 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08736 |
24/09/1960 |
12/10/1987 |
27.066 |
22.110 |
ML |
Motherwell |
11/2009 |
49.175 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20215 |
20/05/1967 |
01/03/1992 |
24.800 |
17.721 |
|
|
11/2009 |
42.521 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08695 |
28/11/1959 |
28/02/2007 |
47.285 |
2.797 |
|
|
12/2009 |
50.082 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56118 |
17/04/1983 |
01/06/2006 |
23.140 |
3.542 |
|
|
12/2009 |
26.682 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56134 |
09/09/1984 |
07/2002 |
17.858 |
7.595 |
|
|
02/2010 |
25.452 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37682 |
29/04/1964 |
10/2014 |
50.496 |
2.058 |
|
|
04/11/2016 |
52.553 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86902 |
30/10/1965 |
11/2013 |
48.077 |
2.973 |
|
|
04/11/2016 |
51.049 |